Villa v. Tiano's Construction Corp. et al
Plaintiff: |
Danilo Villa |
Defendant: |
Tiano's Construction Corp., Mitrani Plasterers Co. Inc., Tiano's Construction Mitrani Cesare General Partnership, GBE Alasia Contracting Corp., Pythagoras General Contracting Corp., Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company, Lloyd Ambinder, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company and Safeco Insurance Company of North America |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv03026 |
Filed: |
April 28, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
Bronx |
Presiding Judge: |
Deborah A. Batts |
Presiding Judge: |
Henry B. Pitman |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 12, 2012 |
Filing
59
ADOPTION OF REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Having reviewed the Report, and finding no clear error on the face of the record, see 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) (1) (B), it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Report and Recommendation of United States Magist rate Judge Henry B. Pitman, dated June 22, 2012, be and the same hereby is APPROVED, ADOPTED, and RATIFIED by the Court in its entirety. This action is hereby DISMISSED as to Defendants Mitrani Plasterers Co., Inc., Tiano's Construction Mitrani Cesare General Partnership and GBE Alasia Contracting Corp.The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a) (3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Docketed as per Chambers Instructions) (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 9/06/2012) (ama)
|
September 6, 2012 |
Filing
57
ADOPTION OF REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: for 54 Report and Recommendations. Having conducted the appropriate levels of review of the July 6, 2012 Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman, this Court APPROVES, ADOPTS , and RATIFIES the Report in its entirety. the Court GRANTS Summary Judgment in favor of Defendants Pythagoras, Safeco, Lumbermens and St. Paul and this action is DISMISSED as to those Defendants. This Order resolves the Motions at Docket Number 15 a nd 25. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a) (3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 9/6/2012) (jfe)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?