The Metropolitan Museaum of Art and Jan Cowles v. Safflane Holdings, Ltd. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: The Metropolitan Museum of Art and Jan Cowles
Defendant: Safflane Holdings, Ltd. and Robert Wylde
Case Number: 1:2011cv03143
Filed: May 10, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L. Cote
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2012 Filing 27 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Nehemiah S. Gianc dated 2/24/2012 re: Counsel request that this Court should compel the execution of the JC release and this matter may then be closed. ENDORSEMENT: In view of the Dec. 21, 2011 Stipulation of Dismissal, which was "So Ordered" by the District Court on January 27, 2012, we are unaware of any jurisdictional basis for the Court to address this post-dismissal drafting disputes if counsel for Safflane wishes to pursue this matter he is to do so by formal motion addressing the jurisdictional and all other pertinent issues. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 2/24/2012) (jfe)
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: For the reasons stated, the application of Gagosian Gallery for reconsideration and vacatur of our November 7, 2011 order isdenied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 1/20/2012) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (cd)
January 27, 2012 Filing 25 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned attorneys of record for The Metropolitan Museum of Art, Jan Cowles, Safflane Holdings, Ltd. and Robert Wylde, that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this action by The Metropolitan Museum of Art, Jan Cowles, Safflane Holdings, Ltd. and/or Robert Wylde are hereby dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) with prejudice and with each partyto bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/27/2012) (lmb)
January 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a telephone conference has been scheduled in the above-captioned action for TUESDAY, JANUARY 17, 2012 at 3:00 P.M., at which time the parties are directed to jointly call chambers at (212) 805-0204 when all parties are on line. Any requests for adjournment of this scheduled conference must be in writing, with copies to all other parties, and must be preceded by reasonable efforts by the requesting party to obtain the consent of those parties. ( Telephone Conference set for 1/17/2012 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 1/13/2012) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (mro)
November 30, 2011 Filing 23 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 22 Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. ENDORSEMENT: Vacated. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/30/2011) (rj)
November 28, 2011 Filing 22 **VACATED**CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/28/2011) (jfe) Modified on 11/30/2011 (rj).
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Since October 31, 2011, the court has been inundated with no less than ten letters from counsel for various parties in these two consolidated cases. Ms. Jan Cowles is seeking a court ruling that, in event of a settlement, she will not be precluded from asserting unrelated claims in an as yet unfiled, future lawsuit. The short answer to this request is that Ms. Cowles seeks an advisory ruling, and we are precluded from offering such relief. We observe that, imbedded in some of the letters to the court, are accusations by counsel for Safflane of misconduct on the part of Ms. Cowles's attorney. We have had occasion before to remark on the unfortunate tendency of counsel to litigate by ad hominem attack, but in any event he proffers no meaningful basis to infer misconduct by his adversary, much less offers a reason for the court to undertake satellite hearings to examine any lawyer's performance of his ethical obligations in these contentious lawsuits. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 11/7/2011) (ab)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: A conference having been held with counsel the respective parties today, it is hereby ORDERED that all previously ordered discovery obligations the above-captioned matters are stayed through WEDNESDAY, OCTOBER 12, 2011. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 10/7/2011) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (rdz)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/16/2011) (djc)
September 16, 2011 Filing 18 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Aaron Richard Golub dated 9/13/2011 re: Due to the significance of GG's redactions and its counsel's self appointed status of arbiter in deciding what is and what is not relevant, plaintiffs respectfully request that all redacted documents be shown to the Court and that all documents related to the sale of the Lichtensteinpainting "Girl in Mirror" be produced. We are prepared to argue this orally in Court. ENDORSEMENT: Georgian shall produce unredacted copies of invoices and official business records, such as GG 105, 112, and 113 to outside counsel, as described in the Protective Order Paragraph 3a. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/16/2011) (djc)
September 14, 2011 Filing 17 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Aaron Richard Golub dated 9/12/2011 re: Plaintiffs respectfully request the Court endorse this letter providing for the following relief concerning such individuals and/or entities: 1. That the designation of "Authorized Persons" be expanded to include potential non-party witnesses, notwithstanding they may not appear at a deposition or at trial as a witness pursuant to paragraph 3.c. of the Order; 2. Such individuals and/or entities may communicate with this office regarding non-confidential facts and circumstances related to the captioned matters; and 3. Service of a subpoena to produce, etc., or a deposition subpoena, on such individuals and/or entities so named will not be a violation of the Order. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/13/2011) (lmb)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...; ENDORSEMENT: This stipulation binds the parties to treat as confidential the documents so classified. The Court, however, has not reviewed the documents referenced herein; therefore, by so ordering this stipulation, the Court makes no findings as to whether the documents are confidential. That finding will be made, if ever, upon a document-by-document review. Moreover, the Court does NOT so order any paragraph, which purports to authorize the parties to file documents under seal without a prior court order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/6/2011) (djc)
August 30, 2011 Filing 15 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Nehemiah S. Glanc dated 8/29/2011 re: Counsel for the Plaintiff writes to request that this Court endorse Mr. Golub's letter application ordering Mr. Marks to appear at his previously scheduled deposition date of September 8, 2011 or on a mutually agreeable date no later than September 30, 2011 and disallowing Mr. Baum to change Mr. Good's deposition date of September 27, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Fact discovery closes Nov. 18. The parties shall make themselves available for a telephone conference with the Court on 9/6/2011 at 3:00 PM in the event this dispute is not resolved. Prior to that time the parties must confer together, in person or by telephone to resolve this issue. (Discovery due by 11/18/2011. Telephone Conference set for 9/6/2011 at 03:00 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/30/2011) (ab)
August 26, 2011 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
August 8, 2011 Filing 13 ANSWER to 12 Counterclaim. Document filed by Jan Cowles.(Baum, David)
July 15, 2011 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Jan Cowles. Document filed by Safflane Holdings, Ltd., Robert Wylde. (Golub, Aaron)
June 27, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger: Telephone Conference held on 6/27/2011. (ft)
June 27, 2011 Filing 11 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Safflane Holdings, Ltd., Robert Wylde.(Golub, Aaron)
June 27, 2011 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Safflane Holdings, Ltd..(Golub, Aaron)
June 27, 2011 Filing 9 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Aaron Richard Golub dated 6/23/2011 re: Counsel requests an extension of the 7/15/2011 deadline to join new parties or amend pleadings until 10/15/2011. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. Any application beyond July 15 must be supported by good cause. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/27/2011) (tro)
June 24, 2011 Filing 8 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Safflane Holdings, Ltd., Robert Wylde.(Golub, Aaron)
June 20, 2011 Filing 7 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David R. Baum dated 6/16/2011 re: Counsel for the Plaintiff writes to request that the Court grant the order preventing the deposition on 6/20/2011, and requiring Wylde Parties to meet and confer with the other parties in good faith to select an alternative date in July, or any other subsequent date that works for all parties. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are reminded that no letter may exceed two pages. As counsel were informed on June 16, the application to adjourn the deposition was granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/20/2011) (ab)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SO ORDERED COORDINATION STIPULATION: The above-captioned actions pending in the Court are hereby coordinated for all pre-trial purposes before this Court. These actions shall be referred to herein as "Coordinated Actions." The Pre-trial Scheduling Order (the "Order") shall apply as specified to the Coordinated Actions. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/6/2011) Also docketed in 11 Civ 1679. (ab)
May 31, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. (pl)
May 31, 2011 Filing 5 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Aaron Richard Golub dated 5/26/11 re: counsel for plaintiff writes that a stipulation has been executed in the Safflane Action, in which the counsel for plaintiffs and defendant have stipulated to extend the deadline for plaintiffs to file a First Amended Complaint from May 27, 2011 to on or before June 10, 2011. With respect to the Met Action, counsel for plaintiffs and defendants have agreed to extend defendants' time to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' Complaint, dated May 10, 2011 to Monday June 27, 2011.. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/10/2011.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/31/11) (pl) Modified on 5/31/2011 (pl). Modified on 6/9/2011 (pl).
May 18, 2011 Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (sjo)
May 18, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
May 18, 2011 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:11-cv-01679-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (sjo)
May 17, 2011 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by The Metropolitan Museum of Art. (Winter, John)
May 10, 2011 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Metropolitan Museum of Art.(rdz) Modified on 5/11/2011 (rdz).
May 10, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
May 10, 2011 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Denise L. Cote as possibly related to 11-cv-1679. (rdz)
May 10, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Safflane Holdings, Ltd., Robert Wylde. (rdz)
May 10, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Safflane Holdings, Ltd., Robert Wylde. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401006259)Document filed by The Metropolitan Museum of Art and Jan Cowles.(rdz) Modified on 5/11/2011 (rdz). Modified on 5/11/2011 (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Metropolitan Museaum of Art and Jan Cowles v. Safflane Holdings, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Metropolitan Museum of Art
Represented By: David Robert Baum
Represented By: Krista Dawn Caner
Represented By: Kimberly Kalmanson
Represented By: John D. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Cowles
Represented By: David Robert Baum
Represented By: Krista Dawn Caner
Represented By: Kimberly Kalmanson
Represented By: John D. Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safflane Holdings, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wylde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?