Lupin Atlantis Holdings S.A. v. Mylan, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lupin Atlantis Holdings S.A.
Defendant: Mylan, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Ethypharm S.A.
Case Number: 1:2011cv03858
Filed: June 8, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Jed S. Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2011 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
June 8, 2011 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:11-md-02241-JSR.. (sjo)
June 8, 2011 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:11-md-02241-JSR. (sjo)
June 8, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
June 8, 2011 Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (sjo)
June 8, 2011 Filing 16 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number: 2:11-cv-00358. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
June 7, 2011 Filing 15 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Southern District of New York. (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
May 23, 2011 Filing 14 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by ETHYPHARM S.A. (Carson, Michelle) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
May 23, 2011 Filing 13 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
May 13, 2011 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS S.A.. ETHYPHARM S.A. waiver sent on 3/24/2011, answer due 6/22/2011. (Scheib, Barbara) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
April 13, 2011 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying Financiere Verdi as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ETHYPHARM S.A. (Carson, Michelle) Modified on 4/14/2011 to edit docket text. (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Paul A. Ragusa as counsel for defendant ETHYPHARM, S.A. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 4/7/11. (njt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 7 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jennifer C. Tempesta on behalf of defendant ETHYPHARM, S.A. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 4/7/11. (njt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lisa Kole on behalf of defendant ETHYPHARM, S.A. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 4/7/11. (njt) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
April 6, 2011 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Jennifer C. Tempesta to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1925006) by ETHYPHARM S.A. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit) (Carson, Michelle) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
April 6, 2011 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Lisa Kole to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1924998) by ETHYPHARM S.A. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit) (Carson, Michelle) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
April 6, 2011 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Paul A. Ragusa to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $40, Receipt # 0315-1924968) by ETHYPHARM S.A. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit) (Carson, Michelle) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
April 6, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle K. Carson on behalf of ETHYPHARM S.A. (Carson, Michelle) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
March 28, 2011 Summons Reissued as to *ETHYPHARM S.A., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, INC.* (gmp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
March 22, 2011 Filing 3 PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
March 21, 2011 Summons Issued as to *ETHYPHARM S.A., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, INC.* (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
March 18, 2011 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Lupin Ltd. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS S.A. (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]
March 18, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ETHYPHARM S.A., MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., MYLAN, INC. (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0315-1906030), filed by LUPIN ATLANTIS HOLDINGS S.A. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Summons for Mylan, Inc, # 5 Summons for Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc, # 6 Summons for Ethypharm S.A.) (ksa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 6/8/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lupin Atlantis Holdings S.A. v. Mylan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lupin Atlantis Holdings S.A.
Represented By: Amin S. Kassam
Represented By: Barbara A. Scheib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Jude Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Jude Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethypharm S.A.
Represented By: Michelle K. Carson
Represented By: Lisa B. Kole
Represented By: Paul A. Ragusa
Represented By: Jennifer Cozeolino Tempesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?