Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al v. Abu Dhabi Investment Authority et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Law Debenture Trust Company of New York and Wilmington Trust Company
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc./ Salomon Brothers, Citigroup Global Markets Ltd., Citigroup Private Bank & Trust, Claudia F. Gasparini I.R.A., Collective Trust Of The Bank Of New York, Coutts EIP US Equity Index BGI, AIB BNY, Credit Suisse First Boston, Credit Suisse Securities (SA) LLC, CSFB Proprietary Trading US, DB Bank AG Amsterdam, Deephaven, Deephaven Capital Management, Del Mar Asset Management, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG Frankfurt, Deutsche Bank AQRREV, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Deutsche Lufthansa AG, Forrestal Funding Master Trust, Galleon Management LP/ Galleon Buccaneers Offshore Bank Of Bermuda(Cayman)Ltd., General Elecric Company, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Inc., Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P., Goldman Sachs Investment Strategies, LLC, Gryphon Hidden Value VIII LP, Halcyon Diversified Fund LP, Halcyon Management Co. LLC, Halcyon Special Situations LP, Havens Advisors LLC, Highbridge Capital Management LLC, Highbridge INT LLC (NO3) / A/C Highbridge CAP COP Maples & Calder, HSBC N.A. Holdings, Inc., IBM Netherlands MSCI US, IBM Personal Pension Plan Trust, IBM Retirement Funds, INKA MBH For Sperrkonto, International Business Machines Corporation, J.P. Morgan, J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC/NYSE, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., J.P. Morgan Services, JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association, Laura Lynn Ford, Liberty Harbor Master Fund I, LP, Magnetar Capital LLC, Magnetar Financial LLC/ Magnetar Capital MST FD LTD M & C Corporate Services LTD., Maples & Calder, Merrill Lynch, Merrill Lynch Financial Markets, Equity Financing Group, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.- Safekeeping, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.- Securities Lending, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Milton Partners LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. INTL., Morgan Stanley/Prime Broker/CN, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, MS S&P 500 Index Fund, MS Select- Value Added Market, MS Value Added Market Series, National Financial Services LLC, NYC Board of Education, NYC Employees Retirement System, NYC Fire Retirement System, NYC Police Officers Variable, NYC Police Retirement System, NYC Retirement Systems, New York Life Insurance CO., Newbrook Capital Advisors LP, ODDO & CIE, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Perry Corp., Perry Partners, Perry Partners L.P., Adam F. Potter, Prism Partners Offshore, Prudential Bache Securities, LLC, R K Mellon CTF #3, Rabo Capital Services, Inc., Relative Value LTD/ Highbridge Event Driven RE Highbridge CAP MGMT LLC, Sanford C. Bernstein & Co., Inc., State Street LUX, TBK Partners, LLC, TD Asset Management USA, Inc., TD Emerald Hedged U.S. Equity, TD Emerald Pooled U.S. Fund, TD Emerald U.S. Market Index Fund, TD U.S. Index Fund, The Hartford, Time Warner Inc. Master Pension Trust, Tribeca Investments LLC, William H. Browne, Tweedy, Browne Company, LLC, Tweedy, Browne Value Fund, UBS Financial Services Inc., UBS Securities Inc., UBS Securities LLC- Securities Lending, USAA Federal Savings Bank, Vanderbilt Partners, LLC, Westchester Capital Management, Wilmington Trust Co., Abu Dhabi Investment Authority, Citibank, N.A. Equity Derivatives, Citibank, N.A., Citibank, Chicago Trading, Caxton Associates LLC, Carlyle Multi-Strategy Master Fund Ltd., Bon Secours Health System, Inc., BNY Mellon, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNP Paribas Prime Brokerage, Inc., Blackrock, Inc., Blackrock, Bear Stearns Security Corp., BHF Bank Aktiengesellschaft, Bear Stearns Equity Strategies RT LLC, Bear Stearns & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Securities Limited, Barclays Global Investors Ltd., Barclays Global Investors NA REF Industry Alpha LTD., Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays Capital Group, Bar Cap Equity Finance, Barclays Bank PLC, Bank Of New York Mellon/MIDCAP SPDRS, Bank Of New York Mellon Employee Benefit Collective Investment Fund Plan, Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, Bank of New York Mellon, Bank Of New York, Bank of America , N.A., Banc of America Securities LLC, AQR Capital AQRREV, AMPERE Capital Management LP, Alberta-WCB, Alliance Bernstein, AllianceBernstein L.P., Allianz Invest KAG-Siemens, AM Master Fund III, LP, AM International EMAC 63 LTD/VOL ARB and Allianz/Sanford
Case Number: 1:2011cv04522
Filed: July 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Holwell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MASTER CASE ORDER No. 2: The Clerk of the Court (the "Clerk") is directed to transfer docket entry ECF No. 692 (Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order) from 11 MD 2296 to the master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296 and n umber it ECF No. 18 on 12 MC 2296. The Clerk is directed to docket this Master Case Order No. 2 as ECF No. 19 on 12 MC 2296, and docket it on 11 MD 2296 and on all of the consolidated actions. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is directed to add the following plaintiff to the master case file: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. (the "Unsecured Creditors Committee"). Accordingly, the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 should list o nly the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees, and (v) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Tribune Company on behalf of Tribune Company, et al. Interim Liaison Counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee: This Court appoints Zuckerman Spaeder LLP ("Zuckerman Spae der") as interim liaison counsel for the Unsecured Creditors Committee and as further set forth in this order. All pending motions for substitution of counsel are granted. Notwithstanding the stay, parties may make motions to substitute counsel, and all such motions shall be docketed only on 11 MD 2296 and the relevant related actions and shall include a proposed order. Any party submitting a motion for substitution of counsel is directed to send a courtesy copy of the proposed order to cha mbers. No defendant has opposed Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Enlarge the Time for Service of Summonses and Complaints. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion is granted. The time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve all summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21) in all actions, and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), is enlarged through and including August 31, 2012, retroactive to March 29, 2012. With respect to defendants who may be added as defendants or changed through amendments in any action on or after March 29, 2012, including defendants within the putative defendant classes who Plaintiffs determin e should be individually named, the time under Fed R. Civ. P. 4(m) for Plaintiffs to serve the summonses and complaints (as they have been or may be amended from time to time, subject to and in accordance with Fed R. Civ. P. 15 and 21), and the time period referenced in Fed R. Civ. P. 15(c)(1)(C), shall expire no earlier than August 31, 2012. This Court will hold an initial pretrial conference with all interim liaison counsel on July 10, 2012 at 11:30 a.m. to discuss, inter alia, Defendants' ; co-interim liaison counsel's proposed organizational structure, a preliminary case management schedule, including a schedule for any motions to dismiss, the continuance of the stay, and any other issues counsel wish to raise. Notwithstanding B ankruptcy Judge Kevin J. Carey's Order Partially Lifting Stay of Adversary Proceedings and State Law Fraudulent Conveyance Actions, dated March 15, 2012, this multidistrict litigation and all consolidated actions remain stayed in all other respects. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(lmb)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MASTER CASE ORDER No. 1: In the exercise of its informed discretion, this Court restructures this multidistrict litigation as follows: The Clerk is directed to open a master case file bearing docket number 12 MC 2296. Any filing fees associated with opening the master case file docket are waived. The Clerk is directed to transfer the following docket entries from 11 MD 2296 to 12 MC 2296: ECF Nos. 1 (Transfer Order), 17 (Master Stay Order), 39 (Pilot Project Removal Order), 41 (Protective Order No.1), 62 (Pro Hac Order), 386 (Status Letter Order), 499 (Notice of Case Reassignment), and 559 (Temporary Stay Order). Those docket entries are to be numbered ECF Nos. 1-8, respectively, on 12 MC 2296. This Order shall be docketed as ECF No. 9 in 1 2 MC 2296 and docketed on all matters consolidated in 11 MD 2296. This Order and all subsequent docket entries on 12 MC 2296 are to be docketed simultaneously on 11 MD 2296. In addition, each subsequent filing by the parties on 12 MC 2296 or 11 MD 22 96 shall indicate whether the filing should be docketed in all related actions or only in specified related actions. Counsel are reminded that filings are to be spread across all related actions only when necessary. Papers filed inappropriately will be stricken from the docket. Interim Lead Plaintiffs: The Clerk is further directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following plaintiffs: (i) Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, individually and in its capacity as successor inden ture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (ii) Law Debenture Trust Company of New York, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for certain series of Senior Notes, (iii) Wilmington Trust Company, individually and in its capacity as successor indenture trustee for the Phones Notes, and (iv) William A. Niese, on behalf of a Putative Class of Tribune Company Retirees. Plaintiffs (i)-(iii) collectively are hereafter referred to as the "Note Holders" and plain tiff (iv) is referred to as the "Retirees." Interim Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs: This Court appoints Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP ("Akin Gump") as interim liaison counsel for the Note Holders and Teitelbaum & Baskin, LLP (the "Teitelbaum Firm") as interim liaison counsel for the Retirees. All counsel for plaintiffs are directed to confer for the purpose of identifying who among them intend to submit motion papers or memoranda to this Court, appear in person for conferences, or offer oral arguments to the Court. Plaintiffs are directed to submit a list to the Court identifying such counsel by March 30, 2012. Interim Lead Defendants: Based on a preliminary review of the complaints in the related actions, this Court endeavored to select interim lead defendants with a sufficient financial interest and who represent different classes of shareholders. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to list on the docket sheet of 12 MC 2296 only the following defenda nts: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders, and Mar io J. Gabelli, on behalf of A Putative Class of Former Tribune Company Shareholders. This Court appoints Proskauer Rose LLP (for The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation), Kaye Scholer, LLP (for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated) , and Entwistle & Cappucci LLP (for Mario J. Gabelli) to act as interim co-liaison counsel for defendants. These firms are collectively referred to as "defendants' interim co-liaison counsel." Defendants are directed to submit a propos ed organizational structure comprised of an executive committee of counsel who will fairly represent each group of defendants in this multidistrict litigation whose interests are similarly aligned. The proposed organizational structure will be subjec t to this Court's approval and should be docketed on 12 MD 2296 by April 20, 2012; as further set forth in this Master Case Order No. 1. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(mro)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER: The stay entered in this multi district litigation on December 28, 2012 by Judge Richard J. Holwell (ECF No. 17), and modified by Order dated January 27, 2012 (ECF No. 386), is further modified as follows: No party to this action is permitted to make any motion, file any documents on the docket, or submit any papers to the Clerk's Office or this Court's chambers until further notice from this Court. It is further ordered that all pending motions for admission pro hac vice are de nied without prejudice. The Clerk ofthe Court is directed to terminate all pending motions for admission pro hac vice. This Court will establish a procedure for attorneys to appear in this action by subsequent order. Plaintiffs are directed to serve this Order on all Defendants forthwith. This order relates to all pro hac vice motions filed by attorneys in 11-MD-2296 and all related cases, denying (243) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (244) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (245) Mo tion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (253) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04522-WHP; denying (320) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04538-WHP; denying (501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-04784-WHP; denying (81) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (159) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (184) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (185) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (189) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (190) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (191) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (194) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (196) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (203) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (204) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (206) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (217) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (218) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (219) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (222) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (234) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (237) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (258) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (259) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (266) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (267) Motio n to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (269) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (276) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (279) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (282) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (309) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (311) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (312) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (328) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (332) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (334) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (353) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (354) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (356) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (359) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (361) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (362) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; deny ing (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (402) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (405) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (408) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (423) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (440) Motion to Appea r Pro Hac Vice; denying (445) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (471) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (474) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (479) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (500) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying ( 501) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (503) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (504) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (505) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (506) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (507) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (508) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (510) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (512) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (513) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (514) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (515) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (516) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (517) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (525) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (527) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (533) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (534) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (536) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (539) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (541) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (543) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (548) Motio n for Leave to Appear ; denying (552) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (553) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (554) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (555) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (556) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-md-02296-WHP; denying (167) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (193) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (201) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09409-WHP; denying (75) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (76) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09410-WHP; denying (344) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (346) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (352) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (364) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (369) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (370) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09572-WHP; denying (126) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09592-WHP; denying (85) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09589-WHP; denying (178) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (179) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (180) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09590-WHP; denying (55) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09597-WHP; denying (108) Motion to Appear P ro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09595-WHP; denying (100) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (101) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09593-WHP; denying (140) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (151) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denyi ng (152) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (153) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09586-WHP; denying (137) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:11-cv-09583-WHP; denying (212) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00061-WH P; denying (160) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (161) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (162) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00063-WHP; denying (430) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying (431) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vi ce in case 1:12-cv-00064-WHP; denying (65) Motion for Leave to Appear in case 1:12-cv-00549-WHP; denying (47) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:12-cv-00554-WHP. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/14/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:11-md-02296-WHP et al.(ft)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas et al v. Abu Dhabi Investment Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Garry Gordon
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose McColm
Represented By: Stephen J. Shimshak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc./ Salomon Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Ltd.
Represented By: Andrew Garry Gordon
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose McColm
Represented By: Stephen J. Shimshak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Private Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia F. Gasparini I.R.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collective Trust Of The Bank Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coutts EIP US Equity Index BGI, AIB BNY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse First Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (SA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSFB Proprietary Trading US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Bank AG Amsterdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deephaven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deephaven Capital Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Mar Asset Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG Frankfurt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AQRREV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Lufthansa AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrestal Funding Master Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galleon Management LP/ Galleon Buccaneers Offshore Bank Of Bermuda(Cayman)Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Elecric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Execution & Clearing, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Investment Strategies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gryphon Hidden Value VIII LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halcyon Diversified Fund LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halcyon Management Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Halcyon Special Situations LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Havens Advisors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highbridge Capital Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highbridge INT LLC (NO3) / A/C Highbridge CAP COP Maples & Calder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC N.A. Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBM Netherlands MSCI US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBM Personal Pension Plan Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBM Retirement Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INKA MBH For Sperrkonto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp.
Represented By: Alicia Llosa Chang
Represented By: Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Represented By: Elliot Moskowitz
Represented By: Michael Joseph Russano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC/NYSE
Represented By: Alicia Llosa Chang
Represented By: Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Represented By: Elliot Moskowitz
Represented By: Michael Joseph Russano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.
Represented By: Alicia Llosa Chang
Represented By: Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Represented By: Elliot Moskowitz
Represented By: Michael Joseph Russano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Services
Represented By: Alicia Llosa Chang
Represented By: Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Represented By: Elliot Moskowitz
Represented By: Michael Joseph Russano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Alicia Llosa Chang
Represented By: Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Represented By: Elliot Moskowitz
Represented By: Michael Joseph Russano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Lynn Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Harbor Master Fund I, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnetar Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnetar Financial LLC/ Magnetar Capital MST FD LTD M & C Corporate Services LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maples & Calder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Boglioli
Represented By: Jane W. Parver
Represented By: Madlyn Gleich Primoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Financial Markets, Equity Financing Group
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Boglioli
Represented By: Jane W. Parver
Represented By: Madlyn Gleich Primoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Boglioli
Represented By: Jane W. Parver
Represented By: Madlyn Gleich Primoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.- Safekeeping
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Boglioli
Represented By: Jane W. Parver
Represented By: Madlyn Gleich Primoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.- Securities Lending
Represented By: Daniel Matthew Boglioli
Represented By: Jane W. Parver
Represented By: Madlyn Gleich Primoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milton Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. INTL.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley/Prime Broker/CN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS S&P 500 Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS Select- Value Added Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS Value Added Market Series
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Financial Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Employees Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Fire Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Police Officers Variable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Police Retirement System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Retirement Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Life Insurance CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newbrook Capital Advisors LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODDO & CIE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer & CO., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Corp.
Represented By: Daniel J. Polatsek
Represented By: Brian J. Poronsky
Represented By: William Michael Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Partners
Represented By: William Michael Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Partners L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J. Polatsek
Represented By: Brian J. Poronsky
Represented By: William Michael Regan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam F. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prism Partners Offshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Bache Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R K Mellon CTF #3
Represented By: Eric Andrew Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabo Capital Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relative Value LTD/ Highbridge Event Driven RE Highbridge CAP MGMT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford C. Bernstein & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Street LUX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBK Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Asset Management USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Emerald Hedged U.S. Equity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Emerald Pooled U.S. Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Emerald U.S. Market Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD U.S. Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Inc. Master Pension Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tribeca Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tweedy, Browne Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tweedy, Browne Value Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC- Securities Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Federal Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Capital Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abu Dhabi Investment Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A. Equity Derivatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew Garry Gordon
Represented By: Elizabeth Rose McColm
Represented By: Stephen J. Shimshak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caxton Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlyle Multi-Strategy Master Fund Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bon Secours Health System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNY Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Prime Brokerage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackrock, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Stearns Security Corp.
Represented By: Alicia Llosa Chang
Represented By: Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Represented By: Elliot Moskowitz
Represented By: Michael Joseph Russano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHF Bank Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Stearns Equity Strategies RT LLC
Represented By: Michael Joseph Russano
Represented By: Elliot Moskowitz
Represented By: Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Represented By: Alicia Llosa Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Stearns & Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Joseph Russano
Represented By: Elliot Moskowitz
Represented By: Benjamin S. Kaminetzky
Represented By: Alicia Llosa Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Securities Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Global Investors Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Global Investors NA REF Industry Alpha LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bar Cap Equity Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of New York Mellon/MIDCAP SPDRS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of New York Mellon Employee Benefit Collective Investment Fund Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America , N.A.
Represented By: Evan M. Jones
Represented By: Daniel Steven Shamah
Represented By: Daniel Lucas Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Securities LLC
Represented By: Evan M. Jones
Represented By: Daniel Steven Shamah
Represented By: Daniel Lucas Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQR Capital AQRREV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMPERE Capital Management LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberta-WCB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AllianceBernstein L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Invest KAG-Siemens
Represented By: Jeffrey Lance Nagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM Master Fund III, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM International EMAC 63 LTD/VOL ARB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz/Sanford
Represented By: Jeffrey Lance Nagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: Hal Neier
Represented By: Robert Joel Lack
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Debenture Trust Company of New York
Represented By: Hal Neier
Represented By: Robert Joel Lack
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust Company
Represented By: Hal Neier
Represented By: Robert Joel Lack
Represented By: Jeffrey Carl Fourmaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?