Muhammad Ali Enterprises LLC v. Kobo, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff Muhammad Ali Enterprises LLC alleged that Defendant Kobo, Inc., an electronic book reading device marketer, took out a full-page advertisement for its eReader in the New York times that made commercial use of the Muhammad Ali Slogan (Float like a butterfly, sting like a bee) and Muhammad Ali's name without permission.

Plaintiff: Muhammad Ali Enterprises LLC
Defendant: Kobo, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2011cv04825
Filed: July 13, 2011
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Shira A. Scheindlin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE: This action is discontinued with prejudice but without costs; provided, however, that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, counsel for either side may apply by letter for restoration of the action to the calendar of the undersigned if the settlement is not effected, in which event the action will be restored. The Clerk ofthe Court is directed to close this case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/7/2011) (ft)
September 23, 2011 10 ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Kobo, Inc..(Crowley, Meagan)
September 16, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2011 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15C, at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/15/2011) (tro)
September 1, 2011 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Meagan Elizabeth Crowley on behalf of Kobo, Inc.. New Address: Reed Smith LLP, 599 Lexington Avenue, 26th Fl., New York, New York, USA 10022, (212) 521-5400. (Crowley, Meagan)
August 22, 2011 7 Featured Case JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: It is hereby STIPULATED and AGREED that the time for Defendant Kobo, Inc. to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff Muhammad Ali Enterprises, LLC is hereby extended to September 23, 2011. No further extensions. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/22/2011) (jfe)
August 22, 2011 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Kobo, Inc. served on 8/10/2011, answer due 8/31/2011. Service was accepted by Peter D. Raymond, Attorney. Service was made by E-Mail. Document filed by Muhammad Ali Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affirmation of Service-Summons)(Sherman, Robert)
August 19, 2011 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meagan Elizabeth Crowley on behalf of Kobo, Inc. (Crowley, Meagan)
August 19, 2011 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Dana Raymond on behalf of Kobo, Inc. (Raymond, Peter)
July 25, 2011 3 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert L. Sherman on behalf of Muhammad Ali Enterprises LLC. New Address: Paul Hastings LLP, 75 East 55th Street, New York, NY, USA 10022, (212) 318-6000. (Sherman, Robert)
July 13, 2011 Mailed notice to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks to report the filing of this action. (ama)
July 13, 2011 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Muhammad Ali Enterprises LLC.(ama)
July 13, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (ama)
July 13, 2011 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (ama)
July 13, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kobo, Inc. (ama)
July 13, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Kobo, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1011484)Document filed by Muhammad Ali Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muhammad Ali Enterprises LLC v. Kobo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Ali Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Natalie Grunfeld Furman
Represented By: Robert L. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kobo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?