Coyne et al v. Aluminum Company of America (Alcoa) et al
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Coyne and Suzanne Coyne
Defendant: Rapid-American Corporation, Owens-Illinois, Inc., Bucyrus International, Inc., Foster Wheeler, L.L.C., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Pettibone Michigan Corporation, Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., Tadano American Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Koehring Company, Empire-Ace Insulation MFG. Corp.,, General Electric Company, Kennedy Valve Manufacturing Co., Inc., Aluminum Company of America (Alcoa), Crane Co., Mario & DiBono Plastering Co., Inc., Bell & Gossett Company, Goodyear Canada, Inc., Link-Belt Construction Equipment Company, Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Komatsu America Corporation, Gates Corporation, Certain Teed Corporation, PPM Cranes, Inc., Caterpillar, Inc., ITT Corporation, Kentile Floors, Inc., CBS Corporation, Georgia Pacific Co. and Terex Corporation
Case Number: 1:2011cv04966
Filed: July 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Richard M Berman
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2011 Filing 12 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF MDL ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL VACATING CONDITIONAL TRANSFER REMAND ORDER... The Panel has now been advised that three actions were remanded to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York county, by th Honorable George B. Daniels, in orders filed on July 25, 2011,and the same hereby is vacated.... (Signed by MDL Panel on 7/27/11) (sjo)
July 25, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard M. Berman: Status Conference held on 7/25/2011. See Transcript for a complete record. (mbe)
July 25, 2011 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via Federal Express AIRBILL # 875915902060 on 7/28/2011. (jfe)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion to remand is GRANTED. The above-captioned action is REMANDED to the Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/25/2011) (jfe)
July 25, 2011 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #11 Order on Motion to Remand, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (jfe)
July 24, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott R Emery on behalf of Georgia Pacific Co. (Emery, Scott)
July 24, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James R. Lynch on behalf of Georgia Pacific Co. (Lynch, James)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: the parties are hereby directed to appear at a conference in Courtroom 21B of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, on Monday, July 25, 2011 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to mutually resolve these issues in good faith prior to the conference.Defendant is directed to serve and file any response to Plaintiff's Motion by Tuesday,July 26, 2011 at noon. (Signed by Judge Richard M. Berman on 7/22/2011) (js)
July 22, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Angela Digiglio on behalf of Crane Co. (Digiglio, Angela)
July 22, 2011 Filing 6 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand. Document filed by Thomas J. Coyne.(Golanski, Alani)
July 22, 2011 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Alani Golanski in Support. Document filed by Thomas J. Coyne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Golanski, Alani)
July 22, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/26/2011 (js)
July 21, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Alani Golanski to RE-FILE Document #4 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand. Use the event type Declaration in Support (non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (ldi)
July 21, 2011 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand. Document filed by Thomas J. Coyne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Golanski, Alani) Modified on 7/22/2011 (ldi).
July 21, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alani Golanski on behalf of Thomas J. Coyne (Golanski, Alani)
July 20, 2011 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Georgia-Pacific Holdings, LLC; Georgia-Pacific Equity Holdings, LLC; Koch Renewable Resources, Inc.; as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Georgia Pacific Co.(ama)
July 20, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 190399-10. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1012026).Document filed by Georgia Pacific Co.(ama)
July 20, 2011 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (ama)
July 20, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coyne et al v. Aluminum Company of America (Alcoa) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rapid-American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owens-Illinois, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bucyrus International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pettibone Michigan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tadano American Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koehring Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire-Ace Insulation MFG. Corp.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Valve Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aluminum Company of America (Alcoa)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Angela Digiglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario & DiBono Plastering Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell & Gossett Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Canada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Link-Belt Construction Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Komatsu America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gates Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Teed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPM Cranes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentile Floors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific Co.
Represented By: Lawrence Gable Lee
Represented By: Scott R Emery
Represented By: James R. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Coyne
Represented By: Alani Golanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Coyne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?