Feist v. RCN Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Betsy Feist |
Defendant: |
RCN Corporation and Paxfire, Inc. |
Counter_claimant: |
Paxfire, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
Betsy Feist |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv05436 |
Filed: |
August 4, 2011 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
John G. Koeltl |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 17, 2017 |
Filing
253
OPINION AND ORDER re: 207 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Paxfire's Counterclaims. filed by Betsy Feist, 219 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Paxfire, Inc..For the foregoing reasons, Feist's motion for s ummary judgment on Paxfire's counterclaims is GRANTED. Feist's claims are DISMISSED as moot in light of her stipulation to limit recovery on her claims to the amount necessary to offset Paxfire's recovery on its counterclaims. Conseq uently, Paxfire's motion for summary judgment on Feist's claims is DENIED as moot. Feist's objection to the Judge Ellis's discovery sanctions that preclude her from introducing certain evidence in support of her claims is also DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motions at Docket Numbers 207 and 219 and close the case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/17/2017) (kgo)
|
August 29, 2016 |
Filing
249
OPINION AND ORDER re: 175 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss for Spoliation of Material Evidence. filed by Paxfire, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Paxfire's motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. This resolves Doc. No 175. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 8/29/2016) (cla)
|
October 26, 2015 |
Filing
162
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Feist's request for reimbursement of costs and expenses related to document production be DENIED. The Parties shall bear their respective costs. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 10/26/2015) (spo)
|
June 26, 2015 |
Filing
146
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER #105609 re: 141 MOTION for Reconsideration re: 127 Order, Concerning Deposition of Kim Richman filed by Paxfire, Inc., 139 MOTION to Compel Betsy Feist to Produce Documents filed by Paxfire, Inc. Paxfire may conduct a limited deposition of Richman addressing the factual matters that Richman discovered in his investigation of Paxfire and conveyed to Feist. This information is relevant to Feist's Fourth Affirmative Defense w hich asserts that Feist is shielded from liability due to her reliance on her counsel's good faith investigation. Except for Paxfire's skepticism, there is no basis to question Feist's assertion that she has produced all relevant, no n-privileged documents in her possession. However, to the extent that Feist has withheld relevant documents on the basis of the attorney-client privilege or the work product doctrine, the Court directs Feist to produce to Paxfire a privilege log incl uding these materials by July 3, 2015. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Paxfire's Motion for Reconsideration Concerning the Deposition of Kim Richman is GRANTED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Paxfire's Motion to Compel Production of Documents is DENIED. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 6/26/2015) (kko) Modified on 6/26/2015 (kko). Modified on 6/26/2015 (ca).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?