Retirement Board Of The Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund Of The City Of Chicago v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: Retirement Board Of The Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund Of The City Of Chicago, Westmoreland County Employee Retirement System, City of Grand Rapids General Retirement System and City of Grand Rapids Police and Fire Retirement System
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 1:2011cv05459
Filed: August 5, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: William H. Pauley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. BNYM's motion for certification of this Court's December 18, 2015 Memorandum & Order is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 188. So ordered. Denying 188 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/9/2016) (rjm)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, BNYM's motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint is denied. This Court exercises supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' state law claims. The parties are directed to submit a propo sed scheduling order addressing remaining discovery to be taken in this case by January 15, 2016. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 169. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/18/2015) (cdo)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 38 Motion for Reconsideration re 37 Order on Motion to Dismiss: For the foregoing reasons, BNYM's motion for reconsideration is denied. Further, this Court certifies its Memorandum & Order dated April 3, 2012 for interlocutory appeal under 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Any party seeking leave for the Court of Appeals to hear an interlocutory appeal shall direct its application to the Court of Appeals within ten days. See 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 38. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/14/2013) (lmb)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, BNYM's motion to dismiss the Complaint is granted in part and denied in part. Because Plaintiffs lack standing to pursue claims regardi ng trusts in which they never invested, all such claims are dismissed with prejudice. Further, BNYM's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims under TIA §§ 315(a) and 316(b) is granted, and those claims are also dismissed with prejudi ce. BNYM's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims under TIA §§315(b) and 315(c) is denied. This Court exercises supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' state law claims. The Clerk ofthe Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 18. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/3/2012) (djc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Retirement Board Of The Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund Of The City Of Chicago v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retirement Board Of The Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund Of The City Of Chicago
Represented By: Joseph Peter Guglielmo
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Beth Ann Kaswan
Represented By: Max Raphael Schwartz
Represented By: David R. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westmoreland County Employee Retirement System
Represented By: Joseph Peter Guglielmo
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Beth Ann Kaswan
Represented By: Max Raphael Schwartz
Represented By: David R. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Grand Rapids General Retirement System
Represented By: Joseph Peter Guglielmo
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Beth Ann Kaswan
Represented By: Max Raphael Schwartz
Represented By: David R. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Grand Rapids Police and Fire Retirement System
Represented By: Joseph Peter Guglielmo
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Johnson
Represented By: Beth Ann Kaswan
Represented By: Max Raphael Schwartz
Represented By: David R. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?