Gilman v. Spitzer et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: William Gilman
Defendant: Eliot Spitzer and The Slate Law Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv05843
Filed: August 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMNET proceeding held on 3/20/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 2, 2012 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 3/20/2012 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/29/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 20, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Oral Argument held on 3/20/2012 on motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim. Decision reserved. (See Transcript). (rjm)
March 9, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lee Levine on behalf of All Defendants. New Address: Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP, 1899 L Street, NW, Suite 200, Washington, DC, United States 20036, (202) 508-1110. (Levine, Lee)
March 9, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jay Ward Brown on behalf of All Defendants. New Address: Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP, 1899 L Street, NW, Suite 200, Washington, DC, United States 20036, (202) 508-1136. (Brown, Jay)
March 1, 2012 Filing 31 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Jeffrey L. Liddle dated 2/28/2012 re: I write on behalf of Plaintiff to request a short adjournment of the March 14, 2012 oral argument currently scheduled in the above-referenced matter. The reason for the request is that I am on vacation that week. I have consulted with counsel for Defendants. They consent to the adjournment and both sides are available on March 20 and 21, 2012 if the Court is available. The Defendants indicated they would prefer March 20,2012 if possible. ENDORSEMENT: The March 14 argument is hereby adjourned to March 20, 2012 at 2:00 p.m. (Oral Argument set for 3/20/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/1/2012) (djc)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. ( Motion Hearing/oral argument set for 3/14/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/24/2012) (cd)
January 19, 2012 Filing 29 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Katharine Taylor Larsen on behalf of All Defendants. New Address: Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP, 1760 Market Street, Suite 1001, Philadelphia, PA, United States 19103, 215.988.9778. (Larsen, Katharine)
January 6, 2012 Filing 28 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim.. Document filed by William Gilman. (Halter, James)
January 6, 2012 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Katharine Larsen in Support re: 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Letter from Lee Levine, Esq. to James W. Halter, Esq. (Dec. 20, 2011)), # 2 Exhibit B (Letter from James W. Halter, Esq. to Lee Levine, Esq. (Jan. 4, 2012)), # 3 Exhibit C (People v. Gilman, Indictment No. 4800-05, Hrg Tr. 8-16, Apr. 17, 2008 [NYDOI/Gilman-00095-98]))(Larsen, Katharine)
January 6, 2012 Filing 26 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC. (Brown, Jay)
December 15, 2011 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 12/2/2011 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jerry Harrison, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 13, 2011 Filing 24 DECLARATION of James W. Halter, Esq. in Opposition re: 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by William Gilman. (Halter, James)
December 13, 2011 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by William Gilman. (Halter, James)
December 13, 2011 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Jay Ward Brown in Opposition re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim.. Document filed by Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Letter from Dept of Ins. to K. Padgett, Marsh & McLennan Cos. (Oct. 20, 2004) [NYDOI/Gilman-00200]), # 2 Exhibit 2 (2006 License Renewal Questionnaire [NYDOI/Gilman-00126]), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Letter from Dept of Ins. to W. Gilman (Oct. 19, 2006) [NYDOI/Gilman-00001-03]), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Letters from Dept of Ins. to counsel to W. Gilman, R. Spinogatti (June 4, 2007; Sept. 24, 2007; Feb. 1, 2008; Feb. 26, 2008; May 12, 2008; Jan. 18, 2011) [NYDOI/Gilman-00026, 30, 35, 40, 125, 129]), # 5 Exhibit 5 (People v. Gilman, Indictment No. 4800-05, Hrg Tr. 88, Apr. 17, 2008, # 6 Exhibit 6 (People v. Gilman, Indictment No. 4800-05, Hrg Tr. 8, Apr. 23, 2008, # 7 Exhibit 7 (People v. Gilman, Indictment No. 4800-05, Hrg Tr. 36-37, Apr. 17, 2008, # 8 Exhibit 8 (Letter from Dept of Ins. to counsel to W. Gilman, R. Spinogatti (June 18, 2008) [NYDOI/Gilman-00373]), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Letter from R. Spinogatti to Dept of Ins. (June 26, 2008) [NYDOI/Gilman-00128]), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Letter from Dept of Ins. to counsel to W. Gilman, R. Spinogatti (Jan. 28, 2011) [NYDOI/Gilman-00135]), # 11 Exhibit 11 (Letter from Dept of Ins. to counsel to W. Gilman, R. Spinogatti (Feb. 8, 2011) [NYDOI/Gilman-00199]), # 12 Exhibit 12 (Letter from Assemblyman William Bianchi to Governor Mario M. Cuomo, # 13 Exhibit 13 (New York Senate Debate Transcripts, 1992 Chapter 767, Statement of Senator Marchi), # 14 Exhibit 14 (Adelphi University v. Committee to Save Adelphi, N.Y.L.J., Feb. 6, 1997, # 15 Exhibit 15 (Conf. Tr., Dec. 2, 2011))(Brown, Jay)
December 13, 2011 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim.. Document filed by Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC. (Brown, Jay)
November 22, 2011 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim.. Document filed by William Gilman. (Halter, James)
November 22, 2011 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim. Document filed by William Gilman.(Halter, James)
November 22, 2011 Filing 18 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J Paul Oetken from James W Halter dated 11/18/2011 re: Proposed schedule for plaintiff's motion to dismiss counterclaims and defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings, as further set forth in this document. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Granted. (Motion due by 11/22/2011. Response due by 12/13/2011, Reply due by 1/6/2012.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/21/2011) (cd)
November 2, 2011 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC. (Brown, Jay)
November 2, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/23/2011(Brown, Jay)
November 1, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Jay Ward Brown to RE-FILE Document 15 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
November 1, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Jay Ward Brown to RE-FILE Document 14 Notice (Other). Use the event type Judgment on the Pleadings found under the event list Motions. (ldi)
November 1, 2011 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/23/2011(Brown, Jay) Modified on 11/2/2011 (ldi).
November 1, 2011 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Notice of Motion re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC. (Brown, Jay) Modified on 11/2/2011 (ldi).
November 1, 2011 Filing 13 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against William Gilman. Document filed by Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2, part 1, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 2, part 2, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 10, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 12)(Brown, Jay)
November 1, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katharine Taylor Larsen on behalf of Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC (Larsen, Katharine)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/2/2011 at 11:00 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/28/2011) (cd)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 9 Motion for Lee Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendants Eliot Spitzer and The Slate Law Group, LLC. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/24/2011) (ab)
October 20, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 10/19/2011, Receipt Number 1019605. (jd)
October 19, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION for Lee Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC.(bcu) (pgu).
October 13, 2011 Filing 8 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Lee Levine dated 10/13/ 2011 re: counsel for defendant writes on behalf of all parties in the above-referenced action to request that, in the wake of he reassignment of this case to Your Honor, Judge Sullivan's Order dated September 6, 2011, be modified as follows: That the deadline for submission of a joint letter and proposed case management plan/scheduling order, in the form and in the manner provided in Your Honor's Individual Rules of Practice, be extended from October 14, 2011 to and including October 21, 2011. That the deadline for submission of Defendants' responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint be extended to and including November 1, 2011. Both Defendants intend to submit a joint motion to dismiss the complaint. The parties have proposed the following mutua11y~agreeable briefing schedule: a. Defendants shall file a joint motion to dismiss the complaint on or before November 1, 2011. b. Plaintiff shall file papers in opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss on or before November 23, 2011. c. Defendants shall file any joint reply papers in further support of their motion to dismiss on or before December 9, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: In light of Defendants' intention to file a motion to dismiss, the conference scheduled for October 25, 2011 is hereby adjourned sine die. ( Motions due by 11/1/2011., Responses due by 11/23/2011, Replies due by 12/9/2011.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/13/2011) (pl) Modified on 10/14/2011 (pl).
October 5, 2011 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:10-cv-08158-JPO. (sjo)
October 5, 2011 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Richard J. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
September 6, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Eliot Spitzer answer due 10/14/2011; The Slate Law Group, LLC answer due 10/14/2011. (pl)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, that the Court is in receipt of a letter from Defendants dated September 6, 2011, requesting an extension of time in which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint through October 14, 2011. The request is HEREBY GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for a status conference on Tuesday, October 25, 2011 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT by Friday, October 14, 2011, at 4:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs that is set forth in this Order. ( Status Conference set for 10/25/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/6/2011) (pl) Modified on 9/6/2011 (pl).
September 6, 2011 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by The Slate Law Group, LLC.(Brown, Jay)
September 6, 2011 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay Ward Brown on behalf of Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC (Brown, Jay)
August 26, 2011 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Slate Law Group, LLC served on 8/23/2011, answer due 9/13/2011. Service was accepted by Jacob Weisberg, Chairman. Document filed by William Gilman. (Halter, James)
August 26, 2011 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Eliot Spitzer served on 8/24/2011, answer due 9/14/2011. Service was accepted by Anton, the Concierge. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by William Gilman. (Halter, James)
August 19, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (tro)
August 19, 2011 Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (tro)
August 19, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC. (tro)
August 19, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eliot Spitzer, The Slate Law Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1014643)Document filed by William Gilman.(tro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilman v. Spitzer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gilman
Represented By: James William Halter
Represented By: Jeffrey Lew Liddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliot Spitzer
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Slate Law Group, LLC
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?