Voelker v. Deutsche Bank AG

Plaintiff: Kelley Voelker
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Case Number: 1:2011cv06362
Filed: September 12, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Filing 164 SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 111, 136, 137, 138 and 139 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 10/31/2017.(mps)
September 26, 2017 Filing 163 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 111, 136, 137, 138 and 139 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 10/26/2017. (mps)
December 21, 2015 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (tn)
December 21, 2015 Filing 162 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: in accordance with Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, that the above-entitled action be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice, with no award of counsel fees or costs by the Court to any party. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/21/2015) (tn)
December 21, 2015 Filing 161 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson dated December 21, 2015 re: Parties' Proposed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pearson, Lawrence)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply respectfully request a brief extension of the deadline to file responses to motions in limine currently set for Dec. 18 to Dec. 24, 2015 addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe and Lawrence M. Pearson dated December 14, 2015. Application GRANTED. The deadline for filing responses to Motions in Limine shall be extended to December 24, 2015. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 12/24/2015.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/15/2015) (adc) Modified on 12/23/2015 (adc).
December 14, 2015 Filing 159 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply respectfully request a brief extension of the deadline to file responses to motions in limine currently set for Dec. 18 to Dec. 24, 2015 addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe and Lawrence M. Pearson dated December 14, 2015. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
December 4, 2015 Filing 158 DECLARATION of Scott Rabe, Esq. in Support re: #149 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony Alleging A Purported Culture Of Vulgarity At The Bank., #146 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Related To The Bank's Defense Of This Lawsuit., #154 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony Related To Time-Barred Allegations And Background Evidence., #148 MOTION in Limine To Bifurcate Punitive Damages., #150 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of A Purported "Glass Ceiling" For Women At The Bank., #147 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony Related To Alleged Discrimination Against Women Other Than Plaintiff., #152 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence That Contains Hearsay.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Rabe Decl. Exs. 1-4, #2 Rabe Decl. Exs. 5-15)(Rabe, Scott)
December 4, 2015 Filing 157 DECLARATION of Lawrence M. Pearson in Support re: #155 MOTION in Limine to Permit the Disclosure and Use of Comparator Names at Trial.. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pearson, Lawrence)
December 4, 2015 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #155 MOTION in Limine to Permit the Disclosure and Use of Comparator Names at Trial. . Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Pearson, Lawrence)
December 4, 2015 Filing 155 MOTION in Limine to Permit the Disclosure and Use of Comparator Names at Trial. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Pearson, Lawrence)
December 4, 2015 Filing 154 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony Related To Time-Barred Allegations And Background Evidence. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Fonstein, Cliff)
December 4, 2015 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #151 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant from Arguing or Presenting Evidence that Plaintiff Failed to Mitigate Her Damages. . Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Pearson, Lawrence)
December 4, 2015 Filing 152 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence That Contains Hearsay. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Fonstein, Cliff)
December 4, 2015 Filing 151 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant from Arguing or Presenting Evidence that Plaintiff Failed to Mitigate Her Damages. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Pearson, Lawrence)
December 4, 2015 Filing 150 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of A Purported "Glass Ceiling" For Women At The Bank. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Fonstein, Cliff)
December 4, 2015 Filing 149 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony Alleging A Purported Culture Of Vulgarity At The Bank. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Fonstein, Cliff)
December 4, 2015 Filing 148 MOTION in Limine To Bifurcate Punitive Damages. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Fonstein, Cliff)
December 4, 2015 Filing 147 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony Related To Alleged Discrimination Against Women Other Than Plaintiff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Fonstein, Cliff)
December 4, 2015 Filing 146 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Related To The Bank's Defense Of This Lawsuit. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Fonstein, Cliff)
October 14, 2015 Filing 145 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/17/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
October 14, 2015 Filing 144 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/17/2015 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen Ford, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2016.(Siwik, Christine)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: Because Plaintiff unduly delayed, to the prejudice of Defendant, in giving Defendant notice of her NYLL claim, her request for leave to amend the Complaint in order to add this claim is DENIED. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment seeking dismissal of Plaintiff's claims arising on or before September 12, 2008 is GRANTED. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/7/2015) (spo)
September 30, 2015 Filing 142 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe, Esq. dated September 30, 2015 re: in response to Plaintiff's letter dated September 24, 2015, regarding whether the Court should dismiss Plaintiff's purported New York Equal Pay Law ("NY EPL") Claim. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
September 30, 2015 Filing 141 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson dated September 30, 2015 re: Request to File Portions of Plaintiff's September 30, 2015 Letter Under Seal. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Pearson, Lawrence)
September 30, 2015 Filing 140 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson dated September 30, 2015 re: Reply to Defendant's September 24, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Pearson, Lawrence)
September 29, 2015 Filing 139 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 29, 2015 Filing 138 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 29, 2015 Filing 137 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 29, 2015 Filing 136 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
September 28, 2015 Filing 135 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #133 Letter, filed by Deutsche Bank AG. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED., ( Responses due by 9/30/2015.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/28/2015) (lmb)
September 28, 2015 Filing 134 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #132 Letter filed by Kelley Voelker. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/28/2015) (lmb)
September 25, 2015 Filing 133 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe dated September 25, 2015 re: request that Court grant the Parties opportunity to submit brief responses to letter briefs each party submitted on September 24, 2015. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
September 24, 2015 Filing 132 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson dated September 24, 2015 re: Request to File Portion of Plaintiff's September 24, 2015 Letter Under Seal. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Pearson, Lawrence)
September 24, 2015 Filing 131 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson dated September 24, 2015 re: Supplemental Briefing re New York Labor Law Claim. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Pearson, Lawrence)
September 24, 2015 Filing 130 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe, Esq. dated Septembe 24, 2015 re: Supplemental briefing regarding New York Labor Law claim. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Rabe, Scott)
September 18, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/4/2015. Pretrial Order due by 1/15/2016. Responses due by 12/18/2015), Set/Reset Hearings: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2016 at 02:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (spo)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying #78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying in part #83 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is also DENIED except with respect to Defendant's argument that Plaintiff's claims arising prior to September 12, 2008 are time-barred based on the three-year statute of limitations period, which the Court shall decide pursuant to the briefing described in paragraph 2, below. 2. By September 24, 2015, the parties shall submit letter briefs to the Court of no more than five pages addressing whether Plaintiff gave Defendant sufficient notice of her equal pay claim under the New York Labor Law, so as to extend the limitations period on her equal pay claims to six years. 3. The following trial-related deadlines and dates shall apply to this case. Motions in Limine shall be filed no later than December 4, 2015. Responses to Motions in Limine shall be filed no later than December 18, 2015. The parties' Joint Pretrial Order, as described in Rule 6 of the Court's Individual Practices, shall be filed no later than January 15, 2016. The parties' proposed voir dire questions, requests to charge and proposed verdict sheets shall be filed no later than January 22, 2016. The parties shall appear before the Court for a final pretrial conference on January 28, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. The jury trial in this matter shall begin on February 8, 2016. 4. If, at any time prior to trial, the parties agree that a referral to the Magistrate Judge or Mediation program would be mutually beneficial, they should submit a joint letter to the Court seeking such a referral. (As is further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/18/2015) (spo)
September 17, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Oral Argument held on 9/17/2015 on motions. See transcript for court's ruling. See order for trial date and motion schedule. (Court Reporter Ellen Ford) (Brantley, Michael)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: the parties shall appear before the Court at 2:00 p.m. on Thursday, September 17, 2015 in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, for oral argument on the Motions. (As is further set forth in this Order.) (Oral Argument set for 9/17/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/24/2015) (spo)
May 18, 2015 Filing 127 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #116 Letter request to File Portions of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal, filed by Kelley Voelker. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff's redacted materials filed in connection with her Summary Judgment Reply brief shall remain in redacted form on ECF. Plaintiff shall file unredacted copies of these materials under seal. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/18/2015) (spo)
May 18, 2015 Filing 126 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #120 Letter requesting that certain portions of documents and supporting record in connection with Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion for Su mmary Judgment, remain redacted as filed on ECF, and the unredacted copies be filed under seal, filed by Deutsche Bank AG. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Defendant's redacted materials filed in connection with its Summary Judgment Reply brief shall remain in redacted form on ECF. Defendant shall file unredacted copies of these materials under seal. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/18/2015) (spo)
May 15, 2015 Filing 125 DECLARATION of Reply Declaration of Scott Rabe in Support re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 - 8, #2 Exhibits 9 - 23, #3 Exhibits 24 - 34, #4 Exhibits 35 - 48)(Rabe, Scott)
May 15, 2015 Filing 124 DECLARATION of Mark Matthews in Support re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
May 15, 2015 Filing 123 DECLARATION of Melissa Kastens in Support re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
May 15, 2015 Filing 122 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #85 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
May 15, 2015 Filing 121 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
May 15, 2015 Filing 120 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe, Esq. dated May 15, 2015 re: requesting that certain portions of documents and supporting record in connection with Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, remain redacted as filed on ECF, and the unredacted copies be filed under seal. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
May 15, 2015 Filing 119 DECLARATION of Lawrence M. Pearson in Support re: #78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pearson, Lawrence)
May 15, 2015 Filing 118 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #80 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Pearson, Lawrence)
May 15, 2015 Filing 117 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Pearson, Lawrence)
May 15, 2015 Filing 116 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson dated May 15, 2015 re: Request to File Portions of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Pearson, Lawrence)
May 6, 2015 Filing 115 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #114 Letter requesting that Jeremi Chylinski's name be removed from the docket, or at the least, marked terminated from this matter, filed by Deutsche Bank AG. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to update the docket to reflect that Mr. Chylinski is so longer counsel of record for Defendant. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/6/2015) (spo)
May 5, 2015 Filing 114 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe, Esq. dated May 5, 2015 re: requesting that Jeremi Chylinski's name be removed from the docket, or at the least, marked terminated from this matter. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #110 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting #112 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/1/2015) (spo)
May 1, 2015 Filing 112 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe dated May 1, 2015. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
May 1, 2015 Filing 111 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
April 30, 2015 Filing 110 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe, Esq. dated 4/30/15. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
April 29, 2015 Filing 109 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #108 Letter request to File Additional Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal, filed by Kelley Voelker. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff's redacted materials filed in connection with her Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall remain in redacted form on ECF. Plaintiff shall file unredacted copies of these materials under seal. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/29/2015) (spo)
April 28, 2015 Filing 108 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael J. Willemin dated April 28, 2015 re: Request to File Additional Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Willemin, Michael)
April 27, 2015 Filing 107 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #85 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Pearson, Lawrence)
April 27, 2015 Filing 106 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #101 Letter request to File Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal, filed by Kelley Voelker. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff's redacted materials filed in connection with her Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment shall remain in redacted form on ECF. Plaintiff shall file unredacted copies of these materials under seal. Plaintiff is further authorized by the Court to refile her Rule 56.1 Counterstatement (Dkt. #104 ) with an executed signature page by April 29, 2015. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/27/2015) (spo)
April 27, 2015 Filing 105 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #95 Letter requesting that certain portions of documents and supporting record in connection with Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, remain redacted as filed on ECF, and that the unredacted copies be filed under seal, filed by Deutsche Bank AG. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Defendant's redacted materials filed in connection with its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment shall remain in redacted form on ECF. Defendant shall file unredacted copies of these materials under seal. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/27/2015) (spo)
April 24, 2015 Filing 104 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #85 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Pearson, Lawrence)
April 24, 2015 Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Pearson, Lawrence)
April 24, 2015 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Lawrence M. Pearson in Opposition re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81, #82 Exhibit 82, #83 Exhibit 83, #84 Exhibit 84, #85 Exhibit 85, #86 Exhibit 86, #87 Exhibit 87, #88 Exhibit 88, #89 Exhibit 89, #90 Exhibit 90, #91 Exhibit 91, #92 Exhibit 92, #93 Exhibit 93, #94 Exhibit 94, #95 Exhibit 95, #96 Exhibit 96, #97 Exhibit 97, #98 Exhibit 98, #99 Exhibit 99, #100 Exhibit 100, #101 Exhibit 101, #102 Exhibit 102, #103 Exhibit 103)(Pearson, Lawrence)
April 24, 2015 Filing 101 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson dated April 24, 2015 re: Request to File Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Pearson, Lawrence)
April 24, 2015 Filing 100 DECLARATION of Scott Rabe in Opposition re: #78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Part 1, #2 Ex. 1 - Part 2, #3 Ex 2 - Part 1, #4 Ex 2 - Part 2, #5 Ex 3 - Part 1, #6 Ex 3- Part 2, #7 Ex 4 - Part 1, #8 Ex 4 - Part 2, #9 Ex. 5, #10 Ex. 6, #11 Ex. 7, #12 Ex. 8, #13 Ex. 9 - Part 1, #14 Ex. 9 - Part 2, #15 Ex. 9 - Part 3, #16 Ex. 9 - Part 4, #17 Ex. 9 - Part 5, #18 Ex. 10, #19 Ex. 11, #20 Ex. 12)(Rabe, Scott)
April 24, 2015 Filing 99 DECLARATION of Melissa Kastens in Opposition re: #78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
April 24, 2015 Filing 98 DECLARATION of John Arnone in Opposition re: #78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rabe, Scott)
April 24, 2015 Filing 97 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #80 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
April 24, 2015 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
April 24, 2015 Filing 95 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe dated April 24, 2015 re: requesting that certain portions of documents and supporting record in connection with Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, remain redacted as filed on ECF, and that the unredacted copies be filed under seal.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #92 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages re Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/23/2015) (kko)
April 22, 2015 Filing 93 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Yasmine Bitar on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Bitar, Karen)
April 22, 2015 Filing 92 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson dated April 22, 2015. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Pearson, Lawrence)
March 10, 2015 Filing 91 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #82 Letter requesting that certain portions of documents and supporting record in connection with Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, remain redacted as file d on ECF, and that the unredacted copies be filed under seal, filed by Deutsche Bank AG. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/10/2015) (spo)
March 10, 2015 Filing 90 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson dated 3/6/2015 re: Writing jointly with Defendant Deutsche Bank pursuant to Rule 4.A of Your Honor's Rules of Individual Practice to respectfully request the Court's permission to file certain portions of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/10/2015) (spo)
March 6, 2015 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Scott Rabe, Esq. in Support re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Rabe Decl. Ex. 1, #2 Rabe Decl. Ex. 2, #3 Rabe Decl. Ex. 3, #4 Rabe Decl. Ex. 4, #5 Rabe Decl. Ex. 5 (Pt. 1 of 3), #6 Rabe Decl. Ex. 5 (Pt. 2 of 3), #7 Rabe Decl. Ex. 5 (Pt. 3 of 3), #8 Rabe Decl. Ex. 6 (Pt. 1 of 2), #9 Rabe Decl. Ex. 6 (Pt. 2 of 2), #10 Rabe Decl. Ex. 7, #11 Rabe Decl. Ex. 8, #12 Rabe Decl. Ex. 9 (Pt. 1 of 2), #13 Rabe Decl. Ex. 9 (Pt. 2 of 2), #14 Rabe Decl. Ex. 10 (Pt. 1 of 6), #15 Rabe Decl. Ex. 10 (Pt. 2 of 6), #16 Rabe Decl. Ex. 10 (Pt. 3 of 6), #17 Rabe Decl. Ex. 10 (Pt. 4 of 6), #18 Rabe Decl. Ex. 10 (Pt. 5 of 6), #19 Rabe Decl. Ex. 10 (Pt. 6 of 6), #20 Rabe Decl. Exs. 11-20, #21 Rabe Decl. Exs. 21-45, #22 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 1 of 22), #23 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 2 of 22), #24 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 3 of 22), #25 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 4 of 22), #26 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 5 of 22), #27 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 6 of 22), #28 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 7 of 22), #29 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 8 of 22), #30 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 9 of 22), #31 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 10 of 22), #32 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 11 of 22), #33 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 12 of 22), #34 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 13a of 22), #35 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 13b of 22), #36 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 14 of 22), #37 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 15 of 22), #38 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 16 of 22), #39 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 17 of 22), #40 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 18 of 22), #41 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 19 of 22), #42 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 20 of 22), #43 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 21 of 22), #44 Rabe Decl. Ex. 46 (Pt. 22 of 22), #45 Rabe Decl. Ex. 47 (Pt. 1 of 5), #46 Rabe Decl. Ex. 47 (Pt. 2 of 5), #47 Rabe Decl. Ex. 47 (Pt. 3 of 5), #48 Rabe Decl. Ex. 47 (Pt. 4 of 5), #49 Rabe Decl. Ex. 47 (Pt. 5 of 5), #50 Rabe Decl. Exs. 48-50, #51 Rabe Decl. Exs. 51-65)(Rabe, Scott)
March 6, 2015 Filing 88 DECLARATION of Paul Busby in Support re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
March 6, 2015 Filing 87 DECLARATION of Melissa Kastens in Support re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
March 6, 2015 Filing 86 DECLARATION of John Arnone in Support re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
March 6, 2015 Filing 85 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
March 6, 2015 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Rabe, Scott)
March 6, 2015 Filing 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
March 6, 2015 Filing 82 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe, Esq. dated March 6, 2015 re: requesting that certain portions of documents and supporting record in connection with Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, remain redacted as filed on ECF, and that the unredacted copies be filed under seal. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
March 6, 2015 Filing 81 DECLARATION of Lawrence M. Pearson in Support re: #78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36)(Pearson, Lawrence)
March 6, 2015 Filing 80 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Pearson, Lawrence)
March 6, 2015 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Pearson, Lawrence)
March 6, 2015 Filing 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Pearson, Lawrence)
March 6, 2015 Filing 77 NOTICE of Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Pearson, Lawrence)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part #75 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application GRANTED IN PART. Defendant's brief in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment shall be limited to 30 pages. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/25/2015) (spo)
February 24, 2015 Filing 75 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages request an extension from 25 pages to 50 pages of the page limit to defendant's motion for summary judgment addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe dated February 24, 2015. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
February 10, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 3/6/2015. Responses due by 4/24/2015. Replies due by 5/15/2015. (spo)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #73 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Application GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to file its motion for summary judgment shall be extended to March 6, 2015. Plaintiff's opposition deadline shall be extended to April 24, 2015. Defendant's reply deadline shall be extended to May 15, 2015. No further extensions will be granted. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/10/2015) (spo)
February 9, 2015 Filing 73 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe on behalf of Defendant Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. dated February 9, 2015. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: WHEREAS, the parties appeared before the Court for a status conference on January 16, 2015, it is hereby ORDERED: 1. Any motions for summary judgment in this action shall be filed by February 27, 2015. 2. Opposition briefs to any motion for summary judgment shall be filed by April 10, 2015. 3. Reply briefs in further support of any motion for summary judgment shall be filed by May 1, 2015. 4. If, at any point, the parties agree that the assistance of a magistrate judge would be helpful in facilitating settlement, the parties should submit a joint letter to the Court requesting referral to a magistrate judge for settlement purposes. ( Motions due by 2/27/2015., Responses due by 4/10/2015, Replies due by 5/1/2015.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/16/2015) (mro)
January 16, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Status Conference held on 1/16/2015. See order for scheduling and deadlines so ordered by the Court (Court Reporter Steven Griffin) (Brantley, Michael)
January 12, 2015 Filing 71 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #70 Letter, filed by Deutsche Bank AG. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The parties shall appear for a status conference before the Court at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, January 16, 2015 in Room 443 of the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10077. ( Status Conference set for 1/16/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/12/2015) (mro)
January 12, 2015 Filing 70 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe dated January 12, 2015 re: in response to the Court's Order dated Jan. 9, 2015, both parties are available the morning of Friday, Jan. 16, 2015 for the status conference. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
January 9, 2015 Minute Entry Status Conference adjourned on 1/9/201. Defendant's attorney, Scott Rabe was unable to appear due to his illness. Parties will submit a letter with proposed dates for the Court to select and so order. (Brantley, Michael)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #68 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael J. Willemin dated December 12, 2014 re: Parties' Request for Extension of Fact Discovery Deadline. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' deadline for fact discovery expired on December 15, 2014. That deadline is extended for the limited purpose of taking the deposition that has been scheduled for January 7, 2015. The Court made clear in its Order of August 18, 2014 that it would not extend discovery beyond December 15, 2014. In a case that has been pending since 2011, the Court sees no justification (and, other than the witness scheduled for deposition on January 7, 2015, the parties have not advanced any justification) for discovery not having been completed by the long scheduled deadline or for the parties' decision to wait until the Friday before their Monday deadline to seek an extension. The status conference scheduled for December 19, 2014 shall be adjourned to January 9, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. (Deposition due by 1/7/2015. Fact Discovery due by 1/7/2015.), (Status Conference set for 1/9/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/15/2014) (rjm)
December 12, 2014 Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael J. Willemin dated December 12, 2014 re: Parties' Request for Extension of Fact Discovery Deadline. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Willemin, Michael)
December 1, 2014 Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson dated December 1, 2014 re: Status Update per August 18, 2014 Order. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Pearson, Lawrence)
November 7, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth J. Chen on behalf of Kelley Voelker. (Chen, Elizabeth)
October 22, 2014 Filing 65 STATUS REPORT. Joint letter on behalf of both parties to provide an update on the status of this matter pursuant to the Court's Order dated Oct. 8, 2014 Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: WHEREAS, the parties appeared before the Court for a status conference on October 8, 2014 at 10:00 a.m., it is hereby ORDERED: 1. By October 22, 2014, the parties shall submit a status letter to the Court regarding the stability of the predictive coding software and any other issues relevant to the progress of discovery in advance of the parties' December 15, 2014 fact discovery deadline. 2. The parties are no longer required to submit a status letter to the Court on November 1, 2014. Following the parties' discovery letter of October 22, 2014, the next status letter shall be due on December 1, 2014. 3. The parties shall next appear for a pretrial conference before the Court at 10:00 a.m. on December 19, 2014 in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The parties should be prepared to discuss the need for any expert discovery and their suggested dates for any summary judgment briefing. 4. If, at any point, the parties agree that the assistance of a magistrate judge would be helpful in facilitating settlement, the parties should submit a joint letter to the Court requesting referral to a magistrate judge for settlement purposes. ( Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/8/2014) (mro)
October 8, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Status Conference held on 10/8/2014. Status report due by 10/22/2014; Fact Discovery due by 12/15/2014., Status Conference set for 12/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.). (Court Reporter Elena Lynch) (Brantley, Michael)
October 2, 2014 Filing 63 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #62 Letter filed by Kelley Voelker. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are reminded that the deadline for the completion of discovery is December 15, 2014, and the Court is not inclined to grant any further extensions. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/2/2014) (kgo)
October 1, 2014 Filing 62 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael J. Willemin dated October 1, 2014 re: Status Report. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Willemin, Michael)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons stated above, the Disputed Materials are covered by the attorney-client privilege, and therefore protected from disclosure. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/11/2014) (mro)
August 25, 2014 Filing 60 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #59 Letter, filed by Deutsche Bank AG. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant shall produce to Plaintiff underlying statistical information for AIAs relevant to the June, September and November 2012 RIFs, redacted as necessary to protect information regarding employees other than those in the Securities Lending group. The parties shall make best efforts to resolve future discovery disputes amicably and without Court intervention. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/25/2014) (djc)
August 25, 2014 Filing 59 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe dated August 25, 2014 re: in reply to Plaintiff's email dated 8/22/14 referencing 8/15/14 letter to the court re: discovery dispute. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rabe, Scott)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting #56 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' request for an extension of discovery until December 15, 2014 is GRANTED. No further extensions to the discovery deadline will be permitted. The parties are directed to provide the Court with joint status reports of no more than 3 pages on October 1, 2014, November 1, 2014 and December 1, 2014. SO ORDERED. Discovery due by 12/15/2014. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/18/2014) (ajs)
August 15, 2014 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe, dated 8/15/2014, in Reply to Plaintiff's Letter dated 8/13/2014 re: Discovery Dispute. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
August 14, 2014 Filing 56 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery both parties jointly request an extension of the current discovery deadline from Oct. 1, 2014 to be extended through Dec. 15, 2014 addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe and Lawrence M. Pearson dated August 14, 2014. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
August 13, 2014 Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael J. Willemin dated August 13, 2014 re: Response to Defendant Deutsche Bank's 8/13/2014 Letter. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Willemin, Michael)
August 13, 2014 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael John Willemin on behalf of Kelley Voelker. (Willemin, Michael)
August 13, 2014 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Scott Rabe, filed as directed (by Judge Caproni) dated 8/13/2014 re: Discovery Dispute. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
May 16, 2014 Filing 52 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/18/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 16, 2014 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/18/2014 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ann Hairston, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/9/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED: 1. All fact discovery shall be completed by October 1, 2014. For any discovery disputes, the parties must first meet and confer in good faith in an effort to resolve the dispute. If this process fails and the Court's intervention is required, the parties are encouraged to notify the Court by telephone so that a joint teleconference may be scheduled promptly. 2. The parties will next appear before this Court for a status conference on Wednesday, October 8, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The parties should be prepared to discuss the deadline for dispositive motions and whether they intend to seek expert discovery. SO ORDERED. ( Fact Discovery due by 10/1/2014., Status Conference set for 10/8/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/18/2014) (ama)
April 18, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Status Conference held on 4/18/2014. All discovery shall be completed by 10-1-14. A subsequent status conference is set for 10-8-14@ 10a.m. See order (Court Reporter Ann Hairston) (Brantley, Michael)
April 10, 2014 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/18/2014 at 11:45 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (djc)
April 10, 2014 Filing 49 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #48 Letter filed by Kelley Voelker. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned to 4/18/14 at 11:45 a.m. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/10/2014) (djc)
April 10, 2014 Filing 48 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson dated 4/10/2014 re: Request for Adjournment of Status Conference. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(Pearson, Lawrence)
April 9, 2014 Filing 47 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Lawrence M. Pearson and Scott Rabe dated 4/9/2014 re: Status of case pursuant to 3/6/2014 Order. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pearson, Lawrence)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: Counsel are further directed to submit a joint letter to the Court no later than April 9, 2014 and appear for a status conference on April 16, 2014, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The parties should append the most recent complaint and the most recent scheduling order to the status letter. The letter must be filed on ECF in accordance with the Individual Rules. The status letter may not exceed 5 pages. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 4/16/2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/06/2014) (ama)
March 6, 2014 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Paul A. Crotty is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: With regard to the discovery dispute as set forth in Plaintiffs letter dated August 28, 2013, and Defendant's response dated September 4, 2013, the parties are ordered to proceed as follows. Since Defendant has availed itself of predictive coding, under the circumstances of this case, Defendant should share the seed set with Plaintiff. Plaintiff has a legitimate purpose in determining whether the predictive coding technology has been properly "trained" to determine the responsiveness of a large number of documents that humans will not review. To the extent that Plaintiff has not cooperated with the discovery process, Plaintiff is directed to do so. Included within that directive is the obligation to propose search terms to address any quality control concerns that Plaintiff may have. With regard to the "universe" of documents to which the predictive coding review will apply, it applies to the set already collected using the parties' previously agreed-upon search terms. There is no need to restart either the collection or coding processes, as either would entail significant and unnecessary burdens on Defendant. In summary, Defendant is ordered to produce its "seed set" of predictive coding documents to Plaintiff and need not apply the predictive coding process to documents beyond those returned by the agreed-upon search terms. Plaintiffs request for costs and fees is denied. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/9/2013) (rsh)
September 4, 2013 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Scott Rabe dated September 4, 2013 re: Response to Plaintiff's letter dated August 28, 2013 regarding predictive coding dispute. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Rabe, Scott)
August 26, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Proceeding proceeding held on 04/29/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(ca)
August 26, 2013 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Proceeding held on 4/29/2013 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2013.(ca)
July 16, 2013 Filing 41 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Scott Rabe dated 7/15/2013 re: This firm represents defendant Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. ("Defendant") in the above referenced matter. We write to respond to Plaintiff's letter dated July 10, 2013, Plaintiffs latest effort to rush to the Court when a discovery issue arises rather than making reasonable efforts to engage in a meet and confer process as required by the Local Rules. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG. (rsh)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Lawrence M. Pearson dated 7/10/2013 re: Counsel for Plaintiff Kelley Voelker, write to address Defendant's anticipated failure to comply with the Court's Order of April 26, 2013, as well as its continuing and willful failure to produce electronically stored information ("ESI") responsive to Plaintiff's Second Requests for the Production of Documents. ENDORSEMENT: Anticipated failure is no reason to have another conference. Rather the parties must meet and confer in good faith to resolve this discovery dispute. If the matter is not resolved by 8/15/2013, either party may call for a conference. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/16/2013) (rsh)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's direction, Defendant submitted its privilege log on May 3, 2013, together with those documents as to which the parties are in dispute. On May 7, 2013, Plaintiff's counsel submitted a letter objecting to the assertion of attorney-client privilege or work product protection. The Court recognizes that a claim of attorney-client privilege or work product protection for an in-house counsel must be scrutinized to insure that business advice is not shielded from discovery due to an inaccurate or overbroad assertion of legal protection. Nonetheless, it is clear that in-house counsel may claim attorney-client privilege or work product protection, where appropriate. Upon review of the 13 documents submitted for review (13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 21, 22, 23, 24, 27, 41), the Court makes the following rulings as set forth in this order. Plaintiff's objections to defendant's assertion of attorney-client privilege and work product protection for the 13 listed documents are overruled. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/9/2013) (sac)
April 29, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 4/29/2013. REMARK: As discussed at the conference, defendant's submission by May 3, and plaintiff's submission by May 8. See transcript for details. Visit http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding via "Courtflow." (mov)
April 26, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Proceedings proceeding held on 4/16/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(sdi)
April 26, 2013 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Proceedings held on 4/16/2013 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/20/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/29/2013.(sdi)
April 25, 2013 Calendar Entry **TIME CHANGE**: Status Conference set for Monday, April 29, 2013 at 03:30 PM (**NOT 04:45 PM**) in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. Reason for time change: recent change on Judge Crotty's court calendar. If both parties deem the conference unnecessary, either party can e-mail the Courtroom Deputy @: Marlon_Ovalles@nysd.uscourts.gov (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy).(mov)
April 17, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 4/17/2013. REMARK: Discovery disputes ruled upon in open court. The next pretrial conference is scheduled to go forward on Monday, April 29, 2013 @ 4:45 PM. By April 26, 2012, both parties shall submit letters to the Court detailing any unresolved discovery disputes. The Court will rule on any unresolved discovery disputes at the next conference. See transcript for details. Visit http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding via "Courtflow." (mov)
April 16, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Scott Roblan Rabe on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. New Address: Seyfarth Shaw LLP, 620 Eighth Avenue, 32nd Floor, New York, NY, 10018, 212-218-5500. (Rabe, Scott)
April 15, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Roblan Rabe on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG (Rabe, Scott)
April 15, 2013 CALENDAR ENTRY *Reminder*: Status Conference set for Tuesday, April 16, 2013 at 05:00 PM in Courtroom 11-D, before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. If both parties deem the conference unnecessary, either party can e-mail the Courtroom Deputy @: Marlon_Ovalles@nysd.uscourts.gov (mov)
April 1, 2013 Filing 34 Letter addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Lawrence M. Pearson dated 4/1/2013 re: Counsel for Plaintiff writes on behalf of both parties to provide the Court with a status update. As you know, on March 1, 2013 the Court held a pre-motion conference with respect to various discovery disputes. At the conference, the Court ordered the production of certain documents by Defendant by April 10, 2013. Defendant anticipates meeting that deadline, and the Court has scheduled a follow-up conference, should one be necessary, for April 16, 2013. Prior to April 16, 2013, the parties will notify the Court as to whether they believe the follow up conference is necessary. We anticipate setting a schedule for the remaining discovery, including depositions, after the production of the documents as ordered by the Court.Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(rsh)
March 18, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 3/18/2013. REMARK: The Court ruled on discovery disputes. Documents to be produced by April 10. A follow-up conference (if needed) will go forward on Tuesday, April 16, 2013 @ 05:00 PM. See transcript for complete details of this proceeding. Visit http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding via "Courtflow." (mov)
March 18, 2013 Calendar Entry **TIME CHANGE**: Pre-Motion Conference set for Monday, March 18, 2013 at 04:45 PM (**NOT 05:00 PM**) in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy)(mov)
February 28, 2013 Calendar Entry: Pre-Motion Conference set for Monday, March 18, 2013 at 05:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. Requests for adjournment of the conference will be considered if made in writing and in accordance with the Judge Crotty's Individual Practices (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy). (mov)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PROTECTION OF CONFIDENTIAL AND PROPRIETARY INFORMATION:...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/31/2013) (js)
January 11, 2013 Filing 32 STATUS REPORT. 1/11/13 e-mail from Marlon Ovalles, Courtroom Deputy, to Jeremi L. Chylinski. (mov)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Douglas H Wigdor dated 12/12/2012 re: Counsel for plaintiff write jointly with Defendants for a brief five day extension of time to move for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings. The current deadline is Friday, December 14, 2012, and we request an extension until Wednesday, December 19, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., ( Motions due by 12/19/2012.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/13/2012) (pl)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER: The current deadline for the parties to make any motions to amend the pleadings herein and/or to join any additional parties in November 30, 2012, pursuant to the November 19, 2012 So -Ordered Stipulation extending the original deadline deadline of November 16, 2012 set in the October 16, 2012 Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (ECF Dkt. No. 21). 2. The parties desire and agree to an extension of the deadline for making motions to amend and/or join additional parties to December 14, 2012 (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/30/2012) (js)
November 29, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/11/2013. (mov)
November 28, 2012 Filing 29 E-mail addressed to Jeremi Chylinski from Marlon Ovalles, Courtroom Deputy dated November 28, 2012 re: Marking 11/28/12 PTC off calendar. Mr. Chylinski, Thank you for response. We've marked the case off tomorrows calendar. There is no need to appear. Judge Crotty would like the parties to submit a status report (can be done via e-mail) on or before January 11, 2013. In the event either party deems a conference necessary before the status report date, one will be scheduled upon receiving the request. (mov)
November 28, 2012 CALENDAR ENTRY *Reminder & Courtroom Change*: Status Conference set for Thursday, November 29, 2012 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 11-D (*Not 20-C*), before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J. If both parties deem the conference unnecessary, either party can send me an e-mail: Marlon_Ovalles@nysd.uscourts.gov (mov)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Pursuant to the October 16, 2012 Civi Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order (ECF Dkt. No. 21 ), the current deadline for the parties to make any motions to amend the pleadings herein and/or to join any additional parties is November 16, 2012. The parties desire and agree to an extension of the deadline for making motions to amend and/or join additional parties to November 30, 2012. (Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2012, Motions due by 11/30/2012.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/19/2012) (ft)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties herein, and in an effort to avoid further amendments to the Complaint in this action and/or the need for additional administrative or judicial intervention, that: 1. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (ECF Dkt. No. 19) contains a claim against Defendant for retaliation under Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, as amended, 42 U.S.C. 200e et seq., which covers Plaintiff's termination in or around September 2012. 2. This stipulation supersedes any contrary language contained in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and/or Defendant's Answer to the Second Amended Complaint (ECF Dkt. No. 20). 3. Defendants, as stated in the September 11, 2012 stipulation between the parties, which was So-Ordered by the Court on October 3, 2012, shall not raise a defense against Plaintiff's Title VII retaliation claims based upon any alleged failure to file an administrative charge with the EEOC. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11/15/2012) (djc) Modified on 11/15/2012 (djc).
October 22, 2012 Filing 26 Letter addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Douglas H. Wigdor, Esq. dated 10/18/2012 re: We regret the necessity of this additional communication, and are acting merely to avoid any misunderstanding or misconstrual of the Court's intent and Order. Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(mt)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Jeremi L. Chylinski dated 10/12/2012 re: Counsel for Plaintiff understood that Your Honor ordered the production of those documents by November 1, 2012, which is thirty days after the October 2, 2012 conference. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel for plaintiff is correct. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/17/2012) (pl)
October 17, 2012 Filing 22 Letter addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Douglas H. Wigdor dated 10/12/2012 re: As you know, we represent Plaintiff Kelley Voelker in the above-referenced matter. Plaintiff writes to the Court in order to submit the attached proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order ("CCMP"), Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(djc)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All Parties (Plaintiff Kelley Voelker and Defendant Deutsche Bank AG, collectively) do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2013. Expert Discovery due by 4/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2012 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. ESI Docs to be produced by November 1, 2012 (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/17/2012) (djc) Modified on 10/17/2012 (djc). Modified on 10/17/2012 (djc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2012: #1 Appendix) (mov).
October 16, 2012 Filing 20 ANSWER to 19 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Chylinski, Jeremi)
October 15, 2012 Filing 25 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a civil proceeding held on 10/2/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(laq)
October 15, 2012 Filing 24 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: civil proceeding held on 10/2/2012 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/8/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2013.(laq)
October 11, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney David Kerr Reid, III for noncompliance with Section 14.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 19 Amended Complaint to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (tro)
October 5, 2012 Filing 19 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #16 Amended Complaint against Deutsche Bank AG with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kelley Voelker. Related document: #16 Amended Complaint filed by Kelley Voelker.(tro)
October 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER: 1. All parties to this action consent to allow Plaintiff Kelley Voelker to amend her Amended Complaint by filing a Second Amended Complaint. 2. Defendant Deutsche Bank AG hereby agrees that it will not object to the filing of, assert any defenses in response to, or otherwise oppose Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint on the basis that no charge has been filed with the Equal Opportunity Employment Commission with respect to the allegations relating to Defendant's decision to terminate Ms. Voelker's employment. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/3/2012) (djc)
October 2, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 10/2/2012. REMARK: CCMP by 10/12/12. See transcript for complete details of this proceeding. Visit http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding via "Courtflow." (mov)
October 1, 2012 Calendar Entry **TIME CHANGE**: Pretrial Conference set for Tuesday, October 2, 2012 at 03:30 PM (**NOT 03:00 PM**) in Courtroom 20C before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J (By: Marlon Ovalles Courtroom Deputy). (mov)
June 28, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 6/28/2012. REMARK: The Court directed the parties to submit a revised civil case management plan when appropriate. The next status conference is scheduled to go forward on Tuesday, October 2, 2012 at 03:00 PM. See transcript for details. Visit http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrm_tech.php with respect to ordering a transcript of a recorded proceeding via "Courtflow." (mov)
June 27, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremi L. Chylinski on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG (Chylinski, Jeremi)
June 27, 2012 CALENDAR ENTRY **REMINDER**: Status Conference set for Thursday, June 28, 2012 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 20-C before Judge Paul A. Crotty, U.S.D.J (By: Marlon Ovalles - Courtroom Deputy).(mov)
May 22, 2012 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Deutsche Bank AG with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Kelley Voelker. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Kelley Voelker.(mro)
May 18, 2012 Filing 15 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Lawrence M. Pearson dated 5/7/2012 re: Request for a pre-motion conference. ENDORSEMENT: There is no need for a pre-motion conference. Leave to file amended complaint is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/18/2012) (rjm)
May 18, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Cliff Fonstein on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. New Address: Seyfarth Shaw LLP, 620 Eighth Avenue, New York, New York, USA 10018, 212-218-5500. (Fonstein, Cliff)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: PLEASE TAKE NOTICE the law firm of Seyfarth Shaw LLP is hereby substituting as counsel of record for the defendant, Deutsche Bank AG, in place of the law firm of Sidley Austin LLP, and further that all pleadings, notices, orders, and other papers required or permitted to be served upon defendant are to be served upon undersigned counsel at the address listed below. Cliff Fonstein, formerly with Sidley Austin LLP and now with Seyfarth Shaw LLP, who has previously appeared in this matter, shall continue as counsel for the defendant. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/16/2012) (jfe)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions aand trial. Jury trial, 7-10 days. See document for other information. Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2012 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/6/2012) (cd)
February 27, 2012 Mediator Session Held on 02/27/2012 at 233 Broadway.(gom)
January 18, 2012 MEDIATOR SESSION SCHEDULED First Mediation Session scheduled for 2/27/12 10:00 AM 233 Broadway.(gom)
January 10, 2012 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/9/2012.(ago)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Douglas H. Wigdor dated 1/3/2012 re: We write to respectfully request that the Court issue an Order directing that David K. Reid be withdrawn as attorney of record for the Plaintiff as he is no longer affiliated with the Firm. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. Attorney David Kerr Reid, III terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 1/9/2012) (rjm)
December 21, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Michael Pearson on behalf of Kelley Voelker (Pearson, Lawrence)
November 11, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Michelle Conroy on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG (Conroy, Tara)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Order filed January 3, 2011). Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/17/2011. Mediator Expertise Request due by 11/14/2011. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 01/03/2011) (sc)
November 4, 2011 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Fonstein, Cliff)
November 4, 2011 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Taunus Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank AG. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG.(Fonstein, Cliff)
October 13, 2011 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cliff Fonstein on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG (Fonstein, Cliff)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED TO AND AGREED by and between counsel for Plaintiff Kelley Voelker (hereinafter referred to as "Plaintiff") and counsel for Defendant Deutsche Bank AG New York branch (hereinafter referred to as "Defendant") that the deadline to file Defendant's Answer be enlarged from October 5, 2011 to November 4, 2011. This is the first time the parties have asked for an extension of the pleading deadlines. Deutsche Bank AG answer due 11/4/2011. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/6/11) (rjm)
October 5, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanne Seltzer on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG (Seltzer, Joanne)
September 15, 2011 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Deutsche Bank AG served on 9/13/2011, answer due 10/4/2011. Service was accepted by Samantha Weinberg. Document filed by Kelley Voelker. (Reid, David)
September 12, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (ama)
September 12, 2011 Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (ama)
September 12, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Deutsche Bank AG. (ama)
September 12, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank AG. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 16229)Document filed by Kelley Voelker.(ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voelker v. Deutsche Bank AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley Voelker
Represented By: Michael John Willemin
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Chen
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: Lawrence Michael Pearson
Represented By: David Kerr Reid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: Karen Yasmine Bitar
Represented By: Tara Michelle Ellis
Represented By: Jeremi L. Chylinski
Represented By: Joanne Seltzer
Represented By: Cliff Fonstein
Represented By: Scott Roblan Rabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?