The Velvet Underground v. The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: The Velvet Underground
Defendant: The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00201
Filed: January 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J. Nathan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2012 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 15 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc.. (Paul, Joshua)
March 19, 2012 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Joshua Paul in Support re: 15 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Paul, Joshua)
March 19, 2012 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Document filed by The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc.. Responses due by 4/5/2012(Paul, Joshua)
March 16, 2012 Filing 14 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Joint Submission Document filed by The Velvet Underground.(James, Clifford)
February 17, 2012 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by The Velvet Underground. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by The Velvet Underground.(cd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2012: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit) (rdz).
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER: The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc. answer due 3/19/2012. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/16/2012) (jar)
February 10, 2012 Filing 11 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Clifford James dated 2/10/2012 re: counsel request an adjournment of the initial pretrial conference to March 23, 2012 at 3:30 p.m. (and to extend the deadline for the written submission to March 16, 2012). ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. ( Initial Conference set for 3/23/2012 at 03:30 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/10/2012) (djc)
February 3, 2012 Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: SO Ordered. The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc. answer due 3/5/2012. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/3/2012) (jfe)
February 2, 2012 Filing 8 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc..(Ewen, David)
January 11, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
January 11, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401026643)Document filed by The Velvet Underground. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(rdz) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/12/2012) (ama). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/12/2012) (ama). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2012: # 3 Ex. 3, # 4 Ex. 4, # 5 Ex. 5, # 6 Ex. 6) (ama). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2012: # 7 Exhibit) (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Velvet Underground v. The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Velvet Underground
Represented By: Clifford James
Represented By: Christopher Robert Whent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Andy Warhol Foundation for the Visual Arts, Inc.
Represented By: Jess Michol Collen
Represented By: David Bruce Ewen
Represented By: Joshua P. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?