Vajic v. API Restaurant Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Miroslav Vajic
Defendant: API Restaurant Corp., Cella Fine Foods Inc., PIO Restaurant, LLC, SETA Restaurant Corp., Giovanni Apicella and Antonio Spiridigliozzi
Case Number: 1:2012cv00757
Filed: January 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Queens
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPINION re: 102 MOTION for Judgment on Plaintiff Daniel Slamna's claims: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to entry of judgment in favor of Slamma is granted, and Slamma is dismissed from this action. (Daniel Slamna terminated.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/30/2017) (jwh)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPINION re: 72 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference regarding Defendants' motion for sanctions against Plaintiffs addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Netanel Newberger dated 07/21/2014 filed by Antonio Spiridigliozzi, Giovanni Apicella, API Restaurant Corp., Cella Fine Foods Inc. Based on the reasoning given within, Defendants' motions to dismiss the FAC and sanctions is denied. The parties will meet for a conference at 4:00 p.m. on September 24, 2014 a t Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. It is so ordered. (Status Conference set for 9/24/2014 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 9/1/2014) (ajs)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 OPINION. Defendants' motions, submitted via letter on December 18, 2013, are hereby dismissed as moot. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/21/2014) (lmb)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 OPINION & ORDER re: 36 MOTION to Certify Class conditional collective action filed by Daniel Slamna, Miroslav Vajic. Based on the conclusions set forth above, Plaintiffs' motion is granted, and the proposed notice is approved subject to the modifications set forth above. The parties shall submit a revised proposed notice to the Court within 60 days of the date of this order that is in conformance with the required modifications. Defendants are ordered to supply to Plaintiffs with the requested information regarding putative plaintiffs, and Plaintiffs are directed to utilize that information in accordance with the agreed-upon restrictions noted above. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/27/2013) (ft)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION re: 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by SETA Restaurant Corp., Antonio Spiridigliozzi, PIO Restaurant, LLC, Giovanni Apicella, API Restaurant Corp., Cella Fine Foods Inc. Based on the conclusions set forth above, Defendants motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied part. Leave to replead within twenty days is granted. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/18/2012) (lmb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vajic v. API Restaurant Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miroslav Vajic
Represented By: Brandon David Sherr
Represented By: Justin Alexander Zeller
Represented By: Brandon David Sherr
Represented By: Justin Alexander Zeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: API Restaurant Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cella Fine Foods Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PIO Restaurant, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETA Restaurant Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giovanni Apicella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Spiridigliozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?