Wang v. The Hearst Corporation

Plaintiff: Xuedan Wang, Elizabeth Mancini and Matthew Jordan Wagster
Defendant: The Hearst Corporation
Case Number: 1:2012cv00793
Filed: February 1, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Harold Baer
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 180 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Hearst Corporation. For the foregoing reasons, Hearst's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at docket number 180 and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/24/2016) (ama)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 106 MOTION to Certify Class Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23. filed by Matthew Jordan Wagster, Erin E. Spencer, Xuedan Wang, Stephanie Lauren Skorka, Caitlin Leszuk, Alexandra Rappaport, Sarah Wheels, Elizabeth Mancini. I have considered the parties' remaining arguments and find them to be without merit. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment regarding their status as "employees" under the FLSA and NYLL is DENIED. Pla intiffs' motion for class certification under the NYLL claims is also DENIED. The trial, which is scheduled to commence on May 28, 2013, is adjourned sine die. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close the two motions (ECFNo. 105 & 106) and remove them from my docket. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 5/08/2013) (ama)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 OPINION AND ORDER. I have considered the parties' remaining arguments and find them to be wi1hout merit. For the reasons in this Opinion and Order, Hearst's motion for partial judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED with respect to the Seventh Cause of Action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the open motion and remove it from my docket. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 1/9/2013) (rjm)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPINION & ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' letter motion to order Defendant Hearst Corporation ("Defendant") to produce discovery related to the affirmative defense of good faith. For the reasons set forth below, Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED with a caveat. For the reasons stated, Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED and Defendant is ORDERED to produce the materials as discussed above. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/19/2012) (djc)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 OPINION & ORDER re: 38 MOTION for Reconsideration of the July 12, 2012 Order or, in the Alternative, for Clarification of the Governing Legal Standard, or Leave to Seek Interlocutory Appeal. filed by The Hearst Corporation. Hearst's mo tion to reconsider is DENIED. Hearst's application for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b) is also DENIED, but Defendant may, of course, try their hand with the Circuit. Meanwhile, the Pretrial Scheduling Order remains in full force and effect, and discovery will not be stayed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion and remove it from my docket. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 8/24/2012) (djc)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION & ORDER re: 24 MOTION to Certify Class under Section 216(b) of the FLSA filed by Matthew Jordan Wagster, Xuedan Wang, Stephanie Lauren Skorka, Elizabeth Mancini, 9 MOTION to Strike Document No. 7 Class and Collective Action Al legations filed by The Hearst Corporation. I have considered the parties' remaining arguments and find them to be without merit. For the foregoing reasons, Hearst's motion to strike the class and collective allegations under the FLSA an d NYLL is DENIED. Plaintiff's cross-motion for conditional certification is GRANTED and the parties will review and sign the pre-trial scheduling order and I will, upon its return, sign and fax a copy to the parties. Plaintiff's request for leave to amend the proposed Second Amended Complaint to add Stephanie Skorka as a named Plaintiff is GRANTED. Any and all discovery sought by either side will require prior approval by the Court (at least the first wave) and will be submitted within 10 days of the date hereof-so we can begin to move this case along. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the two open motions and remove them from my docket. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 7/12/2012) (lmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wang v. The Hearst Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xuedan Wang
Represented By: Rachel Megan Bien
Represented By: Adam T Klein
Represented By: Elizabeth Hartley Wagoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mancini
Represented By: Rachel Megan Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Jordan Wagster
Represented By: Rachel Megan Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hearst Corporation
Represented By: Joshua F Alloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?