The Associated Press v. Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: The Associated Press
Defendant: Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc. and Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.
Amicus Curiae: Gannett Co., Inc., BurrellesLuce, The New York Times Company, Computer & Communications Industry Association, Advance Publications, Inc., The Newspaper Association of America and The McClatchy Company
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Public Knowledge and Electronic Frontier Foundation
Case Number: 1:2012cv01087
Filed: February 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 45, 51, 52, 99, 101 & 108 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 11/29/17.(rz)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 46, 100, 122 & 135 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 11/27/2017.(rz)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 46, 100, 122 & 135 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 11/24/2017. (rz)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 45, 51, 52, 99, 101 & 108 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 11/24/2017. (rz)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between Plaintiff and Counterclaim-Defendant The Associated Press, and Defendants and Counterclaim-Plaintiffs Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc. and Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., that all remaining claims and counterclaims asserted in this action are dismissed with prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(l)(ii). The parties shall bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/30/2013) (djc) Modified on 7/30/2013 (djc).
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY - DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL. Note to Attorney Elizabeth McNamara Document #180 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal, was referred to Judge Denise L. Cote for approval. (jno)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Terminate Transcript Deadlines (djc)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the termination of this action. (djc)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 DOCUMENT REFERRED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc., The Associated Press pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S., Inc., The Associated Press, Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc., Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc..(McNamara, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/30/2013 (jno).
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 179 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 177 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Telephone Conference held on 5/2/2013. (Court Reporter Rose Prater) (gr)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Linda Steinman dated 04/03/2013 re: Response to Meltwater's objections to proposed permanent injunction.(LHH)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Letter addressed to Judge Cote from David Kramer dated 04/03/2013 re: Objections to proposed permanent injunction.(LHH)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Elizabeth McNamara dated 04/02/2013 re: Proposed Permanent Injunction.(LHH)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the settlement conference scheduled for May 1, 2013, is adjourned. By May 7, 2013, counsel shall notify the Court concerning the status of settlement negotiations. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 4/22/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers to Hon. Denise Cote. (djc)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER: On April 2, 2013, the Associated Press ("AP") submitted a proposed permanent injunction to the Court. By letter dated April 3, the Meltwater defendants informed the Court of their objections to the proposed permanent injunction. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephone conference will be held on May 2, 2013 at 2:30 p.m. The parties shall be prepared to discuss Meltwater's objection that the fourth "WHEREAS" paragraph of the proposed permanent injunction does not adequately describe what is meant by AP's "Bug" or where "microformats" and "source organization properties" can be found., ( Telephone Conference set for 5/2/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/29/2013) (lmb)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 VOLUNTARY STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff The Associated Press ("AP") and Defendants Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., and Meltwater News US 1, Inc. (collectively "Meltwater"), as follows: 1. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), AP dismisses with prejudice its claims against Meltwater for Contributory Copyright Infringement (Second Cause of Action) and Vicarious Copyright Infringement (Third Cause of Action), as set forth in AP's First Amended Complaint. 2. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), AP dismisses without prejudice its claims against Meltwater for "Hot News" Misappropriation (Fifth Cause of Action) and Removal or Alteration of Copyright Management information (Sixth Cause of Action), as set forth in AP's First Amended Complaint. 3. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1) and (c), Meltwater dismisses without prejudice its counterclaims against AP for Declaratory Judgment of Safe Harbor from Infringement Claims Based upon the Digital Millennium Copyright Act (Count II); Libel Per Se (Count III); and Tortious Interference (Count IV), as set forth in Meltwater's Amended Answer and Counterclaims. 4. Each party shall bear its respective costs and attorney's fees in connection with the above-referenced claims and counterclaims as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/15/2013) (lmb)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 168 Voluntary Stipulation of Dismissal. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (lmb)
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Elizabeth A. McNamara dated 4/2/2013 re: We represent AP in the above-referenced matter and write pursuant to Your Honor's March 28, 2013 Order, which directed the parties to submit letters informing the Court of the claims and counterclaims they still intend to pursue in this action. Document filed by The Associated Press.(lmb)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/28/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/28/2013 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Letter addressed to Judge Cote from Tonia Ouellette Klausner dated 3/29/2013 re: As requested at yesterday's conference, we have conferred with Meltwater, which has confirmed that the two pieces of information redacted from the Court's Opinion are non-public. Document filed by Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.(gr)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REVISED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth at the pretrial conference held on March 28, 2013, the following schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case: The parties shall submit letters to the Court by April 2, 2013 informing the Court of the claims and counterclaims that they still intend to pursue in this action. The parties are instructed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Maas no later than April 12, 2013, in order to pursue settlement discussions under his supervision. All fact discovery must be completed by June 14, 2013. Expert reports and disclosure of expert testimony conforming to the requirements of Rule 26(a)(2)(B), Fed. R. Civ. P., by the party bearing the burden on an issue must be served by June 28, 2013. Expert discovery must be completed by July 12, 2013. The Joint Pretrial Order must be filed by August 16, 2013. As described in greater detail in this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, the following documents must be filed with the Pretrial Order: Voir Dire, Requests to Charge and a Memorandum of Law addressing all questions of law expected to arise at trial. Any responsive papers are due one week thereafter. Counsel will provide the Court with two (2) courtesy copies of all pretrial documents at the time of filing. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case is placed on the September trial ready calendar. You must be ready to proceed on 24 hours notice. You may contact the Deputy Clerk, Gloria Rojas, to learn where your case stands on the calendar. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the procedures as further specified in this order shall govern the conduct of the trial, and as further set forth. (Fact Discovery due by 6/14/2013. Expert Discovery due by 7/12/2013. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/16/2013.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/28/2013). (rjm)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Status Conference held on 3/28/2013. (Expert Discovery due by 7/12/2013, Fact Discovery due by 6/14/2013, If no expert discovery, then parties to inform the Court not later than June 14. Pre Trial order to be filed by August 16 if this case is to be tried by a jury. Case to be placed on September, 2013 Trial Ready calendar. By April 12, the parties shall contact MJ Maas to schedule a settlement conference if the case is not resolved by then. (ft)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/28/2013) (lmb)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: #156 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions. (sj)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: In an Opinion and Order dated March 20, 2013 ("March 20 Opinion"), the Court granted the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, with one exception. The March 20 Opinion also provided that the parties will be given an additional opportunity to address whether retrospective injunctive relief should be granted in this case. It is hereby ORDERED that parties shall attend a conference on March 28, 2013 at 11:00 A.M. in Courtroom 15B at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. The parties shall meet and confer prior to the conference to agree on a schedule for discovery regarding, inter alia, damages and the scope of any injunction in this case., ( Status Conference set for 3/28/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/21/2013) (lmb)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: On March 21, 2013, the Court filed a redacted version of the Court's Opinion of March 20 on the public record. Subsequently, it was brought to the Court's attention that information regarding the number of customers Meltwater has in the United States has already been placed in the public record. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the information describing the number of Meltwater customers in the United States in the Court's March 20 Opinion shall be unredacted. The unredacted page is appended to this Order. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/21/2013) (lmb)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Tonia Ouellette Klausner dated 3/21/2013 re: Pursuant to the Court's order dated March 20, 2013, the Meltwater defendants submit for the Court's consideration the enclosed chart of very limited proposed redactions to the Court's Opinion and Order dated March 20, 2013. The chart shows the proposed redaction and the justification for the redaction. We would be happy to discuss or elaborate on these matters. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.(lmb)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 OPINION AND ORDER: #103046 The following Opinion and Order GRANTS #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment, document filed by The Associated Press; DENIES #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment, document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc.; DENIES #79 MOTION to Strike [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION], document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc.; DENIES #131 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE SCHARY DECLARATION AND IMPROPER PORTIONS OF STEINMAN DECLARATION, document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. The parties will be given an additional opportunity to address whether retrospective injunctive relief should be granted in this case. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/20/2013) (rsh) Modified on 4/4/2013 (sdi).
March 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER: In an Opinion and Order dated March 20, 2013 ("March 20 Opinion"), the Court granted the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, with one exception. The March 20 Opinion also denied the defendants' motion for summary judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall advise the Court by 10:00 AM on March 21, 2013 whether they request any redactions from the Opinion before it is filed in the public record. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/20/2013) (lmb)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TELEPHONE CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/19/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/19/2012 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tara Jones, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/8/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Alison Brooke Schary on behalf of The Associated Press. New Address: Davis Wright Tremaine LLP, 1919 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 800, Washington, DC, USA 20006-3401, (202) 973-4200. (Schary, Alison)
March 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 BRIEF re: #150 Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief Brief of Amici Curiae The New York Times Company, Advance Publications, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., The McClatchy Company, The Newspaper Association of America,and BurrellesLuce, in Support of Plaintiff. Document filed by Advance Publications, Inc., BurrellesLuce, Gannett Co., Inc., The McClatchy Company, The New York Times Company, The Newspaper Association of America.(Sims, Charles)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #145 Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/28/2013) (ft)
February 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #145 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Advance Publications, Inc., BurrellesLuce, Gannett Co., Inc., The McClatchy Company, The New York Times Company, The Newspaper Association of America. (Sims, Charles)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #145 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: #145 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. filed by Advance Publications, Inc., The New York Times Company, The McClatchy Company, BurrellesLuce, Gannett Co., Inc., The Newspaper Association of America. Any opposition must be filed by February 27; reply is due March 1.(Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 02/26/13)(gr)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 DECLARATION of Charles S. Sims in Support re: #145 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Advance Publications, Inc., BurrellesLuce, Gannett Co., Inc., The McClatchy Company, The New York Times Company, The Newspaper Association of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sims, Charles)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Advance Publications, Inc., BurrellesLuce, Gannett Co., Inc., The McClatchy Company, The New York Times Company, The Newspaper Association of America.(Sims, Charles)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Advance Publications, Inc., BurrellesLuce, Gannett Co., Inc., The McClatchy Company, The New York Times Company, The Newspaper Association of America.(Sims, Charles)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles S. Sims on behalf of The New York Times Company, Advance Publications, Inc., Gannett Co., Inc., The McClatchy Company, The Newspaper Association of America, BurrellesLuce (Sims, Charles)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Charles S. Sims dated 02/21/2013 re: We write to advise the court that on behalf of The New York Times Company and other newspaper publishers, and BurrellesLuce, a media monitoring company like Meltwater, we expect not later than Monday February 25, 2013 to file a motion for leave to file an amici curiae brief, which will include the brief to be filed as an addendum. We hope that the motion can be filed tomorrow, but factors beyond our control leave us uncertain whether that will have to wait until Monday We have asked the parties for consent, which plaintiff has afforded and defendant has refused to grant without seeing the proposed brief in advance. (jcs)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 DECLARATION of Alison B. Schary in Opposition re: #131 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE SCHARY DECLARATION AND IMPROPER PORTIONS OF STEINMAN DECLARATION.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Steinman, Linda)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #131 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE SCHARY DECLARATION AND IMPROPER PORTIONS OF STEINMAN DECLARATION.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Steinman, Linda)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Tonia Ouellette Klausner dated 1/28/2013 re: Enclosed please find the Meltwater defendants' proposed redactions to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Strike the Schary Declaration and Portions of the Steinman Declaration. The columns in the chart show the document containing the material proposed to be redacted, the proposed redaction, and the justification for the redaction. We are delivering by hand a copy of the chart together with two copies of the referenced pages, one copy with the proposed redactions highlighted and one copy with the referenced pages un-highlighted. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/4/2013) (ago)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #131 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE SCHARY DECLARATION AND IMPROPER PORTIONS OF STEINMAN DECLARATION.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 BRIEF of Amici Curiae Eletronic Frontier Foundation and Public Knowledge in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge.(Ahrens, Julie)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #96 Declaration in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #131 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE SCHARY DECLARATION AND IMPROPER PORTIONS OF STEINMAN DECLARATION.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE SCHARY DECLARATION AND IMPROPER PORTIONS OF STEINMAN DECLARATION. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of ROBERT ALLEN GLUNT in Support re: #79 MOTION to Strike [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION].. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #79 MOTION to Strike [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION].. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner to RE-FILE Document 124 Opposition Brief. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Opposition(non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (ka)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner to RE-FILE Document #124 Opposition Brief. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Opposition(non-motion) found under the event list Other Answers. (ka)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 126 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of CATHERINE GREALIS in Support re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - OPPOSITION BRIEF re: #96 Declaration in Opposition to Motion MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE RULE 56(D) DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH A. MCNAMARA [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION]. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc..(Klausner, Tonia Maria) Modified on 1/24/2013 (ka).
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment. [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION]. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #79 MOTION to Strike [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION].. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 121 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Collin J. Peng-Sue in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Alison B. Schary in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON TABLE OF AP'S PROPOSED REDACTIONS RE: AP's Reply Papers in Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment; AP's Opposition to Meltwater's Motion to Strike and Meltwater's Reply Papers in Further Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. The redacted documents may be filed. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/23/2013) (ago)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 BRIEF of amicus curiae Computer & Communications Industry Association. Document filed by Computer & Communications Industry Association.(Sullivan, Kathleen)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Tonia Oullette Klausner dated 1/15/2013 re: Defense counsel writes Meltwater defendants submit for the Court's consideration the enclosed chart of proposed redactions to the reply papers supporting the parties' summary judgment briefs. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. The redacted documents may be filed. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/22/2013) (ago)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #102 Motion to File Amicus Brief. Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/22/2013) (ft)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on #106 MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Computer & Communications Industry Association. Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/22/2013) (ft)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #109 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Computer & Communications Industry Association. (Sullivan, Kathleen)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 DECLARATION of Jonathan B. Oblak in Support re: #109 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Computer & Communications Industry Association. (Sullivan, Kathleen)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Computer & Communications Industry Association.(Sullivan, Kathleen)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 112 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Kathleen M. Sullivan to RE-FILE Document 107 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document linked to filing error. (ldi)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Kathleen M. Sullivan to RE-FILE Document #107 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Document linked to filing error. (ldi)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Kathleen M. Sullivan to RE-FILE Document #106 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Kathleen M. Sullivan to RE-FILE Document 106 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #106 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Computer & Communications Industry Association. (Sullivan, Kathleen) Modified on 1/22/2013 (ldi).
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Computer & Communications Industry Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan B. Oblak)(Sullivan, Kathleen) Modified on 1/22/2013 (ldi).
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Computer & Communications Industry Association.(Sullivan, Kathleen)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen M. Sullivan on behalf of Computer & Communications Industry Association (Sullivan, Kathleen)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #102 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge. (Ahrens, Julie)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge.(Ahrens, Julie)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #40 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Defendants' Counterclaims.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. McNamara in Opposition re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. McNamara in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54 part 1, #55 Exhibit 54 part 2, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91, #93 Exhibit 92, #94 Exhibit 93, #95 Exhibit 94, #96 Exhibit 95, #97 Exhibit 96, #98 Exhibit 97, #99 Exhibit 98, #100 Exhibit 99, #101 Exhibit 100, #102 Exhibit 101, #103 Exhibit 102, #104 Exhibit 103, #105 Exhibit 104, #106 Exhibit 105, #107 Exhibit 106)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Elizabeth A. McNamara to RE-FILE Document #90 Declaration in Support of Motion, #92 Declaration in Opposition to Motion. ERROR(S): No signature or s/. (ldi)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Elizabeth A. McNamara to RE-FILE Document 90 Declaration in Support of Motion, 92 Declaration in Opposition to Motion. ERROR(S): No signature or s/. (ldi)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 DECLARATION of Linda Steinman in Opposition re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 DECLARATION of Alison B. Schary in Opposition re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. McNamara in Opposition re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McNamara, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/28/2012 (ldi).
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. McNamara in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54 part 1, #55 Exhibit 54 part 2, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91, #93 Exhibit 92, #94 Exhibit 93, #95 Exhibit 94, #96 Exhibit 95, #97 Exhibit 96, #98 Exhibit 97, #99 Exhibit 98, #100 Exhibit 99, #101 Exhibit 100, #102 Exhibit 101, #103 Exhibit 102, #104 Exhibit 103, #105 Exhibit 104, #106 Exhibit 105, #107 Exhibit 106)(McNamara, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/28/2012 (ldi).
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 DECLARATION of Sue Cross in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DECLARATION of John D. Rizzo in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9 part 1, #10 Exhibit 9 part 2)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 DECLARATION of Joy Jones in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 part 1, #8 Exhibit 7 part 2, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 DECLARATION of THOMAS CURLEY in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C part 1, #4 Exhibit C part 2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 DECLARATION of THOMAS KENT in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DECLARATION of KERI MCKENZIE in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #82 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 4, #2 Part 3 of 4, #3 Part 4 of 4)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #79 MOTION to Strike [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION].. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to Strike [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION]. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc..(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 DECLARATION of JOHN BOX [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION] SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF JOHN BOX in Opposition re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECLARATION of TONIA OUELLETTE KLAUSNER [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION] in Opposition re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-6, #3 Exhibit 7-13, #4 Exhibit 14-15, #5 Exhibit 16-18, #6 Exhibit 19-20, #7 Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit 22-26, #9 Exhibit 27-31, #10 Exhibit 32-35, #11 Exhibit 36-49, #12 Exhibit 50-58, #13 Exhibit 59-63, #14 Exhibit 64-67, #15 Exhibit 68-70)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DECLARATION of SEBASTIAN GEIDIES [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION] in Opposition re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DECLARATION of ROBERT A. GLUNT [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION] in Opposition re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DECLARATION of SARA SAAB [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION] in Support re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECLARATION of ROBERT A. GLUNT [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION] in Support re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DECLARATION of NICK FULLER [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION] in Support re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DECLARATION of JOHN BOX [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION] in Support re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DECLARATION of CATHY LAWHON [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION] in Support re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 DECLARATION of BROCK N. MEEKS [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION] in Support re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DECLARATION of CATHERINE GREALIS [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION] in Support re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63, #64 Exhibit 64, #65 Exhibit 65, #66 Exhibit 66, #67 Exhibit 67, #68 Exhibit 68, #69 Exhibit 69, #70 Exhibit 70, #71 Exhibit 71, #72 Exhibit 72, #73 Exhibit 73, #74 Exhibit 74, #75 Exhibit 75, #76 Exhibit 76, #77 Exhibit 77, #78 Exhibit 78, #79 Exhibit 79, #80 Exhibit 80, #81 Exhibit 81)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote, from Elizabeth A. McNamara, dated 12/19/2012, re: briefly follow-up on one point after the conference today. In our December 17, 2012 letter, we asked the Court to rule that no amici may file a motion to file an amicus brief. Document filed by The Associated Press.(ja)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote, from David H. Kramer, dated 12/20/2012, re: respond to the letter submitted yesterday by the Associated Press ("AP") regarding prospective amici in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: Any amicus briefs that the Court agrees to accept should be filed no earlier than 1/18/2013. ( Brief due by 1/18/2013.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/21/2012) (ja) Modified on 12/26/2012 (mt).
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on TABLE OF AP'S PROPOSED REDACTIONS. Endorsement: Approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/21/2012) (ja)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote, from David H. Kramer, dated 12/20/2012, re: the Meltwater defendants submit for the Court's consideration the enclosed chart of proposed redactions to the papers supporting the parties' summary judgment briefs. Redactions to the briefs themselves were resolved yesterday, and the briefs (with extremely limited redactions) were publicly-filed. ENDORSEMENT: The chart is filed under seal. The proposed redactions are approved. The parties shall promptly file the redacted papers in the public record and the pages with unredacted information under seal. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/21/2012) (ja)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment. [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION]. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #55 MOTION for Summary Judgment. [REDACTED / PUBLIC VERSION]. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc..(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #53 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by The Associated Press.(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Telephone Conference held on 12/19/2012. (Court Reporter Tara Jones) (gr)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #40 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Defendants' Counterclaims.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DECLARATION of Elizabeth A. McNamara in Opposition re: #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Collin James Peng-Sue on behalf of The Associated Press (Peng-Sue, Collin)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc..(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 DECLARATION of ELIZABETH A. MCNAMARA in Support re: #40 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Defendants' Counterclaims.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(McNamara, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #40 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Defendants' Counterclaims.. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Defendants' Counterclaims. Document filed by The Associated Press.(McNamara, Elizabeth)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/7/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/7/2012 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/5/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2013.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David H. Kramer dated 10/11/2012 re: The parties jointly propose the following process: The parties will initially file under seal all papers in support of their cross-motions for summary judgment. Once the motions are fully submitted, the parties will confer expeditiously to agree on a limited number of proposed redactions for all papers in support of both motions and will submit a joint letter to the Court in accordance with Rule 4(a) of the Court's individual practices. Once the Court rules on the parties' jointly proposed redactions, the parties will file the redacted versions of all documents on ECF accordingly. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/11/2012) (ft)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Telephone Conference held on 9/7/2012. (Court Reporter Denise Richards) (gr)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AMENDED ANSWER to #35 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, #30 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to #30 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against The Associated Press. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Certificate of Service)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Tonia Ouellette Klausner dated 8/2/2012 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court extend Defendants' time to answer the Amended Complaint up to and including August 8, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. There shall be no further extensions., Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc. answer due 8/8/2012; Meltwater News U.S., Inc. answer due 8/8/2012; Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. answer due 8/8/2012. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/3/2012) (lmb)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Letter addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Elizabeth A. McNamara dated 7/13/2012 re: We are counsel to the Associated Press ("AP") and write in response to the Court's Order dated July 10, 2012. Document filed by The Associated Press.(lmb)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Letter addressed to Judge Denise Cote from Elizabeth A. McNamara dated 7/13/2012 re: Counsel for plaintiff writes that the parties have engaged in "meet and confer" discussions regarding their respective Requests for Production ("RFP") and objections. Document filed by The Associated Press.(pl)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge L.Denise Cote from David H. Kramer dated 7/13/2012 re: Counsel for Defendant respectfully request that the court convene an informal conference to discuss the matters set forth in this letter at its earliest convenience. ENDORSEMENT: AP need not make a further production at this time. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/17/2012) (pl) Modified on 7/20/2012 (pl).
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Elizabeth A. McNamara and David H. Kramer dated 7/13/2012 re: Pursuant to the Court's July 10, 2012 Order, the parties submit this joint letter reflecting their proposed modified schedule for phase 1 of this case in light of AP's forthcoming amended complaint. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED., Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc. answer due 8/3/2012; Meltwater News U.S., Inc. answer due 8/3/2012; Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. answer due 8/3/2012.( Amended Pleadings due by 7/13/2012., Motions due by 10/30/2012., Responses due by 11/29/2012, Replies due by 12/20/2012.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/16/2012) (ama)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by The Associated Press. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(cd)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (djc)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER CLOSING REFERENCE: Having conferred with counsel on June 27,2012, and having reviewed their subsequent submissions dated July 10, 2012, it seems apparent that this case cannot be settled at this juncture. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully requested to close the settlement referral to me. (ECF No. 19). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas on 7/11/2012) Copies Sent By Chambers. (djc) Modified on 7/11/2012 (djc).
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: ORDERED that the plaintiff may file its amended complaint by July 13, 2012. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the additional articles identified in the amended complaint shall be included in the "initial discovery period" and "opening motions" described in the May 14, 2012 scheduling order. The parties shall promptly meet and confer regarding any proposal for an adjustment of the dates included in that scheduling order, and to address any outstanding discovery disputes, and shall advise the Court of the outcome of those discussions in a letter or letters to be submitted no later than July 13. The parties are reminded that letters to the Court may not exceed two pages in length. ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/13/2012.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/10/2012) (ama)
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge L. Cote from Linda Steinman dated 7/5/2012 re: Counsel for the plaintiff requests an extension of the deadline for AP to file an Amended Complaint or a motion to amend the complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 7/13/2012.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer (Sitting in Part I) on 7/5/2012) (ft) Modified on 7/5/2012 (ft).
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER..regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential information... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/14/2012) (pl)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Catherine Sarah Grealis on behalf of Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. New Address: Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, 1301 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, 10019, 212-999-5800. (Grealis, Catherine)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/11/2012 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Michael Willen on behalf of Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. (Willen, Brian)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #13 Counterclaim. Document filed by The Associated Press.(McNamara, Elizabeth)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Frank Maas. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/13/2012) (pl)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' proposed schedule for phase 1 of the litigation, which was appended to their joint letter of May 4, 2012, is adopted. No additional parties after July 6, 2012. may be joined or pleadings amended after July 6, 2012. The parties are instructed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Maas prior to May 18, 2012, in order to pursue settlement discussions under his supervision. The initial discovery period must be completed by August 10, 2012. The parties' opening motions will be served by the dates indicated in this Order. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. Amended Pleadings due by 7/6/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 7/6/2012. Discovery due by 8/10/2012. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/14/2012) (pl)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: that a conference will be held on May 11, 2012, at 11:30 a.m. at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, in Courtroom 15B., ( Status Conference set for 5/11/2012 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/7/2012) (pl)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/20/2012. (gr)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: By May 5, 2012, the parties shall submit a joint letter setting forth their agreement regarding the scope and schedule of discovery in this matter or requesting a conference with the Court. The letter should also propose a schedule for settlement discussions before Magistrate Judge Maas. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/20/2012) (ft)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 04/02/2012, Receipt Number 1034217. (jd)
April 19, 2012 Opinion or Order CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 04/02/2012, Receipt Number 1034217. (jd)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS: The Associated Press answer due 5/15/2012. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/17/2012) (cd)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by The Associated Press.(McNamara, Elizabeth)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Affidavit)(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
April 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #11 Motion for David H. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/6/2012) (lmb)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for David H. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc..(bwa)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Tonia Ouellette Klausner dated 3/5/2012 re: We write to request an adjournment of the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(c) pretrial conference, which is currently scheduled for April 13, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned to April 20 at 10:00 am., ( Initial Conference set for 4/20/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/23/2012) (lmb)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Judge Cote's individual practices served on Tonia Ouellette Klausner on 3/23/12. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Associated Press. (McNamara, Elizabeth)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc. answer due 4/6/2012; Meltwater News U.S., Inc. answer due 4/6/2012; Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. answer due 4/6/2012. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/2/2012) (cd)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Catherine Sarah Grealis on behalf of Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. (Grealis, Catherine)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Meltwater US Holdings Inc. for Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc.; Corporate Parent Meltwater Holdings BV for Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc..(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner to RE-FILE Document #5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (lb)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner to RE-FILE Document 5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (lb)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc..(Klausner, Tonia Maria) Modified on 3/2/2012 (lb).
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner on behalf of Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/13/2012 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15B, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/27/2012) (rjm)
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. All Defendants. Document filed by The Associated Press. (Steinman, Linda)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 9550)Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Complaint)(ama)
February 14, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 9550)Document filed by The Associated Press. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Complaint)(ama)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc., Meltwater News U.S., Inc., Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. (ama)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the filing of this action. (ama)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (ama)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Associated Press v. Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meltwater News U.S. 1, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Sarah Grealis
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Brian Michael Willen
Represented By: Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meltwater News U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Sarah Grealis
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Brian Michael Willen
Represented By: Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meltwater U.S. Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Sarah Grealis
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Represented By: Brian Michael Willen
Represented By: Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Gannett Co., Inc.
Represented By: Charles S Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BurrellesLuce
Represented By: Charles S Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The New York Times Company
Represented By: Charles S Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Computer & Communications Industry Association
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Advance Publications, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Newspaper Association of America
Represented By: Charles S Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The McClatchy Company
Represented By: Charles S Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Public Knowledge
Represented By: Julie Angela Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Electronic Frontier Foundation
Represented By: Julie Angela Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Associated Press
Represented By: Collin James Peng-Sue
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McNamara
Represented By: Alison Brooke Schary
Represented By: Linda Jane Steinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?