Terra Energy & Resource Technologies, Inc et al v. Terralinna Pty. Ltd.
Plaintiff: |
Terra Energy & Resource Technologies, Inc and Terra Insight Services, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Terralinna Pty. Ltd. |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv01337 |
Filed: |
February 22, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
William H. Pauley |
Nature of Suit: |
Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. § 1961 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 24, 2014 |
Filing
129
AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth above, Terralinna's Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(2) motion, Docket Entry No. 97, is granted. The plaintiffs must pay Terralinna $47,266.32 for the reasonable attorneys' fees, costs and e xpenses Terralinna incurred defending against Count Three of the plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. re: 97 NOTICE of Notice of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs as to Count III of the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Terralinna Pty. Ltd. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 11/24/2014) (rjm)
|
November 19, 2014 |
Filing
126
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth above, Terralinna's Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(2) motion, Docket Entry No. 97, is granted. The plaintiffs must pay Terralinna $47,266.32 for the reasonable attorneys' fees, costs and expenses Terralinna incurred defending against Count Three of the plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. re: 97 NOTICE of Notice of Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs as to Count III of the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Terralinna Pty. Ltd. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 11/19/2014) (rjm)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing
124
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth above, Terralinna's motion for reconsideration, Docket Entry No. 111, is granted. Granting 111 Motion for Reconsideration. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 11/5/2014) (rjm)
|
April 30, 2014 |
Filing
116
MEMORANDUM & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Terralinna's Rule 37 motion for attorneys' fees in connection with its opposition to Terra's motion to compel is granted. Plaintiffs and their counsel are jointly and severally liable for Terralinna's reasonable fees in the amount of $5,737.50. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 96. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/30/2014) (lmb)
|
April 7, 2014 |
Filing
109
ORDER re: 96 Notice (Other) filed by Terralinna Pty. Ltd. For the reasons set forth above, Terralinna's motion for attorneys' fees and costs, Docket Entry No. 96, is denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 4/7/2014) (ajs)
|
October 31, 2013 |
Filing
91
MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 65 Motion in Limine: For the reasons set forth above, Terralinna's "motion in limine to exclude, as inadmissible hearsay, documents prepared by third parties," Docket Entry No. 65, is denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 10/31/2013) (tn)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?