White et al v. West Publishing Corporation et al Featured Case

Defendant: West Publishing Corporation and Reed Elsevier Inc.
Plaintiff: Edward L. White, Edward L. White, P.C. and Kenneth Elan
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01340
Filed: February 22, 2012
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Jed S. Rakoff
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 80 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gregory A. Blue on behalf of Edward L. White, P.C., Edward L. White. New Address: Dilworth Paxson LLP, 99 Park Avenue, Suite 320, New York, NY, USA 10016, 212-208-6874. (Blue, Gregory)
February 11, 2013 79 Featured Case ORDER: granting 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. After carefully considering the parties' written submissions and oral argument, the Court hereby grants defendants' motions for summary judgment and denies plaintiff's motion. An opinion explaining the reasons for this ruling will issue in due course. Final judgment will not enter until the Court issues the reasons for its decision. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close items number 45, 46 and 53 on the docket of this case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/8/2013) (djc) Modified on 2/11/2013 (djc).
November 30, 2012 78 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 11/20/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 30, 2012 77 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 11/20/2012 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2013.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 26, 2012 76 DECLARATION of Martin S. High in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Motion Previously Filed).. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Assignment of Copyright)(Blue, Gregory)
November 2, 2012 75 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Hough, James)
November 2, 2012 74 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Motion Previously Filed).. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C.. (Blue, Gregory)
November 2, 2012 73 DECLARATION of John P. Sullivan in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rich, Robert)
November 2, 2012 72 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Rich, Robert)
October 23, 2012 71 DECLARATION of James Hough in Opposition re: 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Motion Previously Filed).. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hough, James)
October 23, 2012 70 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 52 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Hough, James)
October 23, 2012 69 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Motion Previously Filed).. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Hough, James)
October 23, 2012 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C.. (Blue, Gregory)
October 23, 2012 67 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 57 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C.. (Blue, Gregory)
October 23, 2012 66 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 51 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C.. (Blue, Gregory)
October 23, 2012 65 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 52 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Rich, Robert)
October 23, 2012 64 DECLARATION of Jonathan Bloom in Opposition re: 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Motion Previously Filed).. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Rich, Robert)
October 23, 2012 63 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Motion Previously Filed).. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Rich, Robert)
October 12, 2012 62 DECLARATION of John R. Gerba in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Rich, Robert)
October 5, 2012 61 DECLARATION of David Blackburn in Support re: 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hough, James)
October 5, 2012 60 DECLARATION of Brett Bogan in Support re: 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Hough, James)
October 5, 2012 59 DECLARATION of Leigh Beauchamp in Support re: 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Hough, James)
October 5, 2012 58 DECLARATION of James Hough in Support re: 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W)(Hough, James)
October 5, 2012 57 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Hough, James)
October 5, 2012 56 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Hough, James)
October 5, 2012 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Motion Previously Filed).. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C.. (Blue, Gregory)
October 5, 2012 54 DECLARATION of Gregory A. Blue in Support re: 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Motion Previously Filed).. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - West Answer, # 3 Exhibit C - Lexis Answer, # 4 Exhibit D - West Response RFA, # 5 Exhibit E - Lexis Response RFA, # 6 Exhibit F - Copyright Reg. Certificate, # 7 Exhibit G - Copyright Reg. Certificate)(Blue, Gregory)
October 5, 2012 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Notice of Motion Previously Filed). Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C.. Responses due by 10/23/2012(Blue, Gregory)
October 5, 2012 52 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C.. (Blue, Gregory)
October 5, 2012 51 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Rich, Robert)
October 5, 2012 50 DECLARATION of Tom Leighton in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Rich, Robert)
October 5, 2012 49 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of John R. Gerba in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Rich, Robert) Modified on 10/12/2012 (db).
October 5, 2012 48 DECLARATION of David Blackburn in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rich, Robert)
October 5, 2012 47 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Rich, Robert)
September 28, 2012 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. Responses due by 10/23/2012 Return Date set for 11/9/2012 at 04:30 PM.(Marks, Benjamin)
September 28, 2012 45 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc..(Hough, James)
September 28, 2012 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cindy Paige Abramson on behalf of Reed Elsevier Inc. (Abramson, Cindy)
September 28, 2012 43 NOTICE of MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C.. (Bragar, Raymond)
September 14, 2012 42 Featured Case ORDER: Judge Rakoff has determined that this case is not appropriate for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Cases in the Southern District of New York, and, accordingly, the parties should instead proceed in accordance with Judge Rakoff's individual rules and orders. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/14/2012) (ja)
September 14, 2012 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 42 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ja)
August 14, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 8/14/2012. (Kotowski, Linda)
July 27, 2012 41 NOTICE of of Name Change. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C.. (Bragar, Raymond)
July 13, 2012 40 ANSWER to 37 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc..(Hough, James)
July 10, 2012 39 ANSWER to 37 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation.(Marks, Benjamin)
July 5, 2012 38 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/3/2012) (djc)
June 26, 2012 37 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Reed Elsevier Inc., West Publishing Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Kenneth Elan, Edward L. White, P.C., Edward L. White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(djc)
May 30, 2012 36 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc..(Hough, James)
May 30, 2012 35 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation.(Marks, Benjamin)
May 22, 2012 34 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 5/16/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 22, 2012 33 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 5/16/2012 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/15/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 17, 2012 32 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 Motion to Dismiss. For reasons stated today in open court, see transcript, 5/16/12, the Court grants defendants' motion to dismiss the claims of Kenneth Elan and the purported subclass of plaintiffs who have not registered any copyrights and denies plaintiffs' request for leave to amend their Class Action Complaint. The Court directs the parties to proceed in accordance with the Civil Case Management Plan dated April 12, 2012. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/16/2012) (ft)
May 17, 2012 31 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF MDL ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL DEEMING MOTION MOOT AND VACATING THE APRIL 17, 2012, HEARING SESSION...Before the Panel is a motion by plaintiff David J. Heinlein, Inc., seeking centralization, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407, of the actions on the attached schedule in the District of Connecticut for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Movant now seeks to withdraw his Section 1407 motion. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the motion for transfer under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 is DEEMED WITHDRAWN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Hearing Session Order and the attached Schedule filed on APRIL 17, 2012, are VACATED insofar as they relate to this matter. (Signed by MDL Panel on 5/17/2012) (sjo)
May 7, 2012 30 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Hough, James)
May 7, 2012 29 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Marks, Benjamin)
April 26, 2012 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss., 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C., Kenneth Elan, Edward L. White. (Blue, Gregory)
April 24, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 04/19/2012, Receipt Number 1035966. (jd)
April 23, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 26 Motion for Paul Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/20/2012) (jfe)
April 19, 2012 26 MOTION for Paul Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.(arc)
April 18, 2012 25 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action and Class Action Complaint with Individual Rules of Practice, Hon. Jed S. Rakoff, Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instruction, M10-468 Standing Order dated 10-31-2011 served on West Publishing Corporation on February 29, 2012. Service was accepted by Donna Christie, at the office of the NYS Secretary of State, Corporate Division of the DOS. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C., Kenneth Elan, Edward L. White. (Bragar, Raymond)
April 18, 2012 24 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons in a Civil Action and Class Action Complaint with Individual Rules of Practice, Hon. Jed S. Rakoff, Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instruction, M10-468 Standing Order dated 10-31-2011 and Order, dated 02/24/2012, for Particularized Statement from Counsel for Elsevier, Inc. served on Reed Elsevier Inc. on February 29, 2012. Service was accepted by Office of the NYS Secretary of State to Chad Matice, Corporate Division of DOS. Document filed by Edward L. White, P.C., Kenneth Elan, Edward L. White. (Bragar, Raymond)
April 16, 2012 23 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN:Plaintiffs have demanded a jury trial in this matter. Amended Pleadings due by 4/27/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 4/27/2012. Motions due by 9/14/2012. Responses due by 10/2/2012. Replies due by 10/12/2012. Deposition due by 8/31/2012. Discovery due by 8/31/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2012 at 04:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 10/26/2012. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/12/2012) (lmb)
April 11, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/11/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2012 at 04:30 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (rjm)
April 6, 2012 22 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation. (Marks, Benjamin)
April 6, 2012 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation.(Marks, Benjamin)
April 6, 2012 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. (Hough, James)
April 6, 2012 19 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.. Responses due by 4/27/2012(Hough, James)
April 6, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 03/28/2012, Receipt Number 1033761. (jd)
April 2, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 15 Motion for James F. McCabe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby Ordered that James F. McCabe is admitted Pro Hac Vice for all purposes as counsel for defendant Reed Elsevier Inc. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/30/2012) (mro)
March 28, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER: that having analyzed the relationship between Reed Elsevier and Matthew Bender, the Court determines that the relationship does not require recusal. The parties are directed to appear in court on Thursday, April 5, 2012 at 11:00 A.M. for an initial scheduling conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. ( Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/28/2012) (pl)
March 28, 2012 16 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: that the Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, U.S.D.J. has ordered that counsel for all parties attend a conference, at the time and place fixed below, for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this notice and enclosures, and to furnish Chambers with a copy of any transmittal letter(s). DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 04-05-2012, AT THE UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK, N.Y. IN COURTROOM 14-B AT 11:00. ( Status Conference set for 4/5/2012 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/28/2012) (pl)
March 28, 2012 15 MOTION for James F. McCabe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc.(pgu)
March 23, 2012 14 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that the time within which Defendant Reed Elsevier Inc. may move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including April 20, 2012. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/20/2012) (js)
March 20, 2012 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Brian Whitney on behalf of Reed Elsevier Inc. (Whitney, Craig)
March 20, 2012 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Reed Elsevier NV, Corporate Parent Reed Elsevier PLC, Corporate Parent Reed Elsevier U.S. Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Reed Elsevier Group plc, Other Affiliate Reed Elsevier Inc., Other Affiliate Reed Elsevier Overseas B.V., Other Affiliate Reed Technology and Information Services Inc., Other Affiliate Reed Holdings BV, Other Affiliate Reed Elsevier (Holdings) Ltd. for Reed Elsevier Inc.. Document filed by Reed Elsevier Inc..(Hough, James)
March 20, 2012 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Edward Hough on behalf of Reed Elsevier Inc. (Hough, James)
March 15, 2012 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Ryan Gerba on behalf of West Publishing Corporation (Gerba, John)
March 15, 2012 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Bloom on behalf of West Publishing Corporation (Bloom, Jonathan)
March 15, 2012 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Ely Marks on behalf of West Publishing Corporation (Marks, Benjamin)
March 15, 2012 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Thomson Reuters Corporation, Corporate Parent Thomson Reuters (Legal) Inc. for West Publishing Corporation. Document filed by West Publishing Corporation.(Rich, Robert)
March 15, 2012 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Bruce Rich on behalf of West Publishing Corporation (Rich, Robert)
March 12, 2012 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. All Defendants. Service was accepted by NYS Secretary of State. Document filed by Edward L. White, Edward L. White, P.C., Kenneth Elan. (Bragar, Raymond)
March 12, 2012 4 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Raymond A. Bragar on behalf of All Plaintiffs. New Address: Bragar Wexler Eagel & Squire, P.C., 885 Third Avenue, Suite 3040, New York, New York, 10022, (212) 308-5858. (Bragar, Raymond)
February 24, 2012 3 Featured Case ORDER: This case was filed on February 22, 2012 and randomly assigned to the undersigned. The undersigned periodically receives modest royalties from Matthew Bender & Co. for his co-authorship of Sand et al., Modern Federal Jury Instructions. As soon as counsel for defendant Reed Elsevier Inc. enters an appearance, that counsel is directed to file with the Court a particularized statement of Reed Elsevier Inc.'s relationship with Matthew Bender & Co. so that the Court can promptly determine whether recusal is required. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/24/2012) (pl)
February 22, 2012 2 Featured Case STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (mro)
February 22, 2012 Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the filing of this action. (mro)
February 22, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (mro)
February 22, 2012 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (mro)
February 22, 2012 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Reed Elsevier Inc., West Publishing Corporation. (mro) Modified on 2/23/2012 (mro).
February 22, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Reed Elsevier Inc., West Publishing Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1030502)Document filed by Edward L. White, Edward L. White, P.C., Kenneth Elan.(mro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/23/2012: # 1 Ex. A Part 1, # 2 Ex. A Part 2, # 3 Ex. A Part 3, # 4 Ex. A Part 4) (ama).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: White et al v. West Publishing Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Publishing Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan Bloom
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Represented By: Benjamin Ely Marks
Represented By: Robert Bruce Rich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Elsevier Inc.
Represented By: James Edward Hough
Represented By: Craig Brian Whitney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward L. White
Represented By: Raymond A. Bragar
Represented By: Gregory A. Blue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward L. White, P.C.
Represented By: Raymond A. Bragar
Represented By: Gregory A. Blue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Elan
Represented By: Gregory A. Blue
Represented By: Raymond A. Bragar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]