United States of America v. Moody's Corp
Plaintiff: |
United States of America, ex rel. and Ilya Eric Kolchinsky |
Defendant: |
Moody's Corporation, Moody's Investors Service, Inc. and John Does #1-100 |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv01399 |
Filed: |
February 24, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William H. Pauley |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
31 U.S.C. § 3729 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 13, 2018 |
Filing
108
OPINION & ORDER re: 100 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. filed by Moody's Corporation, Moody's Investors Service, Inc: For the foregoing reasons, Moody's motion to dismiss the Third Amended Complaint is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 100. This case remains closed. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/13/2018) (jwh)
|
September 1, 2017 |
Filing
93
OPINION & OPINION re: 84 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's March 2, 2017 Order and Opinion and March 3, 2017 Judgment. filed by Ilya Eric Kolchinsky: Relator Ilya Kolchinsky moves pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Proce dure Rule 59(e) and Local Rule 6.3 for reconsideration of this Court's Opinion and Order, dated March 2, 2017, granting Moody's motion to dismiss this whistleblower action. For the foregoing reasons, Kolchinsky's motion for reconsider ation pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 59(e) is granted in part and denied in part. Kolchinsky may file any amended pleading no later than October 6, 2017. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion pending at ECF No. 84. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 9/1/2017) (jwh) Modified on 9/1/2017 (jwh).
|
March 2, 2017 |
Filing
79
OPINION & ORDER re: 63 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, filed by Moody's Corporation, Moody's Investors Service, Inc.; 76 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Conference Request for Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Stephen A. Weiss dated January 18, 2017, filed by Ilya Eric Kolchinsky. For the foregoing reasons, Moody's motion to dismiss is granted, and this action is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at ECF Nos. 63 and 76 and mark this case as closed. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/2/2017) (cla)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?