Kendall v. Cuomo et al
Plaintiff: Cyrill N. Kendall
Defendant: Andrew M. Cuomo, Brian Fischer, William J. Connolly, A. Maume, A. Pelc, K. Klein, John Doe # 1 and John Doe # 2
Case Number: 1:2012cv03438
Filed: April 30, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Ronald L. Ellis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 OPINION AND ORDER. The Court grants Defendants' motion for summary judgment. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/19/17) (yv)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 OPINION re: 70 MOTION that the Court issue an order of perjury filed by Cyrill N. Kendall. For the reasons set forth above, Kendall's Motion for an Order of Perjury is DENIED. This resolves Docket Number 70. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 2/6/2014) (cd)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AND OPINION: With the exception of Claim 11, Defendant's motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint is denied so that a factual record may be developed. The motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 43) is DENIED for Claims 1-10 and G RANTED for Claim 11. Because no facts have been established to date, Kendall's motion for summary judgment (included with his affirmation in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss) (Dkt. No. 53) is also DENIED without prejudice to renew once discovery has been completed. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/27/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
September 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER AND OPINION: "Having obtained a default, a plaintiff must next seek a judgment by default under Rule 55(b)." Green, 420 F.3d at 104. In this district, the party seeking default judgment must attach to their motion the clerk's cer tificate of default and a proposed default judgment form. S.D.N.Y. Local Rule 55.2(b). Notably, Kendall has not sought, nor been issued, a certificate of default from the Clerk of the Court. Therefore, he did not meet the first step for obtaining an entry of default judgment and his motion must be denied. See Dunkin' Donuts Franchised Rests. LLC v. Got-A-Lot-A Dough,Inc., 2008 WL 4861968, *4 (E.D.N.Y. Oct. 31, 2008) (denying, without prejudice, The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C.  7; 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438 (1962). (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/26/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (js) Modified on 9/26/2013 (js).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendall v. Cuomo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyrill N. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Cuomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Maume
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Pelc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe # 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe # 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?