Smith v. BarnesandNoble.com LLC
Plaintiff: Louis K. Smith
Defendant: BarnesandNoble.com LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv04374
Filed: June 5, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Gabriel W. Gorenstein
Presiding Judge: Andrew L. Carter
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 OPINION AND ORDER re: 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Cheryl Smith, 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by BarnesandNoble.com LLC. Defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment for the Defendant and close this case. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 11/2/2015) (kgo)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth above, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 27) is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's claim for unfair competition infringement and DENIED without prejudice as to Plaintiff's claim for di rect copyright infringement and contributory copyright infringement. The Court declines Plaintiff's invitation to "sua sponte" grant him summary judgment on his direct and contributory copyright infringement claims. re: 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BarnesandNoble.com LLC. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 9/22/2014) (rjm)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 23 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Louis K. Smith.For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 23) is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/18/2014) (ama)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. BarnesandNoble.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis K. Smith
Represented By: Carlos A. Leyva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BarnesandNoble.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?