S.M. v. Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: S.M.
Defendant: Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Oxford Health Plans, LLC, United Healthcare Services, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2012cv04679
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G. Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 OPINION AND ORDER re: 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United Health Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Services, Inc., Oxford Health Plans, LLC, Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment < i>and to Sever Claim for Fraudulent Concealment filed by S.M. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's motion to sever is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, Docs. 66, 67, and to close this case. It is SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/23/2015) (ama)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: granting 45 Motion to Compel. For the above reasons, the plaintiff's motion (Docket no. 45) is granted, and Oxford shall produce the plaintiff's Individual Authorization Reports for Rituxan in 2011, 2012, and 2013, and for Gamunex in 2012 and 2013. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 4/01/2014) (ama)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by S.M. For the reasons stated above, S.M.'s state law causes of action fall within the scope of Section 502(a)(1)(B) of ERISA, and are therefore completely preempted by ERISA. Accordingly, this action was properly removed to federal court, and S.M.'s motion to remand this action to state court (Dkt. No. 17) is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion (Dkt. No. 17). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/21/2013) (mro)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.M. v. Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.M.
Represented By: Gabriel Adam Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc.
Represented By: Jesse M. Coleman
Represented By: John F. Kapacinskas
Represented By: Stefania Tani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxford Health Plans, LLC
Represented By: Jesse M. Coleman
Represented By: John F. Kapacinskas
Represented By: Stefania Tani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jesse M. Coleman
Represented By: John F. Kapacinskas
Represented By: Stefania Tani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Jesse M. Coleman
Represented By: John F. Kapacinskas
Represented By: Stefania Tani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?