Wise et al v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Keith Wise and Steve Sexton
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David M. Spillane, David A. Ebersman, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Barclays Capital Inc., Allen & Company LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv04777
Filed: June 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2014. Expert Discovery due by 11/20/2015. Fact Discovery due by 5/8/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2016. Responses due by 3/11/2016. Replies due by 4/22/2016. Deadline for the Lead Plaintiffs to file their class certification motion due by 11/14/2014. Response due by 2/18/2015. Reply due by 3/27/2015. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/15/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
July 24, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Courtney Keats on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Keats, Michael)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER... regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (rjm)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME. WHEREAS, Plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions filed the Consolidated Class Action Complaint (the "Complaint") on February 28, 2013. WHEREAS, pursuant to the agreed upon scheduling order entered by the Court on February 5, 2014, the deadline for Defendants to answer the Complaint is April 25, 2014. WHEREAS, Defendants have requested an extension of time to answer the Complaint and Plaintiffs have consented to Defendants' request: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the undersigned parties that the time for all Defendants to answer the Complaint is extended to May 8, 2014. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (rjm)
January 31, 2014 Filing 67 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (58 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 123 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 72 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 67 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 159 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 74 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 61 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 99 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 180 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 173 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 68 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 71 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 97 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 66 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, James Chang, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Rick Pond, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P., William H. Anhood. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
January 13, 2014 Filing 66 STIPULATION: that the time for all Defendants to answer Plaintiffs' consolidated class action complaint shall be deferred until such time that the parties can meet and confer in good faith to determine a reasonable schedule. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/9/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
January 10, 2014 Filing 65 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (58 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 123 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 72 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 67 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 159 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 74 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 61 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 99 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 180 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 173 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 68 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 71 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 97 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 66 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c and certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Anna M. Ewing, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Robert Greifeld, Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
January 10, 2014 Filing 64 MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION & ORDER re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed by The Williams Capital Group LP, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Uma M. Swaminathan, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Piper Jaffray & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Robert Herpst, Cowen and Company, LLC, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Barclays Capital, Inc., Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., James W. Breyer, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Jose Galvan, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., David A. Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Company LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Facebook Inc., Lebenthal & Co LLC, Linh Luu, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Harvey Lapin, Edward Shierry, Facebook, Inc., Rick Pond, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Erskine B. Bowles, William Blair & Company LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, E* Trade Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Piper Jaffray & Co, E*Trade Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Jill D. Simon, David E. (sic) Ebersman, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lawrence Corneck, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Allen & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, King & Associates, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Peter Thiel, Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Cowen and Company LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Marc L. Andreesen, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, Peter A. Thiel, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Nick E. Tran, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kevin Hicks, Goldman Sachs & CO., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Castleoak Securities LP, William Blair & Company L.L.C., CastleOak Securities L.P, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch. Based on the conclusions determined above, Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied. The parties will meet and confer upon the schedule for further proceedings which will be the subject of a pretrial conference at 10 a.m. February 4, 2014, or at such other time as determined by counsel and the Court. It is so ordered. (Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/11/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION & ORDER re: (46 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 126 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., (117 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. Based upon the conclusions set forth above, (1) Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied in part and granted in part; (2) Plaintiffs' request to lift the PSLRA discovery stay is rendered moot; and (3) Plaintiff's motion to amend is granted in part and denied in part. The parties will meet and confer upon the schedule for further proceedings which will be the subject of a pretrial conference at 10 a.m. February 3, 2014, or at such other time as determined by counsel and the Court. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/11/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
December 12, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
October 3, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 10/3/2013 on Motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, Motion for an order partially lifting the PSLRA discovery stay, and Motion to amend the Complaint, re: (95 in 1:12-md- 02389-RWS) Amended Complaint, filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, Steve Jarvis, First New York Securities L.L.C., Colin Suzman, Meredith Bailey, Atish Gandhi, T3 Trading Group, LLC, Phillip Goldberg, Faisal Sami, (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed by The Williams Capital Group LP, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Uma M. Swaminathan, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Piper Jaffray & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Robert Herpst, Cowen and Company, LLC, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Barclays Capital, Inc., Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., James W. Breyer, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Jose Galvan, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., David A. Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Company LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Facebook Inc., Lebenthal & Co LLC, Linh Luu, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Harvey Lapin, Edward Shierry, Facebook, Inc., Rick Pond, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Erskine B. Bowles, William Blair & Company LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, E* Trade Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Piper Jaffray & Co, E*Trade Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Jill D. Simon, David E. (sic) Ebersman, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lawrence Corneck, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Allen & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, King & Associates, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Peter Thiel, Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Cowen and Company LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Marc L. Andreesen, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, Peter A. Thiel, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Nick E. Tran, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kevin Hicks, Goldman Sachs & CO., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Castleoak Securities LP, William Blair & Company L.L.C., CastleOak Securities L.P, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, (71 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Amended Complaint, filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Jose Galvan, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Mary Galvan, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, (46 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv- 04054-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 126 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv- 04403-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv- 04716-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Anna M. Ewing, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, (117 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by First New York Securities L.L.C., Avatar Securities, LLC, T3 Trading Group, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 61 OPINION & ORDER re: (39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS) MOTION to Sever filed by Lawrence Corneck, Eugene Stricker. Based upon the conclusions set forth above, the Exchange Act Plaintiffs' motion to sever is denied. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: Amending scheduling order (Dkt. No. 96 and Dkt. No. 97)as follows: Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS). MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (108 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 16 in 1:13-cv-02830-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaint., (85 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware. Motion Hearing(FOR #'S 85,89, AND 108) set for 9/26/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Partially Lifting the PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, dated June 25, 2013 (Dkt. No. 117), will be heard at l0am on Thursday, September 19, 2013, in Courtroom 18C. NASDAQ's motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, dated July 2, 2013 (Dkt. No. 126), will be heard at l0am on Thursday, September 19, 2013, in Courtroom 18C. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/5/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
July 18, 2013 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Andrew B. Clubok in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Anna M. Ewing, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Robert Greifeld, Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, Institutional Investor Group, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
July 18, 2013 Filing 58 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Anna M. Ewing, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Robert Greifeld, Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Avatar Securities, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
June 14, 2013 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Thomas A. Dubbs in Opposition re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Jose Galvan, Mary Galvan, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Dubbs, Thomas)
June 14, 2013 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Jose Galvan, Mary Galvan, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Dubbs, Thomas)
May 16, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 5/1/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 16, 2013 Filing 54 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 5/1/2013 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 13, 2013 Filing 53 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (75 in 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 35 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 31 in 1:12-cv-07813-RWS, 25 in 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 18 in 1:12-cv-08040-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 69 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 8 in 1:13-cv-01999-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-07812-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 29 in 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 22 in 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 36 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Eugene Stricker, Lawrence Corneck. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
May 3, 2013 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rouhandeh, James)
May 3, 2013 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Singer, Steven)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: Defendant Facebook, Inc., the individual Facebook defendants, and the underwriter defendants' (collectively, the "Defendants") motion to dismiss the consolidated class action, dated April 30, 2013, will be heard at noon on Wednesday, September 18, 2013 in courtroom 18C. All papers shall be served in accordance with the parties' scheduling stipulations re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. filed by The Williams Capital Group LP, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Uma M. Swaminathan, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Piper Jaffray & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Robert Herpst, Cowen and Company, LLC, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Barclays Capital, Inc., Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., James W. Breyer, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Jose Galvan, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., David A. Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Company LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Facebook Inc., Lebenthal & Co LLC, Linh Luu, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Harvey Lapin, Edward Shierry, Facebook, Inc., Rick Pond, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Erskine B. Bowles, William Blair & Company LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, E* Trade Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Piper Jaffray & Co, E*Trade Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Jill D. Simon, David E. (sic) Ebersman, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lawrence Corneck, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Allen & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, King & Associates, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Peter Thiel, Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Cowen and Company LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Marc L. Andreesen, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, Peter A. Thiel, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Nick E. Tran, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kevin Hicks, Goldman Sachs & CO., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Castleoak Securities LP, William Blair & Company L.L.C., CastleOak Securities L.P, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. ( Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
May 1, 2013 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (CORRECTED). Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Avatar Securities, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Avatar Securities, LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Brian Gralnick, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, T3 Trading Group, LLC, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Rick Pond, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, First New York Securities, L.L.C., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 30, 2013 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Andrew B. Clubok in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, John Gregory, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), First New York Securities L.L.C., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Jose and Mary Galvan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 30, 2013 Filing 47 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., A. Marcus Gerber, Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Kevin Hyms, J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Sylvia Gregorcyzk, Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Rick Pond, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, T3 Trading Group, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, John Gregory, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Dennis Palkon, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Karen Cuker, Vernon R. DeMois, Jr., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew) Modified on 5/1/2013 (ldi).
April 30, 2013 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Rick Pond, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Jose Galvan, Robert Herpst, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Edward Shierry, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Responses due by 6/14/2013Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 25, 2013 Filing 45 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 4/24/2013 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court extend the page limit for the memorandum in support of joint motion to dismiss to fifty-five pages. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
April 16, 2013 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (75 in 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 35 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 31 in 1:12-cv-07813-RWS, 25 in 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 18 in 1:12-cv-08040-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 69 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 8 in 1:13-cv-01999-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-07812-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 29 in 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 22 in 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 36 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Lawrence Corneck, Eugene Stricker. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
April 16, 2013 Filing 43 MOTION to Sever. Document filed by Lawrence Corneck, Eugene Stricker. Return Date set for 5/22/2013 at 12:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
February 28, 2013 Filing 42 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Mary Galvan, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Jose Galvan, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.***Certificate of Service Attached hereto. (Received in the night deposit box on 2/28/2013 at 8:07 p.m. and was received for docketing on 3/5/2013.) ***Original document filed in 12md2389, document #71.(mro)
February 26, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas James McKenna on behalf of Elbita Alfonso. New Address: Gainey McKenna & Egleson, 440 Park Avenue South, 5th Floor, New York, NY, 10016, 212-983-1300. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(McKenna, Thomas)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: that in consideration of the parties' scheduling stipulations (Docket Nos. 61 and 62) and the pending motions in the instant case, the pre-trial conference scheduled for January 23, 2013 is cancelled. The parties are requested to advise the Court of any pre-trial issues. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(pl)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, the parties to the Consolidated Securities Action hereby stipulate and agree, subject to the Court's approval, that the schedule for filing the consolidated complaint and any motion to dismiss in the Consolidated Securities Action shall be as follows: 1. Lead Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated complaint on or before February 28, 2013; 2. Defendants shall file any motion to dismiss on or before April 30, 2013; 3. Lead Plaintiffs shall file their papers in opposition to any motion to dismiss on or before June 14, 2013; and 4. Defendants shall file their reply papers on or before July 16, 2013. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2013. Motions due by 4/30/2013. Responses due by 6/14/2013. Replies due by 7/16/2013). (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (djc)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION & ORDER: Based upon the conclusions set forth above the Securities Actions and the NASDAQ Actions are each separately consolidated. The Institutional Investor Group is appointed lead plaintiff of the Securities Actions and its choice of co lead counsel is approved. The NASDAQ Claimant Group is appointed the lead plaintiff of the NASDAQ Actions and its choice of lead counsel is approved. The NASDAQ Negligence Parties will act as co lead plaintiff of the NASDAQ Actions and its choice of co-lead counsel is approved on a interim basis. The motions of the Eiffel Tower Group and Exchange Act Plaintiffs are denied. The parties will meet and confer with respect to a schedule for filing of consolidated complaints and attendant motions and any other preliminary issues which will be addressed in a pre trial conference at 2PM on January 23, 2013 or such other date and time agreed upon by counsel and the Court. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/6/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
December 6, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2013 at 02:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: various Plaintiffs' motions to remand will be heard on Wednesday, December 12, 2012, at 10 A.M. Courtroom 18C. The briefing schedule is outlined in Section VII, (B) (ii) of the Practice & Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 dated October 10, 2012. In addition, as set forth in the pre trial conference held at noon on Wednesday, November 7, 2012, a hearing will be held to resolve outstanding issues pertaining to the derivatives actions on Wednesday, December 12, 2012, at 10 A.M. in Courtroom 18C. The briefing schedule is outlined in Section VII, (B) (ii) of the Practice & Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sect. 1407 dated October 10, 2012. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(mt)
November 19, 2012 Filing 36 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/7/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 19, 2012 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/7/2012 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/13/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 19, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Remand Hearing set for 12/12/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Status Conference set for 12/12/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(mt)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: As set forth in the pre-trial conference held at noon on Wednesday, November 7, 2012, a hearing will be held to resolve outstanding issues pertaining to the appointment of plaintiffs' lead counsel in the Securities Act actions and the NASDAQ actions on noon on Wednesday, November 14, 2012 in Courtroom 18C. As set forth in the pre-trial conference held at noon on Wednesday, November 7, 2012, a hearing will be held to resolve outstanding issues pertaining to the derivatives actions, including motions to remand1 and will be heard on Wednesday, December 12, 2012, in Courtroom 18C. The briefing schedule is outlined in Section VII, (B) (ii) of the Practice & Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 dated October 10, 2012., ( Status Conference set for 11/14/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/7/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(lmb)
November 7, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Elisabeth Engel on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreesen, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Mark E. Zuckerberg, Facebook Inc., Mark Zukerburg (sic), David Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Marc L Andreessen, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Peter Thiel, James W. Bryer Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Engel, Susan)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: As per the Practice and Procedure Order filed on October 10, 2012 and in consideration of the parties' letters to the Court, a pre-trial conference to determine the briefing schedule and resolve the appointment of plaintiffs' lead counsel is set for 11/7/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
November 5, 2012 Filing 31 PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Document filed by Lawrence Corneck.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: All motions pending as of the date of this Order in any of the actions transferred to this Court by the MDL Panel or removed to this Court are hereby denied without prejudice. Any party may file or refile any motion once liaison and lead counsel are designated and approved. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(lmb)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PRACTICE & PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1407: This Order shall govern the practice and procedure in those actions transferred to this Court by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the "MDL Panel) pursuant to its Order of October 4, 2012, as well as all related actions originally filed in this Court or transferred or removed to this Court. Motions due by 11/14/2012. Responses due by 11/28/2012. Replies due by 12/5/2012. Status Conference set for 12/12/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. All other matters, including various pretrial issues, will be discussed at the initial conference which shall be scheduled once liaison and lead counsel are designated and approved. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ft)
October 4, 2012 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 4, 2012 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
August 20, 2012 Filing 28 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Appoint Rick Pond to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Rick Pond. (Landau, Kevin)
August 9, 2012 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re: 10 MOTION to Appoint Rick Pond to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Rouhandeh, James)
August 9, 2012 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Appoint Rick Pond to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Rick Pond. (Landau, Kevin)
August 9, 2012 Filing 25 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Rouhandeh, James)
August 9, 2012 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JP Morgan Chase & Co for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC.(Rouhandeh, James)
August 9, 2012 Filing 23 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. Document filed by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.(Rouhandeh, James)
August 9, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Ditchfield on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (Ditchfield, Andrew)
August 9, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles S. Duggan on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (Duggan, Charles)
August 9, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James P. Rouhandeh on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (Rouhandeh, James)
July 25, 2012 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert N Cappucci on behalf of Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC (Cappucci, Robert)
July 25, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew J Entwistle on behalf of Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC (Entwistle, Andrew)
July 25, 2012 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Abraham Cortez on behalf of Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC (Cortez, Jordan)
July 23, 2012 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Vincent R. Cappucci in Support re: 14 MOTION to Appoint First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC, Avatar Securities, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Notice of Motion and Motion of Institutional Investor Group For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Approval Of Lead Coun MOTION to Appoint First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC, Avatar Securities, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Notice of Motion and Motion of Institutional Investor Group For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Approval Of Lead Coun. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Cappucci, Vincent)
July 23, 2012 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION to Appoint First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC, Avatar Securities, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Notice of Motion and Motion of Institutional Investor Group For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Approval Of Lead Coun MOTION to Appoint First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC, Avatar Securities, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Notice of Motion and Motion of Institutional Investor Group For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Approval Of Lead Coun Memorandum Of Law In Support Of The Institutional Investor Group's Motion For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Approval Of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. (Cappucci, Vincent)
July 23, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC, Avatar Securities, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Notice of Motion and Motion of Institutional Investor Group For Appointment As Lead Plaintiff And Approval Of Lead Counsel. Document filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC.(Cappucci, Vincent)
July 23, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Roger Cappucci on behalf of First New York Securities, L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC, Avatar Securities, LLC (Cappucci, Vincent)
July 23, 2012 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Kevin Landau in Support re: 10 MOTION to Appoint Rick Pond to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Rick Pond. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Landau, Kevin)
July 23, 2012 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Appoint Rick Pond to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Rick Pond. (Landau, Kevin)
July 23, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Rick Pond to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Rick Pond. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit)(Landau, Kevin)
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint in the above-captioned action is extended through and including sixty (60) days after the later of(i) the appointment of lead plaintiff, approval 0 f lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel, and notification by such lead counsel that no consolidated amended complaint will be filed or (ii) the filing of a consolidated amended complaint, if any, in this action, which, if filed, shall be filed within sixty (60) days after entry of an Order appointing lead plaintiff and lead counsel, and as further set forth in this document. ENDORSEMENT: The request for relief contained in this Stipulation and Order Extending Time for Defendants to Respond To Complaint are So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 7/13/2012) (cd)
July 10, 2012 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Facebook, Inc..(Clubok, Andrew)
July 10, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Brian Clubok on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Clubok, Andrew)
July 10, 2012 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brant Warren Bishop on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Bishop, Brant)
July 3, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Robert W. Sweet. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
July 3, 2012 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-cv-04081-RWS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (pgu)
July 3, 2012 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (pgu)
June 28, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 06/20/2012, Receipt Number 1041523. (jd)
June 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 3 Motion for Troy Robin King to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/25/2012) (cd)
June 20, 2012 Filing 3 MOTION for Troy Robin King to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Steve Sexton, Keith Wise.(pgu)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (jfe)
June 19, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, Barclays Capital Inc., Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1041330)Document filed by Keith Wise, Steve Sexton.(jfe)
June 19, 2012 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, Barclays Capital Inc., Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Mark Zuckerberg. (jfe)
June 19, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (jfe)
June 19, 2012 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Robert W. Sweet as possibly related to 1:12-cv-04081. (jfe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wise et al v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Wise
Represented By: Troy Robin King
Represented By: Domenico George Minerva
Represented By: Christopher S. Polaszek
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Sexton
Represented By: Troy Robin King
Represented By: Domenico George Minerva
Represented By: Christopher S. Polaszek
Represented By: Peter George Safirstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreessen
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?