Alexander Interactive, Inc. v. Adorama, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Alexander Interactive, Inc., Alexander Schmelkin and Josh Levine |
Defendant: |
Adorama, Inc., Adorama Enterprises LLC, Eugene Mendlowits and Mendel Mendlowits |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv06608 |
Filed: |
August 29, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
P. Kevin Castel |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
17 U.S.C. § 101 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 2, 2014 |
Filing
208
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 198 Motion to Seal Document: For these reasons, Samsung's motion for a sealing order (Docket no. 198) is granted. If and when the documents Bates stamped SEA000001 to SEA0000008 are submitted in connection with the plaintiff's contemplated motion to compel, they shall be filed under seal. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 9/2/2014) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
|
August 14, 2014 |
Filing
202
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 173 Motion for Sanctions. The Court declines to modify or set aside any portion of the Memorandum and Order of June 26, 2014, and Ms. Savage's motion (Docket #.173) is DENIED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/14/2014) (lmb)
|
January 13, 2014 |
Filing
90
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 62 Motion to Amend/Correct: For the foregoing reasons, the defendants' motion to amend its counterclaims (Docket no. 62) is granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/13/2014) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
|
December 4, 2013 |
Filing
75
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Compel: For the foregoing reasons, the plaintiffs' motion to compel (Docket nos. 46 and 48) is granted in part a nd denied in part. The defendants are directed, as soon as practicable, to make available for review by a third party retained by the plaintiffs the Adorama source code, as well as the commit log for Adorama's.Net files. This review will take pl ace at Adorama's headquarters. In addition, the parties are directed to meet and confer, in person, within one week of the date of this order, to discuss the duration of the depositions of Mr. Braun and Mr. Roth. Magento is directed to produce t o the plaintiffs, within one week of the date of this order, performance reviews of Mr. Korotun to the extent that they relate to work performed under the Magento Agreement, and to identify the relevant version of the Zend Framework. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/4/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tn)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?