McKenzie et al v. Fishko et al
Plaintiff: |
Richard C. McKenzie, Jr. and Seven Bridges Foundation, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Robert Fishko, Cheryl Fishko and Forum Gallery, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv07297 |
Filed: |
September 28, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
XX Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
Laura Taylor Swain |
Nature of Suit: |
Fraud or Truth-In-Lending |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 13, 2015 |
Filing
136
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cheryl Fishko, Robert Fishko, Forum Gallery, Inc., 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion by Plaintiffs filed by Seven Bridges Foundation, Inc., Richard C. McKenzie, Jr. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted as to each of the claims asserted by Plaintiffs in this action. Defendants' motion is denied as to each of their counterclaims. Plaintiff s' cross-motion for summary judgment is denied in its entirety. The stay of this litigation is hereby lifted. This Memorandum Order resolves docket entry numbers 98 and 115. The parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Fox's Chamber s promptly to schedule a settlement conference with respect to the counterclaims. The final pretrial conference in this matter is hereby scheduled for Friday, May 8, 2015, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 12D. Unless the remaining claims are settled, the parties must confer and make submissions in advance of the conference in accordance with the pre-trial scheduling order. (Docket Entry No. 31.) SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/13/2015) (ajs)
|
March 6, 2014 |
Filing
131
ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for a stay pending the resolution of the Defendants' motion for summary judgment and Plaintiffs' cross motion for summary judgment is granted. This Order resolves docket entry number 103. Granting 103 Motion to Stay. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/6/2014) (rjm)
|
November 27, 2013 |
Filing
94
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 87 Motion for Extension of Time: For the foregoing reasons, the plaintiffs' motion, Docket Entry No. 87, is granted. On or before December 4, 2013, the plaintiffs shall re-file their opposition papers that have been stricken by the Court's November 14,2013 order (Docket Entry No. 85). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox on 11/27/2013) (tn)
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing
69
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying as moot 67 Motion to Strike [certain Exhibits from Docs. 49 and 65 and any references thereto]. Defendants' Objection to Judge Fox's July 9, 2013, Order is overruled and Plaintiffs motion to strike is denied as mo ot. This Memorandum Order resolves docket entry numbers 48 and 67. Defendants are ordered to produce the cost data for the 110 transactions, pursuant to Judge Fox's July 9, 2013, Order, to Plaintiffs by August 16, 2013. The parties are further directed to contact Judge Fox's Chambers promptly to establish a schedule for the completion of discovery. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/13/2013) (ft) Modified on 8/13/2013 (ft).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?