Chang et al v. Facebook Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: James Chang and Sameer Ansari
Defendant: Facebook Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated and Barclays Capital Inc
Case Number: 1:2012cv07542
Filed: October 11, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2014. Expert Discovery due by 11/20/2015. Fact Discovery due by 5/8/2015. Joinder of Parties due by 12/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 1/22/2016. Responses due by 3/11/2016. Replies due by 4/22/2016. Deadline for the Lead Plaintiffs to file their class certification motion due by 11/14/2014. Response due by 2/18/2015. Reply due by 3/27/2015. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/15/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
July 24, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Courtney Keats on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Keats, Michael)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER... regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/12/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (rjm)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME. WHEREAS, Plaintiffs in the above-captioned actions filed the Consolidated Class Action Complaint (the "Complaint") on February 28, 2013. WHEREAS, pursuant to the agreed upon scheduling order entered by the Court on February 5, 2014, the deadline for Defendants to answer the Complaint is April 25, 2014. WHEREAS, Defendants have requested an extension of time to answer the Complaint and Plaintiffs have consented to Defendants' request: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the undersigned parties that the time for all Defendants to answer the Complaint is extended to May 8, 2014. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/28/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al. (rjm)
January 31, 2014 Filing 75 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (58 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 123 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 72 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 67 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 159 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 74 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 61 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 99 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 180 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 173 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 68 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 71 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 97 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 66 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, James Chang, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Rick Pond, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P., William H. Anhood. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
January 13, 2014 Filing 74 STIPULATION: that the time for all Defendants to answer Plaintiffs' consolidated class action complaint shall be deferred until such time that the parties can meet and confer in good faith to determine a reasonable schedule. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/9/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
January 10, 2014 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (58 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 123 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 72 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 67 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 159 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 74 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 65 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 59 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 61 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 99 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 180 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 173 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 68 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 71 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 64 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 97 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 66 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 158 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS) MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and c and certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Anna M. Ewing, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Robert Greifeld, Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
January 10, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION to Amend/Correct (172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 172 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Memorandum & Opinion, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, and certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION & ORDER re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed by The Williams Capital Group LP, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Uma M. Swaminathan, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Piper Jaffray & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Robert Herpst, Cowen and Company, LLC, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Barclays Capital, Inc., Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., James W. Breyer, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Jose Galvan, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., David A. Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Company LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Facebook Inc., Lebenthal & Co LLC, Linh Luu, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Harvey Lapin, Edward Shierry, Facebook, Inc., Rick Pond, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Erskine B. Bowles, William Blair & Company LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, E* Trade Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Piper Jaffray & Co, E*Trade Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Jill D. Simon, David E. (sic) Ebersman, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lawrence Corneck, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Allen & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, King & Associates, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Peter Thiel, Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Cowen and Company LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Marc L. Andreesen, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, Peter A. Thiel, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Nick E. Tran, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kevin Hicks, Goldman Sachs & CO., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Castleoak Securities LP, William Blair & Company L.L.C., CastleOak Securities L.P, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch. Based on the conclusions determined above, Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied. The parties will meet and confer upon the schedule for further proceedings which will be the subject of a pretrial conference at 10 a.m. February 4, 2014, or at such other time as determined by counsel and the Court. It is so ordered. (Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/11/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPINION & ORDER re: (46 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 126 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Anna M. Ewing, NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., (117 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, First New York Securities L.L.C., T3 Trading Group, LLC. Based upon the conclusions set forth above, (1) Defendants' motion to dismiss is denied in part and granted in part; (2) Plaintiffs' request to lift the PSLRA discovery stay is rendered moot; and (3) Plaintiff's motion to amend is granted in part and denied in part. The parties will meet and confer upon the schedule for further proceedings which will be the subject of a pretrial conference at 10 a.m. February 3, 2014, or at such other time as determined by counsel and the Court. It is so ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/11/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
December 12, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
October 3, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Sweet: Oral Argument held on 10/3/2013 on Motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, Motion for an order partially lifting the PSLRA discovery stay, and Motion to amend the Complaint, re: (95 in 1:12-md- 02389-RWS) Amended Complaint, filed by Avatar Securities, LLC, Steve Jarvis, First New York Securities L.L.C., Colin Suzman, Meredith Bailey, Atish Gandhi, T3 Trading Group, LLC, Phillip Goldberg, Faisal Sami, (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint, filed by The Williams Capital Group LP, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Uma M. Swaminathan, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Piper Jaffray & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Robert Herpst, Cowen and Company, LLC, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Barclays Capital, Inc., Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., James W. Breyer, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Jose Galvan, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., David A. Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Company LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Facebook Inc., Lebenthal & Co LLC, Linh Luu, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Harvey Lapin, Edward Shierry, Facebook, Inc., Rick Pond, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Erskine B. Bowles, William Blair & Company LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, E* Trade Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Piper Jaffray & Co, E*Trade Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Jill D. Simon, David E. (sic) Ebersman, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lawrence Corneck, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Allen & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, King & Associates, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Peter Thiel, Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Cowen and Company LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Marc L. Andreesen, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, Peter A. Thiel, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Nick E. Tran, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kevin Hicks, Goldman Sachs & CO., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Castleoak Securities LP, William Blair & Company L.L.C., CastleOak Securities L.P, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, (71 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) Amended Complaint, filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Jose Galvan, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Mary Galvan, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, (46 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv- 04054-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 126 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv- 04403-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv- 04716-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by Anna M. Ewing, Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Nasdaq OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Robert Greifeld, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., The Nasdaq Stock Market LLC, (117 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION Lifting Discovery Stay - Lead Plaintiffs Notice of Motion And Motion For an Order Partially Lifting The PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, filed by First New York Securities L.L.C., Avatar Securities, LLC, T3 Trading Group, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ja)
August 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 OPINION & ORDER re: (39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS) MOTION to Sever filed by Lawrence Corneck, Eugene Stricker. Based upon the conclusions set forth above, the Exchange Act Plaintiffs' motion to sever is denied. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
August 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: Amending scheduling order (Dkt. No. 96 and Dkt. No. 97)as follows: Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS). MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (108 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 16 in 1:13-cv-02830-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Derivative Complaint., (85 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS) MOTION to Remand Matter to the Court of Chancery of the State of Delaware. Motion Hearing(FOR #'S 85,89, AND 108) set for 9/26/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Partially Lifting the PSLRA Discovery Stay and for Leave to Amend the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, dated June 25, 2013 (Dkt. No. 117), will be heard at l0am on Thursday, September 19, 2013, in Courtroom 18C. NASDAQ's motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint, dated July 2, 2013 (Dkt. No. 126), will be heard at l0am on Thursday, September 19, 2013, in Courtroom 18C. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 8/5/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
July 18, 2013 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Andrew B. Clubok in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Anna M. Ewing, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Robert Greifeld, Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, Institutional Investor Group, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
July 18, 2013 Filing 66 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Anna M. Ewing, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Robert Greifeld, Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Avatar Securities, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
June 14, 2013 Filing 65 DECLARATION of Thomas A. Dubbs in Opposition re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Jose Galvan, Mary Galvan, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Dubbs, Thomas)
June 14, 2013 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Jose Galvan, Mary Galvan, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Dubbs, Thomas)
May 16, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 5/1/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 16, 2013 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 5/1/2013 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
May 13, 2013 Filing 61 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (75 in 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 35 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 31 in 1:12-cv-07813-RWS, 25 in 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 18 in 1:12-cv-08040-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 69 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 8 in 1:13-cv-01999-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-07812-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 29 in 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 22 in 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 36 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Eugene Stricker, Lawrence Corneck. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
May 3, 2013 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rouhandeh, James)
May 3, 2013 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Singer, Steven)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Defendant Facebook, Inc., the individual Facebook defendants, and the underwriter defendants' (collectively, the "Defendants") motion to dismiss the consolidated class action, dated April 30, 2013, will be heard at noon on Wednesday, September 18, 2013 in courtroom 18C. All papers shall be served in accordance with the parties' scheduling stipulations re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. filed by The Williams Capital Group LP, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, David E. (sic) Ebersman, David M. Spillane, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Uma M. Swaminathan, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Reed Hastings, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Piper Jaffray & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Robert Herpst, Cowen and Company, LLC, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Barclays Capital, Inc., Marc L. Andreessen, Castleoak Securities, L.P., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Barclays Capital Inc., BMO Capital Markets Corp., James W. Breyer, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Jose Galvan, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., David A. Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Company LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, David Ebersman, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Goldman, Sachs & Co., Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Facebook Inc., Lebenthal & Co LLC, Linh Luu, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Harvey Lapin, Edward Shierry, Facebook, Inc., Rick Pond, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Erskine B. Bowles, William Blair & Company LLC, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, E* Trade Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, JP Morgan Securities LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Piper Jaffray & Co, E*Trade Securities LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Jill D. Simon, David E. (sic) Ebersman, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Lawrence Corneck, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Allen & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, King & Associates, Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Peter Thiel, Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Cowen and Company LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Cipora Herman, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Marc L. Andreesen, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, Peter A. Thiel, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Nick E. Tran, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Kevin Hicks, Goldman Sachs & CO., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Castleoak Securities LP, William Blair & Company L.L.C., CastleOak Securities L.P, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. ( Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 5/2/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
May 1, 2013 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. (CORRECTED). Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Avatar Securities, LLC, Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Avatar Securities, LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Brian Gralnick, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, T3 Trading Group, LLC, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Rick Pond, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, First New York Securities, L.L.C., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 30, 2013 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Andrew B. Clubok in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., North Carolina Department of State Treasurer, Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, John Gregory, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), First New York Securities L.L.C., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Jose and Mary Galvan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 30, 2013 Filing 55 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (54 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 79 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 49 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 56 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 134 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 55 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 141 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 48 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 104 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 89 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 41 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 81 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 155 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 140 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 57 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., A. Marcus Gerber, Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., NASDAQ OMX Group, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., Nasdaqomx Group, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Kevin Hyms, J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Sylvia Gregorcyzk, Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Rick Pond, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, T3 Trading Group, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, John Gregory, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Dennis Palkon, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P., Karen Cuker, Vernon R. DeMois, Jr., Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew) Modified on 5/1/2013 (ldi).
April 30, 2013 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreesen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Seibert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc.,, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., David M. Spillane, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, William Blair & Company, L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreessen, C.L. King & Associates, Inc, Credit Suisse Securities (USA), LLC, E Trade Securities, LLC., Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Barclays Capital Inc, CastleOak Securities L.P, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., JP Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Oppenheimer & Co. Inc, Piper Jaffrey & Co., Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Facebook Inc., Allen & Facebook (sic) LLC, CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Lawrence Corneck, Cowen and Facebook (sic) LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & CO., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Cipora Herman, Kevin Hicks, J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., King & Associates, Inc., Harvey Lapin, Linh Luu, M.R. Beal & Facebook (sic), Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch, Morgan Stanley & Co, Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Facebook (sic) Inc, Jill D. Simon, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Inc., Uma M. Swaminathan, The Nasdaq Stock Market L.L.C., Nick E. Tran, William Blair & Company L.L.C., William Blair & Facebook (sic) LLC, Marc L Andreessen, Goldman Sachs & Co, Allen & Company, L.L.C., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities L.L.C., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., RBC Capital Markets L.L.C., Wells Fargo Securities L.L.C., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Peter Thiel, Barclays Capital, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Allen & Company L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co., Morgan Stanley & Co.L.L.C., Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Oppenheimer & Co., Inc., Rick Pond, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Stifel Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Lazard Capital Markets, LLC, Oppenheimer & CO., Inc., Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co., Inc., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC, Cowen & Facebook (sic) LLC, Merrill Lynch, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc, Mark Zukerburg (sic), Jose Galvan, Robert Herpst, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Muriel Siebert & Co, Inc., Samuel A Ramirez & Company, Inc, David Ebersman, J.P. Morgan Securities Holdings LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Edward Shierry, Stifel, Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Williams Capital Group, L.P.. Responses due by 6/14/2013Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Clubok, Andrew)
April 25, 2013 Filing 53 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert W. Sweet from Andrew B. Clubok dated 4/24/2013 re: Defendants respectfully request that the Court extend the page limit for the memorandum in support of joint motion to dismiss to fifty-five pages. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 4/25/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
April 16, 2013 Filing 52 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (75 in 1:12-cv-07553-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07545-RWS, 35 in 1:12-cv-04716-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07546-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04252-RWS, 31 in 1:12-cv-07813-RWS, 25 in 1:12-cv-07811-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04150-RWS, 50 in 1:12-cv-07552-RWS, 40 in 1:12-cv-04600-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-04551-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07548-RWS, 78 in 1:12-cv-04648-RWS, 46 in 1:12-cv-04099-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04156-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04312-RWS, 18 in 1:12-cv-08040-RWS, 138 in 1:12-cv-07543-RWS, 152 in 1:12-cv-07586-RWS, 53 in 1:12-cv-07550-RWS, 73 in 1:12-cv-07549-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04184-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04131-RWS, 69 in 1:12-cv-04054-RWS, 77 in 1:12-md-02389-RWS, 37 in 1:12-cv-04763-RWS, 8 in 1:13-cv-01999-RWS, 131 in 1:12-cv-07587-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04332-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04291-RWS, 52 in 1:12-cv-04194-RWS, 39 in 1:12-cv-04215-RWS, 34 in 1:12-cv-07812-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04315-RWS, 38 in 1:12-cv-04362-RWS, 29 in 1:12-cv-07531-RWS, 22 in 1:12-cv-09308-RWS, 44 in 1:12-cv-04360-RWS, 47 in 1:12-cv-04201-RWS, 36 in 1:12-cv-04200-RWS, 42 in 1:12-cv-04403-RWS, 51 in 1:12-cv-07542-RWS, 43 in 1:12-cv-04777-RWS, 137 in 1:12-cv-07547-RWS, 92 in 1:12-cv-07815-RWS, 101 in 1:12-cv-04081-RWS, 45 in 1:12-cv-04157-RWS, 76 in 1:12-cv-07551-RWS, 54 in 1:12-cv-07544-RWS) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by Lawrence Corneck, Eugene Stricker. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
April 16, 2013 Filing 51 MOTION to Sever. Document filed by Lawrence Corneck, Eugene Stricker. Return Date set for 5/22/2013 at 12:00 PM.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
February 28, 2013 Filing 50 CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Allen & Company LLC, Marc L. Andreessen, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Robert Van LLC, James W. Breyer, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets, LLC, Castleoak Securities, L.P., CitiGroup Global Market, Inc., Cowen and Company, LLC, Credit Suisse Securites (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securites, Inc., E Trade Securities LLC, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, ITAU BBA USA Securities, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securiries LLC., Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co., LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co., Inc., Oppenheimer & CO. Inc., Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates, Inc., Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Sheryl K. Sandberg, David M. Spillane, Stifel Nicholas & Facebook (sic) Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group, L.P., Peter A. Thiel, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, William Blair & Company L.L.C., Mark Zuckerberg with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Mary Galvan, Fresno County Employees' Retirement Association, Jose Galvan, Banyan Capital Master Fund Ltd., Arkansas Teacher Retirement System, North Carolina Department of State Treasurer.***Certificate of Service Attached hereto. (Received in the night deposit box on 2/28/2013 at 8:07 p.m. and was received for docketing on 3/5/2013.) ***Original document filed in 12md2389, document #71.(mro)
February 26, 2013 Filing 49 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Thomas James McKenna on behalf of Elbita Alfonso. New Address: Gainey McKenna & Egleson, 440 Park Avenue South, 5th Floor, New York, NY, 10016, 212-983-1300. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(McKenna, Thomas)
January 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: that in consideration of the parties' scheduling stipulations (Docket Nos. 61 and 62) and the pending motions in the instant case, the pre-trial conference scheduled for January 23, 2013 is cancelled. The parties are requested to advise the Court of any pre-trial issues. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(pl)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING STIPULATION AND ORDER: WHEREAS, the Court's December 6,2012 Order provided that, prior to the January 23, 2013 pre-trial conference, the parties to the Consolidated Securities Action shall meet and confer with respect to a schedule for filing a consolidated complaint and any attendant motions (see Docket No. 52 at 52); and WHEREAS, the parties to the Consolidated Securities Action have met and conferred in accordance with the Court's December 6 Order; NOW, THEREFORE, the parties to the Consolidated Securities Action hereby stipulate and agree, subject to the Court's approval, that the schedule for filing the consolidated complaint and any motion to dismiss in the Consolidated Securities Action shall be as follows: 1. Lead,Plaintiffs shall file their consolidated complaint on or before February 28,2013; 2. Defendants shall file any motion to dismiss on or before April 30, 2013; 3. Lead Plaintiffs shall file their papers in opposition to any motion to dismiss onor before June 14,2013; and 4. Defendants shall file their reply papers on or before July 16, 2013. ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2013., Motions due by 4/20/2013., Responses due by 6/14/2013, Replies due by 7/16/2013.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 1/14/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(ago)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 OPINION & ORDER: Based upon the conclusions set forth above the Securities Actions and the NASDAQ Actions are each separately consolidated. The Institutional Investor Group is appointed lead plaintiff of the Securities Actions and its choice of co lead counsel is approved. The NASDAQ Claimant Group is appointed the lead plaintiff of the NASDAQ Actions and its choice of lead counsel is approved. The NASDAQ Negligence Parties will act as co lead plaintiff of the NASDAQ Actions and its choice of co-lead counsel is approved on a interim basis. The motions of the Eiffel Tower Group and Exchange Act Plaintiffs are denied. The parties will meet and confer with respect to a schedule for filing of consolidated complaints and attendant motions and any other preliminary issues which will be addressed in a pre trial conference at 2PM on January 23, 2013 or such other date and time agreed upon by counsel and the Court. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 12/6/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
December 6, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2013 at 02:00 PM before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: various Plaintiffs' motions to remand will be heard on Wednesday, December 12, 2012, at 10 A.M. Courtroom 18C. The briefing schedule is outlined in Section VII, (B) (ii) of the Practice & Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 dated October 10, 2012. In addition, as set forth in the pre trial conference held at noon on Wednesday, November 7, 2012, a hearing will be held to resolve outstanding issues pertaining to the derivatives actions on Wednesday, December 12, 2012, at 10 A.M. in Courtroom 18C. The briefing schedule is outlined in Section VII, (B) (ii) of the Practice & Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sect. 1407 dated October 10, 2012. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/19/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(mt)
November 19, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/7/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 19, 2012 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/7/2012 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/13/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Rodriguez, Somari)
November 19, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Remand Hearing set for 12/12/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Status Conference set for 12/12/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(mt)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: As set forth in the pre-trial conference held at noon on Wednesday, November 7, 2012, a hearing will be held to resolve outstanding issues pertaining to the appointment of plaintiffs' lead counsel in the Securities Act actions and the NASDAQ actions on noon on Wednesday, November 14, 2012 in Courtroom 18C. As set forth in the pre-trial conference held at noon on Wednesday, November 7, 2012, a hearing will be held to resolve outstanding issues pertaining to the derivatives actions, including motions to remand1 and will be heard on Wednesday, December 12, 2012, in Courtroom 18C. The briefing schedule is outlined in Section VII, (B) (ii) of the Practice & Procedure Order Upon Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 dated October 10, 2012., ( Status Conference set for 11/14/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet.) (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/7/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(lmb)
November 7, 2012 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Elisabeth Engel on behalf of Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Mark Zuckerberg, Marc L. Andreesen, Sheryl K. Sandberg, Peter A. Thiel, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Facebook, Inc., Mark E. Zuckerberg, Facebook Inc., Mark Zukerburg (sic), David Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Marc L Andreessen, David E. (sic) Ebersman, Peter Thiel, James W. Bryer Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Engel, Susan)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: As per the Practice and Procedure Order filed on October 10, 2012 and in consideration of the parties' letters to the Court, a pre-trial conference to determine the briefing schedule and resolve the appointment of plaintiffs' lead counsel is set for 11/7/2012 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Robert W. Sweet. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 11/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(cd)
November 5, 2012 Filing 39 PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Document filed by Lawrence Corneck.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(Feffer, Joel)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: All motions pending as of the date of this Order in any of the actions transferred to this Court by the MDL Panel or removed to this Court are hereby denied without prejudice. Any party may file or refile any motion once liaison and lead counsel are designated and approved. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 10/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:12-md-02389-RWS et al.(lmb)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2012) (sjo)
October 11, 2012 Filing 36 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:12-cv-02680. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 11, 2012 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 11, 2012 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 11, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 11, 2012 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 11, 2012 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IN RE: FACEBOOK, INC., IPO SECURITIES AND DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. MDL No. 2389. Signed by John G. Heyburn, II; Chairman of the Panel on 10/4/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
October 9, 2012 The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re 35 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RELATED CASE ORDER. Southward v. Zuckerberg, C 12-4144, is related to Spatz v. Facebook, C 12-2662. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Filing 33 NOTICE by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Hearing in United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
August 7, 2012 Filing 32 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING Initial Case Management Conference from 8/24/2012 to 10/26/2012 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW DITCHFIELD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHARLES S. DUGGAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Andrew Ditchfield) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6982927.) filed by Barclays Capital Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Charles S. Duggan) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6982891.) filed by Barclays Capital Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Chi v Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3498 MEJ; and (2) Levy v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3642 PJH. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goldman Sachs & Co identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Goldman, Sachs & Co. L.L.C. for Goldman Sachs & Co. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 25 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Goldman Sachs & Co. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES P. ROUHANDEH PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James P. Rouhandeh ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6961730.) filed by Barclays Capital Inc, Goldman Sachs & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barclays Capital Inc identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 21 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Barclays Capital Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 19 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 17 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 15 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Ahrendtsen, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3212 CRB;(2) Hicks, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3353 RS; (3) Hubuschman v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3366 LHK; (4) Cole v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3367 PJH; and (5) Nelson v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3418 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY BRANT W. BISHOP PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
July 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW B. CLUBOK PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related: Spatz, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC, Offner v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2666 MMC, Chang, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2680, Gregory v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2815 MMC, Lapin v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3195 SBA, DeMois. Jr. v. Facebook, Inc. et al., C 12-3196 LHK, Pilgram v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3197 EMC, Alfonso v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3198 YGR, Lazar v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3199 JSW, Shierry v. Facebook, Inc., et al. C 12-3200 RS, Cuker, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3201 CW, Lieber v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3202 EMC, Stokes v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3203 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brant Bishop ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6913990.) filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew Clubok ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6913974.) filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 6/14/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 13, 2012 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 13, 2012 Filing 6 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Facebook Inc.. (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 13, 2012 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 13, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Francis Basile and Elizabeth L. Deeley (Basile, James) (Filed on 6/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 12, 2012 Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Hon. Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
June 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER. Spatz v. Facebook, C 12-2662, is related to Offner v. Facebook, C 12-2666, Chang v. Facebook, C 12-2680, and Gregory v. Facebook, C 12-2815. Counsel are instructed that all future filings in the reassigned cases are to bear the initials MMC immediately after the case number. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 8, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
May 24, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]
May 24, 2012 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; summons issued against Marc L Andreessen, Barclays Capital Inc, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611074463). Filed by James Chang, Sameer Ansari. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/11/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chang et al v. Facebook Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chang
Represented By: Peter E. Borkon
Represented By: Reed R. Kathrein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sameer Ansari
Represented By: Peter E. Borkon
Represented By: Reed R. Kathrein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L Andreessen
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?