Cuker et al v. Facebook Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Karen Cuker and Brian Gralnick
Defendant: Facebook Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Barclays Capital Inc, Allen & Company LLC, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., RBC Capital Markets LLC, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Cowen and Company LLC, E*Trade Securities LLC, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP and William Blair & Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2012cv07545
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1441 - Petition for Removal: SEC Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
October 12, 2012 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Filing 119 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:12-cv-03201. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 9, 2012 The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re 118 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IN RE: FACEBOOK, INC., IPO SECURITIES AND DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. MDL No. 2389. Signed by John H. Heyburn, II; Chairman of the Panel on 10/4/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS; DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 23, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 RELATED CASE ORDER. Southward v. Zuckerberg, C 12-4144, is related to Spatz v. Facebook, C 12-2662. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 13, 2012 Filing 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karen Cuker, Brian Gralnick re 113 Case Management Scheduling Order, (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 8/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Filing 114 NOTICE by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Hearing in United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/8/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER VACATING AUGUST 10, 2012 HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO REMAND AND DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 7, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW DITCHFIELD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHARLES S. DUGGAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 109 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Andrew Ditchfield) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6983613.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 108 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Charles S. Duggan) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6982970.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, William Blair & Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Chi v Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3498 MEJ; and (2) Levy v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3642 PJH. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 106 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karen Cuker, Brian Gralnick re 105 Declaration in Support, 104 Reply to Opposition/Response (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 105 Declaration of Mark R. Rosen in Support of 104 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byKaren Cuker, Brian Gralnick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 104 ) (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 104 REPLY (re 27 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo ) filed byKaren Cuker, Brian Gralnick. (Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 103 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg re 102 Declaration in Support,, 101 Reply to Opposition/Response, (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 102 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 101 Reply to Opposition/Response, Declaration of James F. Basile In Support Of Defendants Reply Memorandum In Support Of Motion For Stay Of Proceedings Pending Decision On Transfer By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation filed byMarc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 101 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 101 REPLY (re 28 MOTION to Stay re 23 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byMarc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES P. ROUHANDEH PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 16, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY RICHARD D. BERNSTEIN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 13, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 98 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James P. Rouhandeh ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6961744.) filed by Allen & Company LLC, BMO Capital Markets Corp., Barclays Capital Inc, Blaylock Robert Van LLC, C.L. King & Associates Inc, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Castleoak Securities LP, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cowen and Company LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., ETrade Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co, Itau BBA USA Securities Inc, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Lazard Capital Markets LLC, Lebenthal & Co LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, M.R. Beal & Company, Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Muriel Siebert & Co Inc, Oppenheimer & Co Inc, Pacific Crest Securities LLC, Piper Jaffray & Co, RBC Capital Markets LLC, Raymond James & Associates Inc, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, The Williams Capital Group LP, Wells Fargo Securities LLC, William Blair & Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 97 Certificate of Interested Entities by William Blair & Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent WBC Holdings, L.P. for William Blair & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 96 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by William Blair & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 95 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Williams Capital Group LP identifying Corporate Parent The Williams Capital Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Finopco Holdings Co., Other Affiliate David Finkelstein, Other Affiliate Christopher J. Williams, Other Affiliate Bruce Usher, Other Affiliate David Coard, Other Affiliate Jonathan Levin, Other Affiliate DiAnne Calabrisotto for The Williams Capital Group LP. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 94 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by The Williams Capital Group LP. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 93 Certificate of Interested Entities by Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp. for Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 92 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 91 Certificate of Interested Entities by Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc identifying Corporate Parent SAR Holdings, Inc. for Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 90 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by Raymond James & Associates Inc identifying Corporate Parent Raymond James Financial, Inc. for Raymond James & Associates Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 88 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Raymond James & Associates Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 87 Certificate of Interested Entities by Piper Jaffray & Co identifying Corporate Parent Piper Jaffray Companies for Piper Jaffray & Co. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 86 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Piper Jaffray & Co. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 85 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacific Crest Securities LLC (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 84 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Pacific Crest Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by Oppenheimer & Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent Oppenheimer Holdings Inc. for Oppenheimer & Co Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 82 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Oppenheimer & Co Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 81 Certificate of Interested Entities by Muriel Siebert & Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent Siebert Financial Corp. for Muriel Siebert & Co Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 80 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Muriel Siebert & Co Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 79 Certificate of Interested Entities by Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Macquarie Group Limited for Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 78 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 77 Certificate of Interested Entities by M.R. Beal & Company identifying Corporate Parent MRB Securities Corporation, Other Affiliate Bernard Beal for M.R. Beal & Company. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 76 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by M.R. Beal & Company. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 75 Certificate of Interested Entities by Loop Capital Markets LLC (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 74 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Loop Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 73 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lebenthal & Co LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alexandra & James LLC for Lebenthal & Co LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 72 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Lebenthal & Co LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 71 Certificate of Interested Entities by Lazard Capital Markets LLC identifying Corporate Parent LFCM Holdings LLC for Lazard Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 70 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Lazard Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 69 Certificate of Interested Entities by Itau BBA USA Securities Inc identifying Corporate Parent Itau USA Inc., Corporate Parent Itau Unibanco Holding S.A., Corporate Parent Itau Corretora de Valores, S.A. for Itau BBA USA Securities Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 68 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Itau BBA USA Securities Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 67 Certificate of Interested Entities by ETrade Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent E*Trade Financial Corporation for. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 66 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by ETrade Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 65 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cowen and Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cowen Group, Inc. for Cowen and Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 64 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Cowen and Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 63 Certificate of Interested Entities by Castleoak Securities LP identifying Corporate Parent CastleOak Management, LLC, Corporate Parent CastleOak Management Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P. for Castleoak Securities LP. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 62 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Castleoak Securities LP. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 61 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cabrera Capital Markets LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cabrera Capital Inc., Corporate Parent RCF-Cabrera Holdings, Inc. for Cabrera Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 60 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Cabrera Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 59 Certificate of Interested Entities by C.L. King & Associates Inc identifying Other Affiliate Candace King Weir, Other Affiliate Amelia Weir, Other Affiliate Katherine Weir for C.L. King & Associates Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 58 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by C.L. King & Associates Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 57 Certificate of Interested Entities by BMO Capital Markets Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 56 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by BMO Capital Markets Corp.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 55 Certificate of Interested Entities by Blaylock Robert Van LLC identifying Corporate Parent Blaylock & Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Robert Van Securities, Inc. for Blaylock Robert Van LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 54 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Blaylock Robert Van LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 53 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent Everen Capital Corporation for Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 52 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Wells Fargo Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 51 Certificate of Interested Entities by RBC Capital Markets LLC identifying Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 50 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by RBC Capital Markets LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 49 Certificate of Interested Entities by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. identifying Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Taunus Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank A.G. for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 48 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Holdings (USA), Inc., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse (USA), Inc. for Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 46 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 45 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citigroup Global Markets Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CitiGroup, Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Global Market Holdings Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 44 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 43 Certificate of Interested Entities by Allen & Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Allen Operations LLC, Corporate Parent Allen Holding Inc. for Allen & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 42 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Allen & Company LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 41 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barclays Capital Inc identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 40 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Barclays Capital Inc. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 38 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karen Cuker, Brian Gralnick re 36 Declaration in Support, 35 Opposition/Response to Motion, (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 36 Declaration of Samuel M. Ward in Support of 35 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byKaren Cuker, Brian Gralnick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 35 ) (Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 35 RESPONSE (re 28 MOTION to Stay re 23 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed byKaren Cuker, Brian Gralnick. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rosen, Mark) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg re 33 Declaration in Support,, 32 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Certificate of Service of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo; Declaration of James F. Basile In Support; [Proposed] Order (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 33 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 32 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed byMarc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 32 ) (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 32 RESPONSE (re 27 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo ) Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo; [Proposed] Order filed byMarc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Ahrendtsen, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3212 CRB;(2) Hicks, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3353 RS; (3) Hubuschman v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3366 LHK; (4) Cole v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3367 PJH; and (5) Nelson v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3418 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Richard D. Bernstein ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6955068.) filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION REGARDING SCHEDULING. All briefing in response to the motion to remand or the motion to stay shall be filed no later than July 10, 2012, and all reply briefs in support of the motion to remand or the motion to stay shall be filed no later than July 18, 2012. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay re 23 MOTION to Stay Second Amended Notice of Motion For Stay of Proceedings Pending Decision on Transfer By the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/10/2012. Replies due by 7/18/2012. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 5, 2012 Filing 27 Amended MOTION to Remand All Actions to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Mateo filed by Karen Cuker. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Replies due by 7/26/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/5/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 3, 2012 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 25 Amended MOTION to Remand , 23 MOTION to Stay Stipulation Regarding Scheduling filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/3/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 25 Amended MOTION to Remand filed by Karen Cuker. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/16/2012. Replies due by 7/23/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ward, Samuel) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 2, 2012 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Lionel Z. Glancy (Glancy, Lionel) (Filed on 7/2/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR STAY OF PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON TRANSFER BY THE JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION; filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 7/13/2012. Replies due by 7/20/2012. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 29, 2012 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken no longer assigned to the case. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related: Spatz, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC, Offner v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2666 MMC, Chang, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2680, Gregory v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2815 MMC, Lapin v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3195 SBA, DeMois. Jr. v. Facebook, Inc. et al., C 12-3196 LHK, Pilgram v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3197 EMC, Alfonso v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3198 YGR, Lazar v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3199 JSW, Shierry v. Facebook, Inc., et al. C 12-3200 RS, Cuker, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3201 CW, Lieber v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3202 EMC, Stokes v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3203 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 26, 2012 Filing 9 Order granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 26, 2012 Filing 8 Order granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew Clubok ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6920106.) filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 25, 2012 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brant Bishop ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6920095.) filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 6/25/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karen Cuker, Brian Gralnick re 20 Notice of Appearance, 18 MOTION to Remand, 19 Certificate of Interested Entities (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Karen Cuker, Brian Gralnick (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) Modified on 6/27/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Karen Cuker, Brian Gralnick (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 22, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand filed by Karen Cuker, Brian Gralnick. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 7/6/2012. Replies due by 7/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 memorandum, # 2 Rosen declaration, # 3 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Goldman Sachs & Co, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC re 14 Certificate of Interested Entities, 15 Certificate of Interested Entities, 16 Certificate of Interested Entities, (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings Inc, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management LLC, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group Inc, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley for Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by Goldman Sachs & Co identifying Other Affiliate The Goldman Sachs Group Inc, Other Affiliate The Goldman Sachs & Co LLC for Goldman Sachs & Co. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC identifying Other Affiliate JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 13 Proposed Order re 11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings pending decision on transfer by the Judicial Panel on Panel Multidistrict Litigation by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 12 Declaration of James F. Basile in Support of 11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings pending decision on transfer by the Judicial Panel on Panel Multidistrict Litigation filed byMarc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Related document(s) 11 ) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings pending decision on transfer by the Judicial Panel on Panel Multidistrict Litigation filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 7/5/2012. Replies due by 7/12/2012. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 21, 2012 Filing 10 STIPULATION extending time for defendants to respond to complaint filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg, Karen Cuker, Brian Gralnick. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 5 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2012 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) (cp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Marc L Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) (cp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Facebook Inc. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) (cp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (no process) from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV 514238. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611075443). Filed byFacebook Inc., David M. Spillane, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Mark Zuckerberg, Reed Hastings, Erskine B. Bowles, David A. Ebersman, Peter A. Thiel, Marc L Andreessen. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2012: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cp, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuker et al v. Facebook Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Cuker
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Michael M. Goldberg
Represented By: Robert Vincent Prongay
Represented By: Mark Robert Rosen
Represented By: Casey Edwards Sadler
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Gralnick
Represented By: Stephen R. Basser
Represented By: Lionel Z. Glancy
Represented By: Mark Robert Rosen
Represented By: Samuel M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L Andreessen
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen & Company LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaylock Robert Van LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Capital Markets Corp.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.L. King & Associates Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cabrera Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castleoak Securities LP
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen and Company LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Securities LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Itau BBA USA Securities Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lazard Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lebenthal & Co LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loop Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R. Beal & Company
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macquarie Capital (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muriel Siebert & Co Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oppenheimer & Co Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Crest Securities LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Jaffray & Co
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond James & Associates Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel A. Ramirez & Company Inc
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Williams Capital Group LP
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blair & Company LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?