Ahrendtsen et al v. Facebook, Inc. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Ahrendtsen and Aaron M. Levine
Defendant: Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, David A. Ebersman, David M. Spillane, Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, Peter A. Thiel, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co., Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated and Barclays Capital, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv07550
Filed: October 12, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Robert W. Sweet
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Filing 38 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Northern; Case Number: 3:12-cv-03212. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:12-md-02389-RWS. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
October 12, 2012 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
October 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. IN RE: FACEBOOK, INC., IPO SECURITIES AND DERIVATIVE LITIGATION. MDL No. 2389. Signed by John H. Heyburn, II; Chairman of the Panel on 10/4/12. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
October 9, 2012 The United States District Court for the Southern District of New York shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re 37 Order (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RELATED CASE ORDER. Southward v. Zuckerberg, C 12-4144, is related to Spatz v. Facebook, C 12-2662. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 14, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Filing 35 NOTICE by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg Notice of Hearing in United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation and Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Basile, James) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 8/8/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ANDREW DITCHFIELD PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY CHARLES S. DUGGAN PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 26, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner Smith Incorporated on July 9, 2012, filed by Thomas J. Ahrendtsen, Aaron M. Levine. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC on July 2, 2012, filed by Thomas J. Ahrendtsen, Aaron M. Levine. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Barclays Capital, Inc on July 2, 2012, filed by Thomas J. Ahrendtsen, Aaron M. Levine. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on J.P. Morgan Securities LLC on July 2, 2012, filed by Thomas J. Ahrendtsen, Aaron M. Levine. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 26, 2012 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Defedant, Goldman Sachs & Co. by Thomas J. Ahrendtsen, Aaron M. Levine. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/26/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Charles S. Duggan) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6982720.) filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Filing 25 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Andrew Ditchfield) ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6982677.) filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Chi v Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3498 MEJ; and (2) Levy v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3642 PJH. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 19, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Goldman Sachs & Co. identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Corporate Parent The Goldman, Sachs & Co. L.L.C. for Goldman Sachs & Co.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Filing 22 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Goldman Sachs & Co.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES P. ROUHANDEH PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 18, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 17, 2012 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James P. Rouhandeh ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6961697.) filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barclays Capital, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 18 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Barclays Capital, Inc.. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 16 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 14 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley for Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Filing 12 Statement (Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement) by Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (B. W. Bishop) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (A. B. Clubok) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER. The following cases are related to Spatz, et al., v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-2662 MMC: (1) Ahrendtsen, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3212 CRB;(2) Hicks, et al. v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3353 RS; (3) Hubuschman v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3366 LHK; (4) Cole v. Zuckerberg, et al., C 12-3367 PJH; and (5) Nelson v. Facebook, Inc., et al., C 12-3418 YGR. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2012. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 6, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brant W. Bishop, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6947844.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 6, 2012 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew B. Clubok ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6947791.) filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Basile, James) (Filed on 7/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 6, 2012 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 6, 2012 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marc L. Andreessen, Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, David M. Spillane, Peter A. Thiel, Mark Zuckerberg (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 6, 2012 Filing 4 Statement Facebook, Inc.'s Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc.. (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
July 6, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James Francis Basile and Elizabeth L. Deeley (Basile, James) (Filed on 7/6/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2012 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]
June 20, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marc L. Andreessen, Barclays Capital, Inc., Erskine B. Bowles, James W. Breyer, David A. Ebersman, Facebook, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co., Donald E. Graham, Reed Hastings, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611075457.). SUMMONS ISSUED. Filed byThomas J. Ahrendtsen. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/12/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahrendtsen et al v. Facebook, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J. Ahrendtsen
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron M. Levine
Represented By: Christopher Adam Seeger
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Ebersman
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Spillane
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc L. Andreessen
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erskine B. Bowles
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Breyer
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Graham
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed Hastings
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Thiel
Represented By: James Francis Basile
Represented By: Brant Warren Bishop
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan Elisabeth Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co.
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Charles S. Duggan
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: James P. Rouhandeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?