Cortlandt Street Recovery Corp. et al v. Aliberti et al
Plaintiff: |
Cortlandt Street Recovery Corp. and Wilmington Trust Company |
Defendant: |
Giancarlo Aliberti, Hellas Telecommunications, S.a.r.L., Hellas Telecommunications Co-Invest Ltd., Hellas Telecommunications Employees Ltd., TCW HT-CO-Invest I L.P. and TCW HT Co-Invest II, L.P. |
Case Number: |
1:2012cv08686 |
Filed: |
November 29, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
P. Kevin Castel |
Nature of Suit: |
Negotiable Instrument |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 ni Diversity-Negotiable Instrument |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 4, 2016 |
Filing
176
OPINION AND ORDER re: 146 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended and Supplemental Complaint filed by Apax Europe VI-A, L.P., Apax Europe VI-1, L.P., Apax WW Nominees, Ltd., 153 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss filed by Hellas Telecommunications, S.a.r.L., 149 MOTION to Dismiss /Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended and Supplemental Complaint filed by Hellas Telecommunications Co-Invest Ltd., Hellas Telecommunications Employe es Ltd. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motions to dismiss this action are hereby GRANTED. WTC's letter motion to strike an argument from Defendants reply briefs is DENIED as moot.The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at docket numbers 146, 149, and 153, and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/04/2016) (ama)
|
December 9, 2014 |
Filing
88
OPINION AND ORDER re: 79 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 78 Clerk's Judgment, 77 Memorandum & Opinion, filed by Cortlandt Street Recovery Corp., Wilmington Trust Company: Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration of the Cour t's dismissal of this action and for leave to amend the Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 79 and to reopen the case. The remaining parties are hereby ORDERED to submit by December 15, 2014 a briefing schedule on the futility arguments listed by the Sponsor Defendants in their response to Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/9/2014) (tn)
|
March 11, 2014 |
Filing
77
OPINION AND ORDER re: 57 MOTION to Dismiss / Notice of Motion to Dismiss filed by Hellas Telecommunications, S.a.r.L., 46 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3), and under the doctri ne of abstention. MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3), and under the doctrine of abstention. filed by TCW HT-CO-Invest I L.P., TCW HT Co-Invest II, L.P., Hellas Telecommunications Co -Invest Ltd., Hellas Telecommunications Employees Ltd. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss this action is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions and close this case. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/11/2014) (lmb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?