February 21, 2020 |
Filing
553
ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF PETER LIVINGSTON, DEBORAH KOPLOVITZ AND ANDERSON KILL P.C. FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW (2194 in 1:08-Civ-10934-LAP) This case came before the Court on February 12, 2020 on motion of Peter Livingston, Deborah Koplovitz and Anderson Kill P.C. for leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Assa Corp. and Assa Co. Ltd. (ECF 2131). The Court having reviewed the motion, together with the Court file; having heard argument of counsel; and having considered the applicable law and rule , hereby orders as follows: 1. The motion of Peter Livingston, Deborah Koplovitz and Anderson Kill P.C. for leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Assa Corp. and Assa Co. Ltd. (ECF 2131) is granted, they are hereby relieved of any and all further duties and responsibilities for Assa Corp. and Assa Co. Ltd. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/21/2020) (va)
|
September 1, 2017 |
Filing
518
OPINION AND ORDER: Accordingly, the motions for stays are DENIED except to the limited extent set forth above, namely, to provide a six month period during which the charitable organizations with active operations at certain properties find alternati ve arrangements. For the reasons set forth above, the Governments motion (motion number 1) is GRANTED in part and Claimants motions (motions numbers 2-5) are DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions as indicated. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/1/2017) (js)
|
June 29, 2017 |
Filing
499
OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court finds that the Judgment Creditors have proven entitlement to attach and execute upon the Subject Properties under both § 201(a) of the Terrorism Risk Insurance Act and § 1610(b)(3) of the Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act. 81 The parties shall confer on an appropriate form of judgment and provide to the Court within one week. Upon entry of judgment, the Clerk of Court shall terminate all open motions in the above-listed actions. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/29/2017) (js)
|
February 28, 2017 |
Filing
345
OPINION & ORDER re: (1439 in 1:08-cv-10934-KBF) LETTER MOTION to Compel the Government to produce documents responsive to Claimants' document request addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Daniel S. Ruzumna dated January 13, 2017. filed by 650 Fifth Avenue Company, Alavi Foundation. Defendants are entitled to present their statute of limitations defense. However, for the reasons discussed above, defendants' motion to reopen discovery is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 1439. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/28/2017) (cla)
|
February 16, 2017 |
Filing
343
OPINION & ORDER re: (1433 in 1:08-cv-10934-KBF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment - Notice of the Alavi Foundation's and the 650 Fifth Avenue Company's Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by 650 Fifth Avenue Co mpany, Alavi Foundation; (1411 in 1:08-cv-10934-KBF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. For the reasons set forth above, both pending motions for partial summary judgment are DENIED. This matter sh all proceed to trial on the question of Alavi's knowledge of Assa's ownership and control by Iran, as scheduled. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 1411 and 1433. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 2/16/2017) (cla)
|
October 6, 2014 |
Filing
299
OPINION & ORDER. Accordingly, the Hegnas' motion to extend their expired judgment lien is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 1203. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 10/6/2014) (lmb)
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing
200
OPINION & ORDER: As set forth above, all of the assets at issue in this litigation, with the exception of the seven Alavi-only properties described supra, are subject to forfeiture. Issues relating to the seven Alavi-only properties and the innocent owner defense of the judgment creditors are severed for further proceedings. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 9/16/2013) (mro)
|
June 6, 2013 |
Filing
54
OPINION & ORDER re: (373 in 1:08-cv-10934-KBF, 108 in 1:09-cv-00166-KBF, 107 in 1:09-cv-00165-KBF) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against the Assa Defendants filed by Abraham Mandelson, Stuart E. Hersh, Elena Rozenman, Abraham Mendelson, Deborah Rubin, Renay Fryn, Tzvi Rosenman, Elana Rozenman, Tzvi Rozenman, Noam Rozenman, Daniel Miller, Jenny Rubin, Noan Rozenman, Renay Frym. For the reasons set forth above, the Rubin, Beer, Kirschenbaum, Greenbaum, and Acosta plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED. Specifically, the Court finds that the Assa Defednants' assets are "blocked assets" as defined in § 201 of TRIA and that the Assa Defendants' assets constitute "blocked assets" o f Bank Melli, an instrumentality of Iran. As such, the Assa Defendants' interests in the 650 Properties are subject to execution by judgment creditors in possession of valid terrorism-based judgments against Iran. However, the Court does not mak e any factual findings as to the validity or priority of the various judgment creditors' private judgments. Nor does it make any findings of fact as regards the Assa Defendants for the purposes of the Government's civil forfeiture action; t he Court takes no position as to how, if at all, the Government's standard of proof as regards the Assa Defendants differs from that of the private plaintiffs. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at ECF No. 373 in 08 Civ. 10934, ECF No. 107 in 09 Civ. 165, and ECF No. 108 in 09 Civ. 166. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/6/2013) (mro)
|