In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC
Appellant: South Ferry #2 LP, Roslyn Gettinger, Aaron Trust, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Samuel Goldstein, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Chesed Congregations of America, Abraham Wolfson, Abraham Adeff, Helen Elbaum, Al. Trust, Simcha Appelgrad, Benjamin Schenker, A.O.N. Trust, Abraham N. Trust, Sara Klein, Goldie Appelgrad, Bessie Kaufman, Ernest Wachtel, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Minnie Schenker, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Chaim Twersky, Moses Leiter, Wolfson Equities, Chana Wolfson, The Lanx Fund II, LP, Israel Grossman, R. Trust, Anthony Margadonna, Aaron Wolfson, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Mildred Shapiro, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, A. Trust, Irving Rosen, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Gerda Levinsohn, Abraham Trust, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, Sarah Spindell, Larry B. Alexander, Julia Margadonna, N. Zwi Leiter, ZW 1999 Trust, Morris Goldstein, Max Mandis, Clara Meth, Miriam Beren, Helen Younger, Nachema Singer, Jessica Lee Lowrey, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, South Ferry Building Company, Zelda Elbaum, Leon Shiffman, Max Weil, Lee Siegmund, Sol Klein, Zev Wolfson, Morris Milewski, David G. Aviv, Rose Wachtel, Turtle Cay Partners, Rachel Zeitlin, Rebecca Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Aaron Zeitlin, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, AA. Trust, Mary Peters, Freda Rosenberg, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, The Wolfson Trust, Razel Faskowitz, United Congregations Mesora, Zevi Harris, R.A. Trust, Alisa Trust, Ezriel Munk, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, Hyman Mandelbaum, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, James Lowrey, Rabbi Solomon B. Shapiro, Emanuel Gettinger, Kalman Halpern, Morris Nussbaum, A.N. Trust, Joseph Katz, Edara Partnership, Albert Kleinman, David Kaufman, Rachel Twersky and Leo Schechter
In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC
Intervenor: Securities Investor Protection Corporation
Appellee: Irving H. Picard
Case Number: 1:2013cv01300
Filed: February 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Griesa
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2013 Filing 43 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion dated September 6, 2013, the denial of the motion to intervene is affirmed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/10/13) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml)
September 6, 2013 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #42 Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (tro)
September 6, 2013 Mailed a copy of #42 Memorandum & Opinion to Christopher H. LaRosa Securities Investor Protection Corporation 805 15th Street, N.W., Suite 800 Washington, DC 20005. (ca)
September 6, 2013 Filing 42 OPINION: #103544 The denial of the motion to intervene is affirmed. This opinion resolves the appeals listed as case numbers 13 Civ. 1300 and 13 Civ. 2447. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/6/2013) (tro) Modified on 9/10/2013 (ca).
September 4, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Vanderwal, Amy)
September 4, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seanna R. Brown on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Brown, Seanna)
September 4, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jorian L. Rose on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Rose, Jorian)
September 4, 2013 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Christopher H. LaRosa to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/27/2013) (rsh)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #23 Motion for Laura Kristine Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/27/2013) (rsh)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #24 Motion for Martha Rodriguez Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/27/2013) (rsh)
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: In light of the expected transfer of this case to Judge Thomas Griesa, as this case is related to United Congregations Mesora et al. v. Securities Investor Protection Corporation et al., 13 civ. 1300(TPG), the Order setting the initial conference in this case is withdrawn. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/8/2013) (ft)
April 24, 2013 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Appellants' Reply Brief served on Irving Picard, Trustee and Securities Investor Protection Corporation on 4/23/2013. Service was made by Email. Document filed by A. Trust, A.N. Trust, A.O.N. Trust, AA. Trust, Aaron Trust, Abraham N. Trust, Abraham Trust, Abraham Adeff, Al. Trust, Larry B. Alexander, Alisa Trust, Goldie Appelgrad, Simcha Appelgrad, David G. Aviv, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Miriam Beren, Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC, Chesed Congregations of America, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Edara Partnership, Helen Elbaum, Zelda Elbaum, Razel Faskowitz, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Emanuel Gettinger, Roslyn Gettinger, Morris Goldstein, Samuel Goldstein, Israel Grossman, Kalman Halpern, Zevi Harris, Joseph Katz, Bessie Kaufman, David Kaufman, Sara Klein, Sol Klein, Albert Kleinman, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Moses Leiter, N. Zwi Leiter, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Gerda Levinsohn, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Hyman Mandelbaum, Max Mandis, Anthony Margadonna, Julia Margadonna, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, Clara Meth, Morris Milewski, Ezriel Munk, Morris Nussbaum, Mary Peters, R. Trust, R.A. Trust, Rebecca Trust, Irving Rosen, Freda Rosenberg, Leo Schechter, Benjamin Schenker, Minnie Schenker, Mildred Shapiro, Solomon B. Shapiro, Leon Shiffman, Lee Siegmund, Nachema Singer, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Sarah Spindell, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, The Lanx Fund II, LP, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, The Wolfson Trust, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Turtle Cay Partners, Chaim Twersky, Rachel Twersky, United Congregations Mesora, Ernest Wachtel, Rose Wachtel, Max Weil, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, Chana Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Wolfson Equities, Helen Younger, ZW 1999 Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Aaron Zeitlin, Rachel Zeitlin. (Clinton, Laura)
April 23, 2013 Filing 32 Appellant's REPLY BRIEF. Document filed by A. Trust, A.N. Trust, A.O.N. Trust, AA. Trust, Aaron Trust, Abraham N. Trust, Abraham Trust, Abraham Adeff, Al. Trust, Larry B. Alexander, Alisa Trust, Goldie Appelgrad, Simcha Appelgrad, David G. Aviv, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Miriam Beren, Chesed Congregations of America, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Edara Partnership, Helen Elbaum, Zelda Elbaum, Razel Faskowitz, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Emanuel Gettinger, Roslyn Gettinger, Morris Goldstein, Samuel Goldstein, Israel Grossman, Kalman Halpern, Zevi Harris, Joseph Katz, Bessie Kaufman, David Kaufman, Sara Klein, Sol Klein, Albert Kleinman, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Moses Leiter, N. Zwi Leiter, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Gerda Levinsohn, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Hyman Mandelbaum, Max Mandis, Anthony Margadonna, Julia Margadonna, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, Clara Meth, Morris Milewski, Ezriel Munk, Morris Nussbaum, Mary Peters, Irving H. Picard, R. Trust, R.A. Trust, Rebecca Trust, Irving Rosen, Freda Rosenberg, Leo Schechter, Benjamin Schenker, Minnie Schenker, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, Mildred Shapiro, Solomon B. Shapiro, Leon Shiffman, Lee Siegmund, Nachema Singer, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Sarah Spindell, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, The Lanx Fund II, LP, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, The Wolfson Trust, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Turtle Cay Partners, Chaim Twersky, Rachel Twersky, United Congregations Mesora, Ernest Wachtel, Rose Wachtel, Max Weil, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, Chana Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Wolfson Equities, Helen Younger, ZW 1999 Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Aaron Zeitlin, Rachel Zeitlin. (Clinton, Laura)
April 9, 2013 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Brief of the Securities Investor Protection Corporation, Appellee. Document filed by Securities Investor Protection Corporation. (Sheehan, David)
April 9, 2013 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Brief of Appellee Irving H. Picard, Trustee, in Support of Orders Denying Requests to Intervene. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David)
April 9, 2013 Filing 29 Appellee's BRIEF. Document filed by Irving H. Picard. Appellant Reply Brief due by 4/23/2013. (Sheehan, David)
April 9, 2013 Filing 28 Appellee's BRIEF. Document filed by Securities Investor Protection Corporation. Appellant Reply Brief due by 4/23/2013. (Bell, Kevin)
March 20, 2013 Filing 27 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Jorian L. Rose dated 3/19/2013 re: We are counsel to Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the substantively consolidated SIPA liquidation proceedings of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff, appellee in the above-referenced appeal. As discussed with Mr. Beale of your Chambers, we write to propose a revised briefing schedule in this appeal. Appellants filed their brief on March 12,2013 and the Trustee's brief is currently due on March 26, 2013. We propose that the Trustee's and the Securities Investor Protection Corporation's briefs be due on April 9, 2013, and that Appellants' reply brief, if any, be due on April 23, 2013. We have consulted with counsel for Appellants and they consent to this revised briefing schedule. ENDORSEMENT: Approved., ( Appellant Reply Brief due by 4/23/2013., Brief due by 4/9/2013.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/20/2013) (ago) Modified on 3/21/2013 (ago).
March 19, 2013 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Appellants' Opening Brief and Appellants' Supplemental Designation of Record on Appeal served on Irving Picard and Securities Investor Protection Corporation on 3/12/2013. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by A. Trust, A.N. Trust, A.O.N. Trust, AA. Trust, Aaron Trust, Abraham N. Trust, Abraham Trust, Abraham Adeff, Al. Trust, Larry B. Alexander, Alisa Trust, Goldie Appelgrad, Simcha Appelgrad, David G. Aviv, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Miriam Beren, Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC, Chesed Congregations of America, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Edara Partnership, Helen Elbaum, Zelda Elbaum, Razel Faskowitz, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Emanuel Gettinger, Roslyn Gettinger, Morris Goldstein, Samuel Goldstein, Israel Grossman, Kalman Halpern, Zevi Harris, Joseph Katz, Bessie Kaufman, David Kaufman, Sara Klein, Sol Klein, Albert Kleinman, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Moses Leiter, N. Zwi Leiter, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Gerda Levinsohn, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Hyman Mandelbaum, Max Mandis, Anthony Margadonna, Julia Margadonna, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, Clara Meth, Morris Milewski, Ezriel Munk, Morris Nussbaum, Mary Peters, R. Trust, R.A. Trust, Rebecca Trust, Irving Rosen, Freda Rosenberg, Leo Schechter, Benjamin Schenker, Minnie Schenker, Mildred Shapiro, Solomon B. Shapiro, Leon Shiffman, Lee Siegmund, Nachema Singer, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Sarah Spindell, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, The Lanx Fund II, LP, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, The Wolfson Trust, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Turtle Cay Partners, Chaim Twersky, Rachel Twersky, United Congregations Mesora, Ernest Wachtel, Rose Wachtel, Max Weil, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, Chana Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Wolfson Equities, Helen Younger, ZW 1999 Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Aaron Zeitlin, Rachel Zeitlin. (Clinton, Laura)
March 19, 2013 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin H. Bell on behalf of Securities Investor Protection Corporation (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Bell, Kevin)
March 18, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #24 MOTION for Martha Rodriguez Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #23 MOTION for Laura Kristine Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 18, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION for Martha Rodriguez Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A. Trust, A.N. Trust, A.O.N. Trust, AA. Trust, Aaron Trust, Abraham N. Trust, Abraham Trust, Abraham Adeff, Al. Trust, Larry B. Alexander, Alisa Trust, Goldie Appelgrad, Simcha Appelgrad, David G. Aviv, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Miriam Beren, Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC, Chesed Congregations of America, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Edara Partnership, Helen Elbaum, Zelda Elbaum, Razel Faskowitz, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Emanuel Gettinger, Roslyn Gettinger, Morris Goldstein, Samuel Goldstein, Israel Grossman, Kalman Halpern, Zevi Harris, Joseph Katz, Bessie Kaufman, David Kaufman, Sara Klein, Sol Klein, Albert Kleinman, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Moses Leiter, N. Zwi Leiter, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Gerda Levinsohn, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Hyman Mandelbaum, Max Mandis, Anthony Margadonna, Julia Margadonna, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, Clara Meth, Morris Milewski, Ezriel Munk, Morris Nussbaum, Mary Peters, R. Trust, R.A. Trust, Rebecca Trust, Irving Rosen, Freda Rosenberg, Leo Schechter, Benjamin Schenker, Minnie Schenker, Mildred Shapiro, Solomon B. Shapiro, Leon Shiffman, Lee Siegmund, Nachema Singer, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Sarah Spindell, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, The Lanx Fund II, LP, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, The Wolfson Trust, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Turtle Cay Partners, Chaim Twersky, Rachel Twersky, United Congregations Mesora, Ernest Wachtel, Rose Wachtel, Max Weil, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, Chana Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Wolfson Equities, Helen Younger, ZW 1999 Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Aaron Zeitlin, Rachel Zeitlin. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Rodriguez-Lopez, Martha)
March 18, 2013 Filing 23 MOTION for Laura Kristine Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A. Trust, A.N. Trust, A.O.N. Trust, AA. Trust, Aaron Trust, Abraham N. Trust, Abraham Trust, Abraham Adeff, Al. Trust, Larry B. Alexander, Alisa Trust, Goldie Appelgrad, Simcha Appelgrad, David G. Aviv, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Miriam Beren, Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC, Chesed Congregations of America, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Edara Partnership, Helen Elbaum, Zelda Elbaum, Razel Faskowitz, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Emanuel Gettinger, Roslyn Gettinger, Morris Goldstein, Samuel Goldstein, Israel Grossman, Kalman Halpern, Zevi Harris, Joseph Katz, Bessie Kaufman, David Kaufman, Sara Klein, Sol Klein, Albert Kleinman, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Moses Leiter, N. Zwi Leiter, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Gerda Levinsohn, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Hyman Mandelbaum, Max Mandis, Anthony Margadonna, Julia Margadonna, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, Clara Meth, Morris Milewski, Ezriel Munk, Morris Nussbaum, Mary Peters, R. Trust, R.A. Trust, Rebecca Trust, Irving Rosen, Freda Rosenberg, Leo Schechter, Benjamin Schenker, Minnie Schenker, Mildred Shapiro, Solomon B. Shapiro, Leon Shiffman, Lee Siegmund, Nachema Singer, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Sarah Spindell, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, The Lanx Fund II, LP, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, The Wolfson Trust, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Turtle Cay Partners, Chaim Twersky, Rachel Twersky, United Congregations Mesora, Ernest Wachtel, Rose Wachtel, Max Weil, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, Chana Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Wolfson Equities, Helen Younger, ZW 1999 Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Aaron Zeitlin, Rachel Zeitlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The James J. Lowrey Trust of November 29, 2007 for Turtle Cay Partners. Document filed by Turtle Cay Partners.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Tracy McDonald Lowrey Grantor Trust of June 30, 1989, Corporate Parent Jessica Lee Lowrey Grantor Trust of July 1, 1989, Corporate Parent Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Grantor Trust of June 30, 1989 for Coldbrook Associates Partnership. Document filed by Coldbrook Associates Partnership.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wolfson Descendants Intermediary Corporation, Corporate Parent ZW 1999 Intermediary for ZWD Investments, LLC. Document filed by ZWD Investments, LLC.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 19 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Elisheva Wolfson 1983 Intermediary Corporation, Corporate Parent Daniel Wolfson 1983 Intermediary Corporation, Corporate Parent Aaron Wolfson 1983 Intermediary Corporation, Corporate Parent Abraham Wolfson 1983 Intermediary Corporation, Corporate Parent Alisa Wolfson 1983 Intermediary Corporation, Corporate Parent Rebecca Wolfson 1983 Intermediary Corporation for Wolfson Equities. Document filed by Wolfson Equities.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wolfson Cousins, LP.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by United Congregations Mesora.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Zev Wolfson, Corporate Parent B.F. & W. Realty Company for South Ferry Building Company. Document filed by South Ferry Building Company.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wolfson Equities, Corporate Parent Wolfson Descendants Intermediary Corporation for South Ferry #2 LP. Document filed by South Ferry #2 LP.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wolfson Equities for The Lanx Fund II, LP. Document filed by The Lanx Fund II, LP.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Wolfson Cousins LP, Corporate Parent Lanx Fund II for Lanx BM Investments, LLC. Document filed by Lanx BM Investments, LLC.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AAA Trust, Corporate Parent BBB Trust, Corporate Parent CCC Trust, Corporate Parent DDD Trust, Corporate Parent EEE Trust, Corporate Parent FFF Trust for Edara Partnership. Document filed by Edara Partnership.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Chesed Congregations of America.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, Corporate Parent Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, Corporate Parent Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, Corporate Parent Alisa Wolfson Safier 1983 Trust, Corporate Parent Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, Corporate Parent Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust for B.F.&W. Realty Company. Document filed by B.F.&W. Realty Company.(Clinton, Laura)
March 15, 2013 Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment: for #9 MOTION for Christopher H. LaRosa to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8323999.(LaRosa, Christopher)
March 15, 2013 Filing 9 MOTION for Christopher H. LaRosa to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities Investor Protection Corporation.(LaRosa, Christopher)
March 12, 2013 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENTAL DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Appellants A. Trust, A.N. Trust, A.O.N. Trust, AA. Trust, Aaron Trust, Abraham N. Trust, Abraham Trust, Abraham Adeff, Al. Trust, Larry B. Alexander, Alisa Trust, Goldie Appelgrad, Simcha Appelgrad, David G. Aviv, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Miriam Beren, Chesed Congregations of America, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Edara Partnership, Helen Elbaum, Zelda Elbaum, Razel Faskowitz, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Emanuel Gettinger, Roslyn Gettinger, Morris Goldstein, Samuel Goldstein, Israel Grossman, Kalman Halpern, Zevi Harris, Joseph Katz, Bessie Kaufman, David Kaufman, Sara Klein, Sol Klein, Albert Kleinman, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Moses Leiter, N. Zwi Leiter, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Gerda Levinsohn, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Hyman Mandelbaum, Max Mandis, Anthony Margadonna, Julia Margadonna, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, Clara Meth, Morris Milewski, Ezriel Munk, Morris Nussbaum, Mary Peters, R. Trust, R.A. Trust, Rebecca Trust, Irving Rosen, Freda Rosenberg, Leo Schechter, Benjamin Schenker, Minnie Schenker, Mildred Shapiro, Solomon B. Shapiro, Leon Shiffman, Lee Siegmund, Nachema Singer, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Sarah Spindell, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, The Lanx Fund II, LP, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, The Wolfson Trust, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Turtle Cay Partners, Chaim Twersky, Rachel Twersky, United Congregations Mesora, Ernest Wachtel, Rose Wachtel, Max Weil, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, Chana Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Wolfson Equities, Helen Younger, ZW 1999 Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Aaron Zeitlin, Rachel Zeitlin, Debtor Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC, In Re Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC. (Clinton, Laura)
March 12, 2013 Filing 7 Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by A. Trust, A.N. Trust, A.O.N. Trust, AA. Trust, Aaron Trust, Abraham N. Trust, Abraham Trust, Abraham Adeff, Al. Trust, Larry B. Alexander, Alisa Trust, Goldie Appelgrad, Simcha Appelgrad, David G. Aviv, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Miriam Beren, Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC, Chesed Congregations of America, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Edara Partnership, Helen Elbaum, Zelda Elbaum, Razel Faskowitz, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Emanuel Gettinger, Roslyn Gettinger, Morris Goldstein, Samuel Goldstein, Israel Grossman, Kalman Halpern, Zevi Harris, Joseph Katz, Bessie Kaufman, David Kaufman, Sara Klein, Sol Klein, Albert Kleinman, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Moses Leiter, N. Zwi Leiter, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Gerda Levinsohn, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Hyman Mandelbaum, Max Mandis, Anthony Margadonna, Julia Margadonna, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, Clara Meth, Morris Milewski, Ezriel Munk, Morris Nussbaum, Mary Peters, R. Trust, R.A. Trust, Rebecca Trust, Irving Rosen, Freda Rosenberg, Leo Schechter, Benjamin Schenker, Minnie Schenker, Mildred Shapiro, Solomon B. Shapiro, Leon Shiffman, Lee Siegmund, Nachema Singer, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Sarah Spindell, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, The Lanx Fund II, LP, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, The Wolfson Trust, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Turtle Cay Partners, Chaim Twersky, Rachel Twersky, United Congregations Mesora, Ernest Wachtel, Rose Wachtel, Max Weil, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, Chana Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Wolfson Equities, Helen Younger, ZW 1999 Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Aaron Zeitlin, Rachel Zeitlin. Appellee Brief due by 3/26/2013. (Clinton, Laura)
March 12, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Martha Rodriguez Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #5 MOTION for Laura Kristine Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8310389. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Expired Certificate of Good Standing. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days. (bwa)
March 11, 2013 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Martha Rodriguez Lopez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A. Trust, A.N. Trust, A.O.N. Trust, AA. Trust, Aaron Trust, Abraham N. Trust, Abraham Trust, Abraham Adeff, Al. Trust, Larry B. Alexander, Alisa Trust, Goldie Appelgrad, Simcha Appelgrad, David G. Aviv, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Miriam Beren, Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC, Chesed Congregations of America, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Edara Partnership, Helen Elbaum, Zelda Elbaum, Razel Faskowitz, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Emanuel Gettinger, Roslyn Gettinger, Morris Goldstein, Samuel Goldstein, Israel Grossman, Kalman Halpern, Zevi Harris, Joseph Katz, Bessie Kaufman, David Kaufman, Sara Klein, Sol Klein, Albert Kleinman, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Moses Leiter, N. Zwi Leiter, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Gerda Levinsohn, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Hyman Mandelbaum, Max Mandis, Anthony Margadonna, Julia Margadonna, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, Clara Meth, Morris Milewski, Ezriel Munk, Morris Nussbaum, Mary Peters, R. Trust, R.A. Trust, Rebecca Trust, Irving Rosen, Freda Rosenberg, Leo Schechter, Benjamin Schenker, Minnie Schenker, Mildred Shapiro, Solomon B. Shapiro, Leon Shiffman, Lee Siegmund, Nachema Singer, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Sarah Spindell, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, The Lanx Fund II, LP, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, The Wolfson Trust, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Turtle Cay Partners, Chaim Twersky, Rachel Twersky, United Congregations Mesora, Ernest Wachtel, Rose Wachtel, Max Weil, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, Chana Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Wolfson Equities, Helen Younger, ZW 1999 Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Aaron Zeitlin, Rachel Zeitlin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez-Lopez, Martha) Modified on 3/12/2013 (bwa).
March 11, 2013 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Laura Kristine Clinton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8310389. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by A.N. Trust, A.O.N. Trust, AA. Trust, Aaron Trust, Abraham N. Trust, Abraham Trust, Abraham Adeff, Al. Trust, Larry B. Alexander, Alisa Trust, Goldie Appelgrad, Simcha Appelgrad, David G. Aviv, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Miriam Beren, Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC, Chesed Congregations of America, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Edara Partnership, Helen Elbaum, Zelda Elbaum, Razel Faskowitz, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Emanuel Gettinger, Roslyn Gettinger, Morris Goldstein, Samuel Goldstein, Israel Grossman, Kalman Halpern, Zevi Harris, Joseph Katz, Bessie Kaufman, David Kaufman, Sara Klein, Sol Klein, Albert Kleinman, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Moses Leiter, N. Zwi Leiter, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Gerda Levinsohn, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Hyman Mandelbaum, Max Mandis, Anthony Margadonna, Julia Margadonna, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, Clara Meth, Morris Milewski, Ezriel Munk, Morris Nussbaum, Mary Peters, R. Trust, R.A. Trust, Rebecca Trust, Irving Rosen, Freda Rosenberg, Leo Schechter, Benjamin Schenker, Minnie Schenker, Mildred Shapiro, Solomon B. Shapiro, Leon Shiffman, Lee Siegmund, Nachema Singer, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Sarah Spindell, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, The Lanx Fund II, LP, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, The Wolfson Trust, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Turtle Cay Partners, Chaim Twersky, Rachel Twersky, United Congregations Mesora, Ernest Wachtel, Rose Wachtel, Max Weil, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, Chana Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Wolfson Equities, Helen Younger, ZW 1999 Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Aaron Zeitlin, Rachel Zeitlin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Clinton, Laura) Modified on 3/12/2013 (bwa).
March 7, 2013 Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (pgu)
March 7, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu)
March 7, 2013 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 11-cv-5223 and declined by Judge Jed S. Rakoff and returned to wheel for assignment. (pgu)
March 1, 2013 Received intiating documents from the United States Bankruptcy Court - Southern District of New York as notification of filing of Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal (Case Number: 08-01789 (BRL).) with the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y. and the assignment of S.D.N.Y. Case Number: 13-cv-1300 (UA). (laq)
February 26, 2013 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
February 26, 2013 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY COURT TO Judge Jed S. Rakoff as possibly related to 11-cv-5223. (bkar)
February 26, 2013 Filing 3 COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee Irving H. Picard. (bkar)
February 26, 2013 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Appellants A. Trust, A.N. Trust, A.O.N. Trust, AA. Trust, Aaron Trust, Abraham N. Trust, Abraham Trust, Abraham Adeff, Al. Trust, Larry B. Alexander, Alisa Trust, Goldie Appelgrad, Simcha Appelgrad, David G. Aviv, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Miriam Beren, Chesed Congregations of America, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Edara Partnership, Helen Elbaum, Zelda Elbaum, Razel Faskowitz, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Emanuel Gettinger, Roslyn Gettinger, Morris Goldstein, Samuel Goldstein, Israel Grossman, Kalman Halpern, Zevi Harris, Joseph Katz, Bessie Kaufman, David Kaufman, Sara Klein, Sol Klein, Albert Kleinman, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Moses Leiter, N. Zwi Leiter, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Gerda Levinsohn, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Hyman Mandelbaum, Max Mandis, Anthony Margadonna, Julia Margadonna, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, Clara Meth, Morris Milewski, Ezriel Munk, Morris Nussbaum, Mary Peters, R. Trust, R.A. Trust, Rebecca Trust, Irving Rosen, Freda Rosenberg, Leo Schechter, Benjamin Schenker, Minnie Schenker, Mildred Shapiro, Solomon B. Shapiro, Leon Shiffman, Lee Siegmund, Nachema Singer, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Sarah Spindell, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, The Lanx Fund II, LP, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, The Wolfson Trust, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Turtle Cay Partners, Chaim Twersky, Rachel Twersky, United Congregations Mesora, Ernest Wachtel, Rose Wachtel, Max Weil, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson, Chana Wolfson, Zev Wolfson, Wolfson Cousins, LP, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Wolfson Equities, Helen Younger, ZW 1999 Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Aaron Zeitlin, Rachel Zeitlin. (bkar)
February 26, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Burton R. Lifland dated January 3, 2013. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 08-01789 (BRL). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by A.N. Trust, Joseph Katz, Aaron Trust, Sol Klein, South Ferry Building Company, Samuel Goldstein, Abraham N. Trust, Israel Grossman, Zevi Harris, Alisa Trust, Goldie Appelgrad, Abraham Wolfson, N. Zwi Leiter, Al. Trust, Bessie Kaufman, David G. Aviv, Miriam Beren, A. Trust, Hyman Mandelbaum, Helen Elbaum, Albert Kleinman, A.O.N. Trust, David Kaufman, AA. Trust, Abraham Trust, Moses Leiter, Kalman Halpern, Sara Klein, Razel Faskowitz, Morris Goldstein, Gerda Levinsohn, Abraham Adeff, Zev Wolfson, United Congregations Mesora, Roslyn Gettinger, Emanuel Gettinger, Zelda Elbaum, Simcha Appelgrad, B.F.&W. Realty Company, Chesed Congregations of America, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Max Weil, Julia Margadonna, Aaron Zeitlin, R. Trust, ZWD Investments, LLC, Rose Wachtel, Clara Meth, Ernest Wachtel, South Ferry #2 LP, Rachel Zeitlin, Chaim Twersky, Turtle Cay Partners, The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust, Sarah Spindell, Max Mandis, Helen Younger, Wolfson Equities, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, Larry B. Alexander, Leon Shiffman, Irving Rosen, Rebecca Trust, The Wolfson Trust, R.A. Trust, Nachema Singer, Freda Rosenberg, Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Morris Nussbaum, Mildred Shapiro, The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Lanx BM Investments, LLC, Leo Schechter, Rachel Twersky, Aaron Wolfson, The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust, Solomon B. Shapiro, The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust, The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust, James Lowrey, Chana Wolfson, The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust, ZW 1999 Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Minnie Schenker, Edara Partnership, Lee Siegmund, Benjamin Schenker, Anthony Margadonna, Morris Milewski, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, Ezriel Munk, The Lanx Fund II, LP, Mary Peters, Wolfson Cousins, LP. Appellant Brief due by 3/12/2013.(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: South Ferry #2 LP
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Roslyn Gettinger
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aaron Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wolfson Cousins, LP
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Samuel Goldstein
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chesed Congregations of America
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Abraham Wolfson
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Abraham Adeff
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Helen Elbaum
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Al. Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Simcha Appelgrad
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Benjamin Schenker
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: A.O.N. Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Abraham N. Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sara Klein
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Goldie Appelgrad
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bessie Kaufman
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ernest Wachtel
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wolfson Descendants 1983 Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Minnie Schenker
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Coldbrook Associates Partnership
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lanx BM Investments, LLC
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chaim Twersky
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Moses Leiter
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Wolfson Equities
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Chana Wolfson
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Lanx Fund II, LP
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Israel Grossman
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: R. Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Anthony Margadonna
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aaron Wolfson
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mildred Shapiro
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: A. Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Irving Rosen
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: B.F.&W. Realty Company
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gerda Levinsohn
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Abraham Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Aaron Wolfson 1983 Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sarah Spindell
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Larry B. Alexander
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Julia Margadonna
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: N. Zwi Leiter
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ZW 1999 Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Morris Goldstein
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Max Mandis
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Clara Meth
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Miriam Beren
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Helen Younger
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Nachema Singer
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jessica Lee Lowrey
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Alisa Wolfson Safier 1986 Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: South Ferry Building Company
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Zelda Elbaum
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Leon Shiffman
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Max Weil
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Lee Siegmund
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sol Klein
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Zev Wolfson
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Morris Milewski
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David G. Aviv
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rose Wachtel
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Turtle Cay Partners
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rachel Zeitlin
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rebecca Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: ZWD Investments, LLC
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Aaron Zeitlin
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Rebecca Wolfson Wolmark 1983 Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Elishiva Wolfson 1983 Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Nadine R. Wolfson 1991 Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: AA. Trust
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mary Peters
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Freda Rosenberg
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Marianne B. Lowrey Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Wolfson Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Razel Faskowitz
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United Congregations Mesora
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Zevi Harris
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: R.A. Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Alisa Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Ezriel Munk
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Daniel Wolfson 1983 Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Hyman Mandelbaum
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Abraham Wolfson 1983 Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: The Estate of Marianne Lowrey
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James Lowrey
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rabbi Solomon B. Shapiro
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Emanuel Gettinger
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kalman Halpern
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Morris Nussbaum
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: A.N. Trust
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Joseph Katz
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Edara Partnership
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Albert Kleinman
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: David Kaufman
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Rachel Twersky
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Leo Schechter
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Richard Allen Kirby
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, LLC
Represented By: Laura Kristine Clinton
Represented By: Martha Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Securities Investor Protection Corporation
Represented By: Christopher H. LaRosa
Represented By: Kevin H. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Irving H. Picard
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal
Represented By: Seanna R. Brown
Represented By: David J. Sheehan
Represented By: Jorian L. Rose
Represented By: Marc E. Hirschfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?