Lumen View Technology LLC v. Findthebest.com, Inc

Plaintiff: Lumen View Technology LLC
Defendant: Findthebest.com, Inc
Case Number: 1:2013cv03599
Filed: May 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Denise L. Cote
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 OPINION & ORDER. FTB's December 10, 2013 Motion for Declaration of Exceptional Case and Award of Fees and Nontaxable Expenses is granted. An Order will follow with a schedule for briefing with respect to the amount of fees and expenses to be awarded. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/30/2014) (gr)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION & ORDER. Claim 1 of the '073 patent claims an abstract idea, which is patent ineligible subject matter under Section 101 of the codified Patent Act. The dependent claims are invalid as well. Findthebest's September 24, 2013 motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment for the defendant and close the case. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/22/2013) (gr)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: 32 MOTION for Protective Order REGARDING SETTLEMENT INFORMATION. filed by Lumen View Technology LLC. The plaintiffs October 22, 2013 motion for a protective order is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/12/2013) (djc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lumen View Technology LLC v. Findthebest.com, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lumen View Technology LLC
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Leventhal
Represented By: Damian Wasserbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Findthebest.com, Inc
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?