Guaman v. 5 "M" Corp. et al
Plaintiff: |
Jorge Guaman |
Defendant: |
Dennis Turcinovic, Milan Licul, 50/50 Restaurant Corp., Ocinomled, Ltd., Balarini Restaurant Corp. and 5 "M" Corp. |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv03820 |
Filed: |
June 5, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
Queens |
Presiding Judge: |
Lorna G. Schofield |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 13, 2013 |
Filing
52
OPINION AND ORDER. WHEREAS a telephonic conference was held on December 13, 2013 concerning Plaintiff's motion to compel discovery; it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is DENIED without prejudice to renewal after a decision has be en issued on the forthcoming motion for FLSA conditional class certification and after the parties have again conferred with each other; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his motion for FLSA conditional class certification by Januar y 10, 2014; Defendants shall file their opposition by January 27, 2014; and Plaintiff shall file his reply by February 3, 2014. ORDERED that a conference will be held on February 18, 2014 at 10:45 a.m., ( Motions due by 1/10/2014., Responses due by 1/27/2014., Replies due by 2/3/2014.), ( Status Conference set for 2/18/2014 at 10:45 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/13/2013) (lmb)
|
October 23, 2013 |
Filing
42
OPINION AND ORDER re: 27 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Jorge Guaman. For the reasons stated above, Plaintiff's motion to conditionally certify a collective action is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties shall submit a revised for m of notice, consistent with the above opinion, by November 4, 2013. Plaintiffs' request for discovery of class information pursuant to § 216(b) and to have the notice and consent forms posted at an agreed upon location at Delmonico's Kitchen is also granted. By November 4, 2013, Defendants shall provide an Excel spreadsheet that the contains the names, title, compensation rate, period of employment, last known mailing address, email address and telephone number for all non-exempt employees who were employed by Murano Ristorante or Delmonico Kitchen at any time in the six years preceding the filing of the Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to close the motion at docket number 27. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/22/2013) (lmb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?