Mark et al v. Gawker Media LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aulistar Mark, Hanchen Lu and Andrew Hudson
Defendant: Gawker Media LLC and Nick Denton
Case Number: 1:2013cv04347
Filed: June 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J. Nathan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 147 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 153 Motion to Certify Class; denying 154 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment and mot ion for class certification are denied. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted. This resolves Dkt. Nos. 147, 153, and 154. The clerk of court is instructed to close the case. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/29/2016) (cf)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER: the Court provisionally grants the parties' request to redact the highlighted portions of the supporting documents containing email addresses, telephone numbers, and individuals' names where linked to online "handles" or nicknames. In the interest of protecting confidential business information, the Court also provisionally grants the parties' request to redact the highlighted portions of the exhibits containing internal Gawker URLs, usernames, and passw ords. With respect to all of the proposed redactions, Plaintiffs shall promptly file the redacted version of the exhibits and the Court will file under seal unredacted versions of the relevant documents. Plaintiffs shall submit courtesy cop ies to the Court. The Court does caution the parties, however, as it has previously stated, that its reliance in a written opinion on a specific piece of information meant that "the presumption of access outweighs the asserted interest in main taining the confidentiality" of that information. In re A2P SMS Antitrust Litig., 972 F. Supp. 2d 465, 494 n.15 (S.D.N. Y. 2013). Before ruling on the Plaintiffs' motions for class certification and summary judgment, it is impossible to determine what material the Court will rely upon in its decisions, and it is probable that information relied upon will be subject to a heightened presumption of access. Cf Standard Inv., 347 F. App'x at 617. Thus, the Court may revisit this decision following the resolution of the parties' motions or upon request. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/16/2015) (tn)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re: 74 Letter filed by Aulistar Mark. For the foregoing reasons, it is ORDERED that: 1) the opt-in period shall be 60 days; 2) equitable tolling shall not apply; 3) Plaintiffs may not use Defendant's logos on their notice; 4) Defend ants are not required to post hard-copy notice in their offices; 5) Defendants are not required to post notice on their websites and blogs; and 6) Plaintiffs may send notice via social media sites, subject to the Court's further approval of the form and content of such notice. This resolves Docket No. 74. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 11/3/2014) (lmb)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 15 Motion to Certify Class. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiffs' motion for conditional certification and court authorized notice under§ 216(b) of the FLSA is GRANTED. In its opposition brief, Gawker r equests "an opportunity to meet and confer with Plaintiffs' counsel concerning the proposed notice." Def. Opp. at 24. That request is granted. Counsel for the parties are hereby directed to meet and confer regarding the content and dis semination of the notice and to submit a joint proposal to the Court by August 31, 2014. If the parties are unable to reach complete agreement, they should submit a joint letter by the same date. Their letter should (1) represent that the parties hav e met and conferred, (2) identify the precise issues on which disagreement remains, and (3) set forth each side's position on those issues. The parties should cite case law from courts in this Circuit that supports their arguments. After resolving any remaining issues, the Court will direct the parties to submit a joint proposed notice that reflects such resolution. This resolves Docket No. 15. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/15/2014) (ama)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark et al v. Gawker Media LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aulistar Mark
Represented By: Andrea Maria Paparella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanchen Lu
Represented By: Andrea Maria Paparella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hudson
Represented By: Andrea Maria Paparella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gawker Media LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?