United States of America v. Prevezon Holdings Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********6021 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON SEVEN USA LLC, Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street, APPROXIMATELY $894,026.21 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE S, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********8242 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON PINE USA, LLC, and all property traceable thereto, A DEBT OF 3,068,946 EUROS OWED BY AFI EUROPE N.V. TO PREVEZON HOLDINGS RESTRAINED BY THE GOVERNMENT OF THE NETHERLANDS ON OR ABOUT JANUARY 22, 2014, APPROXIMATELY $1,046,530.04 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE, Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********8084 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON SOHO USA LLC, Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE STREET, NEW YORK, NEW YORK 10005, UNIT 1816, APPROXIMATELY $4,429,019.44 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS ALEXANDER CONDOMINIUM, 250 EAST 49th ST, Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., and all property traceable thereto., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd., Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********9102 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 2009 USA, LLC, Kolevins, Ltd., ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********8293 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON ALEXANDER LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********8349 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 1711 USA, LLC, Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (, APPROXIMATELY $1,379,518.90 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE, Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********9128 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 1810 USA, LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********5882 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 2011 USA, LLC, Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree and Ferencoi Investments, Ltd.
Petitioner: Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd., Sundance Aspen, LLC, Victoria Tarantino, Michael Cassidy Foley, Acme Property Management, Inc. and William Browder
Claimant: Martash Holdings, IKR and Denis Katsyv
Interested Party: HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Hermitage Global Partners LP
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Any and All Assets of Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C. incl;uding but not limited to any and all funds on deposit in bank of america acct # 483016158084
Case Number: 1:2013cv06326
Filed: September 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: William H Pauley
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 763 OPINION & ORDER re: #717 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd: For the foregoing reasons, in this Court's informed discretion, Hermitage's motion for attorneys' fees against Moscow and BakerHostetler is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 717. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/30/2018) (jwh)
March 8, 2018 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (jwh)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 762 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the United States, by its attorney, Geoffrey S. Berman, United States Attorney, of counsel, Assistant United States Attorneys Paul M. Monteleoni, Cristine I. Phillips, and Tara M. La Morte, of counsel, and the Defendants and Claimants, by their attorneys, Kevin Reed, Esq., Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP, that: The Settlement Agreement continues in full force and effect except as expressly modified herein, and all terms defined in the Settlement Agreement have the same meaning herein unless specifically redefined herein. Upon entry of this Stipulation and Order, any authorized agent of U.S. Customs and Border Protection having custody of the Restrained Properties shall use portions of the Restrained Properties to make Substitute Payments to the U.S. Treasury to total the amount of the Judgment Payment, in the amounts and from the assets set forth in paragraph 3, below, and under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. The Substitute Payments shall be drawn from the following assets in the following amounts: 1. From the 250 East 49th Street, Unit Comm3 Sale Proceeds, a Substitute Payment in the amount of $4,429,019.44 shall be made under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. 2. From the 20 Pine Street Unit 2009 Sale Proceeds, a Substitute Payment in the amount of $1,379,518.94 shall be made under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. 3. From the 20 Pine Street, Unit 1711 Sale Proceeds, a Substitute Payment in the amount of $230,276.54 shall be made under the procedures set forth in paragraph 4, below. The Amended Protective Order is hereby vacated. The Action is dismissed against all Defendants with prejudice. Notwithstanding paragraph 10, above, this Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the Settlement Agreement, the Enforcement Order and the Judgment, and this Stipulation and Order. Each Party to this Stipulation and Order will bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The signatories to this Stipulation and Order each represent that they are duly authorized to sign this Stipulation and Order, and as further set forth in this stipulation and order. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/8/2018) (jwh) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jwh).
March 7, 2018 Filing 761 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated March 7, 2018 re: Stipulation Modifying Settlement Agreement. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Executed by Parties)(Monteleoni, Paul)
February 6, 2018 Filing 760 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #759 Opinion & Order. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated February 2, 2018, the Government's motion to enforce the Settlement is granted, and Prevezon's motion for discovery is denied. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the Government, in the amount of $5,896.333.65, plus pre-judgment interest at an interest rate of 9% per annum, running from October 31, 2017 to the date judgment is entered, which as of February 6, 2018 is $142,481.27. Accordingly, judgment is hereby entered in the favor of the Government for a total amount of $6,038.814.92. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 2/6/2018) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal)(tro)
February 2, 2018 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: #759 Memorandum & Opinion to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (jwh)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 759 OPINION & ORDER re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement filed by United States of America: For the foregoing reasons, the Government's motion to enforce the Settlement Agreement is granted. Separately, Prevezon's application for discovery is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of the Government, and calculate pre-judgment interest at a rate of 9% per annum. The Clerk of Court is further directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 743. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/2/2018) (jwh)
January 5, 2018 Filing 758 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 12/14/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 5, 2018 Filing 757 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 12/14/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 22, 2017 Filing 756 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Faith Gay dated December 22, 2017 re: Newly-Produced Dutch Documents. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Email)(Gay, Faith)
December 21, 2017 Filing 755 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated December 21, 2017 re: Additional Netherlands documents. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Documents from Netherlands)(Monteleoni, Paul)
December 14, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Oral Argument held on 12/14/2017 re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement . filed by United States of America. (Choi, Brian)
December 12, 2017 Filing 754 DECLARATION of Alexander J. Wilson in Support re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement .. Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
December 12, 2017 Filing 753 DECLARATION of Paul M. Monteleoni in Support re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement .. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - DOJ Response to Congress)(Monteleoni, Paul)
December 12, 2017 Filing 752 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement . . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
December 12, 2017 Filing 751 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #750 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/12/2017) (jwh)
December 12, 2017 Filing 750 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Renita Sharma dated December 12, 2017 re: Requesting telephonic participation. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Sharma, Renita)
December 6, 2017 Filing 749 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Opposition re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement .. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Prevezon Purchased NYC Real Estate Properties, #2 Exhibit 2- August 18, 2017 Email, #3 Exhibit 3- September 18, 2017 Email, #4 Exhibit 4- October 10, 2017 Email)(Gay, Faith)
December 6, 2017 Filing 748 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement . . Document filed by Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Gay, Faith)
November 17, 2017 Filing 747 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/9/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 17, 2017 Filing 746 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/9/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 15, 2017 Filing 745 DECLARATION of Paul M. Monteleoni in Support re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement .. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 15, 2017 Filing 744 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement . . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
November 15, 2017 Filing 743 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement . Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Pre-Motion Conference held on 11/9/2017. (Choi, Brian)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 742 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties having appeared for a pre-motion conference on the Government's anticipated motion to enforce the settlement, the following briefing schedule is entered on consent: 1. The Government shall file its motion by November 15, 2017. 2. Prevezon shall file its opposition by December 6, 2017. 3. The Government shall file its reply by December 12, 2017. 4. Oral argument on the motion shall be held on December 14, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. Motions due by 11/15/2017. Responses due by 12/6/2017 Replies due by 12/12/2017. Oral Argument set for 12/14/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/9/2017) (mro)
November 6, 2017 Filing 741 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #740 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/6/2017) (jwh)
November 3, 2017 Filing 740 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Renita Sharma dated November 3, 2017 re: Telephonic Participation. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Sharma, Renita)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 739 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Accordingly, Prevezon's supplemental request seeking an order directing the Government to grant temporary immigration parole for Denis Katsyv and Natalia Veselnitskaya is denied. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/3/2017) (jwh) Modified on 11/8/2017 (jwh).
November 2, 2017 Filing 738 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated November 2, 2017 re: Response to Court's Order of November 1. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2016-03-09 Letter Denying Immigration Parole)(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 737 ORDER granting #735 Letter Motion for Conference: The Government's application requesting a pre-motion conference is granted. The parties are directed to appear for the conference on November 9, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. Separately, the Government is directed to provide a response to Prevezon's supplemental request concerning the issue of immigration parole by tomorrow, November 2, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/9/2017 at 05:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/1/2017) (jwh)
October 31, 2017 Filing 736 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Faith Gay dated October 31, 2017 re: #735 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Conference to Enforce Settlement Agreement addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated October 30, 2017. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Gay, Faith)
October 30, 2017 Filing 735 LETTER MOTION for Conference Pre-Motion Conference to Enforce Settlement Agreement addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated October 30, 2017. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
June 9, 2017 Filing 734 DECLARATION of Jacob W. Buchdahl in Support re: #717 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Buchdahl, Jacob)
June 9, 2017 Filing 733 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #717 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Buchdahl, Jacob)
June 2, 2017 Filing 732 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #717 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Baker & Hostetler LLP. (Cymrot, Mark)
June 2, 2017 Filing 731 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Opposition re: #717 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Baker & Hostetler LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter from Brown Rudnick to Baker & Hostetler, LLP dated October 28, 2013, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Baker & Hostetler, LLP to Brown Rudnick dated November 13, 2013, #3 Exhibit C - December 13, 2013 Article from the New York Post, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Natalia Veselnitskaya, dated January 5, 2016, #5 Exhibit E - Letter from Baker & Hostetler, LLP to William F. Browder dated September 23, 2008, #6 Exhibit F - Part 1 - William Browder's conviction in Russia dated July 11, 2013, #7 Exhibit F - Part 2 - William Browder's conviction in Russia dated July 11, 2013, #8 Exhibit G - June 16, 2016 Article from The American Interest, #9 Exhibit H - Declaration of Neil Micklethwaite dated July 27, 2009, #10 Exhibit I - October 18, 2016 Article from the New York Law Journal)(Cymrot, Mark)
May 26, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 6/2/2017. (ap)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER: granting #727 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. Response due by 6/2/2017. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/26/2017) (ap)
May 25, 2017 Filing 729 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 5/11/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 25, 2017 Filing 728 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 5/11/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 25, 2017 Filing 727 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Non-Party Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.'s Motion for Attorney's Fees addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Mark A. Cymrot dated May 25, 2017. Document filed by Baker & Hostetler LLP.(Cymrot, Mark)
May 24, 2017 Filing 726 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 5/3/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 24, 2017 Filing 725 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 5/3/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/14/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 19, 2017 Filing 724 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a argument proceeding held on 5/3/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 19, 2017 Filing 723 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: argument held on 5/3/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 17, 2017 Filing 722 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 17, 2017 Filing 721 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 17, 2017 Filing 720 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 16, 2017 Filing 719 DECLARATION of Jacob W. Buchdahl in Support re: #717 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Buchdahl, Jacob)
May 16, 2017 Filing 718 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #717 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Buchdahl, Jacob)
May 16, 2017 Filing 717 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd..(Buchdahl, Jacob)
May 15, 2017 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (rjm)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 716 STIPULATION AND ORDER. The purpose of this Stipulation and Order is to memorialize a settlement agreement pursuant to which the United States will release all of its claims or potential claims against all Defendants relating to this Action and release all Restrained Properties, and all Defendants and Claimants will release all their claims or potential claims against the United States relating to this Action. Upon the completion of the conditions set forth herein, the Amended Protective Order shall be vacated as to all Defendants and all Restrained Properties, and the Second Amended Complaint shall be dismissed against all Defendants with prejudice. Upon entry of the Stipulation and Order, the Government shall inform the Government of the Netherlands that this matter has been resolved and that the Government withdraws any request for the Government of the Netherlands to continue to restrain the AFI Europe Debt, and shall request that the Government of the Netherlands lift the restraint of the AFI Europe Debt that had been implemented at the request of the United States. The Amended Protective Order shall be deemed modified to allow the release of the AFI Europe Debt. For the purpose of settlement only, Defendant Prevezon Holdings will make a payment to the United States consisting of $5,896,333.65 in United States currency (the "Payment"). The Payment shall be due within 15 business days of the release by the Government of the Netherlands of the AFI Europe Debt and shall be made by electronic funds transfer pursuant to written instructions to be provided by the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York. Upon receipt, the Payment shall be deposited into the U.S. Treasury pursuant to the Miscellaneous Receipts Act, 31 U.S.C. 3302, which authorizes deposits of public money into the U.S. Treasury, and does not constitute a forfeiture pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 981(a)(1)(A), and as further specified and set forth in this Stipulation and Order. Removed flag(s): Stayed. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/15/2017) (rjm).
May 12, 2017 Filing 715 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 12, 2017 re: Settlement Agreement. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Settlement Stipulation & Order (executed by parties))(Monteleoni, Paul)
May 12, 2017 Filing 714 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 12, 2017 re: Defendants' Letter of May 11, 2017 Regarding Residual Hearsay Exception. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Disk of Cited Exhibits (under seal), #2 Exhibit B - Prior Defense Counsel's Exhibit List Objections)(Monteleoni, Paul)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 713 ORDER. Jury selection and trial in this action shall commence at 10:00 a.m. on May 15, 2017. So ordered. (Jury Selection set for 5/15/2017 at 10:00AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. Jury Trial set for 5/15/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/12/2017) (rjm)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #619 Motion to Preclude. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on May 11, 2017, Prevezon's Motion to Preclude the Testimony of George Virgin as an Expert in Handwriting Analysis is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 619. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/11/2017) (ras)
May 11, 2017 Filing 711 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam M. Abensohn dated May 11, 2017 re: Extension of Residual Hearsay. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Letter Dated May 9, 2017)(Abensohn, Adam)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Renita Sharma dated 5/11/2017 re: We write to request permission for Quinn Emanuel LLP to bring a portable Mifi and PA FM Tour Guide System into the Courthouse on May 11, 2017 for use at the pre-trial conference. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/11/2017) (rjm)
May 10, 2017 Filing 709 JOINT FINAL TRIAL REPORT. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B-1, #4 Exhibit B-2)(La Morte, Tara)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 708 OPINION & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, and in this Courts informed discretion, Prevezon's motion for summary judgment is denied, and the Governments Motion in Limine No. 2 is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at ECF Nos. 573 and 596, and as further set forth in this order. Motions terminated: #596 MOTION in Limine Number 2, To Exclude Evidence and Arguments Misinforming the Jury On Asset Tracing Law, filed by United States of America, #573 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/10/2017) (ap)
May 9, 2017 Filing 707 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 9, 2017 re: Parties' Proposed Verdict Forms. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Government's Proposed Verdict Form, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Verdict Form)(Monteleoni, Paul)
May 9, 2017 Filing 706 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from K. Reed dated May 9, 2017 re: Proposed Juror Questionnaire. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Juror Questionnaire)(Sharma, Renita)
May 9, 2017 Filing 705 REQUEST TO CHARGE. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
May 9, 2017 Filing 704 PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 703 OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons in this Opinion and Order, this Court grants the Government's Motion in Limine No. 1 and denies Prevezon's Motion in Limine No. 7. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 591. So ordered. re: #591 MOTION in Limine Number 1, Permitting Introduction of Certain Documentary Evidence filed by United States of America. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/9/2017) (rjm)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 702 ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing on May 3, 2017, Prevezon's Motions in Limine No. 1 is denied. Prevezon's Motions in Limine Nos. 3 and 5 are granted. Prevezon's Motions in Limine Nos. 2 and 6 are granted in part and denied in part. Prevezon's Motion in Limine No. 4 is denied without prejudice for re-application at a later time. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing on May 3, 2017, the Government's Motion in Limine Nos. 3, 5, and 6 are granted in part and denied in part. The Government's Motion in Limine Nos. 4 and 7 are denied without prejudice as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at ECF Nos. 578, 581, 584, 587, 590, 597, 600, 601, 604, and 606. So ordered. Denying #578 Motion in Limine; Granting in part and denying in part #581 Motion in Limine; Granting #584 Motion in Limine; Denying without prejudice to renewal by formal motion #587 Motion in Limine; Granting in part and denying in part #590 Motion in Limine; Granting in part and denying in part #597 Motion in Limine; Denying without prejudice as moot #600 Motion in Limine; Granting in part and denying in part #601 Motion in Limine; Denying without prejudice as moot #604 Motion in Limine; Granting in part and denying in part #606 Motion in Limine. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/8/2017) (rjm)
May 6, 2017 Filing 701 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 6, 2017 re: Response to Defendants' Supplemental Letter Regarding Corroboration. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
May 5, 2017 Filing 700 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam M. Abensohn dated May 5, 2017 re: Follow-Up Regarding Prevezon MIL 7 and Government MIL1. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Angert Deposition Excerpt)(Abensohn, Adam)
May 4, 2017 Filing 699 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #698 Letter, filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Prevezon is directed to file its letter, not to exceed two pages, by May 5, 2017 no later than 3:00 p.m. The Government may file a response by May 6, 2017, not to exceed two pages, no later than 12:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/4/2017) (mro)
May 4, 2017 Filing 698 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam Abensohn dated May 4, 2017 re: Prevezon MIL 7 and Government MIL 1. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
May 3, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Oral Argument held on 5/3/2017 re: #578 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Gathered Through a Criminal Ivestigation. filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C.. (Choi, Brian)
May 3, 2017 Filing 697 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #619 MOTION to Preclude The Testimony of George Virgin As An Expert In Handwriting Analysis. . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
May 2, 2017 Filing 696 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #695 Letter, filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/2/2017) (ap)
May 1, 2017 Filing 695 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Renita Sharma dated May 1, 2017 re: Permission to Bring Electronic Device to Hearing. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sharma, Renita)
April 27, 2017 Filing 694 DECLARATION of Cristine Irvin Phillips in Opposition re: #619 MOTION to Preclude The Testimony of George Virgin As An Expert In Handwriting Analysis.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Phillips, Cristine)
April 27, 2017 Filing 693 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #694) - DECLARATION of Cristine Irvin Phillips in Opposition re: #619 MOTION to Preclude The Testimony of George Virgin As An Expert In Handwriting Analysis.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Phillips, Cristine) Modified on 5/2/2017 (ldi).
April 27, 2017 Filing 692 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #619 MOTION to Preclude The Testimony of George Virgin As An Expert In Handwriting Analysis. . Document filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Cristine)
April 26, 2017 Filing 691 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #686 Letter re: the Government's Trial Exhibit List, filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. ENDORSEMENT: Application denied. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/26/2017) (cla)
April 26, 2017 Filing 690 SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam M. Abensohn dated April 26, 2017 re: the Government's Trial Exhibit List. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
April 25, 2017 Filing 689 JOINT FINAL TRIAL REPORT. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1: Plaintiff Designations, #2 Exhibit A-2: Defendant Designations, #3 Exhibit B-1: Plaintiff Exhibits, #4 Exhibit B-2: Defendant Exhibits)(Monteleoni, Paul)
April 25, 2017 Filing 688 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated April 25, 2017 re: Response to Defendant's Motion to Limit Government's Exhibit List. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 687 SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 5/3/2017 at 05:00 PM before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/24/2017) (cla)
April 24, 2017 Filing 686 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam M. Abensohn dated April 24, 2017 re: the Government's Trial Exhibit List. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence between counsel, #2 Exhibit B - Government's trial exhibit list)(Abensohn, Adam)
April 22, 2017 Filing 684 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam M. Abensohn dated April 21, 2017 re: Memoranda and Motion Papers Related to Defendants' Motions in Limine No. 1-7. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
April 21, 2017 Filing 685 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 21, 2017 Filing 683 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated April 21, 2017 re: Letter Pursuant to Court's Individual Practices Regarding Government Motions in Limine Filings. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
April 21, 2017 Filing 682 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated April 21, 2017 re: Government's Motion in Limine Number 7. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
April 21, 2017 Filing 681 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #601 MOTION in Limine Number 6, To Preclude Evidence Regarding the Government's Motives, Legal Theories and Pre-Discovery Evidence. . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
April 21, 2017 Filing 680 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #606 MOTION in Limine Number 5, To Exclude Evidence of In Absentia Conviction of William Browder. . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
April 21, 2017 Filing 679 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #604 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Prejudicial and Hearsay Evidence. . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
April 21, 2017 Filing 678 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #597 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel Alpert. . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
April 21, 2017 Filing 677 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #596 MOTION in Limine Number 2, To Exclude Evidence and Arguments Misinforming the Jury On Asset Tracing Law. . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
April 21, 2017 Filing 676 DECLARATION of Paul M. Monteleoni in Support re: #591 MOTION in Limine Number 1, Permitting Introduction of Certain Documentary Evidence.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Monteleoni, Paul)
April 21, 2017 Filing 675 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #591 MOTION in Limine Number 1, Permitting Introduction of Certain Documentary Evidence. . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
April 21, 2017 Filing 674 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #590 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Dr. Louise I. Shelley As An Expert At Trial. . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 21, 2017 Filing 673 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Support re: #587 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Witness Interview Summaries and Declarations.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Monteleoni Email, #2 Exhibit 2-Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3-Under Seal)(Abensohn, Adam)
April 21, 2017 Filing 672 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #587 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Witness Interview Summaries and Declarations. . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 21, 2017 Filing 671 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #584 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Hearsay Report Concerning Alleged Russian Treasury Fraud. . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 21, 2017 Filing 670 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #581 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Relating To Sergei Magnitsky. . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 21, 2017 Filing 669 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Support re: #578 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Gathered Through a Criminal Ivestigation.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Hearing Transcript February 17, 2017, #2 Exhibit 2-Letter Dated July 2, 2014)(Abensohn, Adam)
April 21, 2017 Filing 668 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #578 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Gathered Through a Criminal Ivestigation. . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 19, 2017 Filing 667 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam M. Abensohn dated 4/14/2017 re: response to Government's letter opposing Defendants' request for a short adjournment of trial. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C. (***Previously filed under seal in envelope #661, and unsealed on 4/19/2017 per order and docket entry #665 .***)(jwh)
April 19, 2017 Filing 666 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam M. Abensohn dated 4/12/2017 re: request a brief continuance of trial scheduled to begin May 15, 2017. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Adam Abensohn) (***Previously filed under seal in envelope #657, and unsealed on 4/19/2017 per order and docket entry #665 .***)(jwh)
April 19, 2017 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #665 Order to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (jwh)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 665 ORDER: Accordingly, Prevezons request for an adjournment of the trial date is denied. Further, because Prevezon has not provided any basis to file its request under seal, the Clerk of Court is directed to unseal Prevezons April 12, 2017 letter and April 14, 2017 reply-docketed as ECF Nos. 657 and 661. The Clerk of Court is also directed to docket the Governments April 14, 2017 response letter as ECF No. 664. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/19/2017) (jwh) Modified on 4/20/2017 (jwh).
April 19, 2017 Filing 664 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni, Cristine Irvin Phillips, Tara M. La Morte dated 4/14/2017 re: response to Defendants' sealed letter dated April 13, 2107, opposing request to adjourn trial. Document filed by United States of America.(jwh)
April 18, 2017 Filing 663 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 4/5/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 18, 2017 Filing 662 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 4/5/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 14, 2017 Filing 661 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 660 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Pursuant to Rule 45(d) (3) (A) (ii) and (iv) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Rule 45 subpoenas presented by Defendants' counsel to Witness-1 on or about October 1, 2015 for trial testimony and document production are hereby quashed. Pursuant to Rule 32 (a) (4) (B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, either party may use the deposition testimony of Witness-1 for any purpose at trial in this matter, subject to any objections permitted by Rule 32(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/13/2015)(***Previously filed under seal in envelope #367, and unsealed on 4/14/2017.***) (anc)
April 14, 2017 Filing 659 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from PREET BHARARA dated 10/9/2015 re: The Government writes to request that the Court enter the attached proposed order that (1) confirms that the parties can use the deposition of Russian citizen and resident Nikolai Gorokhov at trial and (2) quashes subpoenas for trial testimony and document production presented to Mr. Gorokhov by defendants' counsel at his October 1, 2015 deposition. Document filed by United States of America.(anc)(***Previously filed under seal in envelope #367 and unsealed on 4/14/2017.***) Modified on 4/14/2017 (anc). (anc).
April 14, 2017 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #658 Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (mro)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER: On consent of the parties in this action, the Clerk of Court is directed to unseal the Judge Griesa's October 13, 2015 Order and the Government's corresponding application dated October 9, 2015, both of which were filed on the docket as ECF No. 367. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/14/2017) (mro)
April 13, 2017 Filing 657 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 12, 2017 Filing 656 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 7, 2017 Filing 655 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER granting #653 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #619 MOTION to Preclude The Testimony of George Virgin As An Expert In Handwriting Analysis: Application granted, as modified. (Responses due by 4/26/2017 Replies due by 5/3/2017.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 4/7/2017) (jwh)
April 7, 2017 Filing 653 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #619 MOTION to Preclude The Testimony of George Virgin As An Expert In Handwriting Analysis. addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Cristine Irvin Phillips dated 4/7/2017. Document filed by United States of America.(Phillips, Cristine)
April 6, 2017 Filing 652 OPPOSITION BRIEF Government's Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 7. Document filed by United States of America.(Phillips, Cristine)
April 6, 2017 Filing 651 DECLARATION of Dr. Louise Shelley in Opposition re: #590 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Dr. Louise I. Shelley As An Expert At Trial.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Phillips, Cristine)
April 6, 2017 Filing 650 DECLARATION of Cristine Irvin Phillips in Opposition re: #587 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Witness Interview Summaries and Declarations., #581 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Relating To Sergei Magnitsky., #584 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Hearsay Report Concerning Alleged Russian Treasury Fraud., #578 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Gathered Through a Criminal Ivestigation., #590 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Dr. Louise I. Shelley As An Expert At Trial.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Phillips, Cristine)
April 6, 2017 Filing 649 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #590 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Dr. Louise I. Shelley As An Expert At Trial. . Document filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Cristine)
April 6, 2017 Filing 648 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #587 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Witness Interview Summaries and Declarations. . Document filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Cristine)
April 6, 2017 Filing 647 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #584 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Hearsay Report Concerning Alleged Russian Treasury Fraud. . Document filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Cristine)
April 6, 2017 Filing 646 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #581 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Relating To Sergei Magnitsky. . Document filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Cristine)
April 6, 2017 Filing 645 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #578 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Gathered Through a Criminal Ivestigation. . Document filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Cristine)
April 6, 2017 Filing 644 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Opposition re: #606 MOTION in Limine Number 5, To Exclude Evidence of In Absentia Conviction of William Browder.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2- Excerpts of William Browder Deposition, #3 Exhibit 3- Todd Hyman Deposition Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 4- Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5- 3/30/17 Email)(Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 643 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #606 MOTION in Limine Number 5, To Exclude Evidence of In Absentia Conviction of William Browder. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 642 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Opposition re: #591 MOTION in Limine Number 1, Permitting Introduction of Certain Documentary Evidence.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Deposition Excerpts of Todd Hyman, #2 Exhibit 2- Under Seal)(Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 641 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #591 MOTION in Limine Number 1, Permitting Introduction of Certain Documentary Evidence. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 640 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Opposition re: #596 MOTION in Limine Number 2, To Exclude Evidence and Arguments Misinforming the Jury On Asset Tracing Law.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_ Excerpts from Deposition of Anthony Milazzo)(Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 639 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #596 MOTION in Limine Number 2, To Exclude Evidence and Arguments Misinforming the Jury On Asset Tracing Law. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 638 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Opposition re: #597 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel Alpert.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Expert Report of Daniel Alpert, #2 Exhibit 2-Expert Report of Ross Delston, #3 Exhibit 3- Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4- Excerpts of Daniel Alpert Deposition)(Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 637 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #597 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel Alpert. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 636 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #604 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Prejudicial and Hearsay Evidence. . Document filed by Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 635 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Opposition re: #601 MOTION in Limine Number 6, To Preclude Evidence Regarding the Government's Motives, Legal Theories and Pre-Discovery Evidence.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Excerpts of Todd Hyman Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2- Under Seal)(Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 634 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #601 MOTION in Limine Number 6, To Preclude Evidence Regarding the Government's Motives, Legal Theories and Pre-Discovery Evidence. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 633 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #600 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Topics. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 632 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam M. Abensohn dated April 6, 2017 re: Response To Government's Second Sur-Reply Letter Dated April 6, 2017. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
April 6, 2017 Filing 631 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated April 6, 2017 re: Evidence as to U.S. Transfers. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (under seal), #2 Exhibit B (under seal))(Monteleoni, Paul)
April 5, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Oral Argument held on 4/5/2017 re: #573 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C.. (Choi, Brian)
April 4, 2017 Filing 630 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
April 3, 2017 Filing 629 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam M. Abensohn dated April 3, 2017 re: Response to Government's Letter dated April 3, 2017. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
April 3, 2017 Filing 627 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated April 3, 2017 re: Arguments First Raised in Defense Reply Memorandum. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
March 31, 2017 Filing 628 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
March 31, 2017 Filing 626 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam Abensohn dated March 31, 2017 re: Summary Judgment Motion Identification. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
March 31, 2017 Filing 625 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Support re: #573 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Under Seal)(Abensohn, Adam)
March 31, 2017 Filing 624 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #573 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
March 29, 2017 Filing 623 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 29, 2017 Filing 622 DECLARATION of Lloyd Cunningham in Support re: #619 MOTION to Preclude The Testimony of George Virgin As An Expert In Handwriting Analysis.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Lloyd Cunningham CV)(Abensohn, Adam)
March 29, 2017 Filing 621 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Support re: #619 MOTION to Preclude The Testimony of George Virgin As An Expert In Handwriting Analysis.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- George Virgin Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 2- George Virgin Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3-Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4-Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5-Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6-Under Seal)(Abensohn, Adam)
March 29, 2017 Filing 620 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #619 MOTION to Preclude The Testimony of George Virgin As An Expert In Handwriting Analysis. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
March 29, 2017 Filing 619 MOTION to Preclude The Testimony of George Virgin As An Expert In Handwriting Analysis. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER: Defendants Prevezon Holdings Ltd. and various other entities ("Prevezon"), by sealed letter application dated March 24, 2017, seek to unseal an October 13, 2015 order entered by Judge Griesa (the "Griesa Order") pertaining to the deposition testimony of a witness in this action ("Doe 1"). Prevezon also seeks to unseal the Government's sealed letter application dated October 9, 2015 that precipitated the Griesa Order. The Government opposes Prevezon's request. The Government urges that consideration of Prevezon's request be deferred for two weeks while the Government assesses recent developments. (Gov't Ltr. dated Mar. 24, 2017, at 3.) Given the sensitivities of this litigation, this Court adopts the Government's modest proposal. The Government is directed to file an updated assessment no later than April 11, 2017. Accordingly, Prevezon's application is denied without prejudice to reconsideration. Separately, by sealed letter application dated March 27, 2017, Prevezon seeks an order directing the Government to disclose "what steps, if any, [it] has taken... to require [Doe 2] to abide by the protective order." (Prevezon Ltr. dated Mar. 27, 2017, at 3.) This Court grants that application and directs the Government to file a response by April 5, 2017. The Government may file its respective updates regarding Doe 1 and Doe 2 under seal. Any party objecting to the unsealing of this Order should submit a letter to chambers by 10:00 a.m. on March 30, 2017. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/29/2017) (cla) Presiding Judge: Pauley III , William H.
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 617 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #611 Letter re: Pre-Trial Schedule, filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The Daubert motions shall be filed in accordance with the jointly consented schedule set forth below. The joint pretrial schedule deadline is adjourned to April 25, 2017. (Motions due by 4/19/2017., Pretrial Order due by 4/25/2017., Responses due by 4/28/2017, Replies due by 5/5/2017.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/27/2017) (cla)
March 27, 2017 Filing 616 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 24, 2017 Filing 615 DECLARATION of Todd Hyman in Opposition re: #573 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50)(Monteleoni, Paul)
March 24, 2017 Filing 614 DECLARATION of Cristine Irvin Phillips in Opposition re: #573 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19)(Monteleoni, Paul)
March 24, 2017 Filing 613 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #574 Rule 56.1 Statement,. Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
March 24, 2017 Filing 612 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #573 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
March 24, 2017 Filing 611 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Kevin S. Reed dated March 24, 2017 re: Pre-Trial Schedule. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Reed, Kevin)
March 24, 2017 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #609 Order on Motion to Seal Document, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (cla)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 609 ORDER granting #608 Motion to Seal Document #583 Declaration in Support of Motion. Application granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Ex. 2 of the Sharma Declaration (ECF No. 583-2) from the docket and place it under seal. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/24/2017) (cla)
March 24, 2017 Filing 608 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Request to Seal Exhibit 2 to the Declaration (Docket Entry 583-2) addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam M. Abensohn dated March 24, 2017. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
March 24, 2017 Filing 607 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #606 MOTION in Limine Number 5, To Exclude Evidence of In Absentia Conviction of William Browder. . Document filed by United States of America. (La Morte, Tara)
March 24, 2017 Filing 606 MOTION in Limine Number 5, To Exclude Evidence of In Absentia Conviction of William Browder. Document filed by United States of America.(La Morte, Tara)
March 24, 2017 Filing 605 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #604 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Prejudicial and Hearsay Evidence. . Document filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Cristine)
March 24, 2017 Filing 604 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Prejudicial and Hearsay Evidence. Document filed by United States of America.(Phillips, Cristine)
March 24, 2017 Filing 603 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #601 MOTION in Limine Number 6, To Preclude Evidence Regarding the Government's Motives, Legal Theories and Pre-Discovery Evidence. . Document filed by United States of America. (La Morte, Tara)
March 24, 2017 Filing 602 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #600 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Topics. . Document filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Cristine)
March 24, 2017 Filing 601 MOTION in Limine Number 6, To Preclude Evidence Regarding the Government's Motives, Legal Theories and Pre-Discovery Evidence. Document filed by United States of America.(La Morte, Tara)
March 24, 2017 Filing 600 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Certain Topics. Document filed by United States of America.(Phillips, Cristine)
March 24, 2017 Filing 599 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #597 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel Alpert. . Document filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Cristine)
March 24, 2017 Filing 598 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #596 MOTION in Limine Number 2, To Exclude Evidence and Arguments Misinforming the Jury On Asset Tracing Law. . Document filed by United States of America. (La Morte, Tara)
March 24, 2017 Filing 597 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Expert Testimony of Daniel Alpert. Document filed by United States of America.(Phillips, Cristine)
March 23, 2017 Filing 610 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 23, 2017 Filing 596 MOTION in Limine Number 2, To Exclude Evidence and Arguments Misinforming the Jury On Asset Tracing Law. Document filed by United States of America.(La Morte, Tara)
March 23, 2017 Filing 595 DECLARATION of Tara M. La Morte in Support re: #591 MOTION in Limine Number 1, Permitting Introduction of Certain Documentary Evidence.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(La Morte, Tara)
March 23, 2017 Filing 594 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Support re: #590 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Dr. Louise I. Shelley As An Expert At Trial.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Expert Report, #2 Exhibit 2-Under Seal)(Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 593 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #591 MOTION in Limine Number 1, Permitting Introduction of Certain Documentary Evidence. . Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(La Morte, Tara)
March 23, 2017 Filing 592 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #590 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Dr. Louise I. Shelley As An Expert At Trial. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 591 MOTION in Limine Number 1, Permitting Introduction of Certain Documentary Evidence. Document filed by United States of America.(La Morte, Tara)
March 23, 2017 Filing 590 MOTION in Limine To Preclude Dr. Louise I. Shelley As An Expert At Trial. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 589 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Support re: #587 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Witness Interview Summaries and Declarations.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Government Excerpt, #2 Exhibit 2-Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3-Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4-Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5-Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6-Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7 -Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8- Email Dated March 1, 2017)(Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 588 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #587 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Witness Interview Summaries and Declarations. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 587 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Witness Interview Summaries and Declarations. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 586 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Support re: #584 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Hearsay Report Concerning Alleged Russian Treasury Fraud.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Depostion Excerpts Todd Hyman, #2 Exhibit 2-Excerpts of Government Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 3-Government Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit 4-Government Exhibit, #5 Exhibit 5-Government Exhibit, #6 Exhibit 6-Government Exhibit, #7 Errata 7-Government Exhibit, #8 Exhibit 8- Government Exhibit, #9 Exhibit 9- Under Seal)(Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 585 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #584 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Hearsay Report Concerning Alleged Russian Treasury Fraud. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 584 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Hearsay Report Concerning Alleged Russian Treasury Fraud. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 583 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Support re: #581 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Relating To Sergei Magnitsky.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Email Sent by AUSA Christine Phillips, #2 Exhibit 2-Press Release, #3 Exhibit 3-Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4-Press Release)(Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 582 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #581 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Relating To Sergei Magnitsky. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 581 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Relating To Sergei Magnitsky. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 580 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Support re: #578 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Gathered Through a Criminal Ivestigation.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Transcript Excerpts from 3/3/2014 Deposition of Todd Hyman, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Trial Excerpt From 2/17/14 USA v. Prevezon, #4 Exhibit 4- Excerpt From Government's 12/2/15 Exhibit List, #5 Exhibit 5- Document Entitled Results of The Examination of the Inquiry of the USA in The Case of USA v. Prevezon, #6 Exhibit 6- Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7- Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8- Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9- Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 10-Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 11-Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 12- Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 13-Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 14- Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 15-Under seal, #16 Exhibit 16-Under Seal)(Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 579 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #578 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Gathered Through a Criminal Ivestigation. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
March 23, 2017 Filing 578 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Gathered Through a Criminal Ivestigation. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
March 3, 2017 Filing 577 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 3, 2017 Filing 576 DECLARATION of Renita Sharma in Support re: #573 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Errata 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51)(Abensohn, Adam)
March 3, 2017 Filing 575 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #573 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
March 3, 2017 Filing 574 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
March 3, 2017 Filing 573 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
March 2, 2017 Filing 572 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/25/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 2, 2017 Filing 571 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/25/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 2, 2017 Filing 570 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/17/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 2, 2017 Filing 569 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/17/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER denying #565 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: Application denied. The parties are directed to conform their briefs to Sections III.C and III.D of the Court's individual rules of practice. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/27/2017) (tn)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 566 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, in this Court's informed discretion, Prevezon's motion to compel a second Browder deposition is granted. Prevezon shall depose Browder in London for no more than four hours, exclusive of break time. Prevezon is also directed to pay for Browder's counsel's costs and fees associated with the deposition. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/27/2017) (cla)
February 27, 2017 Filing 565 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Regarding Defendants' Dispositive Motion due by March 3, 2017 addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam M. Abensohn dated February 27, 2017. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
February 24, 2017 Filing 564 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
February 24, 2017 Filing 563 SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam Abensohn dated February 24, 2017 re: Deposition of William Browder. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Abensohn, Adam)
February 23, 2017 Filing 562 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Michael S. Kim dated February 23, 2017 re: Defendants' February 21, 2017 Letter Requesting an Additional Deposition of Mr. Browder. Document filed by William Browder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2015 03 19 Ex. A - K&K Letter to Baker & Hostetler, #2 Exhibit 2015 04 09 Ex. B - K&K Letter to Baker & Hostetler, #3 Exhibit 2015 04 10 Ex. C - Baker & Hostetler Letter to K&K, #4 Exhibit 2015 04 15 Ex. D - Browder Deposition Transcript)(Kim, Michael)
February 21, 2017 Filing 561 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam Abensohn dated February 21, 2017 re: Deposition of William Browder. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 560 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 2: For the foregoing reasons, except for the narrow exception described in this Order, this Court denies the Government's requests to use the Additional Relevant Documents, and to update its tracing expert's opinion. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/21/2017) (cla)
February 17, 2017 Filing 568 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Discovery Hearing held on 2/17/2017. (Choi, Brian)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 559 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 3/3/2017. Responses due by 3/24/2017 Replies due by 3/31/2017. The date of the oral argument on the motion shall remain April 5, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. All other deadlines listed in the Scheduling Order dated January 25, 2017 (ECF No. 547) remain the same. Defendants are directed to notify Kobre & Kim of this Scheduling Order forthwith. This Court will resolve the motion on submission. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/17/2017) (cla)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 558 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 1 granting in part and denying in part #553 Letter Motion to Reopen Discovery for Limited Purposes. For the reasons set forth on the record at the February 17, 2017 hearing, the Government's request to compel production of the Martash and IKR documents, as detailed in the Government's letter dated February 10, 2017 (ECF No. 553, at 6-7) is granted. Defendants are directed to produce those documents by March 7, 2017. In addition, the Government's request to introduce the testimony of its expert forensic document examiner, George Virgin, (ECF No. 553, at 8-9) is granted. Defendants are authorized to take the deposition of Mr. Virgin and offer their own expert on the same issue. The Government is authorized to take a deposition of Defendants' expert in advance of trial. The Government's request to introduce witness Stanislav Gorins' interview statements (ECF No. 553, at 9) is denied.. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 2/17/2017) (cla) Modified on 2/23/2017 (cla).
February 16, 2017 Filing 557 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Paul M. Monteleoni dated February 16, 2017 re: Reply to Defendants' February 15 Letter. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
February 15, 2017 Filing 556 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Michael S. Kim dated February 15, 2017 re: Defendants' Request for Second Deposition of Mr. Browder. Document filed by William Browder.(Kim, Michael)
February 15, 2017 Filing 555 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam Abensohn dated February 15, 2017 re: Opposing Additional Discovery Sought By The Government. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two)(Abensohn, Adam)
February 10, 2017 Filing 554 LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Adam Abensohn dated February 10, 2017 re: Additional Discovery Defendants Seek To Obtain Prior To Trial. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Abensohn, Adam)
February 10, 2017 Filing 553 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Discovery for Limited Purposes addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Cristy Irvin Phillips dated 02/10/2017. Document filed by United States of America.(Phillips, Cristine)
February 10, 2017 Filing 552 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/25/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 10, 2017 Filing 551 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/25/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 2, 2017 Filing 550 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/25/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
February 2, 2017 Filing 549 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/25/2017 before Judge William H. Pauley, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2017.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 25, 2017 Filing 548 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William H. Pauley, III: Status Conference held on 1/25/2017. (Choi, Brian)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 547 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties having appeared for a status conference on January 25, 2017, the following scheduling order is entered on consent: 1. The Government shall produce any additional documents for Defendants' consideration by February 1, 2017. 2. The parties shall file letters advising this Court about any outstanding discovery issues and disputes, or proposed amendments to the Second Amended Complaint by February 10, 2017; responses to such letters shall be filed by February 15, 2017; and a conference regarding any such disputes will be held on February 17, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. 3. Any dispositive motion regarding the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed by February 28, 2017; the Government's opposition brief shall be filed by March 21, 2017; Defendants' reply shall be filed by March 28, 2017; and oral argument on the motion shall be held on April 5, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. 4. A joint pretrial order shall be filed by April 7, 2017. 5. Any motions in limine shall be filed by March 23, 2017; opposition briefs shall be filed by April 6, 2017; replies shall be filed by April 21, 2017; and oral argument on the motions in limine will be held on May 3, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. 6. A joint voir dire and request to charge shall be filed by May 9, 2017; and 7. Jury selection and trial will commence on May 15, 2017. Motions due by 5/23/2017. Responses due by 4/6/2017 Replies due by 4/21/2017. Oral Argument set for 5/3/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2017. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/25/2017) (kgo)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III. The status conference, originally scheduled for January 24, 2017, has been adjourned to January 25, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S Courthouse, on consent of the parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/19/2017) (anc)
January 12, 2017 Filing 545 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Renita Sharma on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Sharma, Renita)
January 12, 2017 Filing 544 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Samuel Reed on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Reed, Kevin)
January 12, 2017 Filing 543 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Faith E. Gay on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Gay, Faith)
January 12, 2017 Filing 542 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Michael Abensohn on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Abensohn, Adam)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER: The Prevezon Defendants are directed to retain new counsel by January 17, 2017. The parties are directed to appear for a status conference in Courtroom 20B at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse on January 24, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. (Status Conference set for 1/24/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/13/2016) (cla)
December 13, 2016 Filing 540 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #526 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd. USCA Case Number 16-132. Appeal from United States District Court for the Southern District of New York (Thomas P. Griesa, J.) from the denial of Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.'s motion to disqualify counsel for Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Alexander, LLC, Prevezon Soho USA, LLC, Prevezon Seven USA, LLC, Prevezon Pine USA, LLC, Prevezon 1711 USA, LLC, Prevezon 1810 LLC, Prevezon 2009 USA, LLC, and Prevezon 2011 USA, LLC. This case presents the "extraordinary circumstances" necessary to grant a writ of mandamus. We hold that the district court abused its discretion in denying the motion to disqualify. Accordingly, we grant the petition for a writ of mandamus and instruct the district court to enter an order disqualifying John Moscow and BakerHostetler LLP. Writ granted.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 12/13/2016. (nd)
October 18, 2016 Filing 539 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
June 20, 2016 Filing 538 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Cory Spencer Buland on behalf of Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. New Address: Susman Godfrey L.L.P., 1301 Avenue of the Americas, 32nd Floor, New York, NY, USA 10019, (212) 336-8330. (Buland, Cory)
June 20, 2016 Filing 537 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jacob W Buchdahl on behalf of Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. New Address: Susman Godfrey L.L.P., 1301 Avenue of the Americas, 32nd Floor, New York, NY, USA 10019, (212) 336-8330. (Buchdahl, Jacob)
April 29, 2016 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Judge Thomas P. Griesa is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
January 25, 2016 Filing 536 CORRECTED ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #526 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd. USCA Case Number 16-132. Appellant moves for a stay pending appeal. Appellee Prevezon Holdings Ltd. opposes a stay. Both parties move to file oversized briefs and to seal documents. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that Appellant's stay motion is GRANTED and the district court proceedings are STAYED for the duration of the appeal. See In re World Trade Ctr. Disaster Site Litig., 503 F.3d 167, 170 (2d Cir. 2007). It is further ORDERED that the motions to file oversized briefs and to seal documents are GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 01/25/2016. (nd)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #526 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd. USCA Case Number 16-132. Appellant moves Both parties move to file oversized briefs and to seal documents. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that Appellant's stay motion is GRANTED and the district court proceedings are STAYED for the duration of the appeal. See In re World Trade Ctr. Disaster Site Litig., 503 F.3d 167, 170 (2d Cir. 2007). It is further ORDERED that the motions to file oversized briefs and to seal documents are GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 01/25/2016. (nd)
January 21, 2016 Filing 534 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a motion proceeding held on 1/12/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 21, 2016 Filing 533 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: motion held on 1/12/2016 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 20, 2016 Filing 532 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated January 20, 2016 re: Request that the Court Exclude an Unauthorized Expert Report. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
January 19, 2016 Filing 531 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #463 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Gathered Through Use of Grand Jury Subpoenas, Criminal Mutual Legal Assistance Treaties, and Other Secret Foreign Communications. . Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul)
January 19, 2016 Filing 530 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated January 19, 2016 re: Issues Raised in Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Dismissal. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 529 OPINION #106144 re: #522 LETTER MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Certifying Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Jacob W. Buchdahl dated January 11, 2016. On January 8, 2016, this court denied a motion by non-party Hermitage Capital Management Limited to disqualify John Moscow and BakerHostetler as defense counsel in this litigation. Dkt. 521. Hermitage had, in effect, been allowed to intervene for that limited purpose. Hermitage now moves to certify that order for immediate appeal. Dkt. 522. For the reasons stated above, the court declines to certify its disqualification decision for immediate appellate review under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/15/2016) (adc) Modified on 1/20/2016 (ca).
January 15, 2016 Filing 528 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/6/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 15, 2016 Filing 527 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/6/2016 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 13, 2016 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #526 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
January 13, 2016 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #526 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp)
January 13, 2016 Filing 526 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #521 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-11833289. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Buchdahl, Jacob)
January 12, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Selection set for 1/27/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Oral Argument of defendants' motion to dismiss the second amended complaint and Government motions in-limine nos. 1,5 & 6 set for 1/20/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
January 12, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Scheduling Conference held on 1/12/2016. AUSAs Paul Monteleoni, Margaret Graham, Kristy Phillips and Jaime Nawaday, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys Mark Cymrot and John Moscow, representing all Prevezon Defendants. The Court addresses scheduling of trial, motion to dismiss and motions in-limine. The Court re-schedules jury selection for January 27, 2016 at 10:30AM, on consent of all parties. See transcript. The Court schedules a hearing on defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs second amended complaint (doc. No. 436), and, on the Governments motions in-limine nos. 1,5 & 6 for January 20, 2016 at 2:00PM. See transcript. So ordered. The Court also addresses sundry legal issues with counsel for the parties. See transcript. (Court Reporter: Andrew Walker) (Zaepfel, Kenneth) Modified on 1/13/2016 (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
January 11, 2016 Filing 525 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Support re: #436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt From the Deposition of John E. Rollins)(Cymrot, Mark)
January 11, 2016 Filing 524 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
January 11, 2016 Filing 523 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #522 LETTER MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Certifying Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Jacob W. Buchdahl dated January 11, 2016. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
January 11, 2016 Filing 522 LETTER MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Certifying Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Jacob W. Buchdahl dated January 11, 2016. Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buchdahl, Jacob)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 521 OPINION #106124: For the foregoing reasons, non-party Hermitage's motion to disqualify John Moscow and BakerHostetler is denied. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/8/2016) (kl) Modified on 1/11/2016 (ca). (Main Document 521 replaced on 1/11/2016) (kl).
January 8, 2016 Filing 520 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated January 8, 2016 re: Parole Letters. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Correspondence)(Cymrot, Mark)
January 7, 2016 Filing 519 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated January 7, 2016 re: In Response to the January 6, 2016 Filings from the Government and Hermitage Capital Management Limited. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
January 7, 2016 Filing 518 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/28/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 7, 2016 Filing 517 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 12/28/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 6, 2016 Filing 516 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/23/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 6, 2016 Filing 515 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/23/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Status Conference held on 1/6/2016. Counsel for the Government and the Prevezon Defendants, and non-party Hermitage Capital Mgmt., Ltd., present. The Court addresses legal issues with counsel. See transcript. (Court Reporter: Karen Gorlaski) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
January 6, 2016 Filing 514 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 12/18/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 6, 2016 Filing 513 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 12/18/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
January 6, 2016 Filing 512 DECLARATION of Cory S. Buland in Support re: #487 MOTION to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Attacking its Former Client.. Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Buchdahl, Jacob)
January 6, 2016 Filing 511 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #487 MOTION to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Attacking its Former Client. . Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Buchdahl, Jacob)
January 5, 2016 Filing 510 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated January 5, 2016 re: Motion to Disqualify Baker & Hostetler LLP. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
January 5, 2016 Filing 509 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Opposition re: #487 MOTION to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Attacking its Former Client.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Declaration from Professor Bruce Green, #2 Exhibit Copy of Excerpts of the Deposition of Paul Wrench, #3 Exhibit Copy of an Article in the Moscow Times, #4 Exhibit Copy of an Email from Margaret Graham)(Cymrot, Mark)
January 5, 2016 Filing 508 DECLARATION of Natalia Veselnitskaya in Opposition re: #487 MOTION to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Attacking its Former Client.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
January 5, 2016 Filing 507 DECLARATION of Denis Katsyv in Opposition re: #487 MOTION to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Attacking its Former Client.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
January 5, 2016 Filing 506 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #487 MOTION to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Attacking its Former Client. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
December 29, 2015 Filing 505 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/14/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 29, 2015 Filing 504 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/14/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/31/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 28, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 12/28/2015. Attorney Cory Buland, representing non-party/movant Hermitage Capital Management, Ltd. Attorneys Mark Cymrot, John W. Moscow, and Nick Rose, representing all Prevezon Defendants. AUSA Paul Monteleoni and AUSA Kristy Phillips, representing Plaintiff. The Court withdraws its opinion dated December 18, 2015 (see doc. No. 495). The Court establishes January 5, 2016 as the date by which the Prevezon Defendants may file a brief in response to the Motion filed by Hermitage Capital Mgmt., Ltd. to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostetler, LLP from representing the Prevezon Defendants in this action. See transcript. So ordered. (Court Reporter Ilena Lynch) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
December 28, 2015 Filing 503 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Cory S. Buland dated December 28, 2015 re: Ongoing harm to Hermitage. Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Buland, Cory)
December 24, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 12/24/2015. Counsel for the Government, the Prevezon Defendants, and non-party Hermitage Capital Mgmt., Ltd., present. Telephone conference held and concluded. The Court schedules a telephone conference for December 28, 2015 at 3:00PM to discuss whether the Court will reconsider its Opinion (doc. No. 495) to disqualify the Law Firm of Baker & Hostetler, LLP from representing the Prevezon Defendants in this action. (No transcript taken.) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
December 23, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 12/23/2015. Counsel for the Government, the Prevezon Defendants and non-party Hermitage Capital Mgmt., Ltd., present. See transcript. Telephone conference held and concluded. The Court treats the letter application by Government (doc. No. 502) as a motion for reconsideration of the Order certifying and staying the proceedings (doc. No. 501) and establishes a briefing schedule. See transcript. So ordered. (Court Reporter: Eve Giniger) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
December 22, 2015 Filing 502 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul Monteleoni dated 12/22/2015 re: Defendants' Application for an Order to Show Cause. Document filed by United States of America.(Phillips, Cristine)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE CERTIFIED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) AND WHY THESE PROCEEDINGS SHOULD NOT BE STAYED: Upon filing of the Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Order to Show Cause Why Appeal Should Not be Certified Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) and Why These Proceedings Should Not Be Stayed, it is hereby ORDERED that: Because the Order of this Court Dated December 18, 2015, Dkt. 495 (the "Order") disqualifying Defendants' counsel from this case involves controlling questions of law as to which there is substantial ground for difference of opinion, and because an immediate appeal from the Order may materially advance the ultimate termination of this litigation, this Court hereby certifies the Order for appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for,the Second Circuit under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b); The controlling question presented in the order being certified is: Should Defendants' counsel be disqualified from representing Defendants in this case based on a conflict of interest. The above-captioned action shall be stayed pending Defendants' appeal under 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/22/2015) (kl)
December 21, 2015 Filing 500 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated December 21, 2015 re: Enclosing Defendants' Proposed Order to Show Cause Why Appeal Should Not be Certified Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) and Why These Proceedings Should Not Be Stayed. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Show Cause, #2 Memorandum of Law)(Cymrot, Mark)
December 21, 2015 Filing 499 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cory Spencer Buland on behalf of Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Buland, Cory)
December 21, 2015 Filing 498 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob W Buchdahl on behalf of Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Buchdahl, Jacob)
December 21, 2015 Filing 497 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 12/11/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 21, 2015 Filing 496 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 12/11/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/14/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/24/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/23/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 495 OPINION #106085 (Opinion Withdrawn on 12/28/2015) The court does not take lightly the decision to disqualify counsel. However, the court is now convinced that it would be improper for BakerHostetler and Moscow to continue as counsel to defendants. For the reasons stated above, Hermitage's motion to disqualify BakerHostetler and Moscow as counsel to defendants is granted. (As further set forth in this Order) Attorney John W. Moscow terminated. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/18/2015) (kl) Modified on 12/28/2015 (ca). Modified on 12/28/2015 (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
December 18, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Oral Argument held on 12/18/2015 re: #487 MOTION to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Attacking its Former Client filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. Attorneys Jacob W. Buchdahl and Cory Buland, representing non-party/movant Hermitage Capital Management, Ltd.Attorney Mark Cymrot, representing all Prevezon Defendants. AUSA Paul Monteleoni, representing Plaintiff. The Court hears oral argument of non-party, Hermitage Capital Management, Ltds motion (doc. No. 487 filed on 12/15/15) to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostettler, LLP for attacking its former client. The Court reserves decision and stays any further discovery pending a ruling by the Court. See transcript. So ordered. (Court Reporter: Christine Sellin) (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
December 17, 2015 Filing 494 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated December 17, 2015 re: Hermitage Capital Management Ltd's Motion to Disqualify. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 16, 2015 Filing 493 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael S. Kim dated December 16, 2015 re: Baker Hostetler's Misrepresentations to the Court. Document filed by William Browder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scheduling Correspondence, #2 Exhibit Scheduling Correspondence, #3 Exhibit Scheduling Correspondence)(Kim, Michael)
December 16, 2015 Filing 492 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated December 16, 2015 re: Oral Argument on Hermitage Capital Management Limited's Motion to Disqualify. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 16, 2015 Filing 491 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/7/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 16, 2015 Filing 490 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/7/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 15, 2015 Filing 489 DECLARATION of Bruce A. Green, Esq. in Support re: #487 MOTION to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Attacking its Former Client.. Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Buchdahl, Jacob)
December 15, 2015 Filing 488 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #487 MOTION to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Attacking its Former Client. . Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D)(Buchdahl, Jacob)
December 15, 2015 Filing 487 MOTION to Disqualify John W. Moscow and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Attacking its Former Client. Document filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd..(Buchdahl, Jacob)
December 15, 2015 Filing 486 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated December 15, 2015 re: Request that the Court Add Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 1 to the Agenda for Argument on January 4, 2016. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER GRANTING BAKER BOTTS, L.L.P.'s MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD granting #474 Motion for Seth T. Taube, Richard B. Harper, and Vernon Cassin to Withdraw as Attorney. Before the Court is Baker Botts, L.L.P.'s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendants Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Alexander, LLC, Prevezon Soho USA, LLC, Prevezon Seven USA, LLC, Prevezon Pine USA, LLC, Prevezon 1711 USA, LLC, Prevezon 1810, LLC, Prevezon 2009 USA, LLC, Prevezon 2011 USA, LLC, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., and Kolevins, Ltd. Having considered the Motion, the Court is of the opinion that the motion should be granted, as Baker Botts, L.L.P. has demonstrated satisfactory reasons for withdrawal and withdrawal will not prejudice the litigants or cause any delay. It is hereby ORDERED that Baker Botts, L.L.P., and attorneys Seth T. Taube, Richard Benjamin Harper, and Vernon Anthony Andrew Cassin, III be withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendants Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Alexander, LLC, Prevezon Soho USA, LLC, Prevezon Seven USA, LLC, Prevezon Pine USA, LLC, Prevezon 1711 USA, LLC, Prevezon 1810, LLC, Prevezon 2009 USA, LLC, Prevezon 2011 USA, LLC, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., and Kolevins, Ltd. Attorney Seth T. Taube; Vernon Anthony Andrew Cassin, III and Richard Benjamin Harper terminated. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/15/2015) (kl)
December 14, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 12/14/2015. AUSAs Paul Monteleoni, Margaret Graham, Kristy Phillips and Jaime Nawaday, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys Mark Cymrot and John Moscow, representing all Prevezon Defendants. The Court addresses pending motions in-limine and sundry requests by the parties for production of outstanding document discovery. See transcript. The Court designates the following Government motions in-limine to be addressed at the January 4, 2016 hearing: Government motion in-limine nos. 1, 5 & 6. See transcript. So ordered. (Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
December 14, 2015 Filing 484 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/3/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 14, 2015 Filing 483 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/3/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 11, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 12/11/2015. AUSAs Paul Monteleoni, Margaret Graham, Kristy Phillips and Jaime Nawaday, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys Mark Cymrot, John Moscow, and Nick Rose, representing all Prevezon Defendants. (1) The Court reserves decision on all motions in-limine that have been filed to date (pending trial). See transcript. (2) The Court denies the Prevezon Defendants Motion (doc. No. 478) for a re-newed request for an order to show cause why William Browder should not be held in contempt of court and why the Government should not be sanctioned. (3) The Court directs the deposition of William Browder is to take place on December 18, 2015, and to be continued thereafter, if necessary. See transcript. So ordered. (Court Reporter Kelly Surina) (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
December 11, 2015 Filing 482 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated December 11, 2015 re: Enclosing Corrected Pages of Exhibit. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Pages to Exhibit)(Cymrot, Mark)
December 11, 2015 Filing 481 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #478 MOTION for Sanctions (Defendants' Motion For Renewed Request for an Order to Show Cause why William Browder Should not be Held in Contempt and why the Government Should not be Sanctioned). . Document filed by United States of America. (Graham, Margaret)
December 11, 2015 Filing 480 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Support re: #478 MOTION for Sanctions (Defendants' Motion For Renewed Request for an Order to Show Cause why William Browder Should not be Held in Contempt and why the Government Should not be Sanctioned).. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Documents Reporting Public Events, #2 Exhibit 2-Article from the Daily Beast, #3 Exhibit 3-Press Release, #4 Exhibit 4-Compilation of News Articles, #5 Exhibit 5-Press Release, #6 Exhibit 6-Screenshots of Twitter Feed, #7 Exhibit 7-Press Release, #8 Exhibit 8-Article from Radio Free Europe, #9 Exhibit 9-EMail Correspondence, #10 Exhibit 10-Harvard Business School Case Study, #11 Exhibit 11-Notice of Deposition, #12 Exhibit 12-EMail, #13 Exhibit 13-Facsimile, #14 Exhibit 14-Compilation of Tweets, #15 Exhibit 15-Press Release, #16 Exhibit 16-Minute Order, #17 Exhibit 17-Second Amended Notice of Deposition)(Cymrot, Mark)
December 11, 2015 Filing 479 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #478 MOTION for Sanctions (Defendants' Motion For Renewed Request for an Order to Show Cause why William Browder Should not be Held in Contempt and why the Government Should not be Sanctioned). . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
December 11, 2015 Filing 478 MOTION for Sanctions (Defendants' Motion For Renewed Request for an Order to Show Cause why William Browder Should not be Held in Contempt and why the Government Should not be Sanctioned). Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Renewed Request)(Cymrot, Mark)
December 10, 2015 Filing 477 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint. . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
December 10, 2015 Filing 476 DECLARATION of Seth T. Taube in Support re: #474 MOTION for Seth T. Taube, Richard B. Harper, and Vernon Cassin to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Taube, Seth)
December 10, 2015 Filing 475 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #474 MOTION for Seth T. Taube, Richard B. Harper, and Vernon Cassin to Withdraw as Attorney . . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Taube, Seth)
December 10, 2015 Filing 474 MOTION for Seth T. Taube, Richard B. Harper, and Vernon Cassin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER: The request in the last paragraph of the letter of Margaret Graham, dated November 25, 2015 (Dkt. 443), is denied. The court will rule regarding future expenses referred to in the letter when and if such requests are made. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/10/2015) (kl)
December 10, 2015 Filing 471 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 11/30/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 10, 2015 Filing 470 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTIONS held on 11/30/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 9, 2015 Filing 472 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
December 9, 2015 Filing 469 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
December 8, 2015 Filing 468 DECLARATION of Jaimie L. Nawaday in Support re: #466 MOTION in Limine .. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Nawaday, Jaimie)
December 8, 2015 Filing 467 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #466 MOTION in Limine . . Document filed by United States of America. (Nawaday, Jaimie)
December 8, 2015 Filing 466 MOTION in Limine . Document filed by United States of America.(Nawaday, Jaimie)
December 8, 2015 Filing 465 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Support re: #463 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Gathered Through Use of Grand Jury Subpoenas, Criminal Mutual Legal Assistance Treaties, and Other Secret Foreign Communications.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Press Release, #2 Exhibit 2-Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3-Excerpts of Hyman Deposition, #4 Exhibit 4-Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5-Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6-Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7-Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8-Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9-Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 10-Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 11-Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 12-Letter Dated June 15, 2015, #13 Exhibit 13-Letter Dated July 6, 2015, #14 Exhibit 14-Letter Dated November 2, 2015, #15 Exhibit 15-Filed Under Seal, #16 Exhibit 16-Subpoena to Bank of America, #17 Exhibit 17-Russian Response, #18 Exhibit 18-Filed Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 19-Filed Under Seal, #20 Exhibit 20-Filed Under Seal, #21 Exhibit 21-Filed Under Seal, #22 Exhibit 22-Filed Under Seal, #23 Exhibit 23-Filed Under Seal, #24 Exhibit 24-Excerpts of Schwartzman Deposition, #25 Exhibit 25-Filed Under Seal, #26 Exhibit 26-Excerpt of Rollins Deposition)(Cymrot, Mark)
December 8, 2015 Filing 464 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #463 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Gathered Through Use of Grand Jury Subpoenas, Criminal Mutual Legal Assistance Treaties, and Other Secret Foreign Communications. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
December 8, 2015 Filing 463 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Exclude Evidence Gathered Through Use of Grand Jury Subpoenas, Criminal Mutual Legal Assistance Treaties, and Other Secret Foreign Communications. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 8, 2015 Filing 462 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #461 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Reference to the Magnitsky Act. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
December 8, 2015 Filing 461 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Reference to the Magnitsky Act. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 8, 2015 Filing 460 DECLARATION of Kirill Kabanov in Support re: #458 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Preliminary Findings of Russian Human Rights Council.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Preliminary Report, #2 Exhibit 2-Report by NGO, #3 Exhibit 3-Report, #4 Exhibit 4-Advisory Legal Opinion, #5 Exhibit 5-Resolution on Indictment, #6 Exhibit 6-Court Order, #7 Exhibit 7-Sentence, #8 Exhibit 8-Order)(Cymrot, Mark)
December 8, 2015 Filing 459 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #458 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Preliminary Findings of Russian Human Rights Council. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
December 8, 2015 Filing 458 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Preliminary Findings of Russian Human Rights Council. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 8, 2015 Filing 457 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Support re: #455 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude the Report of the Parliamentary Assembly of the Council of Europe Authored by Andreas Gross.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Website Printouts, #2 Exhibit 2-EMail Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 3-Washington Post Article, #4 Exhibit 4-Interfax Russia & CIS General Newswire Article, #5 Exhibit 5-Azernews Article, #6 Exhibit 6-The National News Agency of Ukraine Ukrinform Article, #7 Exhibit 7-Report, #8 Exhibit 8-Excerpt of Paul Wrench Deposition)(Cymrot, Mark)
December 8, 2015 Filing 456 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #455 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude the Report of the Parliamentary Assembly of the Council of Europe Authored by Andreas Gross. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
December 8, 2015 Filing 455 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude the Report of the Parliamentary Assembly of the Council of Europe Authored by Andreas Gross. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 7, 2015 Filing 454 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated December 7, 2015 re: Enclosing Supporting Documents of the Order to Show Cause. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Order to Show Cause, #2 Declaration of Mark A. Cymrot in Support of Order to Show Cause, #3 Exhibit 1- Defendants November 16, 2015 Notice of Deposition, #4 Exhibit 2- Defendants November 23, 2015 Notice of Deposition, #5 Exhibit 3- Email Correspondence, #6 Exhibit 4- Defendants December 2, 2015 Notice of Deposition, #7 Exhibit 5- Press Release, #8 Exhibit 6- Articles from Media Outlets, #9 Exhibit 7- December 4, 2015 Deposition Notice of the Government, #10 Exhibit 8- Email Correspondence, #11 Exhibit 9- Email Correspondence)(Cymrot, Mark)
December 7, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2015. AUSAs Paul Monteleoni (appearing by telephone via request of the Court), representing Plaintiff. Attorneys Samir Ranade and Nick Rose, representing all Prevezon Defendants. The Court holds a hearing of Defendants ex-parte application for a motion, by Order to show cause, why an order should not be entered finding non-party witness, William Browder, in contempt for failure to appear at a Court-ordered deposition, etc. The Court denies the application of Defendants. The Court further directs the Government to arrange for the deposition of William Browder to be held on some date prior to January 5, 2016. See transcript. So Ordered. See also #453 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Discuss a Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of William Browder addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated December 7, 2015. filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. (Doc. no. 453 decided. See transcript of 12/7/2015.) (Court Reporter Sonia Keller) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
December 7, 2015 Filing 453 LETTER MOTION for Conference to Discuss a Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of William Browder addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated December 7, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 3, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 12/3/2015. AUSAs Paul Monteleoni, Margaret Graham, and Jaime Nawaday, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys Mark Cymrot, John Moscow, Nick Rose and Samir Ranade, representing all Prevezon Defendants. The Court discusses various legal issues and topics regarding pretrial submissions and disclosure, including proposed undisputed facts, motions in-limine, witness lists, jury instructions and charging conference. See transcript. The Court sets a hearing date for motions in-limine for January 4, 2016 at 2:00pm (if necessary). See transcript. (Court Reporter Steve Griffing) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
December 2, 2015 Filing 452 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark Cymrot, Esq. dated 12/2/2015 re: Government's Letter of December 1st. Document filed by Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd., Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree, Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (, Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., and all property traceable thereto.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 to Proposed Order: Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Cymrot, Mark)
December 1, 2015 Filing 451 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated December 1, 2015 re: Open issue following November 30 oral argument. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER: On November 24, 2015, the parties in the above-captioned matter jointly submitted a proposed scheduling order governing pre-trial submissions and disclosures. (Dkts. 440, 440-1). While the court declines to impose the scheduling order as drafted, the court hereby orders the parties to exchange witness and exhibit disclosures on December 2, 2015. Scheduling issues as to all other disclosures and submissions will be resolved by conference on December 3, 2015 at 3:00PM. (Status Conference set for 12/3/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Thomas P. Griesa.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/1/2015) (kl)
November 30, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2015 re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ss to Specified Unlawful Activity filed by United States of America. AUSAs Paul Monteleoni, Margaret Graham, Jaime Nawaday and Kristy Phillips, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys Mark Cymrot and John Moscow, representing all Prevezon Defendants. Oral argument held and concluded of Plaintiffs Motion for partial summary judgment as to specified unlawful activity (doc. No. 397) filed on November 3, 2015. The Court denies the motion. See transcript. So Ordered. (Court Reporter Paula Speer) (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
November 30, 2015 Filing 449 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/9/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 30, 2015 Filing 448 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/9/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 30, 2015 Filing 447 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/13/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 30, 2015 Filing 446 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/13/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/24/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/2/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 29, 2015 Filing 445 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark Cymrot, Esq. dated 11/29/2015 re: Further Opposition to the Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd., Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree, Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (, Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Levine, Paul)
November 25, 2015 Filing 444 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated November 25, 2015 re: Response to the Government's November 25, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
November 25, 2015 Filing 443 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Margaret Graham dated 11/25/15 re: Reimbursement of defense expenses. Document filed by United States of America.(Graham, Margaret)
November 24, 2015 Filing 442 DECLARATION of Paul M. Monteleoni in Support re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 24, 2015 Filing 441 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity. . Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Attachment 1 - Partial Summary Judgment Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Attachment 2 - Rule 56(g) Order)(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 24, 2015 Filing 440 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Margaret Graham dated 11/24/15 re: Schedule of Pretrial Disclosures and Submissions. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Re: Pretrial Disclosures and Submissions)(Graham, Margaret)
November 24, 2015 Filing 439 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERECE proceeding held on 11/19/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 24, 2015 Filing 438 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERECE held on 11/19/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/18/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/25/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 23, 2015 Filing 437 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
November 23, 2015 Filing 436 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Verified Complaint. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER granting #434 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/23/2015) (kl)
November 23, 2015 Filing 434 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated November 23, 2015. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 19, 2015 Filing 433 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/20/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 19, 2015 Filing 432 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/20/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER: The parties in this case are aware that the official close of document discovery was on September 15, 2015, and all discovery, including fact depositions and expert discovery, closed on October 15, 2015. While the Court is confident that the parties have made their best efforts to adhere to the above-mentioned deadlines, the Court is also aware that depositions and document exchanges have occurred well past those deadlines. As the trial date is fast approaching, any party with outstanding document productions is hereby ORDERED to produce all non-privileged documents responsive to document requests on or before November 23, 2015. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/19/2015) (kl)
November 19, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Scheduling Conference held on 11/19/2015. AUSAs Paul Monteleoni, Margaret Graham and Kristy Phillips, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys Mark Cymrot and John Moscow, representing all Prevezon Defendants. The Court addresses scheduling issues in advance of trial. The Court adjourns jury selection and trial from December 2, 2015 to January 6, 2016 at 10:30am. See transcript. (Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
November 19, 2015 Filing 429 DECLARATION of Todd Hyman in Support re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1-A9, #2 Exhibit B1-B31, #3 Exhibit C1-C4, #4 Exhibit D1-D5, #5 Exhibit E1-E4, #6 Exhibit F1-F2)(Graham, Margaret)
November 19, 2015 Filing 428 LETTER MOTION to Compel addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated November 18, 2015. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Pretrial Filing and Disclosure Schedule)(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 18, 2015 Filing 430 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
November 18, 2015 Filing 427 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/2/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
November 18, 2015 Filing 426 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 11/2/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2016.(Siwik, Christine)
November 18, 2015 Filing 425 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/6/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
November 18, 2015 Filing 424 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 11/6/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2016.(Siwik, Christine)
November 18, 2015 Filing 423 COUNTER STATEMENT TO #399 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
November 18, 2015 Filing 422 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCUMENT - DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Opposition re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 35-Declaration Oleg Lurie, #2 Exhibit 36-Excerpt from Deposition of Browder, #3 Exhibit 37-Excerpt of Firestone Deposition, #4 Exhibit 38-Excerpt of Firestone Deposition, #5 Exhibit 39-Excerpt of Firestone Deposition, #6 Exhibit 40-Article, #7 Exhibit 41-Article, #8 Exhibit 42-Article, #9 Exhibit 43-Excerpt of Rollins Deposition, #10 Exhibit 44-Excerpt of Hyman Deposition, #11 Exhibit 45-Excerpt of Browder Deposition, #12 Exhibit 46-Excerpt of Browder Deposition, #13 Exhibit 47-Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 48-Excerpt of Hyman Deposition, #15 Exhibit 49-William Browder's Testimony, #16 Exhibit 50-Part 1-William Browder's Conviction, #17 Exhibit 50-Part 2, #18 Exhibit 51-Article, #19 Exhibit 52-Excerpt of Browder Deposition, #20 Exhibit 53-Magnitsky's Statement, #21 Exhibit 54-Part 1-Mailing Slips, Bank Statements, #22 Exhibit 54-Part 2, #23 Exhibit 55-Mailing Slips, Bank Statements, #24 Exhibit 56-Mailing Slips, Bank Statements, #25 Exhibit 57-Part 1-Mailing Slips, Bank Statements, #26 Exhibit 57-Part2, #27 Exhibit 58-Mailing Slips, Bank Statements, #28 Exhibit 59-Mailing Slips, Bank Statements, #29 Exhibit 60-Mailing Slips, Bank Statements, #30 Exhibit 61-Mailing Slips, Bank Statements, #31 Exhibit 62-Mailing Slips, Bank Statements, #32 Exhibit 63-June 9, 2007 Decision, #33 Exhibit 64-October 22, 2007 Decision, #34 Exhibit 65-Excerpt of Firestone Deposition, #35 Exhibit 66-Excerpt of Argyridou Deposition)(Cymrot, Mark) Modified on 11/18/2015 (db).
November 18, 2015 Filing 421 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Opposition re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Russian Response to MLAT Request, #2 Exhibit 2-Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3-Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4-Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5-Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6-Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7-Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8-Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9-Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 10-Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 11-E-Mail, #12 Exhibit 12-Declaration of Neil Miclkethwaite, #13 Exhibit 13-Excerpt of Firestone Depostion, #14 Exhibit 14-Excerpt from Red Notice, #15 Exhibit 15-Excerpt from Deposition of Paul Wrench, #16 Exhibit 16-Excerpt from Deposition of Martin Wilson, #17 Exhibit 17-Excerpt of Firestone Depostion, #18 Exhibit 18-Excerpt of Alexandrou Deposition, #19 Exhibit 19-Powers of Attorney, #20 Exhibit 20-Part 1 - First Affidavit of Alexandrou, #21 Exhibit 20-Part 2, #22 Exhibit 21-Arbitration Ruling, #23 Exhibit 22-Response of Argyridou, #24 Exhibit 23-May 5, 2003 Arbitration Decision, #25 Exhibit 24-December 9, 2005 Arbitration Decision, #26 Exhibit 25-Excerpt from Browder Deposition, #27 Exhibit 26-Excerpt from Browder Deposition, #28 Exhibit 27-Filed Under Seal, #29 Exhibit 28-Filed Under Seal, #30 Exhibit 29-Filed Under Seal, #31 Exhibit 30-Excerpt from Deposition of Paul Wrench, #32 Exhibit 31-Excerpt from Deposition of Paul Wrench, #33 Exhibit 32-Excerpt from Deposition of Paul Wrench, #34 Exhibit 33-Filed Under Seal, #35 Exhibit 34-Filed Under Seal)(Cymrot, Mark)
November 18, 2015 Filing 420 DECLARATION of Natalya Veselnitskaya in Opposition re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Russian Court Decision, #2 Exhibit 2-Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3-Russian Prosecutor's Compliance With Court Order, #4 Exhibit 4-Part 1-Government's MLAT Request, #5 Exhibit 4-Part 2, #6 Exhibit 5-Response to MLAT Request, #7 Exhibit 6-Government's Production of the Response to MLAT Request)(Cymrot, Mark)
November 18, 2015 Filing 419 DECLARATION of Kirill Kabanov in Opposition re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Preliminary Report, #2 Exhibit 2-Report, #3 Exhibit 3-Report, #4 Exhibit 4-Advisory Legal Opinion Report, #5 Exhibit 5-Resolution on Indictment, #6 Exhibit 6-Court Order, #7 Exhibit 7-Sentence, #8 Exhibit 8-Order)(Cymrot, Mark)
November 17, 2015 Filing 418 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
November 16, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/17/2015 (kl)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 417 ORDER granting #416 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/16/2015) (kl)
November 16, 2015 Filing 416 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Connection with Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated November 16, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
November 13, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 11/13/2015. AUSA Paul Monteleoni, representing Plaintiff. Attorney John Moscow, representing all Prevezon Defendants. Attorney Alexander Willscher, representing non-party, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. The Court addresses deposition issues raised by non-party, HSBC, regarding voluntary rule 30(b)(6) deposition of non-party HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. (See doc. No. 414.) Separately, the Court denies the Prevezon Defendants oral application to enlarge the present briefing schedule of the Governments motion for partial summary judgment filed on Nov. 3, 2015 (doc. No. 397). See transcript. (Court Reporter Rose Prader) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
November 12, 2015 Filing 415 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #410 MOTION to Strike Document No. [398-399] and for a Protective Order or, in the Alternative, for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d). . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
November 11, 2015 Filing 414 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference Regarding Voluntary Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition of Non-Party HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A. addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Alexander J. Willscher dated November 11, 2015. Document filed by HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Draft Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1 to Draft Memorandum)(Willscher, Alexander)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER granting #409 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. So ordered. Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd. answer due 11/23/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C. answer due 11/23/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C. answer due 11/23/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd. answer due 11/23/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C. answer due 11/23/2015; Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd. answer due 11/23/2015; Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree answer due 11/23/2015; Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 ( answer due 11/23/2015; Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street answer due 11/23/2015; Ferencoi Investments, Ltd. answer due 11/23/2015; Kolevins, Ltd. answer due 11/23/2015; Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. answer due 11/23/2015; Prevezon 1810, L.L.C. answer due 11/23/2015; Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C. answer due 11/23/2015; Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C. answer due 11/23/2015; Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C. answer due 11/23/2015; Prevezon Holdings Ltd. answer due 11/23/2015; Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C. answer due 11/23/2015; Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. answer due 11/23/2015; Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C. answer due 11/23/2015. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/9/2015) (lmb)
November 9, 2015 Filing 412 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Support re: #410 MOTION to Strike Document No. [398-399] and for a Protective Order or, in the Alternative, for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d).. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Plaintiff's Response to First Set of Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit 2- Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit 3- Plaintiff's Amended Responses to First Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 4- Letter Dated June 15, 2015, #5 Exhibit 5- Defendants' Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents, #6 Exhibit 6- Subpoena, #7 Exhibit 7- Subpoena, #8 Exhibit 8- Subpoena, #9 Exhibit 9- Subpoena, #10 Exhibit 10- Government's Email, #11 Exhibit 11- Defendants' Cross-Notice of Deposition, #12 Exhibit 12- Service Email)(Cymrot, Mark)
November 9, 2015 Filing 411 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #410 MOTION to Strike Document No. [398-399] and for a Protective Order or, in the Alternative, for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d). . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
November 9, 2015 Filing 410 MOTION to Strike Document No. [398-399] and for a Protective Order or, in the Alternative, for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d). Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
November 9, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 11/9/2015. Attorney Mark Cymrot, representing all Defendants. Attorneys Michael Kim and Lindsay Weiss Harris, representing 3rd-party, William Browder. The Court discusses defendants motion to compel additional documents and witness testimony from non-party, William Browder. The Court grants defense counsels request to conduct additional deposition testimony of William Browder. See transcript. The Court directs defense counsel to properly reimburse travel and lodging expenses incurred by Mr. Browder during Mr. Browders previous trip to the United States for his deposition earlier in the year. See transcript. (This conference resolves issues consumed within letters of counsel related to doc. Nos. 361, 364, 369, and 410.) (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman) (Zaepfel, Kenneth) Modified on 12/3/2015 (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
November 9, 2015 Filing 409 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #381 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,, addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated November 9, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
November 6, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Discovery Hearing continued and concluded on 11/6/2015. AUSA Paul Monteleoni, AUSA Kristy Phillips, and AUSA Margaret Graham, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys Mark Cymrot and John Moscow, representing all Defendants. The Court continues [from 10/2/15] and concludes its discussion of letter briefs filed by Defendants pertaining to Defendants request to compel the Government to produce additional document discovery. This discussion resolves issues contained in Defendants letter motions (doc. nos. 379 and 382) filed on 10/22/15 and 10/26/15, respectively, and of Defendants letter filed on 10/28/15 (doc. No. 391). The Court also makes other sundry rulings. See transcript. (Court Reporter: Vincent Bologna) (Zaepfel, Kenneth). Modified on 11/9/2015 (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
November 6, 2015 Filing 408 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated November 6, 2015 re: Defendants' Letter re Partial Summary Judgment Motion. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 6, 2015 Filing 407 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
November 6, 2015 Filing 406 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated November 6, 2015 re: Correspondence Submitted by Government. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
November 5, 2015 Filing 405 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated November 5, 2015 re: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filed on November 3, 2015 and the Briefing Schedule Entered by the Court on November 4, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Supplemental Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B-Defendants' Notice of Deposition, #3 Exhibit C-E-Mail Dated October 30, 2015, #4 Exhibit D-Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition, #5 Exhibit E-E-Mail Exchange)(Cymrot, Mark)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER: On October 27, 2015, the government submitted a letter to the Court proposing November 3, November 17 and November 24, 2015 as potential dates for motions for partial summary judgment, oppositions thereto, and replies thereto, respectively. (Dkt. 387). Counsel to defendants asked that the Court deny the government's proposed briefing schedule, instead urging that motions summary judgment are improper here. (Dkt. 388). The government responded by arguing in part that their partial motion for summary judgment would be "narrowly targeted" and "intended to streamline the trial." (Dkt. 389). Having considered the letters submitted by the parties, the Court grants the government's partial summary judgment motion schedule. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/4/2015) (kl)
November 3, 2015 Filing 403 DECLARATION of HSBC in Support re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity.. Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
November 3, 2015 Filing 402 DECLARATION of Andreas Gross in Support re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 3, 2015 Filing 401 DECLARATION of Paul M. Monteleoni in Support re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity.. Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
November 3, 2015 Filing 400 DECLARATION of Todd Hyman in Support re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity.. Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
November 3, 2015 Filing 399 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
November 3, 2015 Filing 398 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity. . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
November 3, 2015 Filing 397 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Specified Unlawful Activity. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Partial Summary Judgment Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B - Alternative Rule 56(g) Order)(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 2, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Continuation of discovery telephone conference from 11/2/2015 to 11/6/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
November 2, 2015 Filing 396 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/13/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Siwik, Christine)
November 2, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 11/2/2015. AUSA Paul Monteleoni and AUSA Margaret Graham, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys Mark Cymrot and John Moscow, representing all Defendants. The Court discusses letter briefs filed by Defendants pertaining to Defendants request to compel the Government to produce additional document discovery. The Court sets a date of Nov. 6, 2015 at 2:30pm for a Court conference to continue discussion of these and other issues. See transcript. (Court Reporter Sonia Keller) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
November 2, 2015 Filing 395 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 10/13/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2016.(Siwik, Christine)
November 2, 2015 Filing 394 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated November 2, 2015 re: In Response to The Government's October 30, 2015 Letter to Compel Additional Documents From Defendants. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
October 30, 2015 Filing 393 LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Discovery addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Margaret Graham dated 10/30/15. Document filed by United States of America.(Graham, Margaret)
October 30, 2015 Filing 392 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lindsey Weiss Harris on behalf of William Browder. New Address: Kobre & Kim LLP, 800 Third Ave, Floor 6, New York, New York, 10022, 212-488-1200. (Harris, Lindsey)
October 28, 2015 Filing 391 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated October 28, 2015 re: Response to Executive Branch Discovery Letter From Paul Monteleoni Dated October 26, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
October 28, 2015 Filing 390 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated October 28, 2015 re: Response to Letter From Paul Monteleoni Dated October 26, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
October 28, 2015 Filing 389 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated October 28, 2015 re: Motion Schedule. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
October 28, 2015 Filing 388 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated October 28, 2015 re: To Correct the Government's Representation in its October 27, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
October 27, 2015 Filing 387 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Margaret Graham dated 10/27/15 re: Proposed schedule for partial motion for summary judgment. Document filed by United States of America.(Graham, Margaret)
October 27, 2015 Filing 386 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Margaret Graham dated 10/27/15 re: #382 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated October 26, 2015. . Document filed by United States of America. (Graham, Margaret)
October 26, 2015 Filing 385 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Cristine Irvin Phillips dated 10/26/2015 re: #379 LETTER MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated October 22, 2015. . Document filed by United States of America. (Phillips, Cristine)
October 26, 2015 Filing 384 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cristine Irvin Phillips on behalf of United States of America. (Phillips, Cristine)
October 26, 2015 Filing 383 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Margaret Graham dated 10/26/15 re: Defendants' Oct 22 Letter, Dkt. No. 380. Document filed by United States of America.(Graham, Margaret)
October 26, 2015 Filing 382 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated October 26, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Privilege Log)(Moscow, John)
October 23, 2015 Filing 381 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #174 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, against A DEBT OF 3,068,946 EUROS OWED BY AFI EUROPE N.V. TO PREVEZON HOLDINGS RESTRAINED BY THE GOVERNMENT OF THE NETHERLANDS ON OR ABOUT JANUARY 22, 2014, ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE STREET, NEW YORK, NEW YORK 10005, UNIT 1816, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER 5882 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 2011 USA, LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER 6021 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON SEVEN USA LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER 8084 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON SOHO USA LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER 8242 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON PINE USA, LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER 8293 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON ALEXANDER LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER 8349 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 1711 USA, LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER 9102 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 2009 USA, LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER 9128 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 1810 USA, LLC, APPROXIMATELY $1,046,530.04 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE, APPROXIMATELY $1,379,518.90 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE, APPROXIMATELY $4,429,019.44 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS ALEXANDER CONDOMINIUM, 250 EAST 49th ST, APPROXIMATELY $894,026.21 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE S, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., and all property traceable thereto.Document filed by United States of America. Related document: #174 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
October 22, 2015 Filing 380 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated October 22, 2015 re: Order Entered on September 24, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
October 22, 2015 Filing 379 LETTER MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce Documents addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated October 22, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Privilege Log)(Cymrot, Mark)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 378 OPINION #105971: In sum, and upon review of the briefing, the Court finds that the AVC alleges facts sufficient to support a reasonable belief that the Government will be able to meet its burden of proof at trial as to Prevezon Soho and Prevezon Alexander. Therefore, defendants' motion to vacate or modify the amended protective order is denied. However, the Court believes that the government is entitled to further amend the AVC in the form of the proposed SAVC. Consistent with this Opinion, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion listed as docket number 298. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/22/2015) (kl) Modified on 10/23/2015 (ca).
October 22, 2015 Filing 377 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
October 22, 2015 Filing 376 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
October 22, 2015 Filing 375 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
October 20, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Status Conference held on 10/20/2015. AUSA Paul Monteleoni, AUSA Margaret Graham and AUSA Kristy Phillips, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys John Moscow, Loura Alaverdi, and Nicholas Rose, representing all Defendants. The Court addresses discovery deposition issues raised by counsel, and continues this conference to October 21, 2015 at 3:00pm. See transcript. (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York and the United States Customs and Border Protection are directed to release and to transmit, from the property restrained pursuant to this Court's protective order dated November 5, 2014, Dkt. 173, all costs so incurred by Defendants and Deponents in attending the depositions in New York, to the client escrow account of Baker Hostetler LLP. Defendants and Deponents shall submit to the United States receipts of their costs, including but not limited to flights, ground transportation, hotels, meals, interpreters, and related expenses. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/19/2015) (kl)
October 16, 2015 Filing 373 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/1/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 16, 2015 Filing 372 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/1/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 15, 2015 Filing 371 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated October 15, 2015 re: The Court's Order of October 13, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
October 15, 2015 Filing 370 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
October 15, 2015 Filing 369 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated October 15, 2015 re: Response to October 9, 2015 Letter from William F. Browder. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
October 14, 2015 Filing 368 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated October 14, 2015 re: Defendants' Proposed Order Authorizing the Release of Restrained Funds to Cover Defendants' Deposition-Related Costs. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cymrot, Mark)
October 13, 2015 Filing 367 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
October 13, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 10/13/2015. AUSA Margaret Graham, representing Plaintiff. Attorney Mark Cymrot, representing all Defendants. The Court addresses issues raised in letters filed by the parties pertaining to funding of travel expenses for witness depositions. (See doc. Nos. 365 & 366.) The Court directs defense counsel to submit a proposed order, on notice. See transcript. (Court Reporter Paula Speer) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
October 13, 2015 Filing 366 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Margaret Graham dated 10/13/15 re: Defendants' letter of 10/12/15. Document filed by United States of America.(Graham, Margaret)
October 12, 2015 Filing 365 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated October 12, 2015 re: Request the Court's Assistance in Resolving the Following Disputes Between the Parties. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
October 9, 2015 Filing 364 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael S. Kim dated October 9, 2015 re: DISCOVERY FROM WILLIAM F. BROWDER. Document filed by William Browder.(Kim, Michael)
October 7, 2015 Filing 363 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated October 7, 2015 re: Response to Defendants' Surreply Opposing Amendment of the Complaint. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
October 5, 2015 Filing 362 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated October 5, 2015 re: Government's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint. Document filed by Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd., Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree, Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (, Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., and all property traceable thereto..(Levine, Paul)
October 5, 2015 Filing 361 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated October 5, 2015 re: Further discovery from William F. Browder. Document filed by Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd., Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree, Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (, Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., and all property traceable thereto..(Levine, Paul)
October 5, 2015 Filing 360 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated October 5, 2015 re: Further Support of Letter-Motion for Leave to Amend. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
October 2, 2015 Filing 359 DECLARATION of John W. Moscow in Opposition re: #347 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated September 21, 2015.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- September 23, 2015 Letter to John W. Moscow)(Moscow, John)
October 2, 2015 Filing 358 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #347 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated September 21, 2015. Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Government's Request to Amend the Amended Verified Complaint. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
October 1, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 10/1/2015. AUSA Paul M. Monteleoni, AUSA Margaret Graham, and AUSA Christine Phillips, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys John W. Moscow, Loura Alaverdi, and Vernon Cassin, representing all Defendants. The Court addresses issues raised in letters filed by the parties concerning depositions of party witnesses. (See doc. Nos. 355 & 357.) The Court directs counsel to submit a written response to the Court no later than close of business, October 2, 2015. See transcript. (Court Reporter Patricia Nilsen) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
September 30, 2015 Filing 357 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated September 30, 2015 re: Defendants' September 30 Request for Adjournment. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER: On September 24, 2015, the Court held a hearing for the parties in the above-captioned matter to discuss, inter alia, the proper venue in which the Government would take the depositions of Messrs. Katsyv, Litvak, and Krit; and the adequacy of the Government's offers of parole status and safe passage letters for Messrs. Katsyv, Litvak, and Krit from the proposed deposition date through and including the completion of the trial. As the Court held at the hearing, the depositions of Messrs. Katsyv, Litvak, and Krit shall take place in New York. See Hr'g Tr. of Sept. 24, 2015 at 33:12-22. The request to hold the depositions outside the United States is therefore denied. For the reasons discussed at the hearing, the Court believes that the Government has provided adequate assurances to Messrs. Katsyv, Litvak, and Krit such that they can and should appear at their depositions in New York. See Hr'g Tr. of Sept. 24, 2015 at 30:15-31:9; 32:12-33:10; 35:5-22. The request to sign the draft order appended to Dkt. 353 is therefore denied. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/30/2015) (kl)
September 30, 2015 Filing 355 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated September 30, 2015 re: Depositions of Denis Katsyv, Timofey Krit, Alexander Litvak, and Defendants 30(b)(6) Representative. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
September 29, 2015 Filing 354 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Margaret Graham dated 9/29/15 re: Reply to Defendant's September 28, 2015 Letter. Document filed by United States of America.(Graham, Margaret)
September 28, 2015 Filing 353 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated September 28, 2015 re: Response to Government's September 25, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Stipulation and Protective Order Governing Depositions, #2 Exhibit B- Proposed Protective Order)(Moscow, John)
September 25, 2015 Filing 352 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Margaret Graham dated September 25, 2015 re: Safe Passage. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nawaday, Jaimie)
September 24, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Status Conference held on 9/24/2015. AUSA Paul M. Monteleoni, AUSA Margaret Graham, and AUSA Jaimie Nawaday, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys John W. Moscow, Loura Alaverdi, Gabriella Volshteyn, and Vernon Cassin, representing all Defendants. The Court makes the following rulings: (1) As to Rule 30(b)(1) depositions of three defense witnesses, the Court directs the parties to submit a proposed order or stipulation to the Court. See transcript. So Ordered. (2) As to the request by Defendants that the Government produce relevant documents and information responsive to Defendants interrogatories and documents requests in its possession, custody and control, the Court directs that any agency within any branch of government that did its investigation must produce documents. See transcript. So ordered. (3) As to the proposal by the Government to file a second amended complaint, the Court directs Defendants to file any objections/submissions by close of business October 2, 2015. See transcript. So ordered. (This resolves doc. Nos. 343, 344, 347, 348, 349 & 350.) (Court Reporter Tom Murray) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
September 24, 2015 Filing 351 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated September 24, 2015 re: Defendants' September 23 Letter. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
September 23, 2015 Filing 350 LETTER MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce FBI Memorandum addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated September 23, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John) Modified on 9/24/2015 (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
September 22, 2015 Filing 349 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Jaimie L. Nawaday dated September 22, 2015 re: Location of Party Witness Depositions. Document filed by United States of America.(Nawaday, Jaimie)
September 22, 2015 Filing 348 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Margaret Graham dated 09/22/2015 re: #343 LETTER MOTION for Conference and Requesting That The Court Direct The Government to Produce Documents addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated September 17, 2015. . Document filed by United States of America. (Graham, Margaret)
September 22, 2015 Filing 347 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated September 21, 2015. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Comparison of Complaint Text)(Monteleoni, Paul) Modified on 9/24/2015 (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
September 22, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Paul Michael Monteleoni to RE-FILE Document #346 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated September 21, 2015. Use the event type Leave to File Document found under the event list Motions (Letter). (db)
September 21, 2015 Filing 346 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated September 21, 2015. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #2 Comparison of Complaint Text)(Monteleoni, Paul) Modified on 9/22/2015 (db).
September 21, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing/status conference set for 9/24/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
September 21, 2015 Filing 345 Costs Taxed as to #331 USCA Mandate,, USCA Case Number 14-4407. in the amount of $121.20. on 09/21/2015 in favor of United States of America, Plaintiff - Appellee against Prevezon Holdings Ltd., et al., Defendants - Appellants,. (nd)
September 18, 2015 Filing 344 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated September 18, 2015 re: Requesting the Court's Assistance to Resolve Disputes Concerning Depositions. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
September 17, 2015 Filing 343 LETTER MOTION for Conference and Requesting That The Court Direct The Government to Produce Documents addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated September 17, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John) Modified on 9/24/2015 (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
September 15, 2015 Filing 342 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated September 15, 2015 re: In Response to The Government's September 14, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
September 15, 2015 Filing 341 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 9/2/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 15, 2015 Filing 340 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/2/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 14, 2015 Filing 339 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul Monteleoni dated 9/14/2014 re: Amending the Complaint. Document filed by United States of America.(Nawaday, Jaimie)
September 11, 2015 Filing 338 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated September 11, 2015 re: Further Supplementing Defendant's September 1, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
September 9, 2015 Filing 337 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated August 31, 2015 re: Supplement to August 28, 2015 Letter Regarding Protective Order. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
September 9, 2015 Filing 336 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated August 28, 2015 re: Additional Facts Regarding Protective Order. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
September 3, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 10/15/2015. (kl)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER terminating #323 Letter Motion for Conference; terminating #327 Letter Motion for Conference; terminating #328 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. As the court ruled during yesterday's telephone conference, the deadline for the initial production of expert reports is set for September 29, 2015. The other previously set discovery deadlines of September 15, 2015 and October 15, 2015 remain in effect. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the letter motions listed as items 323, 327, and 328 on the docket. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/3/2015) (kl)
September 2, 2015 Filing 334 ANSWER to #174 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
September 2, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 9/2/2015. AUSA Paul M. Monteleoni and AUSA Jaime Nawaday, representing the Government. Attorneys John W. Moscow and Mark Cymrot, representing the Prevezon Defendants. The Court addresses letters submitted by the parties regarding outstanding discovery issues and makes rulings on the record. See transcript. (Court Reporter Steve Griffing) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
September 2, 2015 Filing 333 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated September 2, 2015 re: Reply to Defendants' September 1 Letter. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
September 1, 2015 Filing 332 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated September 1, 2015 re: In Response to The Government's Letters of August 28 and 31, 2015, and Pursuant to the Order of August 25, 2015.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Judge Griesa, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Second Amended Protective Order)(Moscow, John)
September 1, 2015 Filing 331 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to #187 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. USCA Case Number 14-4407.UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the appeal is DISMISSED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 09/01/2015. (nd)
August 31, 2015 Filing 330 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated August 31, 2015 re: Delivery of Supplement to August 28 Letter. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
August 28, 2015 Filing 329 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated August 28, 2015 re: Delivery of Response to August 25 Order. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
August 28, 2015 Filing 328 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated August 28, 2015. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
August 28, 2015 Filing 327 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated August 28, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #325 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Approved. So ordered. Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd. answer due 9/2/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C. answer due 9/2/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C. answer due 9/2/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd. answer due 9/2/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C. answer due 9/2/2015; Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd. answer due 9/2/2015; Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree answer due 9/2/2015; Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (answer due 9/2/2015; Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street answer due 9/2/2015; Ferencoi Investments, Ltd. answer due 9/2/2015; Kolevins, Ltd. answer due 9/2/2015; Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. answer due 9/2/2015; Prevezon 1810, L.L.C. answer due 9/2/2015; Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C. answer due 9/2/2015; Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C. answer due 9/2/2015; Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C. answer due 9/2/2015; Prevezon Holdings Ltd. answer due 9/2/2015; Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C. answer due 9/2/2015; Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. answer due 9/2/2015; Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C. answer due 9/2/2015; and all property traceable thereto. answer due 9/2/2015. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/28/2015) (kl)
August 27, 2015 Filing 325 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Amended Complaint and to File a Response to the Government's Interrogatories addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated August 27, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
August 26, 2015 Filing 324 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Margaret Graham dated 8/26/2015 re: #323 LETTER MOTION for Conference /Telephone Conference or a Hearing addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated August 26, 2015. . Document filed by United States of America. (Graham, Margaret)
August 26, 2015 Filing 323 LETTER MOTION for Conference /Telephone Conference or a Hearing addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated August 26, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER: The court orders the Government to set forth the specific facts known to the Government supporting a reasonable belief that the Prevezon Soho Account and the Prevezon Alexander Properties were involved in money laundering. Such facts must be detailed in a letter to the court to be filed no later than August 28, 2015. To the extent such facts are not alleged in the operative complaint, the Government must address whether such facts may be considered by the court in assessing the scope of the Amended Protective Order, or alternately whether leave to file a second amended complaint should be granted at this stage of the case. Defendants may respond, also by letter to the court, no later than September 1, 2015. The court further orders defendants to file a proposed modified protective order removing only the restraints on the Prevezon Soho Account and the Prevezon Alexander Properties. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/25/2015) (kl)
August 21, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd. answer due 8/28/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C. answer due 8/28/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C. answer due 8/28/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd. answer due 8/28/2015; Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C. answer due 8/28/2015; Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd. answer due 8/28/2015; Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree answer due 8/28/2015; Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (answer due 8/28/2015; Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street answer due 8/28/2015; Ferencoi Investments, Ltd. answer due 8/28/2015; Kolevins, Ltd. answer due 8/28/2015; Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. answer due 8/28/2015; Prevezon 1810, L.L.C. answer due 8/28/2015; Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C. answer due 8/28/2015; Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C. answer due 8/28/2015; Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C. answer due 8/28/2015; Prevezon Holdings Ltd. answer due 8/28/2015; Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C. answer due 8/28/2015; Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. answer due 8/28/2015; Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C. answer due 8/28/2015; and all property traceable thereto. answer due 8/28/2015. (kl)
August 21, 2015 Filing 321 DECLARATION of John W. Moscow in Support re: #298 MOTION to Vacate or Modify the Amended Protective Order.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- August 17, 2015 Letter to Paul M. Monteleoni, #2 Exhibit 2- August 17, 2015 Letter to John W. Moscow, #3 Exhibit 3- Conviction of Vyacheslav Khlebnikov, #4 Exhibit 4- Conviction of Viktor Markelov)(Moscow, John)
August 21, 2015 Filing 320 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #298 MOTION to Vacate or Modify the Amended Protective Order. . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
August 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting #318 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/21/2015) (kl)
August 21, 2015 Filing 318 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Amended Complaint and to File a Response to the Government's Interrogatories addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated August 21, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
August 21, 2015 Filing 317 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/13/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 21, 2015 Filing 316 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/13/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER granting #314 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/20/2015) (kl)
August 19, 2015 Filing 314 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated August 19, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
August 13, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Status Conference held on 8/13/2015. AUSA Margaret Graham, AUSA Jaime Nawaday and AUSA Andrew Adams, representing the Government. Attorneys Mark Cymrot, Loura Alaverdi, John W. Moscow, and Seth Taube, representing all Defendants. Status conference held as to letter dated 7/27/15 (Doc. No. 297) from the Government, and letters dated 7/29/15 (Doc. Nos. 302 & 308) from the Defendants. The Court establishes August 21, 2015 as the deadline for Defendants to file an answer to the Complaint as well as answers to interrogatories. See transcript. The Court adjourns the October 5, 2015 trial date to December 7, 2015. The Court directs all document discovery be completed by Sept. 15, 2015, and that all discovery be completed by October 15, 2015. See transcript. (Court Reporter Rose Prater) (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
August 12, 2015 Filing 313 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated August 12, 2015 re: Supplementing Arguments in Defendants' Letter Dated July 29, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Declaration of Denis Katsyv)(Moscow, John)
August 11, 2015 Filing 312 DECLARATION of Jaimie Nawaday in Opposition re: #298 MOTION to Vacate or Modify the Amended Protective Order.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Nawaday, Jaimie)
August 11, 2015 Filing 311 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #298 MOTION to Vacate or Modify the Amended Protective Order. . Document filed by United States of America. (Nawaday, Jaimie)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 310 OPINION #105761: These are only allegations. On a motion to dismiss, the court does not find facts. Instead, the court draws all reasonable inferences in plaintiff's favor, assumes all well-pleaded factual allegations to be true, and determines whether they plausibly give rise to an entitlement to relief. And, with respect to the forfeiture claim, the court determines only whether the AVC alleges facts sufficient to support a reasonable belief that the Government will be able to meet its burden of proof at trial. Under these standards, the AVC is sufficiently pleaded to allow the claims to proceed. The motions to dismiss are therefore denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions listed as docket numbers 210 and 212. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/7/2015) (kl) Modified on 8/10/2015 (soh).
July 30, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 8/13/2015 at 02:30 PM before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. (spo)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER terminating #297 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; terminating #302 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference; granting #304 Motion for Protective Order. The court finds that there is "good cause" to enter the requested protective order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c). The motion is therefore granted. The Government is precluded from taking discovery against Kolevins and Ferencoi until the court resolves their motion to dismiss, pending at docket item 210. The court will resolve that motion expeditiously. Additionally, the Government and the Prevezon Defendants have filed letter motions regarding a number of discovery disputes, and have submitted competing proposed schedules for discovery and a potential trial. (Dkt. Nos. 297, 302, 308.) The parties are ordered to appear before the court for a conference to resolve these issues on August 13, 2015 at 2:30p.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions listed as items 297, 302, and 304 on the docket. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 7/30/2015) (spo) Modified on 7/30/2015 (spo).
July 29, 2015 Filing 308 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated July 29, 2015 re: Response to Government's July 27, 2015 Letter Requesting Continuance of the Trial Date. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
July 29, 2015 Filing 307 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Seth T. Taube dated July 29, 2015 re: Governments July 8, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd..(Taube, Seth)
July 29, 2015 Filing 306 DECLARATION of Seth T. Taube in Support re: #304 MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Taube Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Taube Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Taube Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Taube Declaration)(Taube, Seth)
July 29, 2015 Filing 305 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #304 MOTION for Protective Order . . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd.. (Taube, Seth)
July 29, 2015 Filing 304 MOTION for Protective Order . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd..(Taube, Seth)
July 29, 2015 Filing 303 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 29, 2015 Filing 302 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated July 29, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice of Deposition, #2 Exhibit 2-E-Mail Dated July 16, 2015, #3 Exhibit 3-Letter Dated July 23, 2015, #4 Exhibit 4-Letter Dated July 24, 2015)(Moscow, John)
July 28, 2015 Filing 301 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 28, 2015 Filing 300 DECLARATION of John W. Moscow in Support re: #298 MOTION to Vacate or Modify the Amended Protective Order.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - July 8, 2015 Order of the US Court of Appeals for the 2nd Circuit, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of the Government's 30(b) Deposition, #4 Exhibit 4 - Confidential, #5 Exhibit 5 - Confidential, #6 Exhibit 6 - Excerpts from the Government's March 12, 2015 Brief, #7 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from the April 15, 2015 Deposition of William F. Browder, #8 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts from the Government's June 15, 2015 Letter to Defendants, #9 Exhibit 9 - Excerpts from the Russian Federation Letter to the Government, #10 Exhibit 10 - March 3, 2014 Grand Jury Subpoena issues to William F. Browder, #11 Exhibit 11 - Confidential, #12 Exhibit 12 - Statement of Denis Katsyv, #13 Exhibit 13 - Defendants' Proposed Order Vacating the Post-Complaint Amended Protective Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Defendants' Proposed Order Modifying the Post-Complaint Amended Protective Order)(Moscow, John)
July 28, 2015 Filing 299 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #298 MOTION to Vacate or Modify the Amended Protective Order. . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
July 28, 2015 Filing 298 MOTION to Vacate or Modify the Amended Protective Order. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
July 27, 2015 Filing 297 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated July 27, 2015. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Monteleoni, Paul)
July 10, 2015 Filing 296 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated July 10, 2015 re: Response to Government's July 10, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
July 10, 2015 Filing 295 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated July 10, 2015 re: Defendants' July 10, 2015 Letter. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul)
July 9, 2015 Filing 294 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated July 9, 2015 re: In Response to A.U.S.A. Paul Monteleoni's Letter seeking an Immediate Decision of the Currently Pending Motion to Dismiss.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to the Mr. Paul M. Monteleoni dated July 7, 2015)(Moscow, John)
July 8, 2015 Filing 293 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated July 8, 2015 re: Appeal Outcome and Pending Motions. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Monteleoni, Paul)
June 24, 2015 Filing 292 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jaimie Leeser Nawaday on behalf of United States of America. (Nawaday, Jaimie)
June 15, 2015 Filing 291 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated June 15, 2015 re: Discovery Schedule. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
June 4, 2015 Filing 290 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a argument proceeding held on 5/27/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 4, 2015 Filing 289 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: argument held on 5/27/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER: The court directs the parties to confer in good faith regarding the timing of their discovery obligations, and to present the court with a joint proposed discovery schedule or competing proposed schedules no later than June 15, 2015. In advance of the entry of a court-ordered discovery schedule, the court orders the Government to begin making prompt and broad disclosures to defendants regarding the Government's intended evidence and witnesses at trial. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 5/29/2015) (kl)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER: For the reasons discussed at the May 27, 2015 hearing, it his hereby ORDERED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction over William F. Browder and the return date on the Subpoena (Dkt 281-2) subject to the Court's order of March 10, 2015 (Dkt. 252) is adjourned until further Order of this Court. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 5/29/2015) (kl)
May 29, 2015 Filing 286 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul Monteleoni / Andrew C. Adams dated 5/29/2015 re: Discovery Scheduling. Document filed by United States of America.(Adams, Andrew)
May 29, 2015 Filing 285 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated May 28, 2015 re: Defendants Request That Court Approve Proposed Order. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 2- May 28, 2015 Email)(Cymrot, Mark)
May 28, 2015 Filing 284 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated May 28, 2015 re: Proposed Order to Adjourn Subpoena Served Upon William F. Browder. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cymrot, Mark)
May 27, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Status Conference held on 5/27/2015...in re: Letter request filed on May 13, 2015. AUSA Paul M. Monteleoni and AUSA Margaret Graham, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys Mark Cymrot, John Moscow, Paul Levine, Gabriella Volshteyn, and Seth Taube, representing all Defendants. Attorneys Michael Kim and Lindsey Weiss Harris representing non-party William F. Browder. Status conference held as to Letter Motion (Dkt. No. 281) filed on May 13, 2015 by defendants to compel non-party William Browder to produce additional documents and to appear for an additional deposition. The Court instructs counsel for Defendants to seek discovery at this time from the Government rather than Browder. The Court directs counsel to review whether additional document requests or interrogatories must be served in light of the filing of the Amended Verified Complaint. The Court directs the Government to promptly disclose to Defendants evidence and witnesses the Government intends to use at trial. (Doc. no. 281 termed.) (Court Reporter Jennifer Thun) (Zaepfel, Kenneth)
May 26, 2015 Filing 283 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael S. Kim dated May 26, 2015 re: Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by William Browder.(Weiss, Lindsey)
May 21, 2015 Filing 282 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated May 21, 2015 re: Correction of May 13, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
May 13, 2015 Filing 281 LETTER MOTION for Conference (Requesting Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated May 13, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-April 15, 2015 Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2-February 3, 2015 Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 3-October 18, 2006 Interview, #4 Exhibit 4-Part 1, December 4, 2012 Complaint, #5 Exhibit 4-Part 2, #6 Exhibit 4-Part 3, #7 Exhibit 4-Part 4, #8 Exhibit 4-Part 5, #9 Exhibit 4-Part 6, #10 Exhibit 4-Part 7, #11 Exhibit 4-Part 8, #12 Exhibit 4-Part 9, #13 Exhibit 4-Part 10)(Cymrot, Mark) Modified on 5/28/2015 (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING THE PRODUCTION OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION: Regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 5/4/2015) (ajs)
April 24, 2015 Filing 279 DECLARATION of John W. Moscow in Support re: #269 CROSS MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Defendants Proposed Compromise Order, #2 Exhibit 2- Comparison Documents)(Moscow, John)
April 24, 2015 Filing 278 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #269 CROSS MOTION for Protective Order . . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
April 21, 2015 Filing 277 DECLARATION of Paul M. Monteleoni in Support re: #267 MOTION for Protective Order Governing the Production of Confidential Information., #269 CROSS MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul)
April 21, 2015 Filing 276 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #267 MOTION for Protective Order Governing the Production of Confidential Information., #269 CROSS MOTION for Protective Order . . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER re: #274 Letter request regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule on Cross-Motions for a Protective Order, filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. In a letter dated April 17, 2015, the parties propose a briefing schedule for two pending cross-motions for a protective order. The court approves the proposed briefing schedule. The parties' request for oral argument on this issue is denied. Once the pending cross-motions are fully briefed, the court will approve one of the proposed protective orders on an expedited basis. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 4/21/2015; Replies due by 4/24/2015.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/20/2015) (kl)
April 17, 2015 Filing 274 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated April 17, 2015 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule on Cross-Motions for a Protective Order. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
April 3, 2015 Filing 273 DECLARATION of John W. Moscow in Opposition re: #267 MOTION for Protective Order Governing the Production of Confidential Information.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Redline Comparison, #2 Exhibit 2-Grand Jury Subpoena Request, #3 Exhibit 3-Document Request)(Moscow, John)
April 3, 2015 Filing 272 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #267 MOTION for Protective Order Governing the Production of Confidential Information. . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
April 3, 2015 Filing 271 DECLARATION of John W. Moscow in Support re: #269 CROSS MOTION for Protective Order .. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Redline Comparison, #2 Exhibit 2-Grand Jury Subpoena Request, #3 Exhibit 3-Document Request)(Moscow, John)
April 3, 2015 Filing 270 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #269 CROSS MOTION for Protective Order . . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
April 3, 2015 Filing 269 CROSS MOTION for Protective Order . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
March 31, 2015 Filing 268 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #267 MOTION for Protective Order Governing the Production of Confidential Information. . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
March 31, 2015 Filing 267 MOTION for Protective Order Governing the Production of Confidential Information. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
March 31, 2015 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Andrew Caldwell Adams to RE-FILE Document #266 MOTION for Protective Order . Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. ***REMINDER*** - Motion for a Protective Order WAS NOT FILED. First file Motion, then file and link any supporting documents. (db)
March 30, 2015 Filing 266 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Protective Order . Document filed by United States of America.(Adams, Andrew) Modified on 3/31/2015 (db).
March 26, 2015 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #267 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/17/2015. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
March 26, 2015 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #266 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/17/2015 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
March 25, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/16/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 25, 2015 Filing 264 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/16/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/26/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 24, 2015 Filing 263 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated March 24, 2015 re: Enclosing Proposed Counter Order Governing the Production of Confidential Information Pursuant to the Court's Directive at the Conference Held on March 16, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-The Government's Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B- Defendants' Proposed Counter Order, #3 Exhibit C- Red-Line Comparison)(Moscow, John)
March 20, 2015 Filing 262 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 3/9/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 20, 2015 Filing 261 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 3/9/2015 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 16, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Status Conference held on 3/16/2015. AUSA Paul M. Monteleoni and AUSA Margaret Graham, representing Plaintiff. Attorneys Mark Cymrot, John W. Moscow, Loura Alaverdi, Gabriella Volshteyn, and Seth T. Taube, representing all Defendants. Court schedules a trial date of October 5, 2015. The Court addresses the Government's Proposed Order Governing the Production of Confidential Information. (See Court Exhibit A attached.) The Court directs Defendants to present a proposed counter-order by March 24, 2015. Thereafter, the Court directs counsel to adhere to the following briefing schedule: the Government is to file its response in support of its proposed order by March 30, 2015, and Defendants are to file a response in support of their proposed order by April 3, 2015. Replies may be filed in due course. See transcript. (Court Reporter Steve Greenblum) (Zaepfel, Kenneth) Modified on 3/18/2015 (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
March 15, 2015 Filing 260 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Margaret Graham on behalf of United States of America. (Graham, Margaret)
March 13, 2015 Filing 259 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael S. Kim dated March 13, 2015 re: the Court's March 10, 2015 order. Document filed by William Browder.(Kim, Michael)
March 13, 2015 Filing 258 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsey Michelle Weiss on behalf of William Browder. (Weiss, Lindsey)
March 13, 2015 Filing 257 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roger Anson Burlingame on behalf of William Browder. (Burlingame, Roger)
March 13, 2015 Filing 256 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Sangyun Kim on behalf of William Browder. (Kim, Michael)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: William Browder substitutes Roger A. Burlingame as counsel of record in place of Randy M. Mastro, Richard W. Mark, Lisa H. Rubin, and Sarah L. Kushner of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP. So ORDERED. Attorney Roger Anson Burlingame for William Browder added. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/12/2015) (ajs)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: William Browder substitutes Lindsey M. Weiss as counsel of record in place of Randy M. Mastro, Richard W. Mark, Lisa H. Rubin, and Sarah L. Kushner of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP. So ORDERED. Attorney Lindsey Michelle Weiss for William Browder added. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/12/2015) (ajs)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: William Browder substitutes Michael S. Kim as counsel of record in place of Randy M. Mastro, Richard W. Mark, Lisa H. Rubin, and Sarah L. Kushner of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP. So ORDERED. Attorney Michael Sangyun Kim for William Browder added. Attorney Randy M. Mastro and Lisa Heather Rubin terminated. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/12/2015) (ajs)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER: For the reasons discussed at the March 9, 2015 hearing, the court grants the motion to quash the Aspen Subpoenas purportedly served on William F. Browder ("Browder") and other non-parties. (Dkt. No. 111). For the reasons also discussed at the March 9, 2015 hearing, the court holds that Browder was properly served with the New York Subpoena. The court further finds that Browder "regularly transacts business in person" in New York as CEO of Hermitage Capital, and as an author and activist. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(c). The court thus holds that Browder is subject to deposition in New York under Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The New York Subpoena is now returnable April 15, 2015. The court reiterates the need to minimize the time and expense involved in litigating any remaining issues pertaining to the New York Subpoena. To that end, the parties and Browder should confer to narrow such issues and to reach agreements on scope and confidentiality. If issues remain in dispute, the parties and Browder shall submit letters to the court outlining their positions no later than March 13, 2015, in advance of the next scheduled status conference. Such letters must not exceed three pages. This order resolves the entries listed as items #111 and #226 on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/10/2015) (ajs)
March 9, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Oral Argument held on 3/9/2015 re: #111 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties. filed by Victoria Tarantino, Acme Property Management, Inc., Michael Cassidy Foley, Sundance Aspen, LLC, William Browder, Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC, #226 Order to Show Cause. Attorney, Randy M. Mastro, representing non-party, William Browder. Attorney, Mark Cymrot, representing all Defendants. AUSA, Paul M. Monteleoni, representing the Government. Oral argument held and concluded of Motion filed on 9/12/14 by non-party, William Browder, to Quash Subpoena (doc. # 111), and of Order to Show Cause filed on 2/9/15 (doc. #226) as to (1) whether William Browder was properly served in either Aspen or New York, and (2) whether Browder is subject to the Aspen Subpoena or the New York Subpoena consistent with FRCP 45. The Court rules as follows: (1) the motion is granted as to the Motion to quash the Aspen Subpoenas; and (2) Browder was properly served with the New York Subpoena, and the New York Subpoena complies with Rule 45. The return date of the New York Subpoena is now April 15, 2015. (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) (Zaepfel, Kenneth) Modified on 3/18/2015 (Zaepfel, Kenneth).
March 8, 2015 Filing 251 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated March 8, 2015 re: New Issues Raised in Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of the February 9, 2015 Order to Show Cause. Document filed by William Browder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Rubin, Lisa)
March 6, 2015 Filing 250 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated March 6, 2015 re: Schedule for Further Proceedings Regarding Subpoenas. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
March 2, 2015 Filing 249 DECLARATION of Oleg Lurie in Support re: #226 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Cymrot, Mark)
March 2, 2015 Filing 248 DECLARATION of Michael Friedman in Support re: #226 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
March 2, 2015 Filing 247 DECLARATION of Mary C. Benedetto in Support re: #226 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
March 2, 2015 Filing 246 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Support re: #226 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. AGLN Tweet Browder Daily Show, #2 Exhibit 2. Red Notice Excerpt 264-65, #3 Exhibit 3. HermitageTV YouTube Screenshots, #4 Exhibit 4. NJ Dept. of Treasury Division of Taxation re Pepperdine, #5 Exhibit 5. Company Profile of Pepperdine Holdings Limited)(Cymrot, Mark)
March 2, 2015 Filing 245 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #226 Order to Show Cause,,, . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
February 23, 2015 Filing 244 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #226 Order to Show Cause,,, NON-PARTY WILLIAM BROWDERS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO THE FEBRUARY 9, 2015 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CONCERNING THE NEW YORK SUBPOENA. Document filed by William Browder. (Mastro, Randy)
February 23, 2015 Filing 243 DECLARATION of William F. Browder in Opposition re: #226 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by William Browder. (Mastro, Randy)
February 23, 2015 Filing 242 DECLARATION of JULEANNA GLOVER in Opposition re: #226 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by William Browder. (Mastro, Randy)
February 23, 2015 Filing 241 DECLARATION of Lisa H. Rubin, Esq. in Opposition re: #226 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by William Browder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Mastro, Randy)
February 20, 2015 Filing 240 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Support re: #212 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Verified Complaint.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cymrot, Mark)
February 20, 2015 Filing 239 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #212 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Verified Complaint. . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
February 20, 2015 Filing 238 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd.. (Taube, Seth)
February 19, 2015 Filing 237 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #235 Letter Motion, re: Leave to File Excess Pages on Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/19/2015) (ajs) Modified on 2/19/2015 (ajs). Modified on 2/24/2015 (ajs).
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 OPINION #105259: Global's motion to quash is granted. The Government's motion to quash in part is denied as moot. Defendants' motion to compel is denied. This opinion resolves the motions listed in docket item 1 of the miscellaneous action, 14-mc-00318. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/19/2015) (ajs) Modified on 2/20/2015 (soh).
February 18, 2015 Filing 235 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated February 18, 2015. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER: On February 3, 2015, defendants attempted personal service of a subpoena to testify at a deposition in New York City on William Browder ("the New York Subpoena"). Defendants previously attempted to serve Browder with a subpoena in Aspen, Colorado ("the Aspen Subpoena"). Defendants have also issued subpoenas in Delaware to Hermitage Global Partners, L.P., and to Browder in his purported capacity as a director of Hermitage Global Partners, L.P. ("the Delaware Subpoenas"). On February 9, 2015, this court entered an Order to Show Cause, returnable March 9, 2015, relating to the New York Subpoena. This is the date of a previously scheduled hearing addressing the Aspen Subpoena. Counsel for Browder requests that the court rescind the Order to Show Cause entered on February 9, 2015. (ECF No. 231.) The request is denied. The original return date on the New York Subpoena - February 17, 2015 is stayed pending the outcome of the March 9 hearing. The hearing scheduled on March 9 is limited to two issues: (1) whether Browder was properly served in either Aspen or New York, and (2) whether Browder is subject to the Aspen Subpoena or the New York Subpoena consistent with Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. To the extent Browder intends to file opposition papers relating to the Order to Show Cause, such papers should be limited to whether Browder was properly served in New York, and whether Browder is subject to the New York Subpoena under Rule 45. The court does not intend to address motions related to the Delaware Subpoenas at the March 9 hearing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/11/2015) (ajs)
February 11, 2015 Filing 233 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mason C. Simpson dated 02/11/2015 re: March 9, 2015 Hearing. Document filed by Hermitage Global Partners LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Simpson, Mason)
February 11, 2015 Filing 232 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Seth T. Taube dated February 11, 2015 re: Response to Mr. Browders February 10, 2015 Letter. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Taube, Seth)
February 10, 2015 Filing 231 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated February 10, 2015 re: In response to the ex parte Order to Show Cause signed on February 9, 2015. Document filed by William Browder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mastro, Randy)
February 10, 2015 Filing 230 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Seth T. Taube dated February 10, 2015 re: March 9, 2015 Hearing. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Taube, Seth)
February 9, 2015 Filing 229 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim., #212 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Verified Complaint. . Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
February 9, 2015 Filing 228 DECLARATION of Seth T. Taube in Support re: #226 Order to Show Cause,,,. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Taube Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Taube Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Taube Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Taube Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 to Taube Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 to Taube Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 to Taube Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 to Taube Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 to Taube Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 to Taube Declaration, #11 Exhibit 11 to Taube Declaration, #12 Exhibit 12 to Taube Declaration, #13 Exhibit 13 to Taube Declaration, #14 Exhibit 14 to Taube Declaration, #15 Exhibit 15 to Taube Declaration, #16 Certificate of Service)(Taube, Seth)
February 9, 2015 Filing 227 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #226 Order to Show Cause,,, . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Taube, Seth)
February 9, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 3/2/2015. (ajs)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon filing of Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Application for Order to Show Cause Why William Browder Should Not Be Ordered to Attend a Deposition and Produce Documents, and all of the papers and prior proceedings here, it is ORDERED that: William Browder shall show cause before this Court, at Courtroom 26B, Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, on March 9, 2015 at 2:30 p.m., why an order should not be entered for his attendance at a deposition and production of documents. William Browder shall file opposition papers no later than Feb. 23, 2015, and Defendants shall file reply papers no later than March 2, 2015. SO ORDERED. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/9/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Show Cause Response due by 2/23/2015. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/9/2015) (ajs)
February 5, 2015 Filing 225 NOTICE of Filing Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(b)(4) Statement. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Declaration of Service)(Cymrot, Mark)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting #221 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference previously scheduled for February 12, 2015 is adjourned to March 9, 2015 at 2:30 p.m. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the letter motion listed as item 221 on the docket. SO ORDERED. Oral Argument set for 3/9/2015 at 02:30 PM before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/5/2015) (ajs)
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting #222 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/3/2015) (ajs)
February 3, 2015 Filing 222 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated February 3, 2015. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
January 29, 2015 Filing 221 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference / Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena to William Browder to February 27, 2015 addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated January 29, 2015. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #217 Letter Motion for Conference ; granting #219 Letter Motion for Conference. On January 22, 2015, the parties filed a joint request for a hearing on the Motion to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties (Dkt. No. #111 ). The request is granted. The court will hear oral argument on the limited issues of service and compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45. The hearing will be held on February 12, 2015 at 11 a.m. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the letter motions listed as items 217 and 219 on the docket. SO ORDERED. Oral Argument set for 2/12/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/28/2015) (ajs)
January 22, 2015 Filing 219 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference / Hearing on the Motion to Quash the Subpoena to William Browder addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated January 22, 2015. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
January 16, 2015 Filing 218 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated January 16, 2015 re: response to Defendants' hearing request. Document filed by William Browder.(Mastro, Randy)
January 15, 2015 Filing 217 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #111 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties . addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Seth T. Taube dated January 15, 2015. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Taube, Seth)
January 13, 2015 Filing 216 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated January 13, 2015 re: Docketing of February 25, 2014 Letter. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Monteleoni, Paul)
January 12, 2015 Filing 215 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #111 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties . REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW ON NON-PARTY WILLIAM BROWDERS MOTION TO QUASH THE ASPEN SUBPOENA BECAUSE HE IS NOT SUBJECT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 45 AND DEFENDANTS FAILED TO SERVE THAT SUBPOENA. Document filed by William Browder. (Mastro, Randy)
January 12, 2015 Filing 214 DECLARATION in Support re: #212 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Verified Complaint.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Transcript of March 3, 2014 Deposition of the United States, #2 Exhibit 2- Modified Version of the Exhibit B to the Government's Amended Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3- Ex Parte Application for a Post-Complaint Protective Order)(Cymrot, Mark)
January 12, 2015 Filing 213 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #212 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Verified Complaint. . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
January 12, 2015 Filing 212 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Verified Complaint. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
January 12, 2015 Filing 211 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd.. (Taube, Seth)
January 12, 2015 Filing 210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting #208 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. APPROVED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/12/2015) (ajs)
January 9, 2015 Filing 208 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated January 9, 2015. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 207 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 206 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 205 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 204 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon Holdings Ltd.. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 203 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 202 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Martash Holdings. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 201 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 200 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon 1810, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 199 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Denis Katsyv. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 198 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 197 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 196 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by IKR. (Moscow, John)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #191 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. APPROVED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/16/2014) (ajs)
December 16, 2014 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #195 Memo endorsement. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ajs)
December 16, 2014 Filing 194 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated December 16, 2014 re: In Response to Randy Mastro's Letter dated December 15, 2014.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 15, 2014 Filing 193 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated December 15, 2014 re: Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Document filed by William Browder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Mastro, Randy)
December 15, 2014 Filing 192 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated December 15, 2014 re: In Opposition to William Browder's Request for an Extension of Time to File His Reply In Support of His Motion to Quash Subpoenas. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 15, 2014 Filing 191 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated 12/15/2014. Document filed by William Browder.(Mastro, Randy)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED THAT: 1. The time by which the Defendants may move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended up to and including January 12, 2015. 2. Plaintiff shall file its opposition brief by February 9, 2015. 3. Defendants shall file their reply brief by February 20, 2015. 4. Nothing in this Stipulation is a waiver of any of the parties' rights and, except as expressly set forth herein, the parties to the Stipulation reserve all rights and defenses they may have, and entry into this Stipulation shall not impair or othe1wise affect such rights and defenses, including the right to challenge the jurisdiction of the court. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Motions due by 1/12/2015., Responses due by 2/9/2015, Replies due by 2/20/2015.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/12/2014) (ajs)
December 10, 2014 Filing 189 DECLARATION of Seth T. Taube in Opposition re: #111 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties .. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Taube Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Taube Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Taube Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Taube Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 to Taube Declaration, #6 Exhibit 6 to Taube Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 to Taube Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 to Taube Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9 to Taube Declaration, #10 Exhibit 10 to Taube Declaration, #11 Exhibit 11 to Taube Declaration, #12 Exhibit 12 to Taube Declaration, #13 Exhibit 13 to Taube Declaration, #14 Exhibit 14 to Taube Declaration, #15 Exhibit 15 to Taube Declaration, #16 Exhibit 16 to Taube Declaration, #17 Exhibit 17 to Taube Declaration, #18 Exhibit 18 to Taube Declaration, #19 Exhibit 19 to Taube Declaration, #20 Exhibit 20 to Taube Declaration, #21 Exhibit 21 to Taube Declaration, Part 1 of 3, #22 Exhibit 21 to Taube Declaration, Part 2 of 3, #23 Exhibit 21 to Taube Declaration, Part 3 of 3, #24 Exhibit 22 to Taube Declaration, #25 Exhibit 23 to Taube Declaration, #26 Exhibit 24 to Taube Declaration, #27 Exhibit 25 to Taube Declaration, #28 Exhibit 26 to Taube Declaration)(Taube, Seth)
December 10, 2014 Filing 188 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #111 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties . . Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Taube, Seth)
November 25, 2014 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #187 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
November 24, 2014 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #187 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp)
November 24, 2014 Filing 187 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from #173 Protective Order. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-10346713. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Cymrot, Mark)
November 21, 2014 Filing 186 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #111 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties . SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF NON-PARTY WILLIAM BROWDER CONCERNING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO SERVE THE ASPEN SUBPOENA AND LIMITS ON THE COURT'S ENFORCEMENT OF THAT SUBPOENA CONSISTENT WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 45. Document filed by William Browder. (Rubin, Lisa)
November 21, 2014 Filing 185 DECLARATION of WILLIAM F. BROWDER in Support re: #111 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties .. Document filed by William Browder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Rubin, Lisa)
November 21, 2014 Filing 184 DECLARATION of LISA H. RUBIN in Support re: #111 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties .. Document filed by William Browder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51, #2 Exhibit 52, #3 Exhibit 53)(Rubin, Lisa)
November 20, 2014 Filing 183 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #182 Letter filed by William Browder. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION DENIED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/20/2014) (ajs)
November 19, 2014 Filing 182 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated 11/19/2014 re: Motion Practice Scheduling. Document filed by William Browder.(Mastro, Randy)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED THAT: 1. The time by which the Defendants may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint is extended up to and including December 19, 2014. 2. The Government shall file its opposition brief by January 12, 2015. 3. Defendants shall file their reply brief by January 23, 2015. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 12/19/2014. Responses due by 1/12/2015, Replies due by 1/23/2015.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/18/2014) (ajs)
November 18, 2014 Filing 179 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 11/5/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 18, 2014 Filing 178 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 11/5/2014 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER: 1. The Court will reserve decision on the permissible scope of the Browder Subpoena, if any, and will first determine whether Browder was properly served with the Browder Subpoena and is subject to deposition under the Browder Subpoena consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. 2. By no later than November 21, 2014, Browder will file supplemental papers in support of the Motion to Quash on the issues of whether he was properly served with the Browder Subpoena and is subject to deposition under the Browder Subpoena consistent with Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. 3. Defendants shall file any opposition papers by no later than December 10, 2014. 4. Browder shall file any reply papers by no later than December 19, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/14/2014) (ajs)
November 14, 2014 Filing 177 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mason C. Simpson dated 11/14/2014 re: responding to Baker Hostetler's November 13, 2014 letter. Document filed by Hermitage Global Partners LP.(Simpson, Mason)
November 14, 2014 Filing 176 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mason Chandler Simpson on behalf of Hermitage Global Partners LP. (Simpson, Mason)
November 7, 2014 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: #175 Order,,, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (ama)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER: On October 13, 2014, non-parties William Browder and Hermitage Capital Management Ltd. filed four documents under seal. See Dkt. Nos. 145-1, 145-2, 145-3, 145-4. These documents shall remain under seal. The transcript of the ex parte conference held on October 14, 2014 shall be unsealed. The following pages and lines of the transcript of that conference shall be redacted: 2:21-25, 3:19-5:24; 6:7-8; 7:1-9:1; 9:11-14; 9:17-23; 9:25- 15:12; 15:16-16:2; 16:25-18:4; 19:11-13; 21:18-19; 24:1-12; and 28:12-15. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/07/2014) (ama)
November 5, 2014 Filing 174 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,,,, against Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE STREET, NEW YORK, NEW YORK 10005, UNIT 1816, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********8293 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON ALEXANDER LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********8084 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON SOHO USA LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********6021 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON SEVEN USA LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********8349 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 1711 USA, LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********9102 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 2009 USA, LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********8242 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON PINE USA, LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********5882 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 2011 USA, LLC, ANY AND ALL FUNDS ON DEPOSIT IN BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT NUMBER **********9128 HELD IN THE NAME OF PREVEZON 1810 USA, LLC, APPROXIMATELY $1,379,518.90 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE STREET, NEW YORK, NEW YORK 10005, UNIT 2009, APPROXIMATELY $4,429,019.44 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS ALEXANDER CONDOMINIUM, 250 EAST 49th STREET, NEW YORK, NEW YORK 10017, UNIT COMM3, APPROXIMATELY $1,046,530.04 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE STREET, NEW YORK, NEW YORK 10005, UNIT 2308, APPROXIMATELY $894,026.21 HELD BY THE UNITED STATES AS A SUBSTITUTE RES FOR ALL RIGHT, TITLE AND INTEREST IN THE REAL PROPERTY AND APPURTENANCES KNOWN AS THE 20 PINE STREET CONDOMINIUM, 20 PINE STREET, NEW YORK, NEW YORK 10005, UNIT 1711, A DEBT OF 3,068,946 EUROS OWED BY AFI EUROPE N.V. TO PREVEZON HOLDINGS RESTRAINED BY THE GOVERNMENT OF THE NETHERLANDS ON OR ABOUT JANUARY 22, 2014, and all property traceable thereto.Document filed by United States of America. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 3/8/2018, Doc. #762 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Regarding restraint of defendants in rem. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/5/2014) (ajs) Modified on 11/5/2014 (ajs). Modified on 3/8/2018 (jwh).
November 5, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Plaintiff by Paul Monteleoni, AUSA, defendant by Laura Alaverdi, Mark Cymrot, John Moscow, Gabriella Volshteya, Ricard Harper and Vernon Cassin. The court grants the government's application to file an amended complaint. The court grants the government's application to file an amended protective order. Status Conference held on 11/5/2014. (Court Reporter Carol Ganley) (Beale, Jon)
November 4, 2014 Filing 172 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated November 4, 2014 re: Staying proceedings on the Motion to Quash. Document filed by Acme Property Management, Inc., William Browder, Michael Cassidy Foley, Sundance Aspen, LLC, Victoria Tarantino, Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
November 4, 2014 Filing 171 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated November 4, 2014 re: Documents Relevant to Protective Order Motion. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Monteleoni, Paul)
November 3, 2014 Filing 170 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated 11/03/2014 re: In Response to the Government's Letter of October 31, 2014.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cymrot, Mark)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER: The Motion to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties (E.C.F. No. #111 ) shall be stayed through the November 5, 2014 hearing. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/31/2014) (ajs)
October 31, 2014 Filing 168 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated 10/31/2014 re: In Camera Submissions. Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd..(Rubin, Lisa)
October 31, 2014 Filing 167 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint,,,,, addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated October 31, 2014. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Attachment 2 - Proposed Amended Protective Order)(Monteleoni, Paul)
October 30, 2014 Filing 166 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated 10/30/2014 re: Supplement to 10/27/14 Letter. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Vacate and Related Pleadings (Revised List))(Cymrot, Mark)
October 29, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 10/23/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 29, 2014 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 10/23/2014 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 28, 2014 Filing 163 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
October 27, 2014 Filing 162 LETTER MOTION for Conference Letter Requesting Hearing on Pending Motion to Vacate addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark Cymrot dated 10/27/2014. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Vacate and Related Pleadings)(Cymrot, Mark)
October 27, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 11/3/2014. Responses due by 11/14/2014 Replies due by 11/24/2014. (ajs)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #160 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/27/2014) (ajs)
October 24, 2014 Filing 160 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Letter Requesting a Schedule Change on the Motion to Quash Subpoenas addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated October 24, 2014. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
October 24, 2014 Filing 159 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated 10/24/2014 re: Hermitage Global. Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd..(Mastro, Randy)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying #124 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. For the reasons discussed at the October 23, 2014 hearing, the motion to disqualify John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P. (ECF No. 124) is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/24/2014) (ajs)
October 23, 2014 Filing 157 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P.. . Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Rubin, Lisa)
October 23, 2014 Filing 156 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated October 23, 2014 re: Response to the Government's Letter Dated October 22, 2014. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
October 23, 2014 Filing 155 DECLARATION of Lisa H. Rubin, Esq. in Support re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P... Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39, #9 Exhibit 40, #10 Exhibit 41)(Rubin, Lisa)
October 23, 2014 Filing 154 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 10/14/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 23, 2014 Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 10/14/2014 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
October 22, 2014 Filing 152 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated October 22, 2014 re: Disqualification Motion. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: There has been a request for a one-week adjournment of the October 23, 2014 hearing. The request is denied. The parties will appear on October 23. However, the hearing will begin at 3 p.m. instead of noon. So ordered. (Status Conference set for 10/23/2014 at 03:00 PM before Judge Thomas P. Griesa.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/22/2014) (ajs)
October 22, 2014 Filing 150 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated October 22, 2014 re: Response to the Letter of Richard W. Mark Requesting a Continuance of the Hearing Scheduled for 10/23/14. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
October 22, 2014 Filing 149 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Richard W. Mark dated 10/22/2014 re: Hearing Adjournment. Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd..(Rubin, Lisa)
October 14, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Plaintiff by Paul Monteleoni, John McEnany & Christine Magdo, defendant by Laura Alverdi, Mark Cymrot, John Moscow, Gabriella Volshteya, Seth Taube & Vernon Cassin, Movant Hermitage Capital Mngt & William Browder by Randy Mastro, Richard Mark, Lisa Rubin & Sara Kushner. Oral Argument held on 10/14/2014 re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P.. filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd., William Browder and continued to 10/23/2014 at 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter Martha Drevis) (Beale, Jon)
October 14, 2014 Filing 148 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
October 14, 2014 Filing 147 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated 10/14/2014 re: Courtesy Copy Submission. Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd..(Rubin, Lisa)
October 13, 2014 Filing 146 DECLARATION of Bruce A. Green, Esq. in Support re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P... Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B)(Rubin, Lisa)
October 13, 2014 Filing 145 DECLARATION of Lisa H. Rubin, Esq. in Support re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P... Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Rubin, Lisa)
October 13, 2014 Filing 144 DECLARATION of Vadim Kleiner in Support re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P... Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rubin, Lisa)
October 13, 2014 Filing 143 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P.. . Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Rubin, Lisa)
October 13, 2014 Filing 142 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated October 13, 2014 re: Response to the Government's Letter Dated October 10, 2014. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
October 10, 2014 Filing 141 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated October 10, 2014 re: Disqualification Motion. Document filed by United States of America.(Monteleoni, Paul)
October 9, 2014 Filing 140 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #139 Letter filed by Hermitage Capital Management Ltd., William Browder. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/9/2014) (ajs)
October 8, 2014 Filing 139 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy Mastro dated 10/8/2014 re: Request for Page Extension. Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd..(Rubin, Lisa)
October 7, 2014 Filing 138 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark A. Cymrot dated 10/7/2014 re: Response to Gibson Dunn's 10/2/14 Letter, REDACTED VERSION. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cymrot, Mark)
October 7, 2014 Filing 137 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot, REDACTED VERSION in Opposition re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P... Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, Part 1, #15 Exhibit 14, Part 2, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, Part 1, #20 Exhibit 18, Part 2, #21 Exhibit 18, Part 3, #22 Exhibit 18, Part 4, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20)(Cymrot, Mark)
October 7, 2014 Filing 136 DECLARATION of Roy D. Simon Jr., REDACTED VERSION in Opposition re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P... Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moscow, John)
October 7, 2014 Filing 135 DECLARATION of John W. Moscow, REDACTED VERSION in Opposition re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P... Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
October 7, 2014 Filing 134 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P.. REDACTED VERSION. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
October 7, 2014 Filing 133 DECLARATION of Seth T. Taube in Opposition re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P... Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Taube Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Taube Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 to Taube Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 to Taube Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 to Taube Declaration)(Taube, Seth)
October 7, 2014 Filing 132 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P.. . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Taube, Seth)
October 2, 2014 Filing 131 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated October 2, 2014 re: Disciplinary Committee Materials. Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2014.04.11 Letter (Redacted))(Rubin, Lisa)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #97 Motion to Withdraw. It is hereby ORDERED that Nicholas C. Margida be withdrawn as attorney of record for Defendants Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Alexander, LLC, Prevezon Soho USA, LLC, Prevezon Seven USA, LLC, Prevezon Pine USA, LLC, Prevezon 1711 USA, LLC, Prevezon 1810, LLC, Prevezon 2009 USA, LLC, Prevezon 2011 USA, LLC, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., and Kolevins, Ltd. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/2/2014) (ajs)
September 30, 2014 Filing 129 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated 9/29/2014 re: Courtesy Copies. Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd..(Rubin, Lisa)
September 30, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 9/18/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 30, 2014 Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 9/18/2014 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 29, 2014 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P.. . Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Rubin, Lisa)
September 29, 2014 Filing 125 DECLARATION of LISA H. RUBIN in Support re: #124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P... Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31)(Rubin, Lisa)
September 29, 2014 Filing 124 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel John M. Moscow, Esq., Baker & Hostetler LLP and Baker Botts L.L.P.. Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. Return Date set for 10/14/2014 at 11:00 AM.(Mastro, Randy)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Authorize. The court directs the parties to submit to the court all of the relevant materials previously provided to the disciplinary committee of the New York State Appellate Division, First Department in the matter of John Moscow. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/29/2014) (ajs)
September 27, 2014 Filing 122 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Mark Cymrot dated September 27, 2014 re: Response to Gibson Dunn's September 24, 2014 letter. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cymrot, Mark)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SALE OF REAL PROPERTY: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED AND AGREED THAT: 1. The United States and Prevezon 1711 USA agree to the interlocutory sale of the Defendant Property. 2. Prevezon 1711 USA represents that it has entered into a contract on or about August 1, 2014, with a prospective non-party buyer who has offered to purchase the Defendant Property for $1,150,000.00, as set forth within. 10. Each party agrees to bear its costs and attorneys' fees. 11. This Court shall retain jurisdiction in this matter to take additional action and enter further orders as necessary to implement and enforce this order authorizing the sale of the Defendant Property. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/24/2014) (ajs)
September 24, 2014 Filing 120 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - THIRD PARTY MOTION to Authorize Docketing and Submission to this Court of Materials Submitted to the Disciplinary Committee of the Appellate Division, First Department . Document filed by William Browder, Hermitage Capital Management Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit September 18, 2014 Status Conference Transcript)(Rubin, Lisa) Modified on 9/30/2014 (db).
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER denying #74 Letter Motion for Conference. The court denies defendants' February 26, 2014 request for a conference and will determine as the case goes on whether one or more conferences is needed. This order resolves item number 74 on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/24/2014) (ama)
September 18, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Plaintiff by Andrew Adams, AUSA, Christine Magdo, AUSA, Paul Monteleoni, AUSA, Defendant by John Moscow, Seth Taube, Mark Cymrot. Non-party witnesses Willaim Browder & Hermitage Capital by Lisa Rubin. Case Management Conference held on 9/18/2014. The court grants Non-witness party Hermitage Capital's leave to file a motion requesting that the court disqualify John Moscow and Baker & Hostetler as counsel for defendant Prevezon Holdings. Hearing set for 10/14/2014 at 11:00 AM. (Court Reporter Rose Prater) (Beale, Jon)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: As set forth within, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: 1. Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP ("Gibson Dunn"), as counsel for Mr. Browder and Hermitage Capital, may appear on the record at the September 18 Hearing through a special appearance; 2. Gibson Dunn's special appearance at the September 18 Hearing is without waiver of and with the express preservation of all jurisdictional defenses that have been or could be asserted by Mr. Browder and Hermitage Capital in this or any other matter within the Southern District of New York or any other court within the State of New York; and 3. Gibson Dunn's appearance at the September 18 Hearing may not be relied upon or used by any party as a basis for establishing this Court's jurisdiction over Mr. Browder or Hermitage Capital. (See Order.) ( Status Conference set for 9/18/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas P. Griesa.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/17/2014) (ajs)
September 16, 2014 Filing 117 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John Moscow dated 9/16/14 re: Russian Federation's Response to the United States' Mutual Legal Assistance Request. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
September 15, 2014 Filing 116 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated September 15, 2014 re: Second Unauthorized Surreply. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul)
September 14, 2014 Filing 115 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot re: #114 Notice (Other), . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11 - part 1 of 3, #8 Exhibit 11 - part 2 of 3, #9 Exhibit 11 - part 3 of 3, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14 - part 1 of 2, #13 Exhibit 14 - part 2 of 2, #14 Exhibit 15)(Taube, Seth)
September 14, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE of Defendants' Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(b)(4) Statement. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Taube, Seth)
September 12, 2014 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #111 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties . . Document filed by Acme Property Management, Inc., William Browder, Michael Cassidy Foley, Sundance Aspen, LLC, Victoria Tarantino, Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC. (Mastro, Randy)
September 12, 2014 Filing 112 DECLARATION of Lisa H. Rubin, Esq. in Support re: #111 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties .. Document filed by Acme Property Management, Inc., William Browder, Michael Cassidy Foley, Sundance Aspen, LLC, Victoria Tarantino, Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10, #2 Exhibit 11 - 20, #3 Exhibit 21 - 30, #4 Exhibit 31 - 40, #5 Exhibit 41, #6 Exhibit 42, #7 Exhibit 43, #8 Exhibit 44, #9 Exhibit 45 - 50)(Mastro, Randy)
September 12, 2014 Filing 111 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas of Affected Non-Parties . Document filed by Acme Property Management, Inc., William Browder, Michael Cassidy Foley, Sundance Aspen, LLC, Victoria Tarantino, Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC.(Mastro, Randy)
September 12, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE of Motion. Document filed by Acme Property Management, Inc., William Browder, Michael Cassidy Foley, Sundance Aspen, LLC, Victoria Tarantino, Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC. (Mastro, Randy)
September 11, 2014 Filing 109 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #108 Letter, filed by Victoria Tarantino, Acme Property Management, Inc., Michael Cassidy Foley, Sundance Aspen, LLC, William Browder, Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/11/2014) (ajs)
September 9, 2014 Filing 108 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy Mastro dated 9/9/2014 re: REQUEST FOR PAGE EXTENSION. Document filed by Acme Property Management, Inc., William Browder, Michael Cassidy Foley, Sundance Aspen, LLC, Victoria Tarantino, Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC.(Rubin, Lisa)
September 5, 2014 Filing 107 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW Defendants' Second Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Application to Modify or Vacate the Protective Order (Doc. 39). Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
September 5, 2014 Filing 106 DECLARATION of of Mark A. Cymrot in Support of Defendants' Second Supplemental Memorandum in support of their Application to Modify or Vacate the Protective Order (Doc. 39) . Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Letter, #2 Exhibit 2. Subpoena, #3 Exhibit 3. Letter)(Cymrot, Mark)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 CONSENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: By entering into this Consent Order, any objections, defenses, or rights, including the rights to move to quash the Subpoenas or to seek a protective order, that Tarantino otherwise has are preserved; and Defendants' and/or the United States' arguments, defenses, or rights that they otherwise have, are also preserved; AND 2. Tarantino's time to respond, object, or otherwise move with respect to the Subpoenas shall be extended to September 12, 2014; AND 3. The United States' time to respond, object, or otherwise move with respect to the Subpoenas shall be extended to September 19, 2014; AND 4. Any and all motions with respect to the Tarantino Subpoenas will be filed in this Court and decided by this Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 9/19/2014., Responses due by 9/19/2014) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/26/2014) (ama)
August 22, 2014 Filing 104 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated August 21, 2014 re: Proposed Consent Order. Document filed by Acme Property Management, Inc., William Browder, Michael Cassidy Foley, Sundance Aspen, LLC, Victoria Tarantino, Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lisa)
August 22, 2014 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Lisa Heather Rubin to RE-FILE Document #103 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Victoria Tarantino and Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC to object, move, or otherwise respond to nonparty subpoenas addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated August 21, 2014. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
August 21, 2014 Filing 103 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Victoria Tarantino and Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC to object, move, or otherwise respond to nonparty subpoenas addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated August 21, 2014. Document filed by Acme Property Management, Inc., William Browder, Michael Cassidy Foley, Sundance Aspen, LLC, Victoria Tarantino, Victoria Tarantino Consulting LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lisa) Modified on 8/22/2014 (db).
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #99 Letter Motion for Extension of Time concerning subpoenas recently issued by the Defendants. Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/18/2014) (cd)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP may enter a special appearance in this Court to move to quash the Browder Aspen Subpoena, and as further set forth in this document. The Affected Third Parties' time to respond, object, or otherwise move with respect to the Subpoenas shall be extended to August 22, 2014; and The United States's time to respond, object, or otherwise move with respect to the Subpoenas shall be extended to August 29, 2014. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 8/18/2014) (cd)
August 17, 2014 Filing 100 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated August 17, 2014 re: Defendants' August 16, 2014 Letter Objecting to the Affected Third Parties' Request for an Extension of Time to Object, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Subpoenas. Document filed by Acme Property Management, Inc., William Browder, Michael Cassidy Foley, Sundance Aspen, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rubin, Lisa)
August 17, 2014 Filing 99 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Object, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Third-Party Subpoenas addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Randy M. Mastro dated August 15, 2014. Document filed by William Browder, Sundance Aspen, LLC, Michael Cassidy Foley, Acme Property Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Rubin, Lisa)
August 16, 2014 Filing 98 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Seth Taube dated August 16, 2014 re: Subpoenaed Third Parties' Request for Additional Time to Object, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Subpoenas. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Cassin, Vernon)
August 8, 2014 Filing 97 MOTION to Withdraw Nicholas C. Margida as Counsel of Record for Defendants. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth)
August 8, 2014 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vernon Anthony Andrew Cassin, III on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cassin, Vernon)
June 16, 2014 Filing 95 DECLARATION of Mark A. Cymrot in Suppot of Defendants' Supplemental Memorandum to Their Application to Modify or Vacate the Protective Order (Doc. 39) in Support. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cymrot, Mark)
June 16, 2014 Filing 94 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Their Application to Modify or Vacate the Protective Order (Doc. 39). Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
June 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SALE OF REAL PROPERTY: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED AND AGREED THAT: 1. The United States and Prevezon Pine agree to the interlocutory sale of the Defendant Property. 2. Prevezon Pine represents that it has entered into a contract on or about May 15, 2014, with a prospective non-party buyer who has offered to purchase the Defendant Property for $970,000.00. 3. The legal description of the Defendant Property is: 20 Pine Street Condominium, 20 Pine Street, New York, New York 10005, Unit 2308. The title to the Defendant Property is in the name of Prevezon Pine USA, LLC as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 6/3/2014) (lmb)
April 21, 2014 Filing 92 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated 4/21/2014 re: Request for Oral Argument on Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, Docket # 79. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
April 21, 2014 Filing 91 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #79 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint and for an Order Denying the Government's Request to File an Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #79 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint and for an Order Denying the Government's Request to File an Amended Complaint: Approved. Replies due by 4/21/2014. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/17/2014) (tn)
April 16, 2014 Filing 89 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated April 16, 2014. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
April 7, 2014 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #79 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint and for an Order Denying the Government's Request to File an Amended Complaint.. Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting #72 Motion for Nicholas C. Margida to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/03/2014) (ama)
April 1, 2014 Filing 86 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated 3/31/2014 re: The Government respectfully requests that the combined memorandum in response to Defendants' motion to dismiss be due on or before April 7, 2014 and be permitted to total 40 pages. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Responses due by 4/7/2014) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/1/2014) (ajs)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE A CLAIM: that the time for TD Bank to file a claim asserting an interest in property the United States seeks to forfeit in this action is extended from March 27, 2014 to and including May 26, 2014. This is the fifth request for an extension of time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/1/2014) (ja)
March 28, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/14/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 28, 2014 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/14/2014 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/1/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/30/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SALE OF REAL PROPERTY. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED AND AGREED THAT: The United States and Prevezon Alexander agree to the interlocutory sale of the Defendant Property. Prevezon Alexander represents that it has entered into a contract on or about February 28, 2014, with a prospective non-party buyer who has offered to purchase the Defendant Property for $8,250,000. The legal description of the Defendant Property is: the Commercial Condominium Unit 3, which is part of the Alexander Condominium, located at 250 East 49th Street, New York, New York, 10017. The title to the Defendant Property is in the name of Prevezon Alexander, LLC. In furtherance of the interlocutory sale, the parties agree to execute promptly any documents which may be required to complete the interlocutory sale of the Defendant Property. The net proceeds from the sale of the Defendant Property will include all moneys realized from the sale of the Defendant Property, except as further specified in this Stipulation and Order, and as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/25/2014) (rjm)
March 21, 2014 Filing 81 DECLARATION of John W. Moscow in Support re: #79 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint and for an Order Denying the Government's Request to File an Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D-Part 1, #5 Exhibit D-Part 2, #6 Exhibit E-Part 1, #7 Exhibit E-Part 2, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Moscow, John)
March 21, 2014 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #79 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint and for an Order Denying the Government's Request to File an Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
March 21, 2014 Filing 79 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Complaint and for an Order Denying the Government's Request to File an Amended Complaint. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
March 13, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 3/4/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
March 13, 2014 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 3/4/2014 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/17/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the undersigned counsel herein, that: 1. The time by which the Defendants may move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (or in the event that the Plaintiff is permitted to file the Proposed Amended Complaint, the Proposed Amended Complaint) is extended up to and including fourteen (14) days following the entry of an order ruling on the Plaintiff's motion for leave to file the Proposed Amended Complaint. If the Court denies Plaintiff's motion to file the Proposed Amended Complaint, but permits the Plaintiff to file an amended complaint, the time by which the Defendants may move, answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint will be fourteen (14) days after the amended complaint is filed as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/10/2014) (lmb) Modified on 3/11/2014 (lmb).
March 6, 2014 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 3/6/2014. Trial scheduled for 3/31/2014 is adjourned without date. (Beale, Jon)
March 5, 2014 Filing 75 DECLARATION of John W. Moscow In Support of Defendants' Application to Vacate or Modify the Protective Order in Support re: #37 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Moscow, John)
February 26, 2014 Filing 74 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #73 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion (Request for Oral Argument be Heard on Kolevins and Ferencois Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim) addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Seth T. Taube dated February 26, 2014. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd..(Taube, Seth)
February 25, 2014 Filing 73 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Taube, Seth)
February 25, 2014 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #72 MOTION for Nicholas C. Margida to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9389343. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 25, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION for Nicholas C. Margida to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9389343. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Taube, Seth)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF ANDRENE L.K. SMITH AND ORDER. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Andrene L.K. Smith, Esq. formerly an associate of Baker & Hostetler LLP hereby withdraws her appearance as counsel for Defendants Prevezon Holdings LTD., Prevezon Alexander, LLC, Prevezon Soho USA, LLC, Prevezon Seven USA, LLC, Prevezon Pine USA, LLC, Prevezon 1711 USA, LLC, Prevezon 1810, LLC, Prevezon 2009 USA, LLC, Prevezon 2011 USA, LLC, and Ferencoi Investments, LTD. in the referenced matter. Attorney Andrene Letecia Kay Smith terminated. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/21/2014) (rjm)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' OMNIBUS MOTION TO DISMISS: withdrawing #49 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: 1. The Defendants' pending Omnibus Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 49) is WITHDRAWN WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. Defendants Kolevins' and Ferencoi's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim (ECF No. 44) remains pending. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/21/2014) (djc) Modified on 2/24/2014 (djc).
February 17, 2014 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Loura Laresa Alaverdi on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Alaverdi, Loura)
February 14, 2014 Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John Moscow dated 2/14/2014 re: Request for an Order Directing Case to Go Forward on 3/31/2014. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
February 13, 2014 Filing 67 LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Seth T. Taube dated February 13, 2014 re: Withdrawing Defendants Omnibus Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth)
February 12, 2014 Filing 66 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated February 12, 2014. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE A CLAIM: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between counsel for the undersigned parties that the time for TD Bank to file a claim asserting an interest in property the United States seeks to forfeit in this action is extended from February 10, 2014 to and including March 27,2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/06/2014) (ama)
February 6, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Caldwell Adams on behalf of United States of America. (Adams, Andrew)
February 5, 2014 Filing 63 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/7/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
February 5, 2014 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/7/2014 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
February 5, 2014 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessie Morgan Gabriel on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Gabriel, Jessie)
February 4, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 2/25/2014. (ama)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. In light of the multiple issues raised in the Government's Opposition to the Motions to Dismiss, Defendants respectfully request an extension of two weeks, until February 25,2014. Approved.(Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/04/2014) (ama)
February 3, 2014 Filing 59 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Seth T. Taube dated February 3, 2014. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Taube, Seth)
January 28, 2014 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss., #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED AND AGREED THAT: The United States agrees to release the Defendant Property to 127 Retail LLC. 127 Retail LLC represents that, prior to receiving notice of this action, it had purchased the Defendant Property in a legitimate arms-length transaction on or about August 14, 2013. The Government will provide a cancellation of the notice of pendency lien filing to 127 Retail LLC. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/28/2014) (ama)
January 28, 2014 Filing 56 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated 1/27/2014 re: The Government writes to respectfully request permission to file a 35-page memorandum of law in opposition to Defendants' motions to dismiss the complaint (Docket Items 44-45 and 49-50). ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/28/2014) (ama)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE A CLAIM: that the time for TD Bank to file a claim asserting an interest in property the United States seeks to forfeit in this action is extended from January 10, 2014 and including February 10, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/8/2014) (ja)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Approved.(Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/06/2014) (ama)
January 3, 2014 Filing 53 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 Order to Show Cause, to Vacate or Modify the Protective Order. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
January 2, 2014 Filing 52 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants Application to Vacate or Modify the Protective Order addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from John W. Moscow dated January 2, 2014. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Moscow, John)
January 2, 2014 Filing 51 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Paul M. Monteleoni dated 12/30/2013 re: The Government writes to respectfully request an extension of time, until January 28, 2014, of the Government's time to respond to the motions to dismiss filed by defendants Ferencoi and Kolevins, Docket Item ("D.I.") 44, and by the Prevezon defendants, D.I. 49,. ENDORSEMENT: Approved., ( Responses due by 1/28/2014) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/02/2014) (ama)
December 24, 2013 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Taube, Seth)
December 24, 2013 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth)
December 23, 2013 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John W. Moscow on behalf of Kolevins, Ltd.. (Moscow, John)
December 20, 2013 Filing 47 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #37 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
December 20, 2013 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd.. (Taube, Seth)
December 20, 2013 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Taube, Seth)
December 20, 2013 Filing 43 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Kolevins, Ltd.. (Moscow, John)
December 20, 2013 Filing 42 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd.. (Moscow, John)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #41 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendant's motion raises multiple grounds for relief, both legal and factual, and the Government accordingly respectfully requests permission to file a memorandum of law longer than 25 pages in order to adequately respond to them. Approved.(Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/19/2013) (ama)
December 19, 2013 Filing 41 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Seth T. Taube dated December 18, 2013. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Taube, Seth)
December 17, 2013 Filing 40 SERVICE BY PUBLICATION. A Notice of Forfeiture was published in the www.forfeiture.gov on September 18, 2013 through October 17, 2013. Document filed by United States of America. (Monteleoni, Paul)
December 13, 2013 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 13, 2013 Filing 38 DECLARATION of John W. Moscow in Support re: #37 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 13, 2013 Set/Reset Hearings:( Show Cause Hearing set for 12/12/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa.), Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Replies due by 1/6/2014., Show Cause Response due by 1/2/2014.) (ama)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff the United States shall show cause as to why why an order should not be entered vacating or modifying the Protective Order entered in this action. SO ORDERED. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/12/2013 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/13/2013) (ama)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE A CLAIM: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between counsel for the undersigned parties that the time for TD Bank to file a claim asserting an interest in property the United States seeks to forfeit in this action is extended from December 13, 2013 to and included January 10, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/13/2013) (ama)
December 13, 2013 Filing 35 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 13, 2013 Filing 34 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kolevins, Ltd..(Cymrot, Mark)
December 12, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Alan Cymrot on behalf of Kolevins, Ltd.. (Cymrot, Mark)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER on MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 Motion for Paul M. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/12/2013) (ama) (Main Document 32 replaced on 12/12/2013) (ama).
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The Court will hold argument on the defendants' motion to vacate or modify the Government's protective order on January 7th at 2:30 PM. SO ORDERED. ( Oral Argument set for 1/7/2014 at 02:30 PM before Judge Thomas P. Griesa.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/12/2013) (ama)
December 5, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Jennifer E. Owens to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9144771. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Missing Certificate of Good Standing. Certificate of Good Standing Must be issued from the Supreme Court if Virginia with Clerk of Court Signature. Re-file the document as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and attach a valid Certificate of Good Standing, issued within the past 30 days. (wb)
December 5, 2013 Filing 30 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jennifer E. Owens to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9144771. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Taube, Seth) Modified on 12/5/2013 (wb).
December 3, 2013 Filing 29 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 28 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon 1810, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 27 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 26 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 25 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 24 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 23 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 22 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 21 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Prevezon Holdings Ltd.. (Moscow, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 20 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Martash Holdings. (Moscow, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 19 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by IKR. (Moscow, John)
December 3, 2013 Filing 18 CLAIM FOR PROPERTY. Document filed by Denis Katsyv. (Moscow, John)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FOURTH JOINT STIPULATION ADJOURNING THE TIME FOR FILING THE NOTICE OF CLAIM AND INTEREST: Under the Joint Stipulation Adjourning the Time for Filing the Notice of Claim and Interest ordered by this Court on October 17, 2013, the return date for the first of the Defendants' and Defendants-in-rem's notice of claim and interest in the defendant real properties and bank accounts enumerated in the Verified Complaint of the United States of America (the "Defendant Properties") was adjourned until October 29, 2013. Thereafter it was adjourned to December 3, 2013. Counsel for the undersigned parties have been talking and will be talking together to avoid unnecessary issues. Both sides stipulate and agree that the due date for Defendants Kolevins and Ferencoi's notice of claim and interest in the Defendant Properties is hereby adjourned until December 24, 2013. Kolevins is represented by Swiss counsel, who has authorized this request. The other defendants and Defendants-in-rem plan to file on December 3, 2013. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/27/2013) (ama)
November 20, 2013 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Prevezon Holdings Ltd. for Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. Document filed by Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C..(Taube, Seth)
November 20, 2013 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Prevezon Holdings Ltd. for Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C.. Document filed by Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C..(Taube, Seth)
November 20, 2013 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Prevezon Holdings Ltd..(Taube, Seth)
November 20, 2013 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Benjamin Harper on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Harper, Richard)
November 20, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth T. Taube on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Taube, Seth)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE A CLAIM: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between counsel for the undersigned parties that the time for TD Bank to file a claim asserting an interest in property the United States seeks to forfeit in this action is extended from November 12, 2013 to and including December 13, 2013. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/2013) (ama)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 THIRD JOINT STIPULATION: Counsel for the undersigned parties have been talking and will be talking together to avoid unnecessary issues. Both sides stipulate and agree that the due date for the Defendants' notice of claim and interest in the Defendant Properties and that of all other Claimants listed below, and Leonid Petrov, is hereby adjourned until December 3, 2013. The potential Claimants, other than Defendants, are Denis Katsyv, Martash Investment Holdings, IKR, Alexander Litvak and Timofey Krit. Mr. Petrov is represented by Anthony P. Gentile, Esq. of Godofsky & Gentile, who has asked us to make this request on his client's behalf. The Defendants and Defendants-in-rem and other persons listed above do not waive any objections to service of process and personal jurisdiction by the submission of this stipulation and reserve all jurisdictional and other defenses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/12/2013) (ama)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR INTERLOCUTORY SALE OF REAL PROPERTY: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, ORDERED AND AGREED THAT: 1. The United States and Prevezon 2009 agree to the interlocutory sale of the Defendant Property as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/8/2013) (lmb)
November 1, 2013 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Paul M. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9037100. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 1, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION for Paul M. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9037100. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Paul)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SECOND JOINT STIPULATION ADJOURNING THE TIME FOR FILING THE NOTICE OF CLAIM AND INTEREST: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the undersigned counsel, on behalf of all the parties as follows: Under the Joint Stipulation Adjourning the Time for Filing the Notice of Claim and Interest ordered by this Court on October 17, 2013, the return date for the first of the Defendants' and Defendants-in-rem's notice of claim and interest in the defendant real properties and bank: accounts enumerated in the Verified Complaint of the United States of America (the "Defendant Properties") was adjourned until October 29,2013. Counsel for the undersigned parties have been talking and will be talking together to avoid unnecessary issues. Both sides stipulate and agree that the due date for the Defendants' notice of claim and interest in the Defendant Properties and that of all Claimants with actual notice is hereby adjourned until November 12, 2013. The Defendants and Defendants-in-rem do not waive any objections to service of process and personal jurisdiction by the submission of this stipulation and reserve all jurisdictional and other defenses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/28/2013) (ama)
October 17, 2013 Filing 6 JOINT STIPULATION ADJOURNING THE TIME FOR FILING THE NOTICE OF CLAIM AND INTEREST: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by the undersigned counsel, on behalf of all the parties as follows: 1. On September 10, 2013, the United States commenced a civil action in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York seeking the forfeiture of all of the assets worldwide of the above-referenced Defendants-in-rem, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 981(a)(1)(A), 985 and 1956(b)(l) and an in personam judgment against the Defendants. 2. Under Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions, the first of the Defendants' and Defendants-in-rem's notice of claim and interest in the defendant real properties and bank accounts enumerated in the Verified Complaint of the United States of America (the "Defendant Properties") is returnable on October 15, 2013. 3. The due date for the Defendants' notice of claim and interest in the Defendant Properties and that of all Claimants with actual notice is hereby adjourned until October 29, 2013. 4. The Defendants and Defendants-in-rem do not waive any objections to service of process and personal jurisdiction by the submission of this stipulation and reserve all jurisdictional and other defenses. 5. A facsimile of this Stipulation shall be deemed an original for all purposes. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 10/17/2013) (djc) Modified on 10/18/2013 (djc).
October 11, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Alan Cymrot on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Cymrot, Mark)
October 11, 2013 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrene Letecia Kay Smith on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Smith, Andrene)
October 11, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John W. Moscow on behalf of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C.. (Moscow, John)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 2 POST-COMPLAINT PROTECTIVE ORDER PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. 983 (j)(1): NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREE, PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C 983 (j)(A), THAT: The following persons: As set forth herein, and attorneys and other persons and entities acting for or in concert with the above-named businesses and/or entities having actual knowledge of this Order; shall not take any action prohibited by this Order; And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/11/2013) (ama)
September 10, 2013 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
September 10, 2013 Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (laq)
September 10, 2013 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C. incl;uding but not limited to any and all funds on deposit in bank of america acct # 483016158084, Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd., Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree, Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (, Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., and all property traceable thereto.. (laq)
September 10, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Any and All Assets of Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Holdings, Ltd., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Any and All Assets of Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C. incl;uding but not limited to any and all funds on deposit in bank of america acct # 483016158084, Any and All assets of Kolevins, Ltd., Any and all assets of Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C. including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine STreet Condominium, 20 Pine Stree, Any and all assets of Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, title and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as the 20 Pine Street, NY NY 10005, Unit 1816 (, Any and all assets of Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., including but not limited to all right, titile and interest in the real property and appurtenances known as 127 Seventh Ave. aka 166 West 18th Street, Ferencoi Investments, Ltd., Kolevins, Ltd., Prevezon 1711 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 1810, L.L.C., Prevezon 2009 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon 2011 USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Alexander, L.L.C., Prevezon Holdings Ltd., Prevezon Pine USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Seven USA, L.L.C., Prevezon Soho USA, L.L.C., and all property traceable thereto.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 a, #2 b, #3 c, #4 d)(laq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Prevezon Holdings Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prevezon Holdings Ltd.
Represented By: Jessie Morgan Gabriel
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Richard Benjamin Harper
Represented By: John W. Moscow
Represented By: Mark Alan Cymrot
Represented By: Paul M Levine
Represented By: Renita Sharma
Represented By: Andrene Letecia Kay Smith
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Reed
Represented By: Adam Michael Abensohn
Represented By: Seth T. Taube
Represented By: Loura Laresa Alaverdi
Represented By: Vernon Anthony Andrew Cassin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prevezon 1810, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jessie Morgan Gabriel
Represented By: Faith E. Gay
Represented By: Richard Benjamin Harper
Represented By: John W. Moscow
Represented By: Mark Alan Cymrot
Represented By: Paul M Levine
Represented By: Renita Sharma
Represented By: Andrene Letecia Kay Smith
Represented By: Kevin Samuel Reed
Represented By: Adam Michael Abensohn
Represented By: Seth T. Taube
Represented By: Loura Laresa Alaverdi
Represented By: Vernon Anthony Andrew Cassin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |