Alicea v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: |
Edmin Alicea |
Defendant: |
The City of New York, Alejandr Rivas and John Doe |
Case Number: |
1:2013cv07073 |
Filed: |
October 4, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
John G. Koeltl |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 9, 2017 |
Filing
179
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. The plaintiff is entitled to an award of $410,071.25 in reasonable attorney's fees and $3,443.87 in costs. The Clerk is directed to close all pending motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/8/2017) (rj)
|
August 8, 2017 |
Filing
178
OPINION AND ORDER re: 154 MOTION for Attorney Fees . filed by Edmin Alicea, 174 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Elissa Fudim dated June 6, 2017. filed by The City of Ne w York, 176 FIRST MOTION for James Sanborn to Withdraw as Attorney of record for plaintiff. Reibman & Weiner remains as counsel for plaintiff. filed by Edmin Alicea. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. The plaintiff is entitled to an award of $410,071.25 in reasonable attorney's fees and $3,443.87 in costs. The Clerk is directed to close all pending motions. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 8/8/2017) (rj) Modified on 8/9/2017 (rj).
|
May 3, 2016 |
Filing
92
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court has considered all the parties' arguments. To the extent not specifically addressed above, the parties' arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, the defendants' moti on for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of Court is directed to close all pending motions. re: 65 LETTER MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Produce document previously ordered to be produced addressed to J udge John G. Koeltl from Elissa Fudim on behalf of defendants dated September 1, 2015 filed by Terrence McGrath, The City of New York, Paul Arico, Alejandr Rivas, Richard Baboolal, Fredy Cruz, Brendan Regan, 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment (partial) filed by Terrence McGrath, The City of New York, Paul Arico, Alejandr Rivas, Richard Baboolal, Fredy Cruz, Brendan Regan. Party Terrence McGrath terminated. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/2/2016) (rjm).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?