Sunni, LLC et al v. Edible Arrangements International, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Sammy Hinnawi, Sunni III, Inc and Sunni, LLC |
Defendant: |
Edible Arrangements International, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00461 |
Filed: |
January 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
XX Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
Katherine Polk Failla |
Nature of Suit: |
Franchise |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 3, 2014 |
Filing
34
OPINION AND ORDER re: 31 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case For Reconsideration addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Sunni, LLC, Sunni III, Inc. & Mr. Sammy Hinnawi dated April 2, 2014. filed by Sunni III, Inc, Sunni, LLC, Sammy Hinnawi. In sum, Plaintiffs have failed to come forth with any controlling law or facts the Court overlooked that could in any way be expected to alter the conclusion reached by the court. Shrader, 70 F.3d at 257. Plaintiffs here are merely quarreling with th e Courts holdings; the Court will not grant a motion for reconsideration on this basis. Plaintiffs motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket Entry 31. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/3/2014) (kgo)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
29
OPINION AND ORDER re: 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sunni III, Inc, Sunni, LLC, Sammy Hinnawi, 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sunni III, Inc, Sunni, LLC, Sammy Hinnawi: For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiffs 9; motion to remand is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket Entry 16. Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction is also DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Docket Entry 14. The Court's Opinion an d Order shall take effect on April 4, 2014, so that Plaintiffs may, if they choose, seek further relief at the Second Circuit. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark the case as closed. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/25/2014) (tn) (Main Document 29 replaced on 3/25/2014) (tn). Modified on 3/25/2014 (tn).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?