Galberth v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: |
Gregory Galberth |
Defendant: |
Washington, John Doe and Jane Doe |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv00691 |
Filed: |
January 27, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
Wyoming |
Presiding Judge: |
Katherine Polk Failla |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 31, 2017 |
Filing
169
OPINION AND ORDER re: 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Washington. For the reasons outlined above, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/31/2017) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (rj)
|
March 29, 2016 |
Filing
112
OPINION AND ORDER re: 82 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Washington, City of New York. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's claims against Ms. Hurnst, C.O. Soto, Ms. Green, the Doe Defendants, and the City of New York are dismis sed. However, Plaintiff still has a viable claim against Captain Washington. The Clerk of Court is ordered to terminate docket entry 82. The parties are ordered to appear for a telephone conference with the Court on Tuesday, May 3, 2016, at 10:00 a.m . Counsel for Defendant Washington shall arrange for both parties to call the Court at (212) 805-0290 pursuant to the scheduling order separately issued on this date. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Telephone Conference set for 5/3/2016 at 10 :00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) John Doe (Officer at C 74), John Doe (Transportation Officer), Hurnst (Psychologist), Soto, City of New York and Jane Doe (At C 74) terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/29/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (spo) (Main Document 112 replaced on 3/29/2016) (tro).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?