Bigsby v. Barclays Capital Real Estate, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Lamar Bigsby , Jr. |
Defendant: |
Barclays Capital Real Estate, Inc. and John Does 1-20 |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv01398 |
Filed: |
March 3, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
XX Out of State |
Presiding Judge: |
John G. Koeltl |
Nature of Suit: |
Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause of Action: |
18 U.S.C. § 1961 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 2, 2020 |
Filing
271
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel may present to Judge Koeltl in the related case, Mazzei v. The Money Store, No. 01-cv-05694, those portions of the transcript of deposition of Black Knight that was taken in this case that wer e not designated as confidential. Those portions may be presented for the limited purpose of filing a motion seeking relief from judgment based upon an alleged fraud on the Court and/or any appropriate relief in the nature of contempt or sanctions. B lack Knight then will be entitled to argue to Judge Koeltl that the transcript is not properly used in the Mazzei case, in view of the provisions of the stipulated protective order entered in this case. (See ECF No. 51.) Judge Koeltl will decide whet her to consider the Black Knight transcript or not. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to terminate the gavel at ECF No. 255. So ordered. Terminating 255 Motion for Protective Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 3/2/2020) (rjm)
|
October 23, 2019 |
Filing
252
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court has considered all of the arguments of the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed above, the arguments are either moot or without merit. The motion for reconsideration is denied. The Clerk is directed to close Docket No. 247. SO ORDERED. re: 247 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 243 Memorandum & Opinion, 244 Clerk's Judgment, filed by Lamar Bigsby, Jr. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/22/2019) (rjm)
|
July 20, 2019 |
Filing
243
OPINION & ORDER re: 180 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Serrin Turner dated January 21, 2019 filed by Barclays Capital Real Estate, Inc., 237 MOTION to Strike Document No. 228 No tice of Motion filed by Lamar Bigsby, Jr., 175 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Barclays Capital Real Estate, Inc. The Court has considered all the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically add ressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the reasons explained above, the defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted, and the plaintiffs' motion to strike is denied. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing this case. The Clerk is also directed to close all pending motions and to close this case. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/20/2019) (mro) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
|
January 25, 2019 |
Filing
183
OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, BCREI shall designate a witness or witnesses to testify regarding Topic 4(h)(iii), as revised; and Topic 6(i) (regarding BCREI's negotiation of attorney fee schedules). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 1/25/2019) (kl)
|
March 28, 2018 |
Filing
129
OPINION & ORDER re: 109 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. filed by Barclays Capital Real Estate, Inc. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the a rguments are either moot or without merit. For the reasons explained above, Barclays's Rule 12(b) (6) motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Barclays's motion is granted insofar all claims against John Does are dismissed a nd the RICO claims, the California UCL claims, all common law fraud claims, all constructive trust claims, all accounting claims, and the California fair debt collection claims against Barclays are dismissed. Barclays's motion is denied as to al l of the unjust enrichment claims, conversion claims, and the California breach of contract claims. The Clerk is directed to close the motion at docket number 109. SO ORDERED., (John Does 1-20 terminated.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/28/18) (yv)
|
March 17, 2016 |
Filing
36
OPINION AND ORDER. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, the defendants' motion to dismiss is gra nted in part and denied in part. The substantive RICO claim and the RICO conspiracy claim are dismissed. The defendants' motion to dismiss is denied with regard to the plaintiffs' state-law claims (Counts III-VII). The Clerk is directed to close ECF Docket No. 26. re: 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Barclays Capital Real Estate, Inc. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/16/2016) (rjm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?