Signature Exploration and Production Corporation v. GCM Administrative Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Signature Exploration and Production Corporation
Defendant: GCM Administrative Services, LLC, Seth M. Lukash, Gary Herman and Strategic Turnaround Equity Partners, LP (Cayman)
Case Number: 1:2014cv02280
Filed: April 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 OPINION AND ORDER: On July 1, 2015, Counterclaim-Defendants filed a motion for leave to file a supplemental complaint, seeking to add a breach of contract claim against Counterclaimants. For the reasons set forth above, Counterclaim-Defendants' motion to file a supplemental complaint is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 48. It is SO ORDERED. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/29/2016) (kko)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 OPINION AND ORDER re: 50 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Counterclaims filed by Gary Herman, Digital Creative Development Corporation, Seth M. Lukash, Strategic Turnaround Equity Partners, LP (Cayman), GCM Adminis trative Services, LLC. For the reasons set forth above, Counterclaimants' motion to amend is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 50. (As further set forth in this Opinion and Order.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/31/2016) (mro)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION AND ORDER: re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended and Supplemental Counterclaims and Third-Party Claims filed by Tumbleweed Holdings, Inc. f/k/a GrowOpp Holdings, Inc., Craig Ellins, GrowBlox Sciences, Inc., Gr owOpp, LLC, Todd Denkin, Joseph J. Bianco. For the reasons set forth above, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Specifically, Counterclaimants' request for declaratory relief, along with their breach of fid uciary duty claim, is dismissed without prejudice. The claims for unjust enrichment and quantum meruit survive the instant motion. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 30. Furthermore, the Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the caption of this action to remove all third-party plaintiffs and defendants. Instead, the caption shall list Digital Creative Development Corporation, GCM Administrative Services, LLC, Strategic Turnaround Equity Partners, LP, Seth M. Lukash, and Gary Herman as Counterclaimants and GrowBlox Sciences Inc., Todd Denkin, Joseph J. Bianco, Tumbleweed Holdings, Inc., Craig Ellins, and GrowOpp,LLC as Counterclaim-Defendants. The parties are further directed to appear before the Court for a conference on June 16, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. It is SO ORDERED.IT IS SO ORDERED., ( Status Conference set for 6/16/2015 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/02/2015) (ama)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Signature Exploration and Production Corporation v. GCM Administrative Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Signature Exploration and Production Corporation
Represented By: Alexis Lauren Cirel
Represented By: Martin Edward Karlinsky
Represented By: Amy Adrienne Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCM Administrative Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth M. Lukash
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Herman
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Turnaround Equity Partners, LP (Cayman)
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?