Cruz et al v. Zucker
Plaintiff: |
Angie Cruz and I.H. |
Defendant: |
Howard Zucker |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv04456 |
Filed: |
June 19, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
New York |
Presiding Judge: |
Jed S. Rakoff |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 6, 2016 |
Filing
134
OPINION AND ORDER: re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Howard Zucker, 77 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 52 Memorandum & Opinion, #105720. filed by Howard Zucker, 79 MOTION to Amend/Correct 23 Stipulation and Order,,, 64 Notice (Other) Motion to Decertify the Plaintiff Class. filed by Howard Zucker. Accordingly, the Court denies both parties' motions for summary judgment on plaintiffs 9; ESPDT claims. The question to be resolved at trial on the EPDST Provision claims is also presented by plaintiffs' other claims, namely, what treatments, including surgeries or hormone therapies, are medically necessary for the treatment of ge nder dysphoria in minors? In sum, for the foregoing reasons, the Court denies defendant's motion for reconsideration, denies defendant's motion to decertify the plaintiff class, denies defendant's motion for summary judgment in part an d grants it in part, and denies plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment in part and grants it in part. This case will proceed to trial to determine (1) what treatments are medically necessary for individuals under 18 with gender dysphoria and (2 ) to what extent DOH has consistently followed a bona fide policy of limiting coverage of drug uses to those listed in the Medicaid Compendia in the context of treatments for gender dysphoria. The parties are directed to jointly telephone Chambers by no later than July 8, 2016, to schedule a trial date.The Clerk of Court is directed to close documents numbered 77, 79, and 81 on the docket of this case. (And as set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/05/2016) (ama)
|
July 29, 2015 |
Filing
52
OPINION: Accordingly, the Court granted defendant's motion to dismiss Count IV of the Amended Complaint. For the foregoing reasons, the Court, by Order dated June 26, 2015, dismissed Claims III and IV, and also dismissed Claim V with respect to the Youth Exclusion, but otherwise denied defendant's motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/29/2015) (ama)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?