Callsome Solutions, Inc. v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Callsome Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv04639
Filed: June 25, 2014
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: John F. Keenan
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2014 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Google, Inc. served on 6/26/2014, answer due 7/17/2014. Service was accepted by Kevin Valountka, Corporation Service Company. Document filed by Callsome Solutions, Inc.. (Kammerman, Todd)
June 30, 2014 4 Featured Case ORDER: The conference is rescheduled from September 25, 2014 to September 23, 2014 at 11:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 9/23/2014 at 11:30 AM before Judge John F. Keenan.) (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/30/2014) (djc)
June 27, 2014 3 NOTICE OF A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel are directed to appear in Courtroom 20-C on September 25, 2014 at 11:30 a.m., for a pretrial conference, for the purpose of discussing the status of this case. Please notify your adversary as to the date of this conference. This conference will not be adjourned except by order of the Court. (Initial Conference set for 9/25/2014 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 20C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John F. Keenan). (Signed by Judge John F. Keenan on 6/27/2014) (djc)
June 25, 2014 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh)
June 25, 2014 Case Designated ECF. (moh)
June 25, 2014 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (moh)
June 25, 2014 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google, Inc.. (moh)
June 25, 2014 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1098834)Document filed by Callsome Solutions, Inc..(moh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callsome Solutions, Inc. v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Callsome Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Leslie Kammerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?