Jimenez v. F.C.I. Otisville- Bureau of Prison et al
Plaintiff: |
Virgilio Jimenez |
Defendant: |
F.C.I. Otisville- Bureau of Prison, H. L. Hufford, Diane Sommer and Bridget Baker |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv05166 |
Filed: |
July 3, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
Orange |
Presiding Judge: |
Loretta A. Preska |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 28, 2017 |
Filing
74
OPINION & ORDER: re: 62 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Diane Sommer. For the foregoing reasons, the Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Only Plaintiffs FTCA negligence claim remains. The parties are directed to notify Magistrate Judge McCarthy of this decision. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECFNo. 62. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 7/28/2017) (ap)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing
51
OPINION & ORDER re: 38 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 35 Memorandum & Opinion filed by Virgilio Jimenez. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Bivens claim against Defendant Sommer is reinstated. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 38. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/3/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mml)
|
February 3, 2016 |
Filing
35
OPINION & ORDER re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bridget Baker, Diane Sommer, United States, 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Virgilio Jimenez. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED an d Plaintiff's motion to amend the Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff's Bivens claim and medical malpractice FTCA claim are dismissed. Defendants are directed to file an answer to the remaining claim within 30 days hereof. The parties are directed to appear for an initial pre-trial conference on March 22, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Defendants are directed to appear in person. Defendants' counsel shall make arrangements with the appropriate correctional facility for Plaintiff to appear via telephone conference. Defendants shall bring a completed case management plan to the March 22 conference. The Court respectfully directs the Clerk to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 21 and 24. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 2/3/2016) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (mml)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?