Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York et al v. Phase Construction Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York, Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Pension Fund, Annuity Fund, Training Fund, Health and Safety Fund and John J. Virga
Defendant: Phase Construction Services, Inc. and SL Construction Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2014cv06016
Filed: August 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 OPINION AND ORDER re: 134 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Preclusion. filed by Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Training Fund, Annuity Fund, Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York, Pension Fund, John J. Virga, Health and Safety Fund, 144 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument re Motion for Summary Judgment and Order of Preclusion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Barbara S. Mehlsack dated 06/12/2018. filed by Mason Tenders District Co uncil Welfare Fund, Training Fund, Annuity Fund, Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York, Pension Fund, John J. Virga, Health and Safety Fund. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is GRANT ED in part, Plaintiffs' motion for preclusion is DENIED as moot, and Defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The parties are directed to submit a proposed Final Judgment and Order reflecting these finding by January 29, 2019. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, Docs. 134, 144. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 146016) (kv)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 178 OPINION AND ORDER re: 111 MOTION to Enforce Judgment re: 98 Memorandum & Opinion: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for entry of judgment and for an order awarding fees and costs is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 111. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/27/2018) (jwh)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPINION AND ORDER re: 90 MOTION for Attorney Fees Pursuant to Order of the Court Doc No. 77. filed by Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Training Fund, Annuity Fund, Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York, Pension Fund, John J. Virga, Health and Safety Fund. Accordingly, the Court finds an appropriate award of attorneys' fees and expenses is $13,194.50 - which deducts the $1,898 billed for work completed prior to Plaintiffs filing of the pre-motion letter in anticipation of the motion to compel. The Court, therefore, GRANTS Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees and expenses in the amount of $13,194.50. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 90. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/20/2017) (cf)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiff's motion to amend is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions, Docs. 64, 73. It is so o rdered. re: 64 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, filed by Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Training Fund, Annuity Fund, Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York, Pension Fund, John J. Virga, H ealth and Safety Fund, 73 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Documents filed by Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund, Training Fund, Annuity Fund, Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York, Pension Fund, John J. Virga, Health and Safety Fund. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 11/30/2016) (rjm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York et al v. Phase Construction Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Tenders District Council of Greater New York
Represented By: Deke Wayne Bond
Represented By: Andrew A. Gorlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Tenders District Council Welfare Fund
Represented By: Deke Wayne Bond
Represented By: Andrew A. Gorlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Fund
Represented By: Deke Wayne Bond
Represented By: Andrew A. Gorlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annuity Fund
Represented By: Deke Wayne Bond
Represented By: Andrew A. Gorlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Training Fund
Represented By: Deke Wayne Bond
Represented By: Andrew A. Gorlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health and Safety Fund
Represented By: Deke Wayne Bond
Represented By: Andrew A. Gorlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Virga
Represented By: Deke Wayne Bond
Represented By: Andrew A. Gorlick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phase Construction Services, Inc.
Represented By: Rex Whitehorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SL Construction Group, Inc.
Represented By: Rex Whitehorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?