Cooksey v. Simmons et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Edward Cooksey
Defendant: Russell Wendell Simmons, Brittany Lewis, Global Grind Digital, Accel Partnera A and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 1:2014cv07146
Filed: August 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court has considered all of the arguments raised by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed, the arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, the defendant's motion to dis miss is granted and the Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice, the plaintiff's motions for a default judgment and sanctions are denied and the defendant's motion for sanctions is denied. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismi ssing this action and closing the case. The Clerk is also directed to close all pending motions. SO ORDERED. re: 78 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Calvin Edward Cooksey, 49 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Global Grind Digital, 94 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Lisa M. Buckley dated July 13, 2016 filed by Global Grind Digital, 85 CROSS MOTION Pre-Filing Injunction re: 78 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Global Grind Digital. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/19/2016) (rjm)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court denies the plaintiff's motion for "automatic[] disqualification" in its entirety. The plaintiff's time to respond to the Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, ECF Docket No. 49, is extend ed to May 09, 2016. The time to reply is extended to May 23, 2016. This motion has been pending since February 16, 2016. If the plaintiff fails to respond to the motion, the Court will decide the motion on the papers already submitted. The Clerk is directed to close ECF Docket No. 58. So ordered. re: 58 MOTION to Disqualify Judge. filed by Calvin Edward Cooksey. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/20/2016) (rjm)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The defendant's motion to redact certain portions of the Amended Complaint is granted. The Clerk is directed to file the defendant's proposed redacted version of the Amended Complaint (ECF No. 29-1) in lieu of the Amended Complaint in its unredacted form. The Clerk is also directed to close ECF No. 28. re: 28 MOTION Redact Certain Portions in the Amended Complaint filed by Global Grind Digital. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/25/2016) (rjm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooksey v. Simmons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Edward Cooksey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Wendell Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Grind Digital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accel Partnera A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?