March 1, 2021 |
Filing
373
FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT ANGELIQUE DE MAISON: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is liable for disgorgement of $524,885 and a civil penalty in the amount of $4,240,049.30. Defendant shall satisfy this obli gation by paying $4,764,934.30 to the Securities and Exchange Commission within 14 days after entry of this Final Judgment. Defendant may transmit payment electronically to the Commission, which will provide detailed ACH transfer/Fedwire i nstructions upon request. Payment may also be made directly from a bank account via Pay.gov through the SEC website at http://www.sec.gov/about/offices/ofm.htm. Defendant may also pay by certified check, bank cashier's check, or United States postal money order payable to the Securities and Exchange Commission, which shall be delivered or mailed to Enterprise Services Center Accounts Receivable Branch 6500 South MacArthur Boulevard Oklahoma City, OK 73169 and shall be accompanied by a letter identifying the case title, civil action number, and name of this Court; Angelique de Maison as a defendant in this action; and specifying that payment is made pursuant to this Final Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED th at this Court shall retain jurisdiction of this matter for the purposes of enforcing the terms of this Final Judgment. There being no just reason for delay, pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Clerk is ordered to enter this Final Judgment forthwith and without further notice. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/1/2021) (jca) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
|
February 19, 2021 |
Filing
370
OPINION AND ORDER: A judgment of disgorgement in the amount of $524,885 is imposed against defendant de Maison. Defendant de Maison shall also pay a civil penalty of $4,240,049.30. The SEC shall submit by February 26, 2021 a proposed order implementing the Court's rulings as to de Maison. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/19/2021) (jca)
|
October 14, 2020 |
Filing
358
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that parties shall submit, by October 27, 2020, memoranda addressing the impact of Liu on the judgment entered in this action. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/14/2020) (js)
|
July 30, 2018 |
Filing
335
OPINION AND ORDER: For the above reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that de Maison shall disgorge her ill-gotten gains in the amount of $4,240,049.30, plus prejudgment interest. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the SEC shall recalculate the amount of prej udgment interest owed by de Maison in accordance with the instructions in this Opinion and file a letter with its calculations by July 30. Any response, limited to discussions of the calculations alone, is due August 3. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that de Maison shall pay a civil penalty of $4,240,049.30. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Malone shall disgorge her ill-gotten gains in the amount of $394,741.24, plus prejudgment interest to be calculated at the IRS underpayment rate, running fro m the date of the last received payment from Wikifamilies, Lustros, and Gepco, through to the present. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Malone shall pay a civil penalty of $125,000. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mastromatteo and Traverse shall disgorge their ill-gotten gains in the amount of $58,753, plus prejudgment interest to be calculated at the IRS underpayment rate, running from August 1, 2014 through to the present. Mastromatteo and Traverse are jointly and severally liable for the di sgorgement payment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mastromatteo and Traverse shall pay a civil penalty of $58,753. Mastromatteo and Traverse are jointly and severally liable for the civil money penalty. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by August 6, 2018, the SEC shall submit a proposed order implementing the Court's rulings as to all four defendants. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/30/2018) (rro)
|
February 8, 2017 |
Filing
295
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Angelique de Maison (de Maison) brings this motion for reconsideration of the Courts December 23, 2016 Memorandum Opinion and Order awarding de Maison $25,000 as compensation for facilitating the sale of four of her properties (the December 23 Opinion). Specifically, the motion seeks the award of an additional $75,000. For the reasons set forth below, de Maisons motion for reconsideration is denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/8/2017) (gr)
|
December 23, 2016 |
Filing
283
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Ms. de Maisons November 1 motion for relief is granted in part. The Freeze Order shall be modified to allow for the payment of $93,478.65 to the law firm of Davis Wright Tremaine LLP and for the payment of $25,000 to de Maison as compensation for her efforts in connection with the sale of real estate. (Signed by Judge Denise Cote on 12/23/2016) (hm)
|