Modern Settings LLC et al v. Basf Metals Limited et al
Plaintiff: |
Modern Settings LLC |
Defendant: |
Basf Metals Limited, Goldman Sachs International, HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and Standard Bank Plc |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv09391 |
Filed: |
November 25, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
Suffolk |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory H. Woods |
Nature of Suit: |
Antitrust |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 15 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 25, 2024 |
Filing
311
ORDER withdrawing 293 Motion for Judgment. Application granted. The parties' request to stay all pending case deadlines and motions while the parties finalize settlement papers, Dkt. No. 310, is granted. All case deadlines and scheduled co nferences in this action are stayed and held in abeyance. The Court considers the pending motion at Dkt. No. 293 withdrawn by the parties. The parties may refile that motion in the event that the settlement is not consummated. The parties are direc ted to write to the Court no later than June 24, 2024 informing the Court of the status of this matter. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 293. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/25/2024) (ks)
|
October 17, 2023 |
Filing
304
CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION ANDPROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 10/17/2023) (rro)
|
March 29, 2020 |
Filing
239
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 235 JOINT MOTION for Reconsideration re; 179 Memorandum & Opinion, Set Deadlines filed by ICBC Standard Bank plc, Basf Metals Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Goldman Sachs International, 207 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by ICBC Standard Bank plc, Basf Metals Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Goldman Sachs International. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) is GRANTED, the Foreign Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) is DENIED, and Defe ndants' motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are granted leave to replead their Sherman Act and CEA claims. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkt Nos. 207 and 235. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/29/2020) (mro)
|
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
179
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 115 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by BASF CORPORATION, Standard Bank Plc, The London Platinum and Palladium Fixing Comp any Ltd., Basf Metals Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Goldman Sachs International; 113 MOTION to Dismiss Second Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint Under Fed R Civ P 12(b)(6) & 12(f) filed by UBS Securities LLC, UBS AG. For the foregoing reasons: Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Sherman Act claim is GRANTED. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Commodities Exchange Act claims is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' unjust enrichment claim is GRANTED. Defendants' motion to strike portions of the SAC is DENIED. ICBC's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs' application for jurisdictional discovery is DENIED. BASF Corp.'s and UBS's motions to dismiss for failure to state a claim are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at Dkt. Nos. 113 and 115. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/2/2017, Motions due by 6/5/2017.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/28/2017) (anc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?