Malanga v. NYU Langone Medical Center and School of Medicine et al
Plaintiff: |
Michele Malanga |
Defendant: |
NYU Langone Medical Center and School of Medicine, NYU Hospitals Center, Silva Formenti and Maria Fenton-Kerimian |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv09681 |
Filed: |
December 9, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
Dutchess |
Presiding Judge: |
Louis L. Stanton |
Nature of Suit: |
False Claims Act |
Cause of Action: |
31 U.S.C. § 3729 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 9, 2018 |
Filing
115
OPINION & ORDER re: 108 MOTION in Limine for an Order Determining No Heightened Standard Applies Post-FERA filed by Michele Malanga, 107 MOTION in Limine to Preclude Defendant from Submitting Witness Statements filed b y Michele Malanga: For the foregoing reasons, Malanga's motion regarding the FCA's notice standard for a fraud-alert employee is granted. NYU's motion regarding the but-for causation standard is granted. Malanga's motion to exclude NYU's witness statements is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 1/9/2018) (jwh)
|
October 5, 2017 |
Filing
93
OPINION & ORDER re: 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Silva Formenti, NYU Langone Medical Center and School of Medicine, NYU Hospitals Center, 87 CROSS MOTION to Amend/Correct Second Amended Complaint filed by Miche le Malanga: Defendants NYU Langone Medical Center and School of Medicine, et al. ("NYU") move for summary judgment dismissing Plaintiff Michele Malanga's claims. For the foregoing reasons, NYU's motion for summary judgment is gra nted as to Malanga's NYCHRL hostile work environment claim. NYU's motion for summary judgment is denied as to the FCA retaliation claim. Additionally, Malanga's cross-motion to amend the caption is granted. Malanga is directed to file her amended complaint reflecting New York University as the proper defendant by October 13, 2017. Finally, the parties are directed to submit a joint pretrial order by November 10, 2017 and appear for a final pretrial conference on November 16, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute New York University in place and stead of Defendants NYU Langone Medical Center and NYU Hospitals Center in the caption of this action. The Clerk of Court is also directed to terminate the mo tions pending at ECF Nos. 77 and 87. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III. Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2017. Pretrial Order due by 11/10/2017. New York University added. NYU Hospitals Center and NYU Langone Medical Center and School of Medicine terminated.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 10/5/2017) (jwh)
|
December 29, 2016 |
Filing
62
OPINION & ORDER re: 51 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum of Weill Cornell Medicine Radiation Oncology . filed by Silva Formenti, NYU Langone Medical Center and School of Medicine, NYU Hospitals Center. Accordingly, Defendants motion to quash is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 51. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/29/2016) (cla)
|
November 12, 2015 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint is granted with respect to Plaintiff's New York Labor Law, New York State Hum an Rights Law, and aiding and abetting claims (claims 2, 3, 5, and 6) and denied with respect to Malanga's False Claims Act and New York City Human Rights Law claims. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at ECF No. 18. The docket should also be updated to reflect that Maria Fenton-Kerimian is no longer named as a defendant in this action. (As further set forth in this Memorandum & Order.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 11/12/2015) (mro)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?