Ortega et al v. U.S. Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: |
Moises Ortega |
Defendant: |
Bronx Office of Student Suspensions & Hearing, Keith Kerulo, Blanca Torres Mutt, Tanya Drummond, Francisco Moya, Bronx Public School ("P.S.")211 and Advocates for Children of New York |
Case Number: |
1:2014cv09703 |
Filed: |
December 1, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
County: |
Bronx |
Presiding Judge: |
Loretta A. Preska |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 11, 2017 |
Filing
46
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 45 MOTION to Vacate. filed by Moises Ortega. If the plaintiff wishes to pursue his claims, he should file another lawsuit, but he has failed to present any basis for the reconsideration of the dismissal without prejudice of this action. Accordingly, the motion is denied. The Clerk is directed to close all pending motions. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 5/9/2017) (cf)
|
March 24, 2017 |
Filing
43
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 39 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) and 37(b)(2)(A) filed by Blanca Torres Mutt. The defendant, Blanca Torres Mutt, has moved to dismiss the Amended Complaint for failure to prosecut e pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) or, in the alternative, as a sanction for failure to comply with this Court's Orders pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(b)(2)(A). The plaintiff, Moises Ortega, proceeding pro se, ha s failed to respond to the motion. (As further set forth in this Order.) The Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment and to close this case. The Clerk is also directed to close all pending motions. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/23/2017) (cf)
|
February 6, 2015 |
Filing
6
ORDER OF SERVICE: With the exception of Blanca Torres Mutt, all defendants are dismissed from the action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to the plaintiff one USM-285 Form. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 19 15(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962), and as further set forth. USM-285 Form due by 3/9/2015. Request for Issuance of Summons due by 3/9/2015. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/6/2015) (rjm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?