Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft v. O'Rourke Marine Services L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft
Defendant: O'Rourke Marine Services L.P., L.L.P., O.W. Bunker Germany GmbH, O.W. Bunker USA, Inc. and ING Bank N.V.
Case Number: 1:2014cv10027
Filed: December 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Valerie E. Caproni
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties must file a status update in this matter by no later than Friday, April 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/26/2021) (ama)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by no later than Friday, March 5, 2021, the parties must either file a stipulation including to whom the check should be made payable and to what address it should be sent, or file a joint letter updating the Court about the status of this matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/20/2021) (rj)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action will be dismissed with prejudice on February 5, 2021, unless before that date one or more of the parties files a letter with the Court requesting that the action not be dismissed and explaining why the ac tion should not be dismissed in light of the parties' settlement. To be clear, any request that the action not be dismissed must be filed before February 5, 2021; any request filed on or after that date may bedenied solely on that basis. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction to enforce their settlement agreement, not later than January 29, 2021, they must submit (1) their settlement agreement to the Court in accordance with Rule 7.A of the Court's Individual Practice s and (2) a request that the Court issue an order expressly retaining jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354 (2d Cir. 2015). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon dismissal, the Court will order the Clerk of Court to disburse the amount deposited (plus interest). By no later than Friday, February 5, 2021, the parties must jointly inform the Court what amount is to be paid to each of the parties. In the same joint letter, the parties must inform the Court to whom the checks should be made payable and to what address they should be sent. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 2/5/2021.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/02/2020) (ama)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft v. O'Rourke Marine Services L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft
Represented By: Michael Fernandez
Represented By: Peter Judge Gutowski
Represented By: Gina Maria Venezia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Rourke Marine Services L.P.
Represented By: J. Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.W. Bunker Germany GmbH
Represented By: Darren Todd Azman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.W. Bunker USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ING Bank N.V.
Represented By: Brian Paul Maloney
Represented By: Bruce G. Paulsen
Represented By: David E. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?