Phoenix Light SF Limited et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Plaintiff: Phoenix Light SF Limited, C-Bass CBO XIV Ltd., C-Bass CBO XII Ltd., Kleros Preferred Funding V Plc, Silver Elms CDO plc, Silver Elms CDO II Limited and Blue Heron Funding IX Ltd.
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2014cv10103
Filed: December 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
County: New York
Presiding Judge: John G. Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER, The Court will hold oral argument on the parties' motion for summary judgment on August 3, 2021 at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. Public dial-in option: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. SO ORDERED. ( Oral Argument set for 8/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/23/21) (yv)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting 388 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Argument adjourned to 8/3/21 at 10:00AM. So ordered. Oral Argument set for 8/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/16/2021) (mml)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 OPINION AND ORDER re: 146 LETTER MOTION to Compel Deutsche Bank National Trust Co. to produce documents referencing individual loan numbers addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Christopher J. Lucht dated May 23, 2017. filed by Silver Elms CDO plc, Phoenix Light SF Limited, Blue Heron Funding V Ltd., Kleros Preferred Funding V Plc, Blue Heron Funding IX Ltd., Silver Elms CDO II Limited, Blue Heron Funding VI Ltd., C-Bass CBO XVII Ltd., C-Bass CBO XIV Ltd., Blue Heron Funding VII Ltd., 144 LETTER MOTION to Compel Deutsche Bank National Trust Co. to produce addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Christopher J. Lucht dated May 12, 2017. filed by Silver Elms CDO plc, Phoenix Light SF Limited, Blue Heron Funding V Ltd., Silver Elms CDO II Limited, Blue Heron Funding IX Ltd., Kleros Preferred Funding V Plc, Blue Heron Funding VI Ltd., C-Bass CBO XVII Ltd., C-Bass CBO XIV Ltd., Blue Heron Fun ding VII Ltd. Plaintiffs' motion to compel (Dkt. 144) is granted, to the extent that Defendant is directed to run a search for ESI (specifically emails), using, as search terms, the 16,000 individual loan numbers listed in Defendant's Re purchase Tracking Log (DBNTC PHOENIX LIGHT 2731279), and to produce to Plaintiff all responsive, non-privileged documents discovered through that search, unless already produced in discovery in identical form. If Defendant believes it would be hel pful to add qualifiers to this search, to try to avoid "false hits" (in other words, to try to exclude documents where the searched-for series of digits (constituting the loan numbers) are found, instead, in telephone numbers, Social Sec urity numbers, or zip codes), then counsel should confer in good faith regarding the use of such qualifiers, and attempt to reach agreement on methodology. This Court's ordering of only a sample loan-number search at this time is without preju dice to Plaintiffs' right to renew its motion for a more extensive search, should Plaintiffs believe that the results of the sample search would justify a search for more loan numbers. The Clerk of Court is directed to close Dkts. 144 and 146 on the Docket of this action, consistent with this Opinion and Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 6/5/17) Copies Sent By Chambers (via ECF). (yv)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPINION AND ORDER. The Court has considered all of the arguments by the parties. To the extent not specifically addressed above, the parties' arguments are either moot or without merit. For the foregoing reasons, Deutsche Bank's motion to d ismiss is denied in part and granted in part. The Clerk of Court is directed to close all pending motions. re: 26 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Deutsche Bank National Trus t Company, 10 MOTION for Matthew C. Davies to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10483407 filed by Phoenix Light SF Limited, 7 MOTION for George A. Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filin g fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10483276 filed by Phoenix Light SF Limited, 8 MOTION for John A. Libra to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10483332 filed by Phoenix Light SF Limited, 35 MOTION to Dismiss the second amended complaint filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, 9 MOTION for Maximilian C. Gibbons to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10483379 filed by Phoenix Light SF Limited. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/28/2016) (rjm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phoenix Light SF Limited et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Light SF Limited
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Melissa Ann Finkelstein
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: Maximilian Clay Gibbons
Represented By: Michael Ledley
Represented By: John Libra
Represented By: John Anton Libra
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Randall R. Rainer
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-Bass CBO XIV Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Melissa Ann Finkelstein
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: Maximilian Clay Gibbons
Represented By: Michael Ledley
Represented By: John Anton Libra
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Randall R. Rainer
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-Bass CBO XII Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Melissa Ann Finkelstein
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: Maximilian Clay Gibbons
Represented By: Michael Ledley
Represented By: John Anton Libra
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Randall R. Rainer
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kleros Preferred Funding V Plc
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Melissa Ann Finkelstein
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: Maximilian Clay Gibbons
Represented By: Michael Ledley
Represented By: John Anton Libra
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Randall R. Rainer
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Elms CDO plc
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Melissa Ann Finkelstein
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: Maximilian Clay Gibbons
Represented By: Michael Ledley
Represented By: John Anton Libra
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Randall R. Rainer
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silver Elms CDO II Limited
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Melissa Ann Finkelstein
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: Maximilian Clay Gibbons
Represented By: Michael Ledley
Represented By: John Anton Libra
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Randall R. Rainer
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Heron Funding IX Ltd.
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Melissa Ann Finkelstein
Represented By: Steven Sanford Fitzgerald
Represented By: Maximilian Clay Gibbons
Represented By: Michael Ledley
Represented By: John Anton Libra
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Randall R. Rainer
Represented By: Stephen M. Tillery
Represented By: David H Wollmuth
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Bernard J. Garbutt, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?