August 25, 2023 |
Filing
461
OPINION& ORDER re: 452 MOTION to Appeal Clerk's Decision on Taxation of Costs re: 451 Taxation of Costs, . filed by U.S. Bank National Association. U.S Bank's appeal on the taxation of costs is GRANTED IN PART and DE NIED IN PART. U.S Bank shall submit to the Clerk of Court a revised application to tax costs consistent with this Opinion & Order by October 4, 2023. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Doc. 452. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/25/2023) (rro)
|
August 9, 2021 |
Filing
445
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Withdrawal of Appearance of Jennifer M. Thomas as counsel of record filed by Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case is hereby GRANTED, and Jennifer M. Thomas is withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. Attorney Jennifer Marie Thomas terminated. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/9/2021) (ate)
|
August 12, 2020 |
Filing
436
OPINION & ORDER re: 423 MOTION to Alter Judgment re: 422 Clerk's Judgment . filed by Silver Elms CDO plc, Phoenix Light SF DAC, Kleros Preferred Funding V Plc, Silver Elms CDO II Limited, Blue Heron Funding VI Ltd ., C-Bass CBO XVII Ltd., C-Bass CBO XIV Ltd., Blue Heron Funding VII Ltd. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration and to amend the judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the open motion at Document 423. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/12/2020) (cf)
|
March 18, 2020 |
Filing
422
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 421 Memorandum & Opinion. in favor of U.S. Bank National Association against Blue Heron Funding VI Ltd., Blue Heron Funding VII Ltd., C-Bass CBO XIV Ltd., C-Bass CBO XVII Ltd., Kleros Preferred Funding V Plc, PIMCO Eu rope Ltd., Phoenix Light SF DAC, Phoenix Light SF Limited, Silver Elms CDO II Limited, Silver Elms CDO plc. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated March 18, 2020, Defendant U.S. Bank's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 243) is granted, and Defendant U.S. Bank's motion for partial summary judgment on the pleadings, (Doc. 139) is denied. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 03/18/2020) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal) (dt)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
105
OPINION & ORDER re: 84 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants Notice of Joint Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To FRCP 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). filed by Bank of America, NA. This Court has considered parties' other arguments in relation to this motion and finds that they are without merit. For the reasons set forth above, defendants'motion to dismiss is DENIED as to Count II and GRANTED as to Counts I, III, IV, V, and VI. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 84. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/22/2016) (lmb)
|
May 18, 2015 |
Filing
71
OPINION & ORDER re: 49 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Notice of Joint Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1)&(6) filed by Bank of America, NA: For the reasons set forth above, defendants' motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Should plaintiffs seek to amend, they must file any proposed amendment-along with a motion pursuant to Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure-within 21 days from the date of this Opinion & Order. To allow for careful review of those allegations necessary to state a claim, any proposed Second Amended Complaint shall be not more than 75 pages in length. (Additional background materials may be in an appendix.) The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 49. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 5/18/2015) (tn)
|